Liang Vs Hauser
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 94 965694
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Liang, Andy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schuman, Allan M. (& Associates)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schuman, Allan M. +1 415 563 2111
v.
No Logo Hauser, William, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pelton & Gunther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pelton & Gunther +1 415 392 2770
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 7/26/1995, Entered: 7/26/1995
Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
    Blank 13 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995
    Removed From Arbitration
      Blank 12 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995
      Plan I Arbitration, Settlement Conference: Settled (ptr1)
        Blank 11 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995
        Plan I Arbitration, Settlement Conference:
          Blank 10 Filed: 5/5/1995, Entered: 5/5/1995
          Plan I Arbitration: Pltf Demands,, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Jul-17-1995 At 08:00 Am In Dept 314
            Blank 9 Filed: 4/28/1995, Entered: 4/28/1995
            Status Conference Order
              Blank 8 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 4/27/1995
              Mailing, Plan I Arb S/c Order From 05/05/95 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 07/17/95 Scd8 09:00 Am
                Blank 7 Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995
                Status And Setting Conference Statement
                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/6/1995, Entered: 4/6/1995
                  Status And Setting Conference Statement
                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995
                    $182. Pd By: William Hauser
                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995
                      Answer Of William Hauser
                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/8/1994, Entered: 12/8/1994
                        Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For May-05-1995 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/8/1994, Entered: 12/8/1994
                          Summons Issued
                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/8/1994, Entered: 12/8/1994
                            Complaint For Personal Injury (vehicle)

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 5 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?