Lee Vs Wong
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 95 966887
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Lee, Julie, Plaintiff

Represented by Boasberg, Albert Loeb

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Boasberg, Albert Loeb +1 415 989 6969
v.
No Logo Wong, Adam G, Defendant

Represented by Katz & Quan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katz & Quan +1 415 284 9777
No Logo Wong, Diana L., Defendant
No Logo Wong, Edward J, Defendant
No Logo Wong, Elaine Y, Defendant
No Logo Wong, Terry W., Defendant
Officer/Director, Shallbetter Industries Inc
No Logo Lee, Julie, Cross-Defendant

Represented by Boasberg, Albert Loeb

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Boasberg, Albert Loeb +1 415 989 6969
No Logo Wong, Adam G, Cross-Complainant

Represented by Katz & Quan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katz & Quan +1 415 284 9777
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 57 Filed: 10/9/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996
Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
    Blank 56 Filed: 9/26/1996, Entered: 9/26/1996
    $78 Jury Fee Refund Boasberg Albert #97001981
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
      Blank 55 Filed: 9/6/1996, Entered: 9/6/1996
      Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
        Blank 54 Filed: 8/26/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996
        Scd1-tr.cal.: Off Calendar Settled In Dept. 8
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
          Blank 53 Filed: 8/26/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996
          Proceedings Reported By Eric Throne,7855 (d8)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
            Blank 52 Filed: 8/26/1996, Entered: 8/26/1996
            Trl Assigned Fr D-1. Action Settled (d8)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
              Blank 51 Filed: 8/21/1996, Entered: 8/21/1996
              S/c Held, Cause Is Not Settled (17)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                Blank 50 Filed: 8/7/1996, Entered: 8/7/1996
                S/c Held, S/c Contd To 8-21-96 At 9:30 Am. (17)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                  Blank 49 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996
                  $ 78.00 Jury Fee Albert & Boasberg #026418 Cashier Payment
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                    Blank 48 Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996
                    Settlement Conference Order
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                      Blank 47 Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996
                      Mailing, Settlement Conference Notice From 08/07/96 Sc17 09:00 Am For 08/07/96 Sc17 09:00 Am
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                        Blank 46 Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996
                        Settlement Conference Continued, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Aug-07-1996 At 09:00 Am In Dept 17
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                          Blank 45 Filed: 7/22/1996, Entered: 7/22/1996
                          Dropped From S/c Calendar (ptr1),
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                            Blank 44 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996
                            Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                              Blank 43 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996
                              Mailing (ca025) From 08/26/96 Scd1 09:00 Am For 08/07/96 Scd7 09:00 Am
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                Blank 42 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996
                                Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                  Blank 41 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996
                                  Notice Of Trial, Court Trial;
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                    Blank 40 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996
                                    Request For Trial De Novo For The Pltf & X-deft
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                      Blank 39 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996
                                      (2) Order For Sanctions Microfilmed R/b F:173-06
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                        Blank 38 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996
                                        Mailing (ca068) From 02/15/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 02/15/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                          Blank 37 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996
                                          Order To Show Cause - Hearing On: Feb. 15, 1996 - 1:30 Pm
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                            Blank 36 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996
                                            Arbitration: No Fee Requested
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                              Blank 35 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996
                                              Arbitration Award
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                Blank 34 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/19/1996
                                                Dropped From Calendar
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: 1/4/1996
                                                  Order & Stip To Continue Arbitration Hrg Date
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 1/4/1996, Entered: 1/4/1996
                                                    Declaration Of Bruce Quan
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 12/29/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995
                                                      Order To Show Cause, 02/15/96 1:30pm
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 12/28/1995, Entered: 12/28/1995
                                                        Mailing (ca068) From 02/15/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 02/15/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 12/27/1995, Entered: 12/27/1995
                                                          Order To Arbitration, No Disposition Hearing Set For Feb-15-1996 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995
                                                            Order To Show Cause - Hearing On Jan. 22, 1996 - 3:30 Pm
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995
                                                              Mailing (ca068) From 01/22/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 01/22/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995
                                                                Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995
                                                                  Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 09/14/95
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 9/14/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995
                                                                    Arbitration Due To End
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995
                                                                      Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 08/31/95
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 8/31/1995, Entered: 8/31/1995
                                                                        Arbitrator Selection Due
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 8/25/1995, Entered: 8/25/1995
                                                                          Change Of Firm Name And Address
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: 8/21/1995
                                                                            Order To Arbitration, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Aug-28-1995 At 08:00 Am In Dept 314
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 8/15/1995, Entered: 8/15/1995
                                                                              Order To Arbitration
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995
                                                                                Mailing (ca069) From 08/21/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 08/28/95 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 7/21/1995, Entered: 7/21/1995
                                                                                  Status And Setting Conference Statement Of Adam G Wong
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995
                                                                                    Req For Dism, W/o Prej Entire Action As Against Edward J. Wong;diana L. Wong;elaine Y. Wong And Terry W. Wong Only
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: 7/17/1995
                                                                                      Status And Setting Conference Statement Of Plntf & X-defnt
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 7/12/1995, Entered: 7/12/1995
                                                                                        Stip Re Dismissal Of Defts Without Prej
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 6/30/1995
                                                                                          Osc Dismissed/sanctions, Hearing Set For Aug-21-1995 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/21/1995
                                                                                            Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal/sanctions - Hrg On: Aug. 21, 1995 - 1:30 Pm
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 6/21/1995, Entered: 6/21/1995
                                                                                              Mailing (ca070) From 06/30/95 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 08/21/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 6/15/1995, Entered: 6/15/1995
                                                                                                Answer Of X-d, Julie Lee To X-c
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: 6/14/1995
                                                                                                  Status And Setting Conference Statement Of Julie Lee
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 6/6/1995, Entered: 6/6/1995
                                                                                                    Status And Setting Conference Statement Of Adam G Wong
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995
                                                                                                      Cross-complaint Of Adam G. Wong
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/15/1995
                                                                                                        Answer Of Adam G. Wong
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: 4/19/1995
                                                                                                          $182. Pd By: Adam L. Wong
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: 4/19/1995
                                                                                                            Stipulation And Order Extending Filing Date Of Responsive Pleadings To 5/15/95
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995
                                                                                                              Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Jun-30-1995 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995
                                                                                                                Summons Issued
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/30/1995, Entered: 1/30/1995
                                                                                                                  Complaint For Fraud
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?