Liu Vs Chan
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 95 967332
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Liu, Helen Yiu Wah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovis,smith,stewart,(100) Lipscomb & Cross LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hovis,smith,stewart, +1 415 421 9696
v.
No Logo Chan, Christopher See Ching, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Birkhimer, Dennis C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Birkhimer, Dennis C +1 415 922 1881
No Logo Chan, Christopher S.c., Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Birkhimer, Dennis C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Birkhimer, Dennis C +1 415 922 1881
No Logo United World Enterprise Inc, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Katz & Quan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katz & Quan +1 415 284 9777
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (78) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 78 Filed: 7/16/1996, Entered: 7/16/1996
Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
    Blank 77 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996
    Ptr1, Osc 5-13-96 @ 3:30 Pm, Off Calendar: Settled,
      Blank 76 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/10/1996
      Arbitrator Discharged: Case Settled
        Blank 75 Filed: 2/13/1996, Entered: 2/13/1996
        Answer Of Christopher Sc Chan To 2nd Amd Complt
          Blank 74 Filed: 2/5/1996, Entered: 2/5/1996
          Substitution Of Atty, Hovis Smith Larson Stewart Lipscomb Cross For Pltf, Helen Yiu Wah Liu
            Blank 73 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/2/1996
            Proof Of Service
              Blank 72 Filed: 2/1/1996, Entered: 2/1/1996
              Dropped From Calendar
                Blank 71 Filed: 1/29/1996, Entered: 1/29/1996
                Order Granting Christopher Chan's Mo For Relief From Atty Mistake
                  Blank 70 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996
                  Statement Re Filing Of Ntc Of Lien
                    Blank 69 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996
                    Notice Of Lien
                      Blank 68 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996
                      Proof Of Service
                        Blank 67 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/22/1996
                        Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                          Blank 66 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/22/1996
                          Mo To File 2nd Amend Ans/relief--granted.deft's Atty Shall Pay Pltff $1000 As Sanction.order Signed.(10)
                            Blank 65 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/18/1996
                            Reply To Helen Yiu Wah Liu's Oppos To Chan's Mo For Relief From Atty Mistake In The First Amended Verified Answer
                              Blank 64 Filed: 1/12/1996, Entered: 1/12/1996
                              Oppos Of Helen Yiu Wah Liu To Chan's Mo For Relief From Atty Mistake In The First Amended Answer
                                Blank 63 Filed: 1/12/1996, Entered: 1/12/1996
                                Declaration Of Bruce Quan Jr.
                                  Blank 62 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996
                                  Order To Show Cause, 05/13/96 3:30pm
                                    Blank 61 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996
                                    Mailing (ca068) From 05/13/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 05/13/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                                      Blank 60 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996
                                      Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                                        Blank 59 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996
                                        Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 01/11/96
                                          Blank 58 Filed: 1/11/1996, Entered: 1/11/1996
                                          Arbitration Due To End
                                            Blank 57 Filed: 1/10/1996, Entered: 1/10/1996
                                            Arbitrator Selection Due
                                              Blank 56 Filed: 1/5/1996, Entered: 1/5/1996
                                              Amended Ntc Of Deft's Mo For Relief From Atty Mistake In The First Amended Complt, Calendar Motion: To Amend, Calendar Motion: Relief Hearing Set For Jan-22-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                Blank 55 Filed: 12/26/1995, Entered: 12/26/1995
                                                Declaration Of Christopher S.c. Chan
                                                  Blank 54 Filed: 12/26/1995, Entered: 12/26/1995
                                                  Declaration Of Dennis C Birkhimer
                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 12/26/1995, Entered: 12/26/1995
                                                    Ntc Of Mo For Relief From Atty Mistake In The First Amendedverified Answer, Calendar Motion: Relief Hearing Set For Jan-15-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 12/26/1995, Entered: 12/26/1995
                                                      Memo Of P&a's In Support Of Mo For Relief From Atty Mistakein The First Amended Verified Answer
                                                        Blank 51 Filed: 12/11/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 Court Filing
                                                        Stipulation That Commissioner May Act As Judge Pro Tempore
                                                          Blank 50 Filed: 12/7/1995, Entered: 12/7/1995
                                                          Order That Commission Issue To Take Deposition
                                                            Blank 49 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995
                                                            Deft's Re-ntc Of Mo For Order Issuing Commission To Take Deposition Hearing Set For Dec-07-1995 At 09:00 Am In Dept 469
                                                              Blank 48 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995
                                                              Calendared Event Hearing Set For Dec-07-1995 At 09:00 Am In Dept 469
                                                                Blank 47 Filed: 11/20/1995, Entered: 11/20/1995
                                                                Order Denying Leave To File Second Amended Complt
                                                                  Blank 46 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995
                                                                  Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                                                                    Blank 45 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995
                                                                    Mo File 2nd Amended Ans To Complaint--denied.(10)
                                                                      Blank 44 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995
                                                                      Proof Of Service By Mail
                                                                        Blank 43 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995
                                                                        Reply To Helen Yiu Wah Liu's Oppos To Christopher S.c. Chan's Mo For Leave To File Second Amended Answer
                                                                          Blank 42 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995
                                                                          Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 11/07/95
                                                                            Blank 41 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995
                                                                            Arbitrator Selection Due
                                                                              Blank 40 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995
                                                                              Declaration Of Dennis C Birkhimer
                                                                                Blank 39 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995
                                                                                Memo Of P&a's In Support Of Mo For Order Issuing Commissionto Take Deposition
                                                                                  Blank 38 Filed: 11/7/1995, Entered: 11/7/1995
                                                                                  Deft's Ntc Of Mo For Order Issuing Commission To Take Depo-sition And Receive Production Of Documents Abroad, Calendar Motion: Take Deposition, Calendar Motion: Compel Production Of Documents Hearing Set For Dec-05-1995 At 09:30 Am In Dept 469
                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995
                                                                                    Declaration Of Bruce Quan
                                                                                      Blank 36 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/6/1995
                                                                                      Oppos To Helen Yiu Wah Liu To Mo To File Second Amended Complt
                                                                                        Blank 35 Filed: 11/1/1995, Entered: 11/1/1995
                                                                                        Arbitrator Excused
                                                                                          Blank 34 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995
                                                                                          Ntc Of Mo By Christopher S.c. Chan For Leave To File Secondamended Answer, Calendar Motion: To Amend Hearing Set For Nov-14-1995 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                            Blank 33 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995
                                                                                            Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Christopher S.c. Chan's Mo For Leave To File Second Amended Answer To Complt
                                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 10/30/1995, Entered: 10/30/1995
                                                                                              Declaration Of Dennis C. Birkhimer
                                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 10/6/1995, Entered: 10/6/1995
                                                                                                Order To Show Cause On Feb/13/96 At 3:30 Pm In Room 314
                                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995
                                                                                                  Mailing (ca068) From 02/13/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 02/13/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                                                                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995
                                                                                                    Mailing (ca068) From 02/13/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 02/13/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995
                                                                                                      Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995
                                                                                                        Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 10/05/95
                                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 9/19/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995
                                                                                                          Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 09/19/95
                                                                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 9/13/1995, Entered: 9/13/1995
                                                                                                            Proof Of Service
                                                                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995 Court Filing
                                                                                                              Stipulation That Commissioner May Act As Judge Pro Tempore
                                                                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 9/12/1995, Entered: 9/12/1995
                                                                                                                Order Granting Mo By Christopher S.c. Chan To Compel Pltf's Prod Of Documents
                                                                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 9/11/1995, Entered: 9/11/1995
                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995
                                                                                                                    Deft's Ntc Of Mo To Compel Pltf's Prod Of Documents, Calendar Motion: Compel Production Of Documents Hearing Set For Sep-12-1995 At 10:30 Am In Dept 450
                                                                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995
                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Dennis C. Birkhimer
                                                                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 8/23/1995, Entered: 8/23/1995
                                                                                                                        Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Mo By Christopher S.c. Chan To Compel Pltf's Prod Of Documents, Set No. One
                                                                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 8/11/1995, Entered: 8/11/1995
                                                                                                                          Change Of Firm Name & Address Of Atty For X-deft
                                                                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 7/14/1995, Entered: 7/14/1995
                                                                                                                            Plan I Arbitration: Court Trial, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Sep-18-1995 At 08:00 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 7/6/1995
                                                                                                                              Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 07/14/95 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 09/18/95 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 7/6/1995, Entered: 7/6/1995
                                                                                                                                Status Conference Order
                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 6/16/1995, Entered: 6/16/1995
                                                                                                                                  Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 5/26/1995, Entered: 5/26/1995
                                                                                                                                    $182 Pd By: United World Enterprise Inc
                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 5/26/1995, Entered: 5/26/1995
                                                                                                                                      Answer Of United World Enterprise Inc To Unverified First Amended X-complt
                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 5/19/1995, Entered: 5/19/1995
                                                                                                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995
                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued On First Amended Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995
                                                                                                                                            1st Amended X-complt Of Christopher S.c. Chan
                                                                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995
                                                                                                                                              Amened Answer Of Christopher S.c. Chan
                                                                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995
                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995
                                                                                                                                                  Cross-complaint Of Christopher S.c. Chan
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995
                                                                                                                                                    $182 Pd By: Christopher S.c. Chan
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 4/10/1995, Entered: 4/10/1995
                                                                                                                                                      Answer Of Christopher S.c. Chan
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/15/1995
                                                                                                                                                        Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Jul-14-1995 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/15/1995
                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 2/15/1995, Entered: 2/15/1995
                                                                                                                                                            Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?