Katz Vs White
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 95 970037
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Katz, Sheryl, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schuman, Allan M. (& Associates)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schuman, Allan M. +1 415 563 2111
v.
No Logo White, Annie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pelton & Gunther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pelton & Gunther +1 415 392 2770
No Logo White, James, Defendant
Officer/Director, Lions Gate Lighting Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Pelton & Gunther

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pelton & Gunther +1 415 392 2770
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 10/15/1996, Entered: 10/15/1996
Arbitration: No Fee Requested
    Blank 38 Filed: 8/22/1996, Entered: 8/22/1996
    Satisfaction Of Judgment, Full
      Blank 37 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 7/31/1996
      Notice Of Entry Of Judgment
        Blank 36 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/26/1996 Court Filing
        Award Of Arbitrator Microfilmed As Judgement Reel/batch F: 189-14
          Blank 35 Filed: 6/25/1996, Entered: 6/25/1996
          Arbitration Award
            Blank 34 Filed: 6/11/1996, Entered: 6/11/1996
            Response Of Sheryl Katz To Osc; Request For 90 Day Continuance; Declaration Of Allan M Schuman
              Blank 33 Filed: 5/24/1996, Entered: 5/24/1996
              Dropped From Calendar
                Blank 32 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996
                Mailing (ca068) From 07/01/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 07/01/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                  Blank 31 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996
                  Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                    Blank 30 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996
                    Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 02/22/96
                      Blank 29 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996
                      Arbitration Due To End
                        Blank 28 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996
                        Order To Show Cause - Hearing On July 1, 1996 - 3:30 Pm
                          Blank 27 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996
                          Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 02/06/96
                            Blank 26 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996
                            Arbitrator Selection Due
                              Blank 25 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996
                              Arbitrator Excused
                                Blank 24 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996
                                Mailing (ca068) From 05/28/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 05/28/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996
                                  Order To Show Cause, 05/28/96 3:30pm
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996
                                    Mailing (ca068) From 05/28/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 05/28/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996
                                      Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/25/1996, Entered: 1/25/1996
                                        Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 01/25/96
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 1/8/1996, Entered: 1/8/1996
                                          Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 01/08/96
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/20/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995
                                            Order To Arbitration
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995
                                              Mailing (ca069) From 12/18/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 01/08/96 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995
                                                $182 Pd By: James White
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995
                                                  Answer Of James White
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995
                                                    Order To Arbitration Pltf Demands, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Jan-08-1996 At 08:00 Am In Dept 314
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995
                                                      Response To Osc
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 10/27/1995, Entered: 10/27/1995
                                                        Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Dec-18-1995 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995
                                                          Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal/sanctions - Hearing On: Dec. 18, 1995 - 1:30 Pm
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 10/19/1995, Entered: 10/19/1995
                                                            Mailing (ca070) From 10/27/95 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 12/18/95 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 9/29/1995
                                                              Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/22/1995
                                                                Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995
                                                                  $182 Pd By: Annie White
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/14/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995
                                                                    Answer Of Annie White
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/7/1995
                                                                      Summons Filed
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/7/1995
                                                                        (2) Proof Of Service
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/1/1995
                                                                          Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Oct-27-1995 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/1/1995
                                                                            Summons Issued
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 6/1/1995, Entered: 6/1/1995
                                                                              Complaint For Personal Injury (vehicle)

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 33 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?