Ng Kee, Inc Vs Chan
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 95 970790
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ng Hing Kee, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald S. Galasi +65085620 650 085 6200 +1 650 685 6204 galasi.law@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Always & Forever, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Chan, Helen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Chan, Iris, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Cheer Gift, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Kai, Wen Ten, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Meng Trading Co, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Rose Garden Gift, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Katz & Quan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katz & Quan +1 415 284 9777
No Logo Yu, Tammy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Katz & Quan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katz & Quan +1 415 284 9777
No Logo Always & Forever, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Chan, Helen, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Chan, Iris, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Cheer Gift, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Kai, Wen Ten, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
No Logo Meng Trading Co, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Arnold Laub, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arnold Laub +1 415 362 0101
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 61 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999
Memorandum That Civil Case Is @ Issue And Arbitration Conference Stmt
    Blank 60 Filed: 3/6/1998, Entered: 3/6/1998
    Substitution Of Attorney For Pltf Ng Hing Kee Inc
      Blank 59 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997
      Scd1-tr.cal.: Off Calendar, Dismissed
        Blank 58 Filed: 2/18/1997, Entered: 2/18/1997
        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Plntf
          Blank 57 Filed: 9/25/1996, Entered: 9/25/1996
          Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
            Blank 56 Filed: 9/25/1996, Entered: 9/25/1996
            Mailing (ca025) From 03/03/97 Scd1 09:00 Am For 02/19/97 Scd9 03:30 Pm
              Blank 55 Filed: 9/24/1996, Entered: 9/24/1996
              Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Feb-19-1997 At 03:30 Pm In Dept 9
                Blank 54 Filed: 9/24/1996, Entered: 9/24/1996
                Notice Of Trial, Coutr Trial (ptr1),
                  Blank 53 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996
                  Dropped From Calendar
                    Blank 52 Filed: 8/23/1996, Entered: 8/23/1996
                    Request For Trial De Novo For The Pltf
                      Blank 51 Filed: 7/30/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996
                      Arbitration Fee Statement
                        Blank 50 Filed: 7/29/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996
                        Arbitration Award
                          Blank 49 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996
                          Order To Show Cause For Sept 30, 1996 At 3:30pm
                            Blank 48 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996
                            Mailing (ca068) From 09/30/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 09/30/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                              Blank 47 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996
                              Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                                Blank 46 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996
                                Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 05/30/96
                                  Blank 45 Filed: 5/30/1996, Entered: 5/30/1996
                                  Arbitration Due To End
                                    Blank 44 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996
                                    Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 05/13/96
                                      Blank 43 Filed: 5/13/1996, Entered: 5/13/1996
                                      Arbitrator Selection Due
                                        Blank 42 Filed: 5/7/1996, Entered: 5/7/1996
                                        Arbitrator Excused
                                          Blank 41 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996
                                          Order To Show Cause - Hearing On: Sept. 3, 1996 - 3:30 Pm
                                            Blank 40 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996
                                            Mailing (ca068) From 09/03/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 09/03/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                                              Blank 39 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996
                                              Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                                                Blank 38 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996
                                                Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 05/02/96
                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996
                                                  Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 04/15/96
                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 3/27/1996
                                                    Order To Arbitration
                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 3/27/1996
                                                      Mailing (ca075) From 03/25/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 04/15/96 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                        >dba Cheer Gift
                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                          >co, Helen Chan Dba Always & Forever, Iris Chan>
                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                            Cross-complaint Of Wen Ten Kai Dba Meng Trading>
                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                              >chan Dba Always & Forever, Iris Chan Dba Cheer Gift
                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                                $555 Pd By:wen Ten Kai Dba Meng Trading Co, Helen>
                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                                  >chan Dba Always & Forever, Iris Chan Dba Cheer Gift To First Amended Complt
                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                                    Answer Of Wen Ten Kai Dba Meng Trading Co, Helen>
                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                                      Proceedings Reported By Nancy Barker (x-1,flageollet)
                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                                        Osc Re: Status Csonf Case Ord To Arbitration 4/15/96
                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                                          General Denial Of Tammy Yu & Dba Rose Garden Gift
                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                                            Order To Arbitration, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Apr-15-1996 At 08:00 Am In Dept 314
                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/25/1996
                                                                              Order Setting Aside Default And Stip To Set Aside Default
                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996
                                                                                Osc Re Dismissal/sanctions, 03/25/96 1:30pm
                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/22/1996
                                                                                  Mailing, 0sc Dismissed/sanctions Order From 02/20/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 03/25/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 2/20/1996, Entered: 2/20/1996
                                                                                    Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Mar-25-1996 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 2/15/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996
                                                                                      Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 1/31/1996, Entered: 1/31/1996
                                                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 12/29/1995, Entered: 12/29/1995
                                                                                          Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Feb-20-1996 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 12/19/1995, Entered: 12/19/1995
                                                                                            Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal/sanctions For Feb 20, 1996 At 1:30pm
                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/18/1995
                                                                                              Mailing (ca070) From 12/29/95 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 02/20/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995
                                                                                                Req To Enter Default-entered As To: Wen Ten Kai
                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995
                                                                                                  Orig Summons Filed
                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 11/22/1995
                                                                                                    Status Conference Continued: (ptr1) Hearing Set For Dec-29-1995 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 11/15/1995, Entered: 11/15/1995
                                                                                                      Mailing, Stcf Order Continued From 11/22/95 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 12/29/95 Ptr1 08:30 Am
                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995
                                                                                                        $182. Pd By: Tammy Yu
                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995
                                                                                                          Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 10/31/1995
                                                                                                            Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 10/31/1995, Entered: 10/31/1995
                                                                                                              Orig Summons And Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 10/25/1995, Entered: 10/25/1995
                                                                                                                Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995
                                                                                                                  Amended Complaint On First Amended Complt
                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995
                                                                                                                    First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 6/30/1995
                                                                                                                      Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Nov-22-1995 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 6/30/1995
                                                                                                                        Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/30/1995, Entered: 6/30/1995
                                                                                                                          Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?