Liu Vs Scv Corporation
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 95 972116

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Liu, Helen Yiu Wah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovis,smith,stewart,(100) Lipscomb & Cross LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hovis,smith,stewart, +1 415 421 9696
v.
No Logo Lee, Yin C, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Birkhimer, Dennis C (law Offices Of)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Birkhimer, Dennis C +1 415 922 1881
No Logo Scv Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Scv Holdings Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Graham, James

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Graham & James +1 415 954 0200
No Logo Lee, Yin C, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Birkhimer, Dennis C (law Offices Of)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Birkhimer, Dennis C +1 415 922 1881
No Logo Liu, Helen Yiu Wah, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Katz & Quan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katz & Quan +1 415 284 9777
No Logo Scv Holdings Corp, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Graham, James

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Graham & James +1 415 954 0200
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (95) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (8) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 95 Filed: 9/11/1996, Entered: 9/11/1996
Arbitrator Discharged: Case Settled
    Blank 94 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 7/9/1996
    Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
      Blank 93 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996
      >>> $940.01 Interest Pd- Helen Liu #1600/00258208
        Blank 92 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996
        $ 39,938.35 Court Order Paid-h. Liu #1600*00258208
          Blank 91 Filed: 6/28/1996, Entered: 6/28/1996
          $ 13,862.80 Court Ordr-paid Brkhmer #1600/00258205
            Blank 90 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996
            Stipulation Re: Distribution Of Money Deposit With Court
              Blank 89 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996
              Order Re: Distribution Pursuant To Stip
                Blank 88 Filed: 5/27/1996, Entered: 5/27/1996
                $ 6,886.93 Court Order Paid To Scv # 00236157
                  Blank 87 Filed: 5/23/1996, Entered: 5/23/1996
                  Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Mo For Order Of Dis- Charge
                    Blank 86 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996
                    > Costs-microfilmed R/b F: 182-23
                      Blank 85 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996
                      > Vailing On The Contract & For Atty's Fees & >
                        Blank 84 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996
                        > Of Discharge, Order Determining The Party Pre->
                          Blank 83 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996
                          Order Granting Scv Holdings Corp's Mo For Order >
                            Blank 82 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996
                            Proceedings Reported By Joe Vicktein Granted.order Signed.(10)
                              Blank 81 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996
                              Mtns To Discharge/determine Party Prev. On Contract/attys Fees/costs--argued And Taken Under Submission.(10)
                                Blank 80 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/20/1996
                                Declaration Of Robert A Domingues
                                  Blank 79 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/20/1996
                                  Supplemental Declaration Of Raissa Griffin
                                    Blank 78 Filed: 5/20/1996, Entered: 5/20/1996
                                    Reply Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Scv Holdings Corp's Mofor Order Of Discharge
                                      Blank 77 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996
                                      Declaration Of Dennis C. Birkhimer
                                        Blank 76 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996
                                        Objection To Scv's Submitted Evidence, Objection To Scv's Proposed Furture Submission Of Further Evidence
                                          Blank 75 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996
                                          Declaration Of Helen Yiu Wah Liu
                                            Blank 74 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996
                                            Declaration Of Barry D. Hovis
                                              Blank 73 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996
                                              Memo Of Pts & Auths In Response To Motion For Order Of Discharge
                                                Blank 72 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: 5/15/1996
                                                Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of X-defdt, Lee's Oppos To Motion For Dismissal, Etc.
                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996
                                                  Declaration Of Lawrence B Low
                                                    Blank 70 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996
                                                    Declaration Of Robert A Domingues
                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996
                                                      Declaration Of Raissa Griffin
                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996
                                                        Ntc Of Mo For Order Of Discharge, Order Determining The Party Prevailing On The Contract And For Attys' Fees & Cost, Calendar Motion: Attorneys Fees, Calendar Motion: Costs Hearing Set For May-22-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 414
                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996
                                                          Memo Of P&a's In Support Of Scv Holdings Corp's Mo For Or- Der Of Discharge
                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 4/26/1996, Entered: 4/26/1996
                                                            Request For Judicial Ntc
                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: 4/19/1996
                                                              Order To Show Cause - Hearing On: Aug. 19, 1996 - 3:30 Pm
                                                                Blank 64 Filed: 4/19/1996, Entered: 4/19/1996
                                                                Proof Of Service Of Order Denying Yin C Lee's Mo For The Court To Determine The Stakeholder's Attys' Fees & Costs
                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996
                                                                  Mailing (ca068) From 08/19/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 08/19/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                                                                    Blank 62 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996
                                                                    Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                                                                      Blank 61 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996
                                                                      Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 04/18/96
                                                                        Blank 60 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/18/1996
                                                                        Arbitration Due To End
                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/12/1996
                                                                          Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/12/1996
                                                                            Mtn For Attys Fees/costs - Mtn Denied. Order Signed In Opencrt (10)
                                                                              Blank 57 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/12/1996
                                                                              Order Denying Yin C. Lee's Motion For The Court To Deter- Mine The Stakeholder's Attys' Fees And Costs
                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996
                                                                                Deft's Objections To Helen Yiu Wah Liu's Late Filed Declarations
                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 4/11/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996
                                                                                  Supplemental Declaration Of Raissa Griffin
                                                                                    Blank 54 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/10/1996
                                                                                    Declaration Of Linda G Lipscomb
                                                                                      Blank 53 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/10/1996
                                                                                      Declaration Of Helen Yiu Wah Liu
                                                                                        Blank 52 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/10/1996
                                                                                        Reply Memo Of P&a's In Support Of Joinder In Mo For The Court To Determine The Stakeholders Attys Fees And Costs
                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/10/1996
                                                                                          Memo Of P&a's In Support Of Lee's Reply To Scv's Oppos To Lee's Mo For The Court To Determine Reasonable Attys' Fees
                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996
                                                                                            Defdt's Objes To Evidence In Oppos To The Motion For The Court To Determine Attys' Fees/costs
                                                                                              Blank 49 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996
                                                                                              Memo Of Pts & Auths In Oppos To Motion For The Court To Determine The Attys' Fees/costs
                                                                                                Blank 48 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996
                                                                                                Declaration Of Raissa Griffin
                                                                                                  Blank 47 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996
                                                                                                  Declaration Of Mark C. Dosker
                                                                                                    Blank 46 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996
                                                                                                    Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 04/01/96
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 45 Filed: 4/1/1996, Entered: 4/1/1996
                                                                                                      Arbitrator Selection Due
                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 3/28/1996, Entered: 3/28/1996
                                                                                                        Joinder Of Helen Liu In Mo For The Court To Determine Atty Fees & Costs Hearing Set For Apr-12-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 3/27/1996, Entered: 3/27/1996
                                                                                                          Proof Of Service
                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996
                                                                                                            Deft's Ntc Of Mo For The Court To Determine The Stakeholderattorney's Fees And Costs, Calendar Motion: Attorneys Fees, Calendar Motion: Costs Hearing Set For Apr-12-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                              Blank 41 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996
                                                                                                              Declaration Of Dennis C. Birkhimer
                                                                                                                Blank 40 Filed: 3/26/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996
                                                                                                                Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Mo For The Court To Deter- Mine Attys' Fees And Costs
                                                                                                                  Blank 39 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: 3/11/1996
                                                                                                                  59,835.07 Court Order Deposit-birkhimer #025265 Cashier Payment
                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996
                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service By Mail
                                                                                                                      Blank 37 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: 3/4/1996
                                                                                                                      Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein Holdings Co.order Signed.(10)
                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: 3/4/1996
                                                                                                                        Mo Comp Deposit Of Funds Into An Interest Bearing Trust Account--grtd Pur To Qualified Statement Of Non-oppo By Cv Holdings Co.order Signed.(10)
                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 3/4/1996, Entered: 3/4/1996
                                                                                                                          Order For The Deposit Of Funds With The Clerk Of This Court
                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 2/29/1996
                                                                                                                            Reply Memo Of P&a's In Support Of Mo Court To Compel Depos-it Funds
                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 2/26/1996
                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Raissa Griffin
                                                                                                                                Blank 32 Filed: 2/26/1996, Entered: 2/26/1996
                                                                                                                                Scv Holdings Corp's Qualified Statement Of Non-oppos To Yinc Lee's Mo To Compel Deposit Of Funds
                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: 2/7/1996
                                                                                                                                  Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                                                                                                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 2/7/1996, Entered: 2/7/1996
                                                                                                                                    Mo Comp Deposit Of Funds Into An Interest Bearing Trust Account--cont March 4, 1996.(10)
                                                                                                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996
                                                                                                                                      Substitution Of Atty For Pltf
                                                                                                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 1/26/1996
                                                                                                                                        Plan I Arbitration:, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Apr-01-1996 At 08:00 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/22/1996
                                                                                                                                          Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 1/19/1996, Entered: 1/19/1996
                                                                                                                                            Status Conference Order
                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/18/1996
                                                                                                                                              Ntc Of Mo For The Court To Compel Deposit Of Funds Into An Interest Bearing Trust Acct, Calendar Motion: Compel Answers Hearing Set For Feb-07-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/18/1996
                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Dennis C. Birkhimer
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/18/1996
                                                                                                                                                  Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Mo For Court To Compel Depo-sit Of Funds Into An Interest Bearing Trust Acct
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/18/1996
                                                                                                                                                    Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 01/26/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 04/01/96 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 1/18/1996, Entered: 1/18/1996
                                                                                                                                                      Answer Of Yin C. Lee To Scv Holdings Corp's X-complt In Interpleader
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 1/8/1996, Entered: 1/8/1996
                                                                                                                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 1/2/1996, Entered: 1/2/1996
                                                                                                                                                          Answer Of Helen Yiu Wah Liu To X-complt In Interpleader
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995
                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of William D Rauch,jr
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995
                                                                                                                                                              Oppos Of Helen Liu To Mo To Compel Attendance At Depositionand For Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995
                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Dennis C Birkhimer
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995
                                                                                                                                                                  Memo Of P&a's In Support Of Mo Compelling Pltf's Deposition
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 11/29/1995, Entered: 11/29/1995
                                                                                                                                                                    Deft's Ntc Of Mo Compelling Pltf's Deposition, Calendar Motion: Compel Answers, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For Dec-20-1995 At 09:00 Am In Dept 469
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995
                                                                                                                                                                      Verified Cross-complaint Of Scv Holdings Corp
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 11/28/1995
                                                                                                                                                                        Answer Of Scv Holdings Corp
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 11/9/1995, Entered: 11/9/1995
                                                                                                                                                                          Order Extending Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995
                                                                                                                                                                            Application For Order Extending Time To Answer Or Otherwiserespond To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 10/24/1995, Entered: 10/24/1995
                                                                                                                                                                              Order Extending Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                $182. Pd By: Scv Holdings Corp.
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 10/23/1995, Entered: 10/23/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                  Appl For Order Extending Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond T Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/11/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                    $182 Pd By: Yin C. Lee
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 10/11/1995, Entered: 10/11/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer Of Yin C. Lee
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/27/1995, Entered: 9/27/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Filed/proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                          Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Jan-26-1996 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 8/29/1995, Entered: 8/29/1995
                                                                                                                                                                                              Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?