Alhadeff Vs Key Sheen Industries
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 95 972271
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alhadeff, Diamond, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Katz & Quan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katz & Quan +1 415 284 9777
v.
No Logo Home Express, Defendant
No Logo Key Sheen Industries, Defendant
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 2/6/1996, Entered: 2/6/1996
Req For Dism, W/o Prej, Entire Action
    Blank 6 Filed: 2/2/1996, Entered: 2/2/1996
    Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Mar-25-1996 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
      Blank 5 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 1/26/1996
      Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal/sanctions For March 25, 1996 At 1:30pm
        Blank 4 Filed: 1/26/1996, Entered: 1/26/1996
        Mailing (ca070) From 02/02/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 03/25/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
          Blank 3 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995
          Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Feb-02-1996 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
            Blank 2 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995
            Summons Issued
              Blank 1 Filed: 9/5/1995, Entered: 9/5/1995
              Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 18 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?