Farmer Vs Metropolitan Life Insu Co
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 95 973996
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Farmer, Cathy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Engler, Paul B

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul B Engler +1 925 938 2460
v.
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Costella & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Costella & Associates +1 925 945 4491
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo International Service Systems Inc, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Liebman & Reiner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Liebman & Reiner [calif] +1 415 227 0777
No Logo Metropolitan Life Insurance Co, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Costella & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Costella & Associates +1 925 945 4491
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 35 Filed: 9/4/1996, Entered: 9/4/1996
Req For Dism, W/ Prej, X-complt Only
    Blank 34 Filed: 9/4/1996, Entered: 9/4/1996
    Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
      Blank 33 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/8/1996
      Challenge Of Proposed Arbitrator Pursuant To Code Of Civil Procedure 170.6
        Blank 32 Filed: 8/5/1996, Entered: 8/5/1996
        Arbitrator Discharged: Case Settled
          Blank 31 Filed: 7/29/1996, Entered: 7/29/1996
          Plan I Arbitration, Settlement Conference: Settled (ptr1)
            Blank 30 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996
            Application For Lien
              Blank 29 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996
              Request For Ntc
                Blank 28 Filed: 7/8/1996, Entered: 7/8/1996
                Order To Show Cause - Hearing On: Nov. 4, 1996 - 3:30 Pm
                  Blank 27 Filed: 7/5/1996, Entered: 7/5/1996
                  Mailing (ca068) From 11/04/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 11/04/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                    Blank 26 Filed: 7/5/1996, Entered: 7/5/1996
                    Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                      Blank 25 Filed: 7/5/1996, Entered: 7/5/1996
                      Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 07/05/96
                        Blank 24 Filed: 7/5/1996, Entered: 7/5/1996
                        Arbitration Due To End
                          Blank 23 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996
                          Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 06/17/96
                            Blank 22 Filed: 6/17/1996, Entered: 6/17/1996
                            Arbitrator Selection Due
                              Blank 21 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/12/1996
                              Plan I Arbitration, Settlement Conference:
                                Blank 20 Filed: 4/12/1996, Entered: 4/12/1996
                                Plan I Arbitration: Pltf Demands, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Jun-17-1996 At 08:00 Am In Dept 314
                                  Blank 19 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/4/1996
                                  Mailing, Plan I Arb S/c Order From 04/12/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 07/29/96 Ptr1 09:00 Am
                                    Blank 18 Filed: 4/4/1996, Entered: 4/4/1996
                                    Status Conference Order
                                      Blank 17 Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: 3/18/1996
                                      Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                        Blank 16 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996
                                        > Sued As Iss Building Maintenance Inc
                                          Blank 15 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996
                                          $185 Pd By: International Service Systems Inc >
                                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996
                                            > Sued As Iss Building Maintenance To X-complt Of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co
                                              Blank 13 Filed: 3/7/1996, Entered: 3/7/1996
                                              Answer Of International Service Systems Inc >
                                                Blank 12 Filed: 2/21/1996, Entered: 2/21/1996
                                                Proof Of Service
                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 1/10/1996, Entered: 1/10/1996
                                                  Req For Dism, W/ Prej, Complt Only As To Tishman Speyer Properties
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: 1/9/1996
                                                    Summons Issued On X-complt Filed
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: 1/9/1996
                                                      X-complt Of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: 1/9/1996
                                                        $182 Pd By: Metropolitan Life Insurance Co
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: 1/9/1996
                                                          Answer Of Metropolitan Life Insurance Co
                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 1/9/1996, Entered: 1/9/1996
                                                            Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 12/20/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995
                                                              Proof Of Service
                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 12/20/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995
                                                                Summons Filed/proof Of Service
                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995
                                                                  Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Apr-12-1996 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995
                                                                    Summons Issued
                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 11/14/1995, Entered: 11/14/1995
                                                                      Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?