Carter Vs Bldg Material & Construction
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 95 974112
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carter, Darlene, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Katz & Quan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katz & Quan +1 415 284 9777
v.
No Logo Building Materials & Construction Teamsters Local, Defendant

Represented by Beeson Tayer & Bodine, PC

No Logo Carey, Ron, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Altshuler Berzon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Altshuler,berzon,nussbaum, +1 415 421 7151
No Logo Gilmartin, Tom Jr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Altshuler Berzon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Altshuler,berzon,nussbaum, +1 415 421 7151
No Logo International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Altshuler Berzon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Altshuler,berzon,nussbaum, +1 415 421 7151
No Logo Welch, Christopher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Abraham, Alexander Koret

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Abraham, Alexander Koret +1 415 348 7700
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 49 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997
Transfer Receipt County: San Mateo New # 399614
    Blank 48 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997
    Case File Transferred To San Mateo Superior Ct. (eh)
      Blank 47 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: 1/6/1997
      Ptr1, Osc 1-6-97 @ 1:30 Pm, Off Calendar: Venue Changed,
        Blank 46 Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: 12/2/1996
        Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting Deft, Christopher Welsh'smotion For Change Of Venue
          Blank 45 Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996
          Order Granting Defnt Christopher Welsh's Motion For Change Of Venue
            Blank 44 Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996
            Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
              Blank 43 Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996
              Mo Change Of Venue--granted.order Signed.(10)
                Blank 42 Filed: 11/26/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996
                Declaration Of Phil Tarantino
                  Blank 41 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
                  Proof Of Service
                    Blank 40 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
                    Declaration Of Geoffrey Piller
                      Blank 39 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
                      Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Deft's Reply To Pltf's Oppos To Deft's Motion For Change Of Venue
                        Blank 38 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
                        Deft's Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Its Motion To Strike The Declaration Of David Daneluz
                          Blank 37 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
                          Deft's Objections To Decls Submitted By Pltf
                            Blank 36 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
                            Ntc O Mo By Def To Strike Decl Of David Daneluz, Calendar Motion: To Strike Hearing Set For Nov-27-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                              Blank 35 Filed: 11/18/1996, Entered: 11/18/1996
                              Defts' Statement Of Nonopposition To Motion For Change Of Venue
                                Blank 34 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/15/1996
                                Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Jan-06-1997 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 212
                                  Blank 33 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/15/1996
                                  Declaration Of David Daneluz
                                    Blank 32 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/15/1996
                                    Declaration Of Chester Leonhardt
                                      Blank 31 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/15/1996
                                      Declaration Of Darlene Carter
                                        Blank 30 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/15/1996
                                        Oppos To Deft's Mo For Change Of Venue
                                          Blank 29 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996
                                          Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal/sanctions - Hearing On: Jan. 6, 1997 - 1:30 Pm
                                            Blank 28 Filed: 11/7/1996, Entered: 11/7/1996
                                            Mailing (ca070) From 11/15/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 01/06/97 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                              Blank 27 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996
                                              Status And Setting Conference Statement By Defendant Christopher Welsh
                                                Blank 26 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996
                                                $185. Pd By: Christopher P. Welsh
                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996
                                                  Ntc Of Motion By Deft For Change Of Venue, Calendar Motion: Change Of Venue Hearing Set For Nov-27-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996
                                                    Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Deft's Motion For Change Of Venue
                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996
                                                      Declaration Of Christopher Welsh
                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/1/1996
                                                        $370. Pd By: Ron Carey & Tom Gilmartin, Jr.
                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/1/1996
                                                          > Ron Carey, And Tom Gilmartin, Jr.
                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/1/1996
                                                            Answer Of International Brotherhood Of Teamsters,>
                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996
                                                              >teamsters Union Local 216
                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996
                                                                $185 Pd By: Building Material & Construction>
                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996
                                                                  >teamsters Union Local 216
                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996
                                                                    Answer Of Building Material & Construction>
                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 10/30/1996, Entered: 10/30/1996
                                                                      Status And Setting Conference Statement By International Brotherhood Of Teamsters; Ron Carey; Tom Gilmartin Jr
                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: 10/28/1996
                                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Plntf
                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996
                                                                          Mailing (ca023) From 11/15/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 11/15/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am
                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996
                                                                            Plan I New Status Conference: (ptr1), Hearing Set For Nov-15-1996 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 10/11/1996, Entered: 10/11/1996
                                                                              Status Conference Order
                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996
                                                                                Order Of Remand
                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996
                                                                                  Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: 3/18/1996
                                                                                    Ntc & Acknowledgment Of Receipt
                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: 3/18/1996
                                                                                      $185 Pd By: International Brotherhood Of Teamsters
                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/18/1996, Entered: 3/18/1996
                                                                                        Notice To Adverse Party Of Removal To Federal Court
                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996
                                                                                          Proof Of Service
                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 3/6/1996, Entered: 3/6/1996
                                                                                            Proof Of Service
                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995
                                                                                              Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Apr-12-1996 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995
                                                                                                Summons Issued
                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/17/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995
                                                                                                  Complaint For Damages And Injunctive Relief

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 52 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?