Ng Vs Branscomb
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 95 974644
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ng, Norman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Allan M Schuman & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Allan M Schuman & Associates +1 415 563 2111
v.
No Logo Branscomb, Elbert, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Valerian & Holmberg (wc)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valerian & Holmberg +1 510 926 0200
No Logo Valdez, Nemesio Jr, Defendant
No Logo Valdez, Woody, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Colombatto, Klimenko & Rosse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colombatto, Klimenko & Rosse +1 415 391 6182
No Logo Branscomb, Elbert, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Valerian & Holmberg (wc)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Valerian & Holmberg +1 510 926 0200
No Logo Valdez, Nemesio Jr, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Colombatto, Klimenko & Rosse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colombatto, Klimenko & Rosse +1 415 391 6182
No Logo Valdez, Woody, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Colombatto, Klimenko & Rosse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colombatto, Klimenko & Rosse +1 415 391 6182
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 44 Filed: 12/13/1996, Entered: 12/13/1996
Arbitrator Discharged: Case Settled
    Blank 43 Filed: 11/26/1996, Entered: 11/26/1996
    Dropped From Calendar
      Blank 42 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996
      > Comb V. Woody Besina Valdez, Nemesio Valdez, Et Al
        Blank 41 Filed: 11/6/1996, Entered: 11/6/1996
        Req For Dism, W/ Prej, X-complt Of Elbert Brans->
          Blank 40 Filed: 10/29/1996, Entered: 10/29/1996
          Order Re: Mo
            Blank 39 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996
            Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
              Blank 38 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996
              Mo For Sj--pos Provided To Crt.crt Grtd Mo For Sj(mp-deft Elbert Branscomb).(10)
                Blank 37 Filed: 10/18/1996, Entered: 10/18/1996
                Pltf's Declaration Of Non-oppos To Deft's Mo For Summary Judgment Etc,
                  Blank 36 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996
                  $100. Pd By: Elbert Branscomb
                    Blank 35 Filed: 9/9/1996, Entered: 9/9/1996
                    Ntc Of Motion By Deft, Elbert Branscomb, Calendar Motion: Summary Judgment Hearing Set For Oct-24-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                      Blank 34 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/16/1996
                      Order To Show Cause For Dec 16, 1996 At 3:30pm
                        Blank 33 Filed: 8/15/1996, Entered: 8/15/1996
                        Mailing (ca068) From 12/16/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 12/16/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                          Blank 32 Filed: 8/15/1996, Entered: 8/15/1996
                          Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                            Blank 31 Filed: 8/15/1996, Entered: 8/15/1996
                            Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 08/15/96
                              Blank 30 Filed: 8/15/1996, Entered: 8/15/1996
                              Arbitration Due To End
                                Blank 29 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996
                                Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 08/01/96
                                  Blank 28 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996
                                  Arbitrator Selection Due
                                    Blank 27 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996
                                    Arbitrator Excused
                                      Blank 26 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 7/31/1996
                                      Order To Show Cause - Hrg On: December 02, 1996 At 3:30 Pm
                                        Blank 25 Filed: 7/30/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996
                                        Mailing (ca068) From 12/02/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 12/02/96 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                                          Blank 24 Filed: 7/30/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996
                                          Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                                            Blank 23 Filed: 7/30/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996
                                            Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 07/30/96
                                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/15/1996, Entered: 7/15/1996
                                              Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 07/15/96
                                                Blank 21 Filed: 7/9/1996, Entered: 7/9/1996
                                                Substitution Of Atty, Allan M Schuman & Associates, For Pltf, Norman Ng
                                                  Blank 20 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996
                                                  Plan I Arbitration, Settlement Conference: Hearing Set For Aug-26-1996 At 01:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                    Blank 19 Filed: 5/10/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996
                                                    Plan I Arbitration: Pltf Demands,, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Jul-15-1996 At 08:00 Am In Dept 314
                                                      Blank 18 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996
                                                      Mailing, Plan I Arb S/c Order From 05/10/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 08/26/96 Ptr1 09:00 Am
                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 5/2/1996, Entered: 5/2/1996
                                                        Status Conference Order
                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996
                                                          Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996
                                                            > Valdez To X-complt Of Elbert Branscomb
                                                              Blank 14 Filed: 4/15/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996
                                                              Answer Of X-deft's, Nemesio Valdez, Jr & Woody >
                                                                Blank 13 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996
                                                                Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                  Blank 12 Filed: 4/5/1996, Entered: 4/5/1996
                                                                  Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                    Blank 11 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996
                                                                    $370 Pd By: Nemesio Valdez Jr & Woody Valdez
                                                                      Blank 10 Filed: 3/20/1996, Entered: 3/20/1996
                                                                      Answer Of Nemesio Valdez Jr & Woody Valdez
                                                                        Blank 9 Filed: 3/15/1996, Entered: 3/15/1996
                                                                        Proof Of Service
                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 3/14/1996, Entered: 3/14/1996
                                                                          Proof Of Service
                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996
                                                                            Summons Issued On X-complt Filed
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996
                                                                              X-complt Of Elbert Branscomb
                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996
                                                                                $185 Pd By: Elbert Branscomb
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/8/1996, Entered: 3/8/1996
                                                                                  Answer Of Elbert Branscomb
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995
                                                                                    Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For May-10-1996 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995
                                                                                      Summons Issued
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/13/1995
                                                                                        Complaint For Personal Injury (vehicle)

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 18 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?