Chun Vs Salomon N.a.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 96 977006
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Chun, Lisa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Katz & Quan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katz & Quan +1 415 284 9777
v.
No Logo Park Presidio Sporting Goods, Defendant
No Logo Salomon N.a., Defendant
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 12/9/1996, Entered: 12/9/1996
Ptr1, Osc 12-9-96 @ 1:30 Pm, Off Calendar: Dismissed,
    Blank 12 Filed: 10/10/1996, Entered: 10/10/1996
    Mailing, Plan I, Osc From 10/07/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 12/09/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
      Blank 11 Filed: 10/10/1996, Entered: 10/10/1996
      Order To Show Cause: Hearing On-dec 09, 1996 At 1:30 Pm
        Blank 10 Filed: 10/9/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996
        Order For Sanctions Microfilmed R/b F: 196-29
          Blank 9 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996
          Sanctions $350 Owed By Plaintiff's Counsel
            Blank 8 Filed: 10/7/1996, Entered: 10/7/1996
            Plan I, Order To Show Cause: Hearing Set For Dec-09-1996 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
              Blank 7 Filed: 10/4/1996, Entered: 10/4/1996
              Req For Dism, W/o Prej, Entire Action
                Blank 6 Filed: 8/16/1996, Entered: 8/16/1996
                Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Oct-07-1996 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                  Blank 5 Filed: 8/9/1996, Entered: 8/9/1996
                  Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal/sanctions-oct 07, 1996 At 1:30 Pm
                    Blank 4 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/8/1996
                    Mailing (ca070) From 08/16/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 10/07/96 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: 3/21/1996
                      Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Aug-16-1996 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: 3/21/1996
                        Summons Issued
                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/21/1996, Entered: 3/21/1996
                          Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?