Shauger Vs Superior National Insu Co
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 96 977900
Superior Court Judge David A. Garcia, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Shauger, Cindy, Plaintiff

Represented by Katz & Quan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katz & Quan +1 415 284 9777
v.
No Logo Manning, Tom, Defendant
Officer/Director, Asiainfo Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, New D&b Corp
No Logo Shobel, Dave, Defendant
No Logo Superior National Insurance Company, Defendant

Represented by Corey, Edward E

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward E Corey +1 415 777 5266
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 55 Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997
Off-calendar-settled (quan/ptr1),
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
    Blank 54 Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: 8/29/1997
    Off Calendar Settled (quan/ptr1)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
      Blank 53 Filed: 8/14/1997, Entered: 8/14/1997
      Req For Dism, W/ Prej, Complt, Entire Action
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
        Blank 52 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: 7/14/1997
        Settlement Conference Order
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
          Blank 51 Filed: 7/11/1997, Entered: 7/11/1997
          Mailing, Settlement Conference Notice From 09/15/97 Scd7 09:00 Am For 09/15/97 Scd7 09:00 Am
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
            Blank 50 Filed: 7/10/1997, Entered: 7/10/1997
            Settlement Conference Continued
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
              Blank 49 Filed: 7/9/1997, Entered: 7/9/1997
              Dropped From S/c Calendar (ptr1),
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                Blank 48 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997
                Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                  Blank 47 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997
                  Mailing (ca025) From 03/03/97 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 09/15/97 Scd9 03:30 Pm
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                    Blank 46 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997
                    Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                      Blank 45 Filed: 3/3/1997, Entered: 3/3/1997
                      Notice Of Trial, Jury Trial, Pltf Demands (dismissed Shobel& Manning), N
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                        Blank 44 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: 2/24/1997
                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Plntf
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                          Blank 43 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997
                          > Sanctions-microfilmed R/b F: 209-05
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                            Blank 42 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997
                            > Request For Production Of Documents & Awarding >
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                              Blank 41 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997
                              > Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories And >
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                Blank 40 Filed: 2/13/1997, Entered: 2/13/1997
                                Order Granting Mo To Compel Responses To Form >
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                  Blank 39 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: 1/31/1997
                                  Status And Setting Conference Statement By Sup Nat'l Ins Co
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                    Blank 38 Filed: 1/23/1997, Entered: 1/23/1997
                                    Ntc Of Mo To Compel Responses To Interrogatories, Calendar Motion: Compel Answers, Calendar Motion: Compel Production Of Documents Hearing Set For Feb-13-1997 At 09:00 Am In Dept 450
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                      Blank 37 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997
                                      Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Mar-03-1997 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                        Blank 36 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: 1/3/1997
                                        Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal/sanctions - Hearing On: March 3, 1997 - 1:30 Pm
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                          Blank 35 Filed: 1/3/1997, Entered: 1/3/1997
                                          Mailing (ca070) From 01/10/97 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 03/03/97 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                            Blank 34 Filed: 12/24/1996, Entered: 12/24/1996
                                            Status And Setting Conference Statement By Deft
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                              Blank 33 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996
                                              Status Conference Continued: (ptr1) Hearing Set For Jan-10-1997 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                Blank 32 Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996
                                                Answer Of Superior National Ins Co To 1st Amended Complaint
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996
                                                  Status Conference Order
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 11/27/1996, Entered: 11/27/1996
                                                    Mailing, Stcf Order Continued From 12/06/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 01/10/97 Ptr1 08:30 Am
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996
                                                      Order Granting Demurrer And Striking Portions Of First Amended Complaint
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                        Blank 28 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996
                                                        Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein Leave To Answer.order Signed.(10)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                          Blank 27 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996
                                                          Demurrer-1st Amd Cmplt/strike--dem Sust W/o Leave To Amend.mo To Strike Grtd.request For Sanctions Denied.10 Days Leave To Answer.order Signed.(10)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 11/4/1996, Entered: 11/4/1996
                                                            Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 11/4/1996, Entered: 11/4/1996
                                                              Demurrer-1st Amd Cmplt/strike--cont To Nov 20, 1996.(10)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: 11/1/1996
                                                                Status Conference Continued: (ptr1) Hearing Set For Dec-06-1996 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 10/31/1996, Entered: 10/31/1996
                                                                  Deft's Reply To Pltf's Non-oppos To Deft's Demurrer And Mo To Strike
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: 10/24/1996
                                                                    Status Conference Order
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                      Blank 21 Filed: 10/23/1996, Entered: 10/23/1996
                                                                      Mailing, Stcf Order Continued From 11/01/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 12/06/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                        Blank 20 Filed: 10/9/1996, Entered: 10/9/1996
                                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Plntf
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 9/30/1996
                                                                          Ntc Of Mo To Strike As To First Amended Complt, Calendar Motion: Strike Complaint Hearing Set For Nov-04-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 9/30/1996, Entered: 9/30/1996
                                                                            Ntc Of Hearing On Demurrer Of Superior National Insurance Co To First Amended Complt, Calendar Motion: Demurrer Hearing Set For Nov-04-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                              Blank 17 Filed: 9/27/1996, Entered: 9/27/1996
                                                                              Status Conference Continued: (ptr1) Hearing Set For Nov-01-1996 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 9/20/1996, Entered: 9/20/1996
                                                                                Status Conference Order
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 9/19/1996, Entered: 9/19/1996
                                                                                  Mailing, Stcf Order Continued From 09/27/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 11/01/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 9/6/1996, Entered: 9/6/1996
                                                                                    Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 9/6/1996, Entered: 9/6/1996
                                                                                      Demurrer/strike--o/c.1st Amd Cmplt Filed On Sept 5, 1996. (10)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 9/5/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996
                                                                                        First Amended Complaint
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/5/1996, Entered: 9/5/1996
                                                                                          Status And Setting Conference Statement By Plntf
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/4/1996, Entered: 9/4/1996
                                                                                            Deft's Request For Sanctions
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/29/1996, Entered: 8/29/1996
                                                                                              Status And Setting Conference Statement By Superior Natio- Nal Ins Co
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 8/27/1996, Entered: 8/27/1996
                                                                                                Change Of Address Of Atty, Edward E. Corey
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 8/8/1996, Entered: 8/8/1996
                                                                                                  Proof Of Service
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/6/1996
                                                                                                    $185 Pd By: Superior National Insurance Co Inc
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/6/1996
                                                                                                      Ntc Of Hearing On Demurrer Of Superior National Insurance Co Inc, Calendar Motion: Demurrer Hearing Set For Sep-06-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/6/1996
                                                                                                        Deft's Ntc Of Mo To Strike, Calendar Motion: To Strike Hearing Set For Sep-06-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996
                                                                                                          Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Sep-27-1996 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996
                                                                                                            Summons Issued
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/29/1996, Entered: 4/29/1996
                                                                                                              Complaint For Damages And Injunctive Relief
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?