Seaboard Surety Company Vs Siu
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 96 979409
Superior Court Judge David A. Garcia, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Seaboard Surety Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fallat, John L

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Lyster Fallat +1 415 457 3773 +1 415 457 2667 jfallat@fallat.com
v.
No Logo Man, Peter, Defendant
No Logo Siu, Christina, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jagiello, Barbara A.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara A. Jagiello +1 415 391 4030
No Logo Lew & Fong, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drath, Cilfford, Murphy, Wennerholm, & Hagen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Drath Clifford Murphy Wennerholm & Hagen +1 510 287 4000
No Logo Lew, Norman, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drath, Cilfford, Murphy, Wennerholm, & Hagen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Drath Clifford Murphy Wennerholm & Hagen +1 510 287 4000
No Logo Siu, Christina, Cross-Complainant
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 105 Filed: 3/19/1998, Entered: 3/19/1998
Acknowledgment Of Satisfaction Of Judgment, Full
    Blank 104 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998
    Arbitrator Discharged: Case Settled
      Blank 103 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998
      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal & Proof Of Service
        Blank 102 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/8/1998
        > Christina Siu
          Blank 101 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/8/1998
          Req For Dism, W/ Prej, Cross Complaint Filed By >
            Blank 100 Filed: 12/30/1997, Entered: 12/30/1997
            Acknowledgment Of Satisfaction Of Judgment, Full
              Blank 99 Filed: 12/22/1997, Entered: 12/22/1997
              Order Of Court Of Appeal Denying Petition For Writ Of Mandate/prohibition
                Blank 98 Filed: 12/17/1997, Entered: 12/17/1997
                Req For Dism, W/o Prej, Complt Only
                  Blank 97 Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: 12/3/1997
                  Off Calendar Settled (fallat/ptr1)
                    Blank 96 Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: 12/3/1997
                    Proof Of Service
                      Blank 95 Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: 12/3/1997
                      Added To Court Calendar
                        Blank 94 Filed: 12/3/1997, Entered: 12/3/1997
                        Transferred From Jury To Court Calendar-failure To Timely Deposit Jury Fees
                          Blank 93 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: 11/25/1997
                          Sett. Conf. Dropped From Calendar
                            Blank 92 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: 11/25/1997
                            Order Denying Motion To Compel Answers To Deposition Quest-ions & To Compel Production Of Documents
                              Blank 91 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997
                              Settlement Conference Continued
                                Blank 90 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997
                                Dropped From S/c Calendar (ptr1),
                                  Blank 89 Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: 11/14/1997
                                  Ntc Of Continuance Of Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                    Blank 88 Filed: 11/5/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997
                                    Supplemental Declaration Of John M Drath
                                      Blank 87 Filed: 11/5/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997
                                      Memo Of Pts And Authorities In Reply To Oppos To Motion To Compel Answers And Compel Production Of Documents
                                        Blank 86 Filed: 11/3/1997, Entered: 11/3/1997
                                        Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                          Blank 85 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 10/31/1997
                                          Mailing (ca026) From 12/09/97 Scd1 09:00 Am For 12/09/97 Scd1 09:00 Am
                                            Blank 84 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 10/31/1997
                                            Notice Of Rescheduling Of Trial
                                              Blank 83 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 10/31/1997
                                              Declaration Of Quinn A Moody
                                                Blank 82 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 10/31/1997
                                                Memo Of P&a's In Opposition To X-defts' Mo To Compel Answers
                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 10/31/1997
                                                  Dropped From Trial Calendar (scd1/ptr1),
                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 10/31/1997
                                                    Request For Judicial Ntc
                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/23/1997
                                                      Proof Of Service
                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/23/1997
                                                        Request For Judicial Ntc
                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/23/1997
                                                          Declaration Of John M. Drath
                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/23/1997
                                                            Separate Statement Of Questions Objected To At Depo & Docs Not Produced At Depo
                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/23/1997
                                                              Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Motion To Compel Answers And Prod Of Docs
                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 10/23/1997, Entered: 10/23/1997
                                                                Ntc Of Motion By X-defts To Compel Answer To Depo Questionsand To Produce Documents, Calendar Motion: Compel Answers, Calendar Motion: Compel Production Of Documents Hearing Set For Nov-07-1997 At 09:00 Am In Dept 450
                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 9/25/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997
                                                                  Proof Of Service
                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997
                                                                    Order After Hearing
                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/8/1997
                                                                      Pltf's Memo Of P&a In Oppos To X-defts' Mo To Compel Pro- Duction
                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/8/1997
                                                                        Request For Judicial Ntc
                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: 9/8/1997
                                                                          Declaration Of Quinn A Moody
                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 8/19/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997
                                                                            Proof Of Service
                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997
                                                                              Notice Of Entry Of Judgment
                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997
                                                                                Ntc Of X-defts' Mo To Compel Production Of Documents, Calendar Motion: Compel Production Of Documents Hearing Set For Sep-15-1997 At 09:00 Am In Dept 450
                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997
                                                                                  X-deft's Mo To Compel Production Of Documents, Calendar Motion: Compel Production Of Documents Hearing Set For Sep-15-1997 At 09:00 Am In Dept 450
                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997
                                                                                    Declaration Of Laura M Sagmeister
                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 8/13/1997, Entered: 8/13/1997
                                                                                      California Rule Of Court Rule 355 Statement
                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
                                                                                        Mailing (ca025) From 08/07/97 X-1 09:00 Am For 11/26/97 Scd4 04:00 Pm
                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: 8/8/1997
                                                                                          Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 8/7/1997, Entered: 8/7/1997
                                                                                            Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:
                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 8/7/1997, Entered: 8/7/1997
                                                                                              Notice Of Trial, Jury Trial, X-comp Demands (ptr1), N
                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 8/7/1997, Entered: 8/7/1997
                                                                                                Dropped From Osc Calendar (ptr1),
                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 8/7/1997, Entered: 8/7/1997
                                                                                                  Proceedings Reported By Maria Amador - 9539
                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 8/7/1997, Entered: 8/7/1997
                                                                                                    Mtn To Vacate Arb Order Gtd. Removed From Arb. Set For Jurytrial 12/8/97, 9am, Scd1 (x-1, Flageollet)
                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 7/29/1997, Entered: 7/29/1997
                                                                                                      Response To Motion For Vacating Arbitration Date
                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997
                                                                                                        Stipulation For Entry Of Judgment
                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997
                                                                                                          Judgment-microfilmed R/b F: 225-12
                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997
                                                                                                            Ntc Of Motion To Vacate Or Continue Arbitration Per Rule 7.9, Calendar Motion: Vacate Hearing Set For Aug-07-1997 At 09:00 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997
                                                                                                              Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Motion To Vacate
                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: 7/18/1997
                                                                                                                Declaration Of John M Drath In Support Of Motion
                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: 7/14/1997
                                                                                                                  Order Vacating Sanctions
                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997
                                                                                                                    Order To Show Cause-hrg On: Aug 21, 1997 At 1:30 Pm
                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 6/27/1997
                                                                                                                      Mailing (ca072) From 06/23/97 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 08/21/97 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: 6/26/1997
                                                                                                                        Order For Sanctions
                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997
                                                                                                                          Arb Osc
                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 6/23/1997, Entered: 6/23/1997
                                                                                                                            Sanctions $250 Owed By Defendant Counsel
                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/20/1997
                                                                                                                              Stipulation Vacating Arbitration Deadline Date
                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997
                                                                                                                                $370 Pd By: Norman Lew And Lew & Fong
                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 5/6/1997, Entered: 5/6/1997
                                                                                                                                  Answer Of Norman Lew And Lew & Fong To X-complt
                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 4/3/1997, Entered: 4/3/1997
                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service On Original Summons And X-complt
                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 2/21/1997, Entered: 2/21/1997
                                                                                                                                      Order To Show Cause: Hearing On-june 23, 1997 At 3:30 Pm
                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997
                                                                                                                                        Mailing (ca068) From 06/23/97 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 06/23/97 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997
                                                                                                                                          Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997
                                                                                                                                            Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 02/20/97
                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 2/20/1997, Entered: 2/20/1997
                                                                                                                                              Arbitration Due To End
                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997
                                                                                                                                                Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 02/03/97
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 2/3/1997, Entered: 2/3/1997
                                                                                                                                                  Arbitrator Selection Due
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 1/30/1997, Entered: 1/30/1997
                                                                                                                                                    Cross-complaint Of Christina Siu
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: 1/27/1997
                                                                                                                                                      Order To Arbitration Pltf Demands, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Feb-03-1997 At 08:00 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997
                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997
                                                                                                                                                          Change Of Address Of Atty, John L. Fallat
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997
                                                                                                                                                            Order To Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 1/15/1997, Entered: 1/15/1997
                                                                                                                                                              Mailing (ca069) From 01/27/97 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 02/03/97 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 12/30/1996, Entered: 12/30/1996
                                                                                                                                                                Req To Enter Default-entered As To: Peter Man
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996
                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Summons & Complt
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 12/23/1996, Entered: 12/23/1996
                                                                                                                                                                    Joint Status And Setting Conference Statement By Deft
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996
                                                                                                                                                                      Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Jan-27-1997 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 12/2/1996, Entered: 12/2/1996
                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
                                                                                                                                                                          Mailing (ca070) From 12/06/96 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 01/27/97 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 11/25/1996, Entered: 11/25/1996
                                                                                                                                                                            Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal/sanctions-jan 27, 1997 At 1:30 Pm
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 11/20/1996, Entered: 11/20/1996
                                                                                                                                                                              Status And Setting Conference Statement By Christina Siu
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 11/15/1996, Entered: 11/15/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Status And Setting Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                  Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 10/21/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                    Mo To Cons W/spr-262716--o/c Purs To Stip.(10)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                      Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 10/8/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                        Mo To Cons W/spr-262716--cont To 10/21/96.(10)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                          Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                            Mo To Cons W/spr-262716--cont To Oct 8, 1996.(10)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/1/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                              Memo Of P&a's In Opposition To Mo To Consolidate
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 9/12/1996, Entered: 9/12/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Motion To Consolidate
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 9/12/1996, Entered: 9/12/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of John L. Fallat
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 9/12/1996, Entered: 9/12/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/12/1996, Entered: 9/12/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ntc Of Mo By Pltf For Consolidation, Calendar Motion: Consolidate Hearing Set For Oct-01-1996 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 8/6/1996, Entered: 8/6/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                          $185. Pd By: Christina Siu
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/1/1996, Entered: 8/1/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer Of Christina Siu
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 7/2/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Dec-06-1996 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/2/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/2/1996, Entered: 7/2/1996
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?