Cornell Vs Guardsmark, Inc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 96 983043
Superior Court Judge David A. Garcia, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cornell, Patricia Marie (pp), Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Guardsmark, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Munger, Tolles & Olson +1 415 512 4000
Cause of Action Civil Rights
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 61 Filed: 2/2/1998, Entered: 2/2/1998
Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
    Blank 60 Filed: 1/26/1998, Entered: 1/26/1998
    Arbitrator Discharged: Case Settled
      Blank 59 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: 10/10/1997
      Order To Show Cause-hrg On: February 19, 1998 @ 1:30 Pm
        Blank 58 Filed: 10/10/1997, Entered: 10/10/1997
        Mailing (ca072) From 10/09/97 X-1 09:00 Am For 02/19/98 X-1 01:30 Pm
          Blank 57 Filed: 10/9/1997, Entered: 10/9/1997
          Arb Osc Hearing Set For Feb-19-1998 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 212
            Blank 56 Filed: 9/29/1997, Entered: 9/29/1997
            Ntc Of Order Granting Mo To Withdraw As Attys Of Record
              Blank 55 Filed: 9/25/1997, Entered: 9/25/1997
              Statement Of Non-oppos To Plntf's Motion To Continue Arbitration
                Blank 54 Filed: 9/24/1997, Entered: 9/24/1997
                Order Granting Mo To Withdraw As Attys Of Record, R Michaellieberman And Patricia E Henle, For Pltf
                  Blank 53 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/22/1997
                  Ntc Of Motion To Continue Arbitration, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Oct-09-1997 At 09:00 Am In Dept 314
                    Blank 52 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/22/1997
                    Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Motion To Continue Arbitra- Tion
                      Blank 51 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/22/1997
                      Declaration Of R Michael Lieberman In Support Of Motion
                        Blank 50 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997
                        Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                          Blank 49 Filed: 9/12/1997, Entered: 9/12/1997
                          Mo To W/d Atty--grtd.(10)
                            Blank 48 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/20/1997
                            Ntc Of Motion By Pltf To Withdraw Attorneys Of Record, Calendar Motion: Withdraw As Attorney Of Record Hearing Set For Sep-12-1997 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                              Blank 47 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/20/1997
                              Declaration Of R. Michael Lieberman
                                Blank 46 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/20/1997
                                Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Motion To Withdraw As Attys Of Record
                                  Blank 45 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997
                                  Order To Show Cause-hrg On: November 24, 1997 At 3:30 Pm
                                    Blank 44 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997
                                    Mailing (ca068) From 11/24/97 Ptr1 03:30 Pm For 11/24/97 Ptr1 03:30 Pm
                                      Blank 43 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997
                                      Order To Arbitration, No Disposition Hearing Set For Nov-24-1997 At 03:30 Pm In Dept 314
                                        Blank 42 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997
                                        Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 07/24/97
                                          Blank 41 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997
                                          Arbitration Due To End
                                            Blank 40 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/7/1997
                                            Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 07/07/97
                                              Blank 39 Filed: 7/7/1997, Entered: 7/7/1997
                                              Arbitrator Selection Due
                                                Blank 38 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997
                                                Plan I Arbitration: Pltf Demands,, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Jul-07-1997 At 08:00 Am In Dept 314
                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997
                                                  Status Conference Order
                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997
                                                    Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 06/13/97 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 07/07/97 Ptr1 08:00 Am
                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/15/1997
                                                      Status And Setting Conference Statement By Guardsmark Inc
                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997
                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Plntf
                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 5/12/1997, Entered: 5/12/1997
                                                          Answer Of Guardsmark, Inc. To Pltfs' 1st Amd Complt
                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 5/9/1997, Entered: 5/9/1997
                                                            Status Conference Continued: (ptr1) Hearing Set For Jun-13-1997 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997
                                                              Ntc Of Entry Of Order Regarding Demurrer To First Amended Complt
                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/5/1997
                                                                Ntc Of Entry Of Order
                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 5/2/1997, Entered: 5/2/1997
                                                                  Order Re: Demurrer To First Amended Complt & Motion To Strike
                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: 4/29/1997
                                                                    Stipulation And Protective Order Re: Confidential Informa- Tion
                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 4/25/1997, Entered: 4/25/1997
                                                                      Status Conference Order
                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 4/25/1997, Entered: 4/25/1997
                                                                        Mailing, Stcf Order Continued From 05/09/97 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 06/13/97 Ptr1 08:30 Am
                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 4/17/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997
                                                                          Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 4/17/1997, Entered: 4/17/1997
                                                                            Demurrer/strike--argued And Taken Under Submission.(10)
                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997
                                                                              Reply Memo Of Deft In Supp Of Motion To Strike
                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997
                                                                                Reply Brief Of Deft, Guardsmark
                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997
                                                                                  Deft's Oppos To Pltf's Request For Judicial Notice
                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/15/1997
                                                                                    Errata To Pltfs' Memo Of Pts & Auths In Oppos To Deft's Demurrer
                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 4/10/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997
                                                                                      Status And Setting Conference Statement By Guardsmark Inc
                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 4/10/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997
                                                                                        Pltfs' Request For Judicial Ntc
                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 4/10/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997
                                                                                          Memo Of P&a's In Opposition To Mo To Strike Of Deft Guards-mark Inc
                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 4/10/1997, Entered: 4/10/1997
                                                                                            Pltfs' Memo Of P&a's In Opposition To Demurrer Of Deft
                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: 4/7/1997
                                                                                              Declaration Confirming Service
                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997
                                                                                                Ntc Of Demurrer And Demurrer To First Amended Complt To First Amended Complt, Calendar Motion: Demurrer Hearing Set For Apr-17-1997 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997
                                                                                                  $185. Pd By: Guardsmark, Inc.
                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997
                                                                                                    Ntc Of Motion By Deft To Strike, Calendar Motion: To Strike Hearing Set For Apr-17-1997 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: 3/31/1997
                                                                                                      Request For Judicial Ntc
                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/13/1997
                                                                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Plntf
                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 3/13/1997, Entered: 3/13/1997
                                                                                                          Summons Filed/proof Of Service
                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 3/12/1997, Entered: 3/12/1997
                                                                                                            Order & Stip Remanding Case To State Court
                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/5/1997
                                                                                                              Ntc Of Association Of Counsel, Patricia E Henle, For Pltf
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 2/24/1997, Entered: 2/24/1997
                                                                                                                First Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 1/8/1997, Entered: 1/8/1997
                                                                                                                  Ntc To Adverse Party Of Removal To Federal Court By Guards-mark Inc
                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996
                                                                                                                    Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996
                                                                                                                      Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For May-09-1997 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996
                                                                                                                        Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/6/1996, Entered: 12/6/1996
                                                                                                                          Complaint For Damages & Injuncjtive Relief

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 35 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?