North Jersey Media Group Inc. v. SarahPac et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-06494
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein
Last Updated March 20, 2017 at 12:26 AM EDT (8.1 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo NORTH JERSEY MEDIA GROUP INC., Plaintiff

Represented by Perkins & Dunnegan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Irvin Dunnegan +1 212 332 8300 wd@dunnegan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Irvin Dunnegan +1 212 332 8300 wd@dunnegan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Daniel Liebowitz +1 212 332 8307 +1 212 332 8301 bl@dunnegan.com
v.
No Logo Sarah Palin, Defendant
No Logo Sarahpac, Defendant

Represented by Goetz Fitzpatrick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ronald D. Coleman +1 212 695 8100 +1 212 629 4013 rcoleman@goetzfitz.com
Space Ronald D. Coleman +1 212 695 8100 +1 212 629 4013 rcoleman@goetzfitz.com
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
Timeline
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER terminating 7 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants move, alternatively, to dismiss or to transfer this case to another district where it could have been brought. This case is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey. Plaintiff is a New Jersey corporation, publishing local newspapers in New Jersey. Defendants are a citizen of Alaska and a federally registered political action committee ("PAC") whose principal place of business is in northern Virginia. Plaintiffs allege copyright infringement of a copyrighted photograph and a violation of the Lanham Act. There is no indication of any substantial activities in this state or district. The most convenient forum is where plaintiff claims injury, New Jersey. If defendants violated the law, they did so nationally and one sit us is as convenient as another. The district of Alaska, preferred by defendants, is not a convenient forum nor is the district of Virginia. Hence this case will be transferred to the district of New Jersey. See D.H Blair & Co., Inc. et al v. Gottdiener, 462 F.3d 95, 106-07 (2d Cir. 2006). The judge to whom this case is assigned can then determine the substantive sufficiency of defendant's motion. The clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 7) terminated, bundle the file, and transfer it to the Clerk of the Court in the District of New Jersey, Northern Division. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/17/2014) (mro) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sarah Palin, SarahPac. (Coleman, Ronald) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/5/2014, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY to Response to Motion re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply Memorandum. Document filed by Sarah Palin, SarahPac. (Coleman, Ronald) Modified on 1/7/2014 (db). (Entered: 01/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Thomas E. Franklin in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by North Jersey Media Group Inc.. (Weiss, Richard) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Jennifer A. Borg in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by North Jersey Media Group Inc.. (Weiss, Richard) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by North Jersey Media Group Inc.. (Weiss, Richard) (Entered: 12/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 7 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Sarah Palin, SarahPac. (Coleman, Ronald) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Sarah Palin, SarahPac. Return Date set for 1/3/2014 at 10:00 AM.(Coleman, Ronald) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Sarah Palin, SarahPac.(Coleman, Ronald) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED MOTION for John J. Tiemessen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Corrected). Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sarah Palin, SarahPac. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Alaska, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Coleman, Ronald) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John J. Tiemessen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-9097965. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sarah Palin, SarahPac. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement Certificate of Good Standing, Alaska Bar Assoc.)(Coleman, Ronald) Modified on 11/20/2013 (wb). (Entered: 11/19/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald David Coleman on behalf of Sarah Palin, SarahPac. (Coleman, Ronald) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND amending 1 Complaint against Sarah Palin, SarahPac, and John Does Nos. 1-5 with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by North Jersey Media Group Inc. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by North Jersey Media Group Inc. (tn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/8/2013: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit) (sdi). (Entered: 10/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/13/2013, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Sarah Palin, SarahPac. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401076702)Document filed by North Jersey Media Group Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(msa) (Entered: 09/17/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 230 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?