Bradley v. Cruz et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-12927-IT

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 1:41 AM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOHN BRADLEY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harrisburg Civil Law Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Bradley +1 617 894 9370 johnbradley618@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sinsheimer & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert S. Sinsheimer +1 617 722 9954 +1 617 722 9950 rsinsheimer@sinsheimerlaw.com
Space Wesley B. Stoker +1 617 772 9954 wstoker@sinsheimerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Frank J. Middleton, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bret A. Cohen +1 617 748 5500 +1 617 748 5555 bcohen@mintz.com
Space Robert O. Sheridan +1 617 348 4466 rsheridan@mintz.com
No Logo Michael Horan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bret A. Cohen +1 617 748 5500 +1 617 748 5555 bcohen@mintz.com
Space Robert O. Sheridan +1 617 348 4466 rsheridan@mintz.com
No Logo Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bret A. Cohen +1 617 748 5500 +1 617 748 5555 bcohen@mintz.com
Space Robert O. Sheridan +1 617 348 4466 rsheridan@mintz.com
No Logo Timothy J. Cruz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky & Popeo, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bret A. Cohen +1 617 748 5500 +1 617 748 5555 bcohen@mintz.com
Space Robert O. Sheridan +1 617 348 4466 rsheridan@mintz.com
No Logo Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC, Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Bingham McCutchen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan M. Albano +1 617 951 8360 +1 617 951 8376 jonathan.albano@morganlewis.com
No Logo Judge Jerome Niedermeier, Mediator
Office Boston
Filed 11/15/2013
Jury Demand Both
Demand $1500000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Suffolk
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (163) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 164 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None
Opposition re 163 Amended MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Omnibus Statement filed by John Bradley. (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
    LREF
    Blank 163 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
    Amended MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Omnibus Statement by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
      Amended Response by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County to 160 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 . (Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None
        Amended REPLY to Response to 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 160 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None
          Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 158 MOTION for Leave to File a Corrected L.R.56.1 Statement filed by John Bradley. (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 158 MOTION for Leave to File a Corrected L.R.56.1 Statement; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. Defendant may file an Amended Reply 7 days thereafter. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None
              MOTION for Leave to File a Corrected L.R.56.1 Statement by John Bradley.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank 157 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
                MOTION to Strike Portions of Plaintiff's Omnibus Statement by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                  LREF
                  Blank 156 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
                  Response by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County to 152 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 - Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's L.R. 56.1 Omnibus Filing Asserting Disagreements with Defendants' Alleged Agreed Upon Facts and Asserting Additional Facts Subject to Proof by Competent Evidence -. (Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
                    REPLY to Response to 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None
                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for 151 Opposition to Motion, 152 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 and 153 Declaration. Counsel who filed the document are requested to submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office by June 7, 2016. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
                        DECLARATION re 152 Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 by John Bradley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19)(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 152 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
                          Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Bradley. (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None
                            Opposition re 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Bradley. (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 149 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. RESPONSE due by 5/31/2016. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 149 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 31, 2016 to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by John Bradley.(Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: Motion Hearing held on 5/13/2016 re 139 MOTION to Strike MOTION to Seal Document filed by Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County, Timothy J. Cruz, Frank J. Middleton, Michael Horan. Court hears argument on the motion. Court allows in part and denies in part docket entry 139 to the extent that paragraphs 13, 17, 18 and 21 are stricken by agreement of the parties on the record on this date and the remaining information is impounded. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.)(Attorneys present: Sisnsheimer, Stoker, COhen, Sheridan) (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 147 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ALLOWING IN PART 120 Defendants' SEALED MOTION to Strike (or in the Alternative Impound. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/10/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion to Strike, to the extent that paragraphs 13, 17, 18 and 21 are stricken by agreement of the parties on the record on this date and the remaining information is impounded and granting 139 Motion to Seal Document. (Bowler, Marianne) Modified on 5/11/2016 to add docket number (DaSilva, Carolina). (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 139 MOTION to Strike MOTION to Seal Document : Motion Hearing set for 5/10/2016 02:45 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                          Plaintiff's SEALED Opposition re: 139 Defendant's SEALED MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative MOTION to Impound filed by John Bradley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Cover Letter)(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 142 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered re: 120 Defendants' SEALED MOTION to Strike (or in the Alternative Impound). (DaSilva, Carolina) (Main Document 142 replaced on 5/12/2016) (DaSilva, Carolina). (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                                              Letter/request (non-motion) from Bret Cohen notifying the Court of paragraph changes to pending motion and opposition. . (Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler Referred for: Motion referred: 139 Defendant's SEALED MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative MOTION to Impound. (DaSilva, Carolina) Motions referred to Marianne B. Bowler. (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                  Defendant's SEALED MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative MOTION to Impound (Responses due by 5/9/2016) by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F)(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Transcript of Hearing on Motion held on April 4, 2016, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 5/10/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/18/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered DENYING AS MOOT 114 Motion for Summary Judgment. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for: 132 Memorandum in Support of Motion and 134 Declaration. Counsel who filed the document are requested to submit a courtesy copy to the Clerk's Office by April 18, 2016. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                            DECLARATION re 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Robert O. Sheridan) by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17A, # 18 Exhibit 17B, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20, # 22 Exhibit 21)(Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                              Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re 131 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 131 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Summary Judgment by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Motion Hearing held on 4/4/2016 re 121 MOTION for Leave to File. Case called. Court notes Globe's motion to intervene, which court allowed, was for a limited purpose and treats Globe as amicus curiae.Court states that defendants may delete paragraphs from their statement of undisputed material facts and serve the amended statement on Plaintiff no later than 4/8/2016. Plaintiff may amend his statement of material fact accordingly and serve on Defendants no later than 4/15/2016. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Sinsheimer, Cohen, Sheridean, Albano) (MacDonald, Gail) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Blank 129 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered re: Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Forthcoming Motion to Strike (Or in the Alternative Impound)Under Seal [#121] no later than April 8, 2016, Defendants shall serve on the Plaintiff a revised LR 56.1 statement in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment [#114], see Order attached for further details. (Molloy, Maryellen) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        Plaintiff's SEALED Opposition re: 120 Defendants' SEALED MOTION to Strike (or in the Alternative Impound) filed by John Bradley. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 127 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY to Response to 121 MOTION for Leave to File Forthcoming Motion to Strike (Or In The Alternative Impound) Under Seal filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ALLOWING 124 MOTION for Leave to File a Reply ; Counsel using the Electronic Case Filing System should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted in accordance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank 125 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 121 MOTION for Leave to File Forthcoming Motion to Strike (Or In The Alternative Impound) Under Seal : Motion Hearing set for 4/4/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File a Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to File Forthcoming Motion to Strike (or in the Alternative Impound) Under Seal by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - [Proposed Reply])(Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  Opposition re 121 MOTION for Leave to File Forthcoming Motion to Strike (Or In The Alternative Impound) Under Seal filed by John Bradley. (Sinsheimer, Robert) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 121 MOTION for Leave to File Forthcoming Motion to Strike (Or In The Alternative Impound) Under Seal filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Albano, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Forthcoming Motion to Strike (Or In The Alternative Impound) Under Seal by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        Defendants' SEALED MOTION to Strike (or in the Alternative Impound) ( Responses due by 4/6/2016) by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Cover Letter)(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 03/23/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered STRIKING 118 Motion to Strike (or in the Alternative Impound). See Attached Order. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 03/22/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                            This Document has been STRICKEN from the Record per order at 119 Defendant's SEALED MOTION to Strike or in the Alternative MOTION to Impound ( Responses due by 4/1/2016) by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(DaSilva, Carolina) Modified text on 3/22/2016 (DaSilva, Carolina). (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                              DECLARATION re 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Declaration of Robert O. Sheridan) by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 9A - Redacted, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17A, # 19 Exhibit 17B, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22 - Redacted)(Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 116 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                Statement of Material Facts L.R. 56.1 re 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re 114 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, Bret) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 113 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered DENYING AS MOOT 110 Defendant's Sealed Motion to Impound Forthcoming Exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. See Attached Order. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        DEFENDANTS' SEALED RESPONSE TO 111 COURT ORDER by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 111 Filed: 1/22/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered re 110 Defendant's Motion to Impound Forthcoming Exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County, Timothy J. Cruz, Frank J. Middleton, Michael Horan. See Attached Order. (DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 01/22/2016)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Defendant's Sealed Motion to Impound Forthcoming Exhibits to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Cover Letter)(DaSilva, Carolina) (Entered: 01/21/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                              NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: 11/16/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                Transcript of Status Conference held on October 14, 2015, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com Redaction Request due 12/7/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2016. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 107 Filed: 10/26/2015, Entered: 10/26/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ADOPTING IN PART [106] Joint MOTION for a Proposed Scheduling Order for Summary Judgment Briefing on Issues of Liability. See Attached Order. (DaSilva, Carolina)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: 10/21/2015, Terminated: 10/26/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for a Proposed Scheduling Order for Summary Judgment Briefing on Issues of Liability by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: 10/15/2015 Order on Motion for Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered ALLOWING [95] Motion for Protective Order; DENYING AS MOOT [97] Assented-to Motion for Leave to File Forthcoming Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order under Seal. See Attached Order. (DaSilva, Carolina)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: 10/16/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 10/14/2015. Court has colloquy with counsel. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez at raeufp@gmail.com.)(Attorneys present: Sinsheimer, Stoker, Cohen, Sheridan) (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/9/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. ALLOWING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART [91] MOTION to Intervene to Modify Protective Order filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC (DaSilva, Carolina)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. re [85] Sealed Order. The attached Order is a REDACTED version of the Sealed Order at [85]. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/8/2015 Order on Motion to InterveneCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Motion Hearing held on 10/8/2015 re [91] MOTION to Intervene to Modify Protective Order filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC; the motion is granted in part and denied in part. Court has colloquy with Intervenor counsel, and counsel for plaintiff and defendants. The SEALED ORDER at document [85] shall remain sealed, but the docket entry language will be unsealed; a redacted version of said Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Sinsheimer, Cohen, Sheridan, Alban, Hall) (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                Opposition re [95] MOTION for Protective Order and Cross Motion to be Allowed to Take Deposition of Three Witnesses filed by John Bradley. (Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered re: [97] Motion for Leave to File Document. See Attached Order. (DaSilva, Carolina)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/5/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by John Bradley re [91] MOTION to Intervene to Modify Protective Order Plaintiff's Position (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015, Terminated: 10/15/2015 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                      Assented to MOTION for Leave to File Forthcoming Opposition to Defendants Motion for a Protective Order Under Seal by John Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [91] MOTION to Intervene to Modify Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 10/8/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani.(MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015, Terminated: 10/15/2015 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: 9/2/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [91] MOTION to Intervene to Modify Protective Order filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank  Notice Resetting Hearings
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Status Conference set for 10/14/2015 03:15 PM in Courtroom 9 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: 8/20/2015 Notice Cancelling HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Status Conference set for 8/24/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Indira Talwani. Status Conference will be rescheduled by the Court at a later date. (DaSilva, Carolina)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: 8/19/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [91] MOTION to Intervene to Modify Protective Order filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Case)(Albano, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: 8/19/2015, Terminated: 10/8/2015 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene to Modify Protective Order by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC.(Albano, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: 8/19/2015 Intervenor Complaint
                                                                                                                                                      Intervenor COMPLAINT Motion to Intervene to be Heard on Motion to Modify Protective Order, filed by Boston Globe Media Partners, LLC.(Albano, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [88] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Discovery to be completed by 10/1/2015 (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/12/2015, Entered: 8/12/2015, Terminated: 8/12/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                          Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/1/15 to Complete Discovery by John Bradley.(Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: 8/11/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by John Bradley of Withdrawal of Motion (Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: 8/6/2015, Terminated: 8/12/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to 10/01/2015 to Complete Discovery by John Bradley.(Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: 7/23/2015 ~~SEALED OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Judge Indira Talwani: SEALED ORDER entered. re [75] MOTION to Compel filed by John Bradley, [79] Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County, Timothy J. Cruz, Frank J. Middleton, Michael Horan. Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Answers to Deposition Questions Propounded to Defendant Timothy Cruz [#75] and Defendants Cross Motion for Protective Order [#79] are hereby ALLOWED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. See Order for details. (MacDonald, Gail) Modified on 10/9/2015 (MacDonald, Gail).
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/17/2015, Entered: 7/20/2015 Order on Motion to SealCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: Cross-motion to seal allowed nunc pro tunc re [72] Motion to Seal. (DaSilva, Carolina)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/2/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [75] MOTION to Compel filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. FILED UNDER SEAL (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2)(adminn, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Withdrawal of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                      Withdrawal of motion: [77] Emergency MOTION for Court Order Preventing Discussion of Information Related to Motion to Compel at June 19 Status Conference (Assented-To) filed by Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County, Timothy J. Cruz, Frank J. Middleton, Michael Horan. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Order Lifting StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER LIFTING STAY(MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 7/8/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 6/19/2015. Court has colloquy with counsel. Case to be unstayed. Emergency motion [77] to be withdrawn. Motion for Opposition to Motion [75] allowed to be filed under seal. Motion for Protective Order allowed to be filed in two weeks under seal; opposition allowed to be filed under seal. Leave of court must be sought for any reply brief. Fact Discovery to be completed by 8/17/2015; dates for expert discovery and disp. motions vacated. A Pretrial Conf. date may be set at the Status Conference set for 8/24/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Indira Talwani. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Sinsheimer, Stoker, Cohan, Sheridan) (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/19/2015 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Wesley B. Stoker on behalf of John Bradley (Stoker, Wesley)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: 6/18/2015, Terminated: 6/19/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                              Emergency MOTION for Court Order Preventing Discussion of Information Related to Motion to Compel at June 19 Status Conference (Assented-To) by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [75] MOTION to Compel filed by John Bradley, FILED UNDER SEAL. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit)(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: 6/17/2015, Terminated: 9/17/2015 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Compel answers to deposition questions to defendant Timothy Cruz by John Bradley, FILED UNDER SEAL.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. The Response at document [72] is being treated as a Cross-Motion. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: 6/16/2015 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [71] Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal. Counsel should now file the document for which leave to file has been granted. Counsel must include - Leave to file granted on (date of order)- in the caption of the document. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: 6/12/2015, Terminated: 7/17/2015 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                        (The Court treats this as a Cross-Motion to Seal.) RESPONSE to Motion re [71] MOTION for Leave to File Forthcoming Motion to Compel Under Seal - And Request To File All Responsive Pleadings Under Seal - filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Cohen, Bret) Modified on 6/16/2015 (MacDonald, Gail).
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: 6/11/2015, Terminated: 6/16/2015 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to File Forthcoming Motion to Compel Under Seal by John Bradley.(Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: 6/3/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 6/19/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Indira Talwani. Discovery to be completed by 8/3/2015 Motions due by 2/3/2016. See attached Order. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 6/19/2015 11:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: 5/28/2015 Letter/request (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter/request (non-motion) from Robert S. Sinsheimer re: status of 5/27/2015 mediation. (Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: 5/13/2015 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [66] Motion to Stay. On 5/29/15, the parties are instructed to notify the Court as to the status of the mediation set for 5/27/15. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: 5/8/2015, Terminated: 5/13/2015 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Notice Cancelling Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The Status Conference set for 4/17/2015 is cancelled. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting in part and denying in part [63] Motion to Stay. Case stayed for thirty (30) days. The parties may renew motion for larger extension -- any such motion shall include a date certain for the proposed mediation. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015, Terminated: 4/10/2015 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: 3/30/2015 Order on Motion to WithdrawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [61] Motion to Withdraw [60] MOTION to Compel Documents. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015, Terminated: 3/30/2015 Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw [60] MOTION to Compel Documents by John Bradley.(Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: 3/19/2015, Terminated: 3/30/2015 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Documents by John Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4)(Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Notice Resetting Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE Resetting a Hearing. Status Conference set for 2/12/15 has been reset to 4/17/2015 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: 1/30/2015 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery to be completed by 4/14/2015 (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: 1/30/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [57] Motion for Extension of Time to April 14, 2015 to Complete Fact Discovery. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: 1/16/2015, Terminated: 1/30/2015 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to April 14, 2015 to Complete Fact Discovery Deadline by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: 1/15/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered granting [54] Motion to Approve Proposed Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part [55] Motion to Approve Proposed Protective Order (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/13/2015, Terminated: 1/15/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION To Approve Proposed Protective Order by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # (1) (Proposed) Protective Order)(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/13/2015, Terminated: 1/15/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION Requesting Court Order For Electronic Discovery Plan Under Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # (1) (Proposed) Electronic Discovery Plan)(Sheridan, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss held on October 30, 2014, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 1/8/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: 11/19/2014 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery to be completed by 2/13/2015 Motions due by 8/11/2015 Status Conference 2/12/15 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [35] Defendants partial motion to dismiss Count III of the complaint against Defendant Cruz and Count IV of the complaint in its entirety. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Memorandum and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Judge Indira Talwani: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Motion Hearing held on 10/30/2014 re [35] MOTION to Dismiss. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel re: motion. Motion taken under advisement. Order to issue. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Sinsheimer, Cohen, Sheridan) (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: 10/29/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Robert O. Sheridan on behalf of Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County (Sheridan, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE re [43] Order Setting Hearing on Motion. The hearing scheduled for 10/29 has been rescheduled to 10/30/14 at 2:30 pm. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/16/2014 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [35] MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint (Against Defendant Cruz) and Count IV of the Complaint (Against the Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County) (RENEWED) : Motion Hearing set for 10/30/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Indira Talwani.(MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [35] MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint (Against Defendant Cruz) and Count IV of the Complaint (Against the Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County) (RENEWED) : Motion Hearing set for 10/29/2014 02:15 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Indira Talwani.(MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition re [13] MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint (Against Defendant Cruz) and Count IV of the Complaint (Against the Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County) filed by John Bradley. (Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above-captioned matter. Counsel are referred to the Court's Transcript Redaction Policy, available on the court website at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/general-info.htm (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of Status Conference held on September 23, 2014, before Judge Indira Talwani. The Transcript may be purchased through the Court Reporter, viewed at the public terminal, or viewed through PACER after it is released. Court Reporter Name and Contact Information: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net Redaction Request due 10/30/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/10/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2015. (Scalfani, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 2/12/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to [35] MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint (Against Defendant Cruz) and Count IV of the Complaint (Against the Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County) (RENEWED) filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Bret A. Cohen in Support re [35] MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint (Against Defendant Cruz) and Count IV of the Complaint (Against the Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County) (RENEWED) filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Support re [35] MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint (Against Defendant Cruz) and Count IV of the Complaint (Against the Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County) (RENEWED) filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014, Terminated: 11/3/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint (Against Defendant Cruz) and Count IV of the Complaint (Against the Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County) (RENEWED) by Timothy J. Cruz, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Order Lifting StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Judge Indira Talwani: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. ORDER LIFTING STAY(MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge Indira Talwani: Status Conference held on 9/23/2014. Case called. Court has colloquy with counsel. The renewed Motion to Dismiss should be filed; no new memorandum needed. Leave is granted to file a reply to the opposition containing up to five pages by 10/7/14. Discovery to go forward. (Court Reporter: Cheryl Dahlstrom at cheryldahlstrom@comcast.net.)(Attorneys present: Sinsheimer, Cohen) (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Recommendations for Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Recommendations for Scheduling Order . (Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [13] MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint (Against Defendant Cruz) and Count IV of the Complaint (Against the Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County) filed by John Bradley. (Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Recommendations for Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Recommendations for Scheduling Order . (Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: 8/22/2014 Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Disclosure pursuant to Rule 26 by John Bradley.(Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/23/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Indira Talwani. (MacDonald, Gail)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014 Report of Alternative Dispute Resolution ProviderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPORT of Alternative Dispute Resolution Provider. Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier reports case did not settle. This case should be restored to your trial list. (Franklin, Yvonne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Notice of ADR Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of ADR Conference Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing set for AUGUST 12, 2014 AT 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5 before Magistrate Judge Jerome J. Niedermeier. INSTRUCTIONS - COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO BE PRESENT WITH THEIR CLIENTS AND REPRESENTATIVES THEREOF WITH FULL SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY. A brief mediation memoranda (5-6 pages, including exhibits) addressing both the merits of the case and parties settlement position should be submitted by email to yvonne_franklin@mad.uscourts.gov no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing" and is not to be served upon opposing Parties. Counsel are requested to try and accommodate this date. In the event that you believe the case is not ripe for mediation at this time, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to confer with opposing counsel and FILE AN ASSENTED-TO MOTION WITH THE COURT to continue the mediation as soon as possible. (Franklin, Yvonne)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: 6/9/2014 Notice of ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Indira Talwani added. Judge Richard G. Stearns no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: 5/21/2014 Notice of assignment to ADR ProviderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Jerome Niedermeier appointed.(Garvin, Brendan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: 5/20/2014 Order Referring Case to ADRCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Richard G. Stearns: ORDER entered. REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution.(Flaherty, Elaine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: 5/19/2014 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [21] Motion to Refer Case to Mediation. The case will be referred to Judge Niedermeier for mediation. (RGS, int2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: 5/19/2014, Terminated: 5/19/2014 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Refer Case to Mediation and Select a Mediator by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying [13] Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and subject to renewal after the conclusion of mediation, if necessary. (RGS, int2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [18] Motion to Stay. The parties have until May 19, 2014 to inform the court if they wish to participate in the court sponsored mediation program, and if so, whether the parties prefer a particular magistrate judge as their mediator. If the parties choose to engage a private mediator, by August 14, 2014 the parties are to submit a joint status report informing the court of the selected mediator, and the schedule for the mediation. (RGS, int2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: 5/7/2014, Terminated: 5/14/2014 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Mediation by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 Order on Motion for Extension of TimeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting [16] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has until May 9, 2014 to oppose defendants' motion to dismiss. (RGS, int2)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/17/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014, Terminated: 4/17/2014 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to May 9, 2014 to OPPOSE DEFENDANTS TIMOTHY J. CRUZS AND THE OFFICE OF THE DISTRICT ATTORNEY FOR PLYMOUTH COUNTYS PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III OF THE COMPLAINT (AGAINST CRUZ) AND COUNT IV OF THE COMPLAINT IN ITS ENTIRETY by John Bradley.(Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Bret A. Cohen in Support re [13] MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint (Against Defendant Cruz) and Count IV of the Complaint (Against the Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County) filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support re [13] MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint (Against Defendant Cruz) and Count IV of the Complaint (Against the Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County) filed by Timothy J. Cruz, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014, Terminated: 5/14/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Count III of the Complaint (Against Defendant Cruz) and Count IV of the Complaint (Against the Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County) by Timothy J. Cruz, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County.(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendants' ANSWER to [1] Complaint, with Jury Demand as to Counts I, II, III, V and VI by Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1)(Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: 4/4/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Bret A. Cohen on behalf of Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County (Cohen, Bret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Bradley. Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County waiver sent on 2/3/2014, answer due 4/4/2014. (Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Bradley. Frank J. Middleton waiver sent on 2/3/2014, answer due 4/4/2014. (Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Bradley. Michael Horan waiver sent on 2/3/2014, answer due 4/4/2014. (Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John Bradley. Timothy J. Cruz waiver sent on 2/3/2014, answer due 4/4/2014. (Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: 1/27/2014 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S. Sinsheimer on behalf of John Bradley (Sinsheimer, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 Filing Fee/Payment Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filing fee/payment: $ 400.00, receipt number 1BST040735, receipted November 15, 2013 for [1] Complaint, (Adam, Lucien)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to Timothy J. Cruz, Michael Horan, Frank J. Middleton, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Danieli, Chris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 General Order 09-1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  General Order 09-1, dated January 6, 2009 regarding the E-Government Act and Personal Identifiers entered. (Danieli, Chris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Notice of Case AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Abaid, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: 11/15/2013 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Frank J. Middleton, Michael Horan, Timothy J. Cruz, Office of the District Attorney for Plymouth County, filed by John Bradley. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Cover Sheet, # (4) Category Form)(Danieli, Chris)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 2,758 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?