TCYK, LLC v. Doe 163
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 6:13-cv-01347
District Judge Anne C. Conway, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 18, 2016 at 1:14 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TCYK, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fee & Jeffries, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard E. Fee +1 813 229 8008 +1 813 229 0046 rfee@feejeffries.com
v.
No Logo Doe 163, Defendant
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 101
Nature of Suit 820 - Property Rights: Copyright
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve Non-party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly on 9/23/2013. (MDH) (Entered: 09/23/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None
    MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Leave to Serve Non-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit C)(Fee, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 9 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: None
      NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 4 Related case/interested persons/ECF-2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by TCYK, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Fee, Richard) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        Case reassigned to Chief Judge Anne C. Conway. New case number: 6:13-cv-1347-Orl-22GJK. Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell no longer assigned to the case. (reassigned back to Judge Conway per #7 order) (LAK) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER: The transfer order [Doc. 5] is hereby withdrawn. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 9/5/2013. (Conway, Anne) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            Case Reassigned to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. New case number: 6:13-cv-1347-Orl-36GJK. Chief Judge Anne C. Conway no longer assigned to the case. (MAA) (Entered: 09/05/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              (withdrawn per #7 order) ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable Charlene E. Honeywell pursuant to Local Rule 1.04(b). Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 9/3/2013. (SR) Modified on 9/6/2013 (LAK). (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                RELATED CASE ORDER, NOTICE OF DESIGNATION under Local Rule 3.05-Track 2, INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER and ORDER Requiring Electronic Filing. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/13/2013. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/13/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 8/30/2013. (SR) (ctp) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: None
                  Copyright Report sent to Washington. (mailed with copy of complaint) (LAK) (Entered: 08/30/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by TCYK, LLC. (LAK) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT against Doe 163 with Jury Demand . Injunctive relief sought. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ORL-07773) filed by TCYK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(LAK) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 212 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?