Martin et al v. KCBX Terminals Company et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-08376
District Judge John J. Tharp, Jr, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge John J. Tharp, Jr
Last Updated December 4, 2018 at 4:34 PM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Alfredo Mendoza, Plaintiff

Represented by Alfredo Mendoza

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alfredo Mendoza
No Logo Campos Rosalio, Plaintiff

Represented by Barnow & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben Barnow +1 312 621 2000 +1 312 641 5504 b.barnow@barnowlaw.com
No Logo Jane Gould, Plaintiff

Represented by Jane Gould

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jane Gould
No Logo Jean Tourville, Plaintiff

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jean Tourville
No Logo Joann Podkul, Plaintiff

Represented by Barnow & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben Barnow +1 312 621 2000 +1 312 641 5504 b.barnow@barnowlaw.com
No Logo Kevin P. Murphy, Plaintiff

Represented by Barnow & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben Barnow +1 312 621 2000 +1 312 641 5504 b.barnow@barnowlaw.com
No Logo Lilly Martin, Plaintiff

Represented by Lilly Martin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lilly Martin

Represented by Zimmerman Law Office, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank James Stretz +1 312 440 0020 frank@attorneyzim.com
Space Adam M. Tamburelli +1 312 440 0020 +1 312 440 4180 adam@attorneyzim.com
Space Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. +1 312 440 0020 +1 312 440 4180 tom@attorneyzim.com
No Logo Patricia A. Fisher, Plaintiff

Represented by Barnow & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben Barnow +1 312 621 2000 +1 312 641 5504 b.barnow@barnowlaw.com
No Logo Raymond Figueroa, Plaintiff

Represented by Barnow & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben Barnow +1 312 621 2000 +1 312 641 5504 b.barnow@barnowlaw.com
No Logo Susan Sadlowski Garza, Plaintiff

Represented by Barnow & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben Barnow +1 312 621 2000 +1 312 641 5504 b.barnow@barnowlaw.com
v.
No Logo Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Swanson Martin & Bell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Lawrence Vanderporten +1 312 321 3515 svanderporten@smbtrials.com
BP Products North America Inc. BP Products North America Inc., Defendant

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M Crook +1 312 862 2558 patrick.crook@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott William Fowkes +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 861 2200 sfowkes@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caitlin Alejandrina Kovacs +1 312 862 3782 caitlin.kovacs@kirkland.com
No Logo Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, Defendant
No Logo DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
Space Thor W. Ketzback +1 312 602 5111 thor.ketzback@bryancave.com
Space Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com
No Logo George J. Beemsterboer, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Swanson Martin & Bell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher T. Sheean +1 312 222 8559 csheean@smbtrials.com
No Logo KCBX Terminals Co, Defendant

Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen A Swedlow +1 312 705 7400 +1 312 705 7401 stephenswedlow@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo KCBX Terminals Company, Defendant
No Logo KM Railways, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Koch Carbon, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Service List, Defendant

Represented by Barnow & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ben Barnow +1 312 621 2000 +1 312 641 5504 b.barnow@barnowlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erich Paul Schork +1 312 312 312 +1 312 641 5504 e.schork@barnowlaw.com

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Jennifer Caisman +1 312 602 5000 lauren.caisman@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thor W. Ketzback +1 312 602 5111 thor.ketzback@bryancave.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick McKey +1 312 602 5000 +1 312 602 5050 patrick.mckey@bryancave.com

Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick M Crook +1 312 862 2558 patrick.crook@kirkland.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott William Fowkes +1 312 862 2000 +1 312 861 2200 sfowkes@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Raymond Christopher Heck +1 312 861 2000 rcheck@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caitlin Alejandrina Kovacs +1 312 862 3782 caitlin.kovacs@kirkland.com

Represented by Law Office Of Ivan Trahan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Mark Siegel +1 503 841 6692 stevesiegel14@gmail.com

Represented by Law Offices of Ann Galloway

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ian H. Levin +1 312 782 8500 ianhlevin@gmail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Barry Rogers +1 312 332 1188 +3320 332 332 0192 KevinRogersLaw@gmail.com
TERMINATED: 11/26/2014 Frank James Stretz +1 312 440 0020 fjstretz@gmail.com

Represented by Levenfeld Pearlstein, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James D. Brusslan +1 312 476 7570 jbrusslan@lplegal.com

Represented by Pavich Law Group PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J. Pavich +1 312 782 8500 jpavich@pavichlawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Pavich +1 312 782 8500 +1 312 853 2187 rpavich@pavichlawgroup.com

Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen A Swedlow +1 312 705 7400 +1 312 705 7401 stephenswedlow@quinnemanuel.com

Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julie Diane Miller +1 847 433 4500 +1 847 433 2500 ecf@qulegal.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jamie Elisabeth Saltz Weiss +1 847 433 4500 +1 847 433 2500 Jamie@Qulegal.com

Represented by Swanson Martin & Bell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael John Maher +1 312 321 9100 mmaher@smbtrials.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher T. Sheean +1 312 222 8559 csheean@smbtrials.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Lawrence Vanderporten +1 312 321 3515 svanderporten@smbtrials.com

Represented by The Law Offices of Avrum J. Rosen, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aron David Robinson +1 312 857 9050 +1 312 857 9054 adroblaw@aol.com

Represented by Zimmerman Law Office, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam M. Tamburelli +1 312 440 0020 +1 312 440 4180 adam@attorneyzim.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. +1 312 440 0020 +1 312 440 4180 tom@attorneyzim.com
No Logo Transload Realty, LLC, Defendant

Represented by HeplerBroom LLC - Edwardsville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Troy A. Bozarth +1 618 656 0184 +1 618 656 1364 tab@heplerbroom.com
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 240 - Real Property: Torts to Land
Timeline
  Entries (241) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disbursement of Funds
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Disbursement of funds
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER and Judgment. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/3/2016:Notice mailed by Judicial Staff (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(ntf, ) (Entered: 08/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Final approval hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, the withdrawal of objection of Wayne Garritano 234 is granted. The objectors' motion to testify telephonically 235 is denied. The objection to class settlement is overruled, and the motion for final approval of class action settlement 233 is granted, as modified by the court. The motion for approval of attorney fees, reimbursement of costs and expenses, and payment of representative plaintiff service awards 215 is granted, as modified by the court. Class counsel is directed to submit a proposed final approval order with the court's modifications to proposed_order_shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov. Civil case terminated. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio to motion for miscellaneous relief, 235 In Opposition to Motion to Testify Telephonically (Parkhill, Anthony) (Entered: 07/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Motion by Meredith S. Kirshenbaum for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 235 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 7/29/2016 at 11:00 AM. (Kirshenbaum, Meredith) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION by Claimants Refugio Bautista, Marianne Bly, Judith Celio, Ernest Chico, Josie Chico, Ventura Contreras, Veronica Flores, Victor Garibay, Lady Gonzalez, Rafael Martinez, Francisco Mendez, Tomas Ramos, Peggy Salazar, Jose Toscano, Joseph Toscano, Jose Vargas, Anastasia Villalobos to Testify Telephonically (Kirshenbaum, Meredith) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Wayne Garritano re other,,, 221 of Withdrawal of Wayne Garritano as Class Objector and Withdrawal of His Declaration in Support of Class Objection (Kirshenbaum, Meredith) (Entered: 07/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio for settlement Seeking Final Approval of Class Action Settlements (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Carla A. Peak, # 2 Exhibit B: June 2, 2016 Email, # 3 Exhibit C: June 3, 2016 Email, # 4 Exhibit D: June 6, 2016 Email, # 5 Exhibit E: June 14, 2016 Email)(Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 232 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None
ORDER. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/30/2016: Plaintiffs' motion for leave to serve limited discovery on objectors 225 is denied, but objectors shall make an additional disclosure concerning the translation and interpretation of the filed declarations. The supplemental disclosure shall be made by July 13, 2016. Class objectors' motion for production of deposition transcripts 228 is denied. [For further detail see attached order.] Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 06/28/16 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway @312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/20/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/1/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2016. (Conway, Colleen) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Motion hearing held. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to serve limited discovery 225 and the claimants' motion for production of the representative plaintiffs' deposition transcripts 228 are taken under advisement. The court will issue a ruling on the motions via cm/ecf. No appearance on 6/30/16 is necessary. Final approval hearing is reset to 7/29/16 at 11:00 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Meredith S. Kirshenbaum for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 228 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/30/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Kirshenbaum, Meredith) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None
MOTION by Claimants Salvador Anaya, Juan Baez, Refugio Bautista, Maria Bautista, Marianne Bly, Judith Celio, Ernest Chico, Josie Chico, Ventura Contreras, Veronica Flores, Victor Garibay, Wayne Garritano, Lady Gonzalez, Rafael Martinez, Francisco Mendez, Tomas Ramos, Peggy Salazar, Jose Toscano, Joseph Toscano, Jose Vargas, Anastasia Villalobos MOTION FOR PRODUCTION OF THE REPRESENTATIVE PLAINTIFFS' DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS (Kirshenbaum, Meredith) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Salvador Anaya, Juan Baez, Refugio Bautista, Maria Bautista, Marianne Bly, Judith Celio, Ernest Chico, Josie Chico, Ventura Contreras, Veronica Flores, Victor Garibay, Wayne Garritano, Lady Gonzalez, Rafael Martinez, Francisco Mendez, Tomas Ramos, Peggy Salazar, Jose Toscano, Joseph Toscano, Jose Vargas, Anastasia Villalobos to MOTION by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio for Leave to Serve Limited Discovery on Objectors to Class Action Settlement Agree 225 (Kirshenbaum, Meredith) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Erich Paul Schork for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 225 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/28/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Schork, Erich) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio for Leave to Serve Limited Discovery on Objectors to Class Action Settlement Agreements (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Exemplar Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit B: Exemplar Subpoena Rider)(Schork, Erich) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Correction regarding MDL Member Case docket entry (unnumbered entry from 06/20/2016). (jl) Modified on 6/24/2016 (jl, ). (Entered: 06/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimants Salvador Anaya, Juan Baez, Refugio Bautista, Maria Bautista, Marianne Bly, Judith Celio, Ernest Chico, Josie Chico, Ventura Contreras, Veronica Flores, Victor Garibay, Wayne Garritano, Lady Gonzalez, Rafael Martinez, Francisco Mendez, Tomas Ramos, Peggy Salazar, Jose Toscano, Joseph Toscano, Jose Vargas, Anastasia Villalobos by Kenneth Steven Ulrich (Ulrich, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The motion to withdraw as attorney 218 is granted. Jordan Rudnick is terminated as counsel of record for plaintiffs. No appearance on the motion is necessary. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
Certain Class Members' Objection to the Proposed Class Action Settlements and Notice of Intent to Appear at the Final Approval Hearing by Salvador Anaya, Juan Baez, Refugio Bautista, Maria Bautista, Marianne Bly, Judith Celio, Ernest Chico, Josie Chico, Ventura Contreras, Veronica Flores, Victor Garibay, Wayne Garritano, Lady Gonzalez, Rafael Martinez, Francisco Mendez, Tomas Ramos, Peggy Salazar, Jose Toscano, Joseph Toscano, Jose Vargas, Anastasia Villalobos (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22)(Kirshenbaum, Meredith) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimants Salvador Anaya, Juan Baez, Maria Bautista, Refugio Bautista, Marianne Bly, Judith Celio, Ernest Chico, Josie Chico, Ventura Contreras, Veronica Flores, Victor Garibay, Wayne Garritano, Lady Gonzalez, Rafael Martinez, Francisco Mendez, Tomas Ramos, Peggy Salazar, Jose Toscano, Joseph Toscano, Jose Vargas, Anastasia Villalobos by Meredith S. Kirshenbaum (Kirshenbaum, Meredith) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Jordan Rudnick for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney, 218 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/28/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Rudnick, Jordan) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None
MOTION by Attorney Jordan Rudnick to withdraw as attorney for Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville. No party information provided (Rudnick, Jordan) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 03/08/16 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway @312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/14/2016. (Conway, Colleen) (Entered: 06/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM in Support of Representative Plaintiffs' Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses, and Payment of Representative Plaintiff Service Awards (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Summary of TIme, Costs, and Expenses Reported, # 2 Exhibit B: Declaration of Erich P. Schork, # 3 Exhibit C: Declaration of Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr., # 4 Exhibit D. Declaration of Kevin B. Rogers, # 5 Exhibit E: Declaration of James D. Brusslan, # 6 Exhibit F: Declaration of Jeffrey A. Leon, # 7 Declaration of Robert J. Pavich, # 8 Exhibit H: Declaration of Aron Robinson, # 9 Exhibit I: Declaration of Jay Geraci, # 10 Exhibit J: Order, In re Potash Antitrust Litig., No. 08-CV-6910 (N.D. Ill. June 12, 2013))(Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio for attorney fees , Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses, and Payment of Representative Plaintiff Service Awards (Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
ORDER Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by the Honorable Manish S. Shah on 4/18/2016. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Preliminary approval hearing held. For the reasons stated in open court, Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement with Calumet Transload Railroad, LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc., and Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation 211 is granted. Enter Preliminary Approval Order. Final approval hearing is set for 7/26/16 at 11:00 a.m. Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification 157 and Defendants' Motion to Strike 168 are terminated as moot. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Preliminary approval hearing on 4/18/16 is reset to 1:15 p.m. Please note, this is only a change of time. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio for settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement Agreement with Calumet Transload Railroad, LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc., and Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit Resume of Ben Barnow, # 3 Exhibit Resume of Thomas A. Zimmerman)(Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Preliminary approval hearing is set for 4/18/2016 at 01:00 PM. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Plaintiff reports settlement has been reached with the remaining defendants, Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc., and Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation. Plaintiff has leave to file the motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement when ready to do so. Plaintiff may contact this court's courtroom deputy if shortened notice is necessary. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 04/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held and continued to 4/8/16 at 9:45 a.m. The parties report that a settlement with the remaining defendants has been reached in principle. The parties may contact this court's courtroom deputy if they agree the status hearing is unnecessary. Plaintiffs have leave to file the motion for preliminary approval when ready. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
SUGGESTION of Death as to Plaintiff Jean Tourville (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: At the parties' request, the preliminary approval hearing is reset to 3/8/16 at 12:15 p.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Plaintiff has leave of court to file the motion for preliminary approval of settlement as late as 3/3/16. Continued status hearing and hearing on motion for preliminary approval of settlement is set for 3/4/16 at 10:00 a.m. The court forgives its requirement of 3 days advance notice of presentment. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 02/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/9/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Clarify
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourvillein Opposition to MOTION by Defendants Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation, Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc. to clarify 197 (Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Steven Lawrence Vanderporten for presentment of motion to clarify 197 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/9/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Clarify
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Steven Lawrence Vanderporten for presentment of motion for extension of time to complete discovery 194 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/3/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourvillein Opposition to MOTION by Defendants KCBX Terminals Company, Koch Carbon, LLC to strike evidence supporting Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 168 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Excerpts from the Deposition of Alfredo Mendoza, # 2 Exhibit B: Excerpts from the Deposition of Richard Martinez, # 3 Exhibit C: Excerpts from the Deposition of Patricia A. Fisher)(Schork, Erich) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
REPLY by Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville to MOTION by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville to certify class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 157 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Erich Paul Schork for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 190 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/2/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Schork, Erich) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 1/27/2016, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: At the parties' request, the status hearing is reset to 2/3/16 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 01/27/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, 186 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/26/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 01/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/19/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 1/12/2016, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville by Jordan Rudnick (Rudnick, Jordan) (Entered: 01/12/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr Jordan Rudnick (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None
(Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion) NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of extension of time, 181 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/7/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 12/31/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: None extension of time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None extension of time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Barry Rogers for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, 176 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/8/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Rogers, Kevin) (Entered: 12/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 12/2/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville by Amelia Susan Newton (Newton, Amelia) (Entered: 11/12/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 11/9/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document # 168 , 170 , 167 , 166 , 172 , 171 , 169 sent to Attorney Steven Mark Siegel returned as: unknown address error. Mailed to attorney Steven Mark Siegel Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ea, ) (Entered: 11/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE by KCBX Terminals Company, Koch Carbon, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville to certify class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 157 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stephen A. Swedlow, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Michael Estadt, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Lyle Chinkin, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Declaration of David MacIntosh, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14 - Declaration of David MacIntosh, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17 - Declaration of Michael Dourson, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19, # 21 Exhibit 20)(Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 170 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/12/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None File Excess Pages
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of motion to strike, 168 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 11/12/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None Strike
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc.in Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville to certify class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 157 (Harvey, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 11/6/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Calumet Transload Railroad LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville to certify class and Incorporated Memorandum of Law 157 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, Map, # 2 Exhibit 2, Mendoza deposition excerpts, # 3 Exhibit 3, Fisher deposition excerpts, # 4 Exhibit 4, Martinez deposition excerpts, # 5 Exhibit 5, Campos deposition excerpts, # 6 Exhibit 6, Martin deposition excerpts, # 7 Exhibit 7, Gould deposition excerpts)(Harvey, Elizabeth) (Entered: 11/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Plaintiffs' reply to the Motion for Class Certification 157 is due 12/4/15. Continued status hearing is set for 1/15/16 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 10/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of motion for extension of time to file response/reply, 162 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/21/2015 at 09:30 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 10/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 10/13/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation, Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc. by Elizabeth Schroer Harvey (Harvey, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Jean Tourville by Nickolas J. Hagman (Hagman, Nickolas) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Defendants' counsel advise the court three depositions of class representatives, as well as some documents from outstanding discovery requests, are necessary before responding to the Motion for Class Certification 157 . Defendants' responses to the motion 157 shall be filed by 10/16/15. Defendants' expert disclosures, if any, shall be served simultaneously with the filing of their responses. Plaintiff's oral request to extend the 12/18/15 fact discovery deadline is granted. All fact discovery shall be noticed in time to be completed by 2/5/16. Continued status hearing is set for 10/21/15 at 9:30 a.m., at which time a deadline for Plaintiffs' reply to the motion 157 shall be set. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document #154 sent to Attorney Patrick M Crook returned as: Unknown Address Error. The Clerk telephoned Patrick M Crook, no contact made. Document 154 mailed to attorney Patrick M Crook with Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (ea, ) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None Certify Class
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF EMAIL NOTIFICATION FAILURE, for document # 152 , 153 sent to Attorney Patrick Crook returned as: Unknown address error. The Clerk telephoned [Attorney Patrick Crook], no contact made. Document 152 153 mailed to attorney [Patrick Crook ] with Letter re: bounce back email and a Notification of Change of Address form. Notices have been set to No. Counsel must email the Clerk's Office at Docketing_ILND@uscourts.gov when a Notification of Change of Address has been filed to ensure electronic notification is reset. (kmc, ) (Entered: 08/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/13/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/04/15 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway @312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/3/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/12/2015. (Conway, Colleen) (Entered: 08/13/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Clarify
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
REPLY by Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville to MOTION by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville to clarify June 5, 2015 Order and Extend Expert Disclosure Dat 149 , response in opposition to motion,, 152 (Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/3/2015, Entered: None
RESPONSE by KCBX Terminals Company, Koch Carbon, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiffs Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville to clarify June 5, 2015 Order and Extend Expert Disclosure Dat 149 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 08/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: The 7/27/15 deadline for plaintiff's expert disclosure is stayed pending the 8/4/15 hearing on plaintiff's motion to clarify. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of motion to clarify, 149 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 8/4/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Clarify
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/2/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Jean Tourville by Matthew C. De Re (De Re, Matthew) (Entered: 07/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Adam M. Tamburelli for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 145 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 6/1/2016 at 09:45 AM. (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/24/2015, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 06/05/15 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway @312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 7/15/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2015. (Conway, Colleen) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Plaintiffs' expert disclosure and report in regard to the class certification motion shall be served by 7/27/15. Plaintiff's motion for class certification remains due on 8/27/15. A date for Defendants' expert disclosure and report shall be set at the next status hearing on 9/9/15 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 06/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Due to a scheduling conflict with one of the defendants, and with no objections from the other parties, the status hearing previously set for 6/1/15 at 9:30 a.m. is hereby stricken and reset to 6/5/15 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 05/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. Counsel for the parties advise the court they are still working on written discovery and the testing of physical items. Plaintiffs' counsel advises the court that an environmental expert is anticipated. Continued status hearing is set for 6/1/15 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants KCBX Terminals Company, Koch Carbon, LLC by Jennifer Anne Bauer (Bauer, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/5/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to amended complaint by DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 02/05/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Defendant DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC's Second Motion for Extension of Time 136 is granted. Defendant DTE shall answer or otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint by 2/9/15. Motion hearing previously set for 2/5/15 at 9:45 a.m. is hereby stricken and no appearance is necessary. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 02/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Steven Patrick McKey for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 136 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/5/2015 at 09:45 AM. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to amended complaint by KCBX Terminals Company, Koch Carbon, LLC(Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to amended complaint by Calumet Transload Railroad LLC(Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to amended complaint by Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation(Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to amended complaint by George J. Beemsterboer, Inc.(Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Steven Patrick McKey for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 129 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 2/3/2015 at 09:45 AM. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 128 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. The court adopts the defendants' proposed date to file an answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiffs Complaint 63 by 1/29/15. Any requests to amend the pleadings must be made by 3/31/15. Plaintiffs shall file their motion for class certification by 8/27/15. Defendants' responses shall be filed by 10/1/15. Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed by 10/29/15. No surreply is allowed. All fact discovery shall be noticed in time to be completed by 12/18/15. No expert discovery dates will be set at this time. Defendants' request for Plaintiffs to disclose experts in connection with Plaintiffs' class certification motion will be addressed at the next status hearing, which is set for 4/9/15 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of motion for protective order, 124 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 1/6/2015 at 09:45 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 12/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: None Protective Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Frank James Stretz for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 121 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/4/2014 at 09:45 AM. (Stretz, Frank) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/25/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
STATUS Report by Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
STATUS Report by Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation, Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc., KCBX Terminals Company, Koch Carbon, LLC (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of extension of time, 116 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 12/3/2014 at 09:45 AM. (Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 11/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: None extension of time
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: A joint status report containing a proposed discovery schedule and dates for the remaining defendants to answer the complaint is due on or before 11/24/14. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held. The court advises the parties that a ruling on the motions to dismiss will be issued within the next week. With the ruling on the motions to dismiss, the court will set a date by which the parties have to file a joint status report containing a proposed date for the defendants to answer Plaintiff's Complaint, as well as a proposed discovery schedule. If the parties are not able to agree on a discovery schedule, they may submit competing ones. Defendants KCBX and BP advise the court on a dispute regarding a potential protective order governing the confidentiality of discovery documents. The court directs those defendants to keep talking to resolve the matter, but that if unresolved, the defendants may submit competing proposals for the protective order to this court's proposed order email inbox, and the court will decide the issue. Continued status hearing is set for 1/21/15 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 11/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/29/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 10/08/14 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway @312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/19/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2015. (Conway, Colleen) (Entered: 10/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 109 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/8/2014 at 09:45 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 10/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr for presentment of motion to compel, 106 before Honorable Manish S. Shah on 10/8/2014 at 09:45 AM. (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Compel
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE by Jeffrey A. Leon of Change of Address [Notification of Change of Firm Name and Change of Attorney Email Address] (Leon, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 08/15/14 before the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Court Reporter Contact Information: Colleen Conway @312.435.5594 or colleen_conway@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 10/3/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2014. (Conway, Colleen) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on May 15, 2014 before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr. Court Reporter Contact Information: Carolyn Cox, Carolyn_Cox@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 9/24/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/6/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/2/2014. (Cox, Carolyn) (Entered: 09/03/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: Status hearing held and continued to 11/6/14 at 9:30 a.m. The defendants' motions to dismiss are fully briefed. The parties may submit a proposed discovery schedule to this court's proposed order email inbox at 'Proposed_Order_Shah@ilnd.uscourts.gov'. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
REPLY by BP Products North America Inc., Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation, Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc., KCBX Terminals Company, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC to response in opposition to motion,, 91 (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
REPLY by KCBX Terminals Company, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC to response in opposition to motion,, 91 (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendants Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation, Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc. to response in opposition to motion,, 91 Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation, Calumet Transload Railroad, LLC, and George J. Beemsterboer, Inc.'s Individual Reply in Support of their Partial Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
REPLY by Defendant DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC to response in opposition to motion,, 91 DTE's Individual Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None
REPLY by BP Products North America Inc. to response in opposition to motion,, 91 BP Products North America Inc.'s Individual Reply In Support Of Its Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fowkes, Scott) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
Joint Reassignment STATUS Report by Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville (Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by George J. Beemsterboer, Inc. (Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Calumet Transload Railroad LLC (Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation (Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 07/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure STATEMENT by BP Products North America Inc. Corporate Disclosure Statement (Fowkes, Scott) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE by Raymond Figueroa, Patricia A. Fisher, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourvillein Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 73 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 79 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM 76 , MOTION by Defendant BP Products North America Inc. to dismiss BP Products North America Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint Based Upon Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 (a)(2) and 12(b)(6) 82 (Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by KCBX Terminals Company, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 07/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Manish S. Shah: This case has been reassigned to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Manish S. Shah. All previously set status dates and motion hearing dates are hereby stricken. All other hearing dates, deadlines and schedules in place as of the date of this Order remain in effect. Counsel for the parties shall confer and then prepare and file a joint Reassignment Status Report, not to exceed five pages, within 14 days of the entry of this Order. A template for the Reassignment Status Report, setting forth the information required, may be found at http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/home/JudgeInfo.aspx by clicking on Judge Shah's name and then again on the link entitled 'Cases Reassigned to Judge Shah.' A status hearing is hereby set before Judge Shah on 8/15/14 at 9:30 a.m. Notices mailed by Judicial Staff. (psm, ) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Manish S. Shah for all further proceedings pursuant IOP 13(f)(2). Signed by Executive Committee on 7/7/2014.(jh, ) (Entered: 07/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 8/13/14 at 9:00 a.m. Defendants' motions to dismiss [ 73 , 76 , 79 , 82 ] are taken under advisement. Plaintiff is to file a consolidated response brief not to exceed 40 pages to the motions to dismiss by 7/15/14; defendants' are permitted to file a joint reply of up to 20 pages with an individual reply brief for each moving defendant of up to 5 pages which are due by 8/12/14. The Court will rule via CM/ECF notice. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/15/2014, Entered: None
REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of $50.00, receipt no. 0752-9453060, re Michelle Schmit's motion for leave to file pro hac vice 66 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Receipt No. 0752-9453060, # 2 Exhibit B - Receipt No. 0752-9453214, # 3 Exhibit C - Carolyn Hoesly Email 050614)(Schmit, Michelle) (Entered: 05/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants KCBX Terminals Company, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC by Michael John Lyle (Lyle, Michael) (Entered: 05/13/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Scott William Fowkes for presentment of motion to dismiss, 82 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 5/15/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Fowkes, Scott) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by BP Products North America Inc. in support of motion to dismiss, 82 BP Products North America Inc.'s Memorandum in Support of Its motion to DismissPlaintiffs' Consolidated Class Action Complaint (Fowkes, Scott) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant BP Products North America Inc. to dismiss BP Products North America Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Consolidated Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint Based Upon Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 8 (a)(2) and 12(b)(6) (Fowkes, Scott) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Steven Patrick McKey for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 79 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 5/15/2014 at 09:30 AM. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 79 (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 76 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 5/15/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by KCBX Terminals Company, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 76 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Steven Lawrence Vanderporten for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 73 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 5/15/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation, Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 73 (Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice by Eric Lyttle 71 is granted. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9461584. (Lyttle, Eric) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Motion for leave to appear pro hac vice by Sylvia E. Simson 69 is granted. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9460775. (Simson, Sylvia) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motions for leave to appear pro hac vice by Michelle Schmit 66 and Jennifer Adams 67 are granted. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 05/06/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9453340. (Jennifer, Adams) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-9453214. (Schmit, Michelle) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
ORDER: Per the Court's prior order, a Consolidated Amended Complaint has been filed in Case No. 13 C 8376. Cases 13 C 8499 and 13 C 9038 are consolidated with 13 C 8376 for all purposes and should be terminated administratively per prior order 57 . The Clerk is directed to enter all appearances by counsel in 13 C 8499 and 13 C 9038 on the docket in 13 C 8376. Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 4/8/2014: Mailed notice (jmp, ) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/8/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: The motions to dismiss filed by defendants Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, and George J. Beemsterboer, Inc. 29 , KCBX Terminals Company, KM Railways, LLC, and Koch Carbon, LLC 33 , and DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC 36 are denied as moot. Defendants have leave to answer or otherwise respond to the consolidated class action complaint by 5/12/14. In the event any motion is filed in response to the complaint, it should be noticed for 5/15/14 at 9:30 a.m., in conjunction with the status hearing previously set in this matter. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 04/08/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
Consolidated Class Action Complaint AMENDED complaint by Alfredo Mendoza, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Joann Podkul, Kevin P. Murphy, Patricia A. Fisher, Campos Rosalio, Jean Tourville, Lilly Martin, Raymond Figueroa, Jane Gould against BP Products North America Inc., Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc., KCBX Terminals Company, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC, Beemsterboer Slag and Ballast Corporation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Safety Data Sheet for petcoke), # 2 Exhibit B (CDC Guide - Coal Dust), # 3 Exhibit C (permit), # 4 Exhibit D (map), # 5 Exhibit E (Executive Order), # 6 Exhibit F (IEPA Violation Notice), # 7 Exhibit G (IEPA Complaint), # 8 Exhibit H (LA Times article))(Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC by Lauren Jennifer Caisman (Caisman, Lauren) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BP Products North America Inc. by Scott William Fowkes (Fowkes, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BP Products North America Inc. by Patrick M Crook (Crook, Patrick) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/10/2014, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant BP Products North America Inc. by Caitlin Alejandrina Kovacs (Kovacs, Caitlin) (Entered: 03/10/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
ORDER Appointing Interim Co-Lead Counsel Signed by the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr on 3/7/2014:Mailed notice(air, ) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status hearing held and continued to 5/15/14 at 9:30 a.m. Plaintiffs' motion for appointment of Interim Co-Lead Counsel 54 is granted. Plaintiffs' consolidated amended complaint is due 4/7/14. Going forward, all filings shall be made in case number 13 C 8376; the Clerk of the Court is directed to administratively terminate cases 13 C 8499 and 13 C 9038. ENTER ORDER APPOINTING PLAINTIFFS' INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 54 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/7/2014 at 01:00 PM. (Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Ben Barnow for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief, 54 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 3/4/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Jean Tourville, Raymond Figueroa, Kevin P. Murphy, Joann Podkul, Susan Sadlowski Garza, Patricia A. Fisher, Campos Rosalio for Appointment of Plaintiffs' Interim Co-Lead Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Barnow, Ben) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Jean Tourville by James D. Brusslan (Brusslan, James) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Status hearing held. Submissions for appointment as interim class counsel pursuant to FRCP 23(g) are due by 2/21/14; responses due 2/28/14. Status hearing set for 2/28/14 is stricken. Status hearing re-set for 3/7/14 at 1:00 p.m. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc. by Michael John Maher (Maher, Michael) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc. by Steven Lawrence Vanderporten (Vanderporten, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Motion hearing held. Defendant DTC Chicago Fuels Terminal did not appear. Without objection, plaintiffs' motion to reassign related cases (13cv8499, 13cv9038) 44 is granted. The Court finds that these cases are related within the meaning of LR 40.4(a) and satisfy the criteria for reassignment set forth in LR 40.4(b). All further responses to pleadings or briefing of any pending motions to dismiss are stayed pending further order of the Court. Status hearing set for 2/14/14 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
Supplemental Jurisdictional STATEMENT by DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
RESPONSE by KCBX Terminals Company, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC to MOTION by Plaintiffs Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Jean Tourville to transfer case as related under Local Rule 40.4 44 (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Adam M. Tamburelli for presentment of motion to transfer case 44 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/28/2014 at 10:00 AM. (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
MOTION by Plaintiffs Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Jean Tourville to transfer case as related under Local Rule 40.4 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
Supplemental Jurisdiction STATEMENT by Calumet Transload Railroad LLC (Sheean, Christopher) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Status and motion hearing held. Defendants who are LLCs are to file supplemental jurisdictional statements as to the citizenship of the members of the LLC. Plaintiffs are directed to file a motion to transfer related cases to the calendar of Judge John J. Tharp, Jr. This motion is to be noticed for presentment on 1/28/14 at 10:00 a.m. Defendants' motions to dismiss [29, 33, 36] are entered and continued. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendants Calumet Transload and Beemsterboers motion to dismiss is reset for presentment at 9:00 a.m. on 1/21/14. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 40 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
STATUS Report by Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Jean Tourville (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Upon filing of the notice of voluntary dismissal and pursuant to FRCP Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is terminated only as to Defendant Transload Realty, LLC. The scheduled 1/21/2014 status date stands. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Steven Patrick McKey for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 36 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 36 (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 33 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/21/2014 at 09:00 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by KCBX Terminals Company, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 33 (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Christopher T. Sheean for presentment of motion to dismiss 29 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 1/21/2014 at 09:30 AM. (Sheean, Christopher) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM by Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc. in support of motion to dismiss 29 (Sheean, Christopher) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Defendant Calumet Transload Railroad LLC (Sheean, Christopher) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office) (mr, ). (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc. to dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memo of Law in Support)(Sheean, Christopher) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office.) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs of Defendant Transload Realty, LLC (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Calumet Transload Railroad LLC, George J. Beemsterboer, Inc. by Christopher T. Sheean (Sheean, Christopher) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr: Defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time 24 is granted. Answer or other responsive pleadings by all defendants (including non-moving defendants) will be due 1/15/2014. Responses should be accompanied by statements of affiliates required by Local Rule 3.2. No appearance on 12/18/2013. The initial status hearing is re-set to 1/21/14 at 9:00 a.m. The parties are directed to review the procedures and requirements for this conference on Judge Tharp's web site, which may be accessed at [www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/judges] and to submit the required Initial Status Report by 1/17/14. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 12/13/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 24 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/18/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendants KCBX Terminals Company, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC for extension of time to file answer (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Thor W. Ketzback of Change of Address (Ketzback, Thor) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC by Thor W. Ketzback (Ketzback, Thor) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC's motion for extension of time 18 is denied as moot. Per the Court's order 8 on 11/26/2013, the deadline for Defendant DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC's answer or other responsive pleading is already 12/20/2013. No appearance required on the motion. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC by Donald Alexander Cole (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Steven Patrick McKey for presentment of extension of time 18 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/12/2013 at 09:00 AM. (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC for extension of time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant DTE Chicago Fuels Terminal, LLC by Steven Patrick McKey (McKey, Steven) (Entered: 12/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendant Transload Realty, LLC's agreed motion for extension of time 13 is granted. Transload's answer or other responsive pleading due 1/15/2014. No appearance on 12/5/2013. The initial status hearing remains scheduled for 1/8/14 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Transload Realty, LLC (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Troy A. Bozarth for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 13 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/5/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendant Transload Realty, LLC for extension of time to file answer , Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Transload Realty, LLC by Troy A. Bozarth (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Jean Tourville by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Jean Tourville by Frank James Stretz (Stretz, Frank) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Jane Gould, Lilly Martin, Alfredo Mendoza, Jean Tourville by Adam M. Tamburelli (Tamburelli, Adam) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before the Honorable John J. Tharp, Jr:Defendants' agreed motion for extension of time 6 is granted. Answer or other responsive pleadings by all defendants (including non-moving defendants) will be due 12/20/2013. Responses should be accompanied by statements of affiliates required by Local Rule 3.2. No appearance on 12/3/2013. An initial status hearing will be held on 1/8/14 at 9:00 a.m. Mailed notice (air, ) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Motion by Stephen A. Swedlow for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 6 before Honorable John J. Tharp Jr. on 12/3/2013 at 09:00 AM. (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
MOTION by Defendants KCBX Terminals Company, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (et, ) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by KCBX Terminals Co, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants KCBX Terminals Co, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC by Stephen A. Swedlow (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
CIVIL Cover Sheet (Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Chancery Division, case number (2013-CH-24614) filed by KCBX Terminals Co, KM Railways, LLC, Koch Carbon, LLC Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-8951571. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Swedlow, Stephen) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 595 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?