McNosky et al v. Perry et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-00631
District Judge Sam Sparks, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 12:24 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christopher Daniel McNosky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Daniel McNosky +1 817 360 0687 cmcnosky@gmail.com
No Logo Sven Stricker, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sven Stricker +1 817 681 1760 ststravis@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Greg Abbott, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Texas Attorney General William Terrell Deane +1 512 463 2120 +1 512 320 0667 bill.deane@oag.state.tx.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Texas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Texas Attorney General Michael P. Murphy +1 512 936 2995 +1 512 474 2697 michaelp.murphy@texasattorneygeneral.gov
No Logo Texas Governor Rick Perry, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Capitol Station

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Terrell Deane +1 512 463 2120 +1 512 320 0667 bill.deane@oag.state.tx.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Terrell Deane +1 512 463 2120 +1 512 320 0667 bill.deane@oag.state.tx.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Texas Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael P. Murphy +1 512 936 2995 +1 512 474 2697 michaelp.murphy@texasattorneygeneral.gov
No Logo Cleopatra DeLeon, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry Chasnoff +1 210 281 7001 +1 210 224 2035 bchasnoff@akingump.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry Chasnoff +1 210 281 7001 +1 210 224 2035 bchasnoff@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel McNeel Lane, Jr. +1 210 281 7070 +1 210 224 2035 nlane@akingump.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Frank Stenger-Castro +1 210 281 7000 +1 210 224 2035 frank.stenger-castro@saws.org
No Logo Mark Phariss, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry Chasnoff +1 210 281 7001 +1 210 224 2035 bchasnoff@akingump.com
No Logo Nicole Dimetman, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry Chasnoff +1 210 281 7001 +1 210 224 2035 bchasnoff@akingump.com
No Logo Victor Holmes, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry Chasnoff +1 210 281 7001 +1 210 224 2035 bchasnoff@akingump.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/20/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER re 64 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Christopher Daniel McNosky. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing for ALL PENDING MATTERS onFriday, August 21, 2015 at 02:00 PM is hereby CANCELLED until further order of thecourt. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os) (Entered: 08/20/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 64 Filed: 8/19/2015, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Daniel McNosky (McNosky, Christopher) (Entered: 08/19/2015)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Setting All Pending Matters. Hearing set for 8/21/2015 02:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (os) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: None
          RESPONSE to Show Cause Order 58 by Mary Louise Garcia. (Friemel, Russell) Modified on 7/30/2015 to add text and create link (td). (Entered: 07/30/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/23/2015, Entered: None
            MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Deane, William) (Entered: 07/23/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
              DEFICIENCY NOTICE to William T. Deane: re 59 Response to Order to Show Cause. Pursuant to the Administrative Policies and Procedures Section 3g, with the exception of multiple motion types,...each filing must consist of only one pleading. Multiple pleadings...must be filed as separate documents. Your document contains a RESPONSE and a MOTION. Your RESPONSE has been filed. Please re-file you MOTION separately. (klw) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None
                RESPONSE to 58 Order to Show Cause by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, The State of Texas. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Deane, William) Modified on 7/22/2015 to create link and add text (klw). (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER that within fifteen (15) days of this date any party herein must file a pleading to show cause why this case should remain open and specify any factual or legal issue surviving in this cause. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (klw) (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None
                    ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Mary Louise Garcia. (Friemel, Russell) (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING 54 Motion to Stay Proceedings; all pending motions ( 18 , 24 , 32 , 37 , 48 ) are DISMISSED without prejudice to refiling after the United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit renders its opinion in the related case. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/22/2014, Entered: None
                        Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Christopher Daniel McNosky, re 54 MOTION to Stay Case filed by Defendant Rick Perry, Defendant Greg Abbott (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Proposed Order)(McNosky, Christopher) (Entered: 03/22/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Stay Case by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Stay Proceedings)(Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 53 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER GRANTING 52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; this case will be on the same schedule as established by agreement in cause no. 13cv631 and 13cv955. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Greg Abbott, Mary Louise Garcia, Rick Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 51 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                            ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Greg Abbott, Mary Louise Garcia, Rick Perry. (Murphy, Michael) Modified on 1/28/2014 to remove filers (kkc). (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None
                              Transcript filed of Proceedings held on January 9, 2014, Proceedings Transcribed: All Pending Matters. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lily I. Reznik, Telephone number: 512-391-8792. Parties are notified of their duty to review the transcript to ensure compliance with the FRCP 5.2(a)/FRCrP 49.1(a). A copy may be purchased from the court reporter or viewed at the clerk's office public terminal. If redaction is necessary, a Notice of Redaction Request must be filed within 21 days. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made available via PACER without redaction after 90 calendar days. The clerk will mail a copy of this notice to parties not electronically noticed Redaction Request due 2/13/2014, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/24/2014, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2014, (Reznik, Lily) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 49 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 17 Motion to Consolidate; GRANTING 21 Motion to Intervene, for the limited purpose of opposing the Motion to Consolidate, but these plaintiffs are not parties to the McNosky case at this time; GRANTING 42 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; Responses due 20 days from entry of this order. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 01/13/2014)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/12/2014, Entered: None
                                  Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment by Christopher Daniel McNosky. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(McNosky, Christopher) (Entered: 01/12/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Sam Sparks: Hearing held on All Pending Matters on 1/9/2014 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.). (Court Reporter Lily Reznik.)(td) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None
                                    ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Order in pending case)(Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry. (Deane, William) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                      SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to 32 MOTION to Dismiss /Brief AND Resp to Amended TRO & Injunction by Mary Louise Garcia. (Friemel, Russell) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                        Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mary Louise Garcia. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Friemel, Russell) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                          Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Deane, William) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 41 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Sven Stricker. (McNosky, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 40 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Christopher Daniel McNosky. (McNosky, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                              Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, re 24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Christopher Daniel McNosky, Plaintiff Sven Stricker (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Exhibit1, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 38 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              NON-CONSENT to Trial by US Magistrate Judge by Mary Louise Garcia (Friemel, Russell) Modified docket text on 12/23/2013 (kkc). (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for Summary Judgment by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(McNosky, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael P. Murphy on behalf of Greg Abbott, Rick Perry. Attorney Michael P. Murphy added to party Greg Abbott(pty:dft), Attorney Michael P. Murphy added to party Rick Perry(pty:dft) (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Certificate of Service)(Murphy, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Proposed Scheduling Order -Joint by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry. (Deane, William) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE to 31 Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order by Mary Louise Garcia. (Friemel, Russell) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER (All Pending Matters set for 1/9/2014 at 2:00 PM before Judge Sam Sparks). Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss /Brief AND Resp to Amended TRO & Injunction by Mary Louise Garcia. (Friemel, Russell) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 31 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                          Scheduling Recommendations -Joint Discovery Plan by Greg Abbott, Christopher Daniel McNosky, Rick Perry, Sven Stricker. (Deane, William) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker re: 10 Amended Complaint. Mary Louise Garcia served on 11/19/2013, answer due 12/10/2013. (McNosky, Christopher) Modified docket text on 12/4/2013 (kkc). (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER GRANTING 27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response and Objections to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction; Response/Objections due by 12/27/2013. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker, re 27 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant Rick Perry, Defendant Greg Abbott (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McNosky, Christopher) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Deane, William) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, re 17 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Rick Perry, Defendant Greg Abbott (Deane, William) (Entered: 11/25/2013)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    ATTACHMENT Proposed Order to 24 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker. (McNosky, Christopher) Modified docket text on 11/25/2013 (kkc). (Entered: 11/23/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Affidavit)(McNosky, Christopher) (Entered: 11/23/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/21/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry, re 18 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Christopher Daniel McNosky, Plaintiff Sven Stricker (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Deane, William) (Entered: 11/21/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 19 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Consolidate; Response due by 11/26/2013. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Intervene by Cleopatra DeLeon, Nicole Dimetman, Victor Holmes, Mark Phariss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Proposed Order) (kkc) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker, re 17 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Defendant Rick Perry, Defendant Greg Abbott (McNosky, Christopher) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 17 Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Conference, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Proposed Order)(McNosky, Christopher) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McNosky, Christopher) (Entered: 11/14/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  Opposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Proposed Order)(Deane, William) (Entered: 11/12/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Order for Proposed Scheduling Order. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 12/23/2013. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker 12 MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing. (kkc) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING 12 Motion for Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 10/31/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint by Greg Abbott, Rick Perry.(Deane, William) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Permission for Electronic Case Filing by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker. (kkc) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Greg Abbott, Mary Louise Garcia, Rick Perry. (kkc) (Entered: 10/15/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rick Perry, Greg Abbott, Mary Louise Garcia amending 3 Amended Complaint, filed by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker.(kkc) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER GRANTING 8 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE 6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sam Sparks. (kkc) (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend Complaint by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Summons, # 3 Envelope) (kkc) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint by Rick Perry.(Deane, William) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Rick Perry. (Deane, William) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker. Rick Perry served on 8/23/2013, answer due 9/13/2013. (kkc) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Rick Perry. (kkc) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rick Perry amending 1 Complaint, filed by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker.(kkc) (Entered: 08/19/2013)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Summons Issued as to The State of Texas. (os) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 100018262), filed by Christopher Daniel McNosky, Sven Stricker. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet and Receipt)(os) (Entered: 07/30/2013)
                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 689 times.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?