Hancock Vs Ghazanfarpour
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 97 983916
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hancock, Robert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Weltin Law Office, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Weltin Law Pc +1 510 251 6060
v.
No Logo Gamma Intertrade, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ghazanfarpour, Pari, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ventura, Carol L

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carol L Ventura +1 415 732 4150
PG&E Corporation PG&E Corporation, Claimant
Officially listed as "Pg&e Co"

Toggle Switch Represented by Peters, Ronald A

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald A Peters +1 415 973 3182
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 7/31/1997, Entered: 7/31/1997
Ntc Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service
    Blank 24 Filed: 7/17/1997, Entered: 7/17/1997
    Req For Dism, W/ Prej Complt Entire Action
      Blank 23 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: 6/20/1997
      Response To Osc
        Blank 22 Filed: 6/13/1997, Entered: 6/13/1997
        Osc - Pos Hearing Set For Jul-01-1997 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 314
          Blank 21 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997
          Order To Show Cause-hearing On: July 01, 1997 At 2:00 Pm/ Proof Of Service
            Blank 20 Filed: 6/3/1997, Entered: 6/3/1997
            Mailing (ca073) From 06/13/97 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 07/01/97 Ptr1 02:00 Pm
              Blank 19 Filed: 6/2/1997, Entered: 6/2/1997
              Status And Setting Conference Statement By Pari Ghazanfar- Pour
                Blank 18 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 5/29/1997
                $185. Pd By: Pari Ghazanfarpour
                  Blank 17 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: 5/29/1997
                  Answer Of Pari Ghazanfarpour
                    Blank 16 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: 5/20/1997
                    Status And Setting Conference Statement By Plntf
                      Blank 15 Filed: 5/16/1997, Entered: 5/16/1997
                      $ 200.00 Sanctions By: Weltin Van Dam #000450 Cashier Payment
                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/30/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997
                        Order For Sanctions
                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/29/1997, Entered: 4/29/1997
                          Sanctions $200 Owed By Plaintiff Counsel
                            Blank 12 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 4/24/1997
                            Request For Special Ntc
                              Blank 11 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 4/24/1997
                              Notice Of Lien Claim
                                Blank 10 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 4/24/1997
                                Proof Of Service For Deft Gamma Intertrade
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 4/24/1997
                                  Declaration Confirming Service (dcs)
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 4/24/1997, Entered: 4/24/1997
                                    Proof Of Service For Deft Pari Ghazanfarpour
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 3/25/1997
                                      Order To Show Cause - Hearing On: April 29, 1997 - 9:00 Am
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/25/1997, Entered: 3/25/1997
                                        Mailing (ca074) From 04/29/97 Ptr1 09:00 Am For 04/29/97 Ptr1 09:00 Am
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: 3/24/1997
                                          Order To Show Cause - Proof Of Service Hearing Set For Apr-29-1997 At 09:00 Am In Dept 314
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997
                                            Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997
                                              Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Jun-13-1997 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997
                                                Summons Issued
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/10/1997, Entered: 1/10/1997
                                                  Complaint For Personal Injury (vehicle)

                                                    Space Space

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 59 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?