Ford Vs Tishman Speyer Properties
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 97 984870
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Ford, Deborah, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eisenberg, Neil Daniel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eisenberg, Neil Daniel +1 415 956 3567
v.
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wilson Elser Moskowitz +1 213 624 3044
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 11/25/1997, Entered: 11/25/1997
Notice Of Entry Of Order
    Blank 36 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997
    Ptr1, Osc 11-24-97 @ 1:30 Pm, Off Calendar: Dem Sust W/o Leave To Amend,
      Blank 35 Filed: 10/29/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997
      Declaration Of Service
        Blank 34 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: 10/27/1997
        Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
          Blank 33 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: 10/27/1997
          Demurrer-amd Cmplt--sustained W/o Leave To Amend.order Is Signed.(10)
            Blank 32 Filed: 10/27/1997, Entered: 10/27/1997
            Order Granting Tishman Speyer Properties Lp's Demurrer To Pltf's Amended Complt-microfilmed R/b F: 233-27
              Blank 31 Filed: 10/24/1997, Entered: 10/24/1997
              Status And Setting Conference Statement By Tishman Speyer Properties
                Blank 30 Filed: 10/14/1997, Entered: 10/14/1997
                Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Nov-24-1997 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                  Blank 29 Filed: 10/8/1997, Entered: 10/8/1997
                  Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal/sanctions: Nov 24, 1997 At 1:30 Pm
                    Blank 28 Filed: 10/8/1997, Entered: 10/8/1997
                    Mailing, 0sc Dismissed/sanctions Order From 10/14/97 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 11/24/97 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                      Blank 27 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997
                      Ntc Of Demurrer By Deft, Tishman Speyer Properties Lp To Amended Complt, Calendar Motion: Demurrer Hearing Set For Oct-27-1997 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                        Blank 26 Filed: 9/23/1997, Entered: 9/23/1997
                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Plntf
                          Blank 25 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/22/1997
                          Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                            Blank 24 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/22/1997
                            Demurrer-amd Cmplt--o/c.amended Cmplt Filed.(10)
                              Blank 23 Filed: 9/18/1997, Entered: 9/18/1997
                              Reply To Pltf's Opposition To Demurrer
                                Blank 22 Filed: 9/15/1997, Entered: 9/15/1997
                                Status And Setting Conference Statement By Tishman Speyer Properties
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 9/9/1997, Entered: 9/9/1997
                                  Memo Of Pts & Auths In Oppos To Deft's Demurrer
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 8/27/1997, Entered: 8/27/1997
                                    Tishman Speyer's Ntc Of Demurrer To Amended Complt, Calendar Motion: Demurrer, Calendar Motion: To Amend Complaint Hearing Set For Sep-22-1997 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/20/1997
                                      Mailing, Plan I, Osc From 08/19/97 Ptr1 02:00 Pm For 10/14/97 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: 8/20/1997
                                        Order To Show Cause For Oct 14, 1997 At 1:30pm
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 8/19/1997, Entered: 8/19/1997
                                          Plan I, Order To Show Cause: Hearing Set For Oct-14-1997 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997
                                            Amended Complaint
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997
                                              Ntc Of Demurrer Of Tishman Speyer Properties L.p., Calendar Motion: Demurrer Hearing Set For Sep-22-1997 At 09:30 Am In Dept 10
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997
                                                Declaration Of Lucinda L. Storm
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 8/18/1997, Entered: 8/18/1997
                                                  Deft's Memo Of Pts & Auths In Supp Of Demurrer To Complt
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 8/1/1997, Entered: 8/1/1997
                                                    Osc - Pos Hearing Set For Aug-19-1997 At 02:00 Pm In Dept 314
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997
                                                      $190 Pd By: Tishman Speyer Properties
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 7/24/1997, Entered: 7/24/1997
                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Deft Tishman Speyer Properties
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 7/22/1997, Entered: 7/22/1997
                                                          Order To Show Cause-hrg On: Aug 19, 1997 At 2:00 Pm
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 7/21/1997, Entered: 7/21/1997
                                                            Mailing (ca073) From 08/01/97 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 08/19/97 Ptr1 02:00 Pm
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997
                                                              Order To Show Cause - Hearing On: June 17, 1997 - 9:00 Am
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997
                                                                Mailing (ca074) From 06/17/97 Ptr1 09:00 Am For 06/17/97 Ptr1 09:00 Am
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/13/1997, Entered: 5/13/1997
                                                                  Order To Show Cause - Proof Of Service Hearing Set For Jun-17-1997 At 09:00 Am In Dept 314
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997
                                                                    Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997
                                                                      Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Aug-01-1997 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997
                                                                        Summons Issued
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/25/1997, Entered: 2/25/1997
                                                                          Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?