American Home Assurance Vs Ross
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 97 986800
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Home Assurance Co, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Galvin Brown & Boland

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brown & Boland +1 415 445 2626
v.
No Logo Brown, Keith, Defendant
No Logo Brown, Renee, Defendant
No Logo Ross, John David Iii, Defendant
Cause of Action Labor
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998
Ptr1, Osc 12-21-98 @ 1:30 Pm, Off Calendar: Dismissal Filed,
    Blank 38 Filed: 11/18/1998, Entered: 11/18/1998
    Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
      Blank 37 Filed: 10/5/1998, Entered: 10/5/1998
      Osc Dismissed/sanctions (default/bankruptcy Stay), Hearing Set For Dec-21-1998 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 212
        Blank 36 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998
        Order To Show Cause-re Dismissal (crc 225) Nov 04, 1998 At 9:00 Am
          Blank 35 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998
          Order To Show Cause-hrg On: Dec 21, 1998 At 1:30 Pm
            Blank 34 Filed: 9/30/1998, Entered: 9/30/1998
            Mailing, 0sc Dismissed/sanctions Order From 10/05/98 X-1 01:30 Pm For 12/21/98 X-1 01:30 Pm
              Blank 33 Filed: 6/15/1998, Entered: 6/15/1998
              Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Oct-05-1998 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 212
                Blank 32 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998
                Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal/sanctions-oct 05, 1998 At 1:30 Pm
                  Blank 31 Filed: 6/5/1998, Entered: 6/5/1998
                  Mailing, 0sc Dismissed/sanctions Order From 06/15/98 X-1 01:30 Pm For 10/05/98 X-1 01:30 Pm
                    Blank 30 Filed: 4/13/1998, Entered: 4/13/1998
                    Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Jun-15-1998 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 212
                      Blank 29 Filed: 4/10/1998, Entered: 4/10/1998
                      Osc Re Dismissal/sanctions On 06/15/98 At 1:30 Pm In Room 212
                        Blank 28 Filed: 4/9/1998, Entered: 4/9/1998
                        Mailing, 0sc Dismissed/sanctions Order From 04/13/98 X-1 01:30 Pm For 06/15/98 X-1 01:30 Pm
                          Blank 27 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/8/1998
                          Order To Show Cause-hrg On: April 13, 1998 @ 1:30 Pm
                            Blank 26 Filed: 1/8/1998, Entered: 1/8/1998
                            Mailing, Plan I, Osc From 01/05/98 X-1 01:30 Pm For 04/13/98 X-1 01:30 Pm
                              Blank 25 Filed: 1/5/1998, Entered: 1/5/1998
                              Plan I, Order To Show Cause: Hearing Set For Apr-13-1998 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 212
                                Blank 24 Filed: 11/24/1997, Entered: 11/24/1997
                                Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Jan-05-1998 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 212
                                  Blank 23 Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: 11/14/1997
                                  Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal/sanctions-1/5/98 @ 1:30 Pm
                                    Blank 22 Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: 11/14/1997
                                    Enclosed Documents For Filing: 11/07/97 Cover Letter, Brantj. Bordsen, Esq; Notice Of Commencement Of Case
                                      Blank 21 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/13/1997
                                      Mailing, 0sc Dismissed/sanctions Order From 11/24/97 Ptr1 01:30 Pm For 01/05/98 X-1 01:30 Pm
                                        Blank 20 Filed: 11/5/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997
                                        Declaration Of Non-service
                                          Blank 19 Filed: 11/5/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997
                                          >> Ross Iii
                                            Blank 18 Filed: 11/5/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997
                                            Req To Enter Default-entered As To: John David >>
                                              Blank 17 Filed: 11/5/1997, Entered: 11/5/1997
                                              Declaration Confirming Service
                                                Blank 16 Filed: 11/4/1997, Entered: 11/4/1997
                                                Status And Setting Conference Statement By American Home Assurance Co
                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 10/31/1997, Entered: 10/31/1997
                                                  Summons Filed
                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 10/17/1997, Entered: 10/17/1997
                                                    Osc Dismissed/sanctions Hearing Set For Nov-24-1997 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 314
                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 10/8/1997, Entered: 10/8/1997
                                                      Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal/sanctions - Hearing On: Nov. 24, 1997 - 1:30 Pm
                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 10/7/1997, Entered: 10/7/1997
                                                        Mailing (ca070) From 10/17/97 Ptr1 08:30 Am For 11/24/97 Ptr1 01:30 Pm
                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 9/22/1997, Entered: 9/22/1997
                                                          (4) Proof Of Service
                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: 9/2/1997
                                                            Proceedings Reported By Margaret Del Coto (x-1 Flageollet).
                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: 9/2/1997
                                                              Sanctions $200 Owed By Plaintiff's Counsel (x-1 Flageollet)
                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 9/2/1997, Entered: 9/2/1997
                                                                Order Re Sanctions: Microfilmed R/b F: 228-31
                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997
                                                                  Order To Show Cause For Sept 02, 1997 At 8:45am
                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997
                                                                    Mailing (ca074) From 09/02/97 Ptr1 08:45 Am For 09/02/97 Ptr1 08:45 Am
                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 7/28/1997, Entered: 7/28/1997
                                                                      Order To Show Cause - Proof Of Service Hearing Set For Sep-02-1997 At 08:45 Am In Dept 314
                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/15/1997
                                                                        Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/15/1997
                                                                          Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Oct-17-1997 At 08:30 Am In Dept 314
                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/15/1997
                                                                            Summons Issued
                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/15/1997
                                                                              Complaint For Damages For Reimbursement Of Workers' Compensation Benefits

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?