Morgan Vs Ccsf
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 97 990647
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Morgan, David, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schuman, Allan M. (& Associates)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schuman, Allan M. +1 415 563 2111
No Logo Morgan, Juliette, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schuman, Allan M. (& Associates)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schuman, Allan M. +1 415 563 2111
v.
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City and County of San Francisco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space City Attorney Of San Francisco +1 415 554 3924
No Logo Abc Parking Inc, Cross-Defendant
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by City and County of San Francisco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space City Attorney Of San Francisco +1 415 554 3924
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 20 Filed: 5/5/1998, Entered: 5/5/1998
Removed From Arbitration: Case Settled
    Blank 19 Filed: 5/1/1998, Entered: 5/1/1998
    Arb Proceedings Under 985759
      Blank 18 Filed: 4/3/1998, Entered: 4/3/1998
      Plan I Arbitration: Consol/w985759, Pltf Demands,, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Mar-30-1998 At 08:00 Am In Dept 212
        Blank 17 Filed: 3/31/1998, Entered: 3/31/1998
        Status Conference Order
          Blank 16 Filed: 3/30/1998, Entered: 3/30/1998
          Mailing, Plan I Arb Order From 04/03/98 X-1 08:45 Am For 03/30/98 X-1 08:00 Am
            Blank 15 Filed: 3/24/1998, Entered: 3/24/1998
            Status And Setting Conference Statement By Abc Parking
              Blank 14 Filed: 3/18/1998, Entered: 3/18/1998
              Status And Setting Conference Statement By David Morgan
                Blank 13 Filed: 2/27/1998, Entered: 2/27/1998
                Proof Of Service
                  Blank 12 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998
                  Cross-complaint Of Ccsf
                    Blank 11 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998
                    Answer Of Ccsf
                      Blank 10 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998
                      Deft Ccsf's Request For Jury Trial
                        Blank 9 Filed: 2/19/1998, Entered: 2/19/1998
                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Ccsf
                          Blank 8 Filed: 2/10/1998, Entered: 2/10/1998
                          Responseto Order To Show Cause; Request For Osc To Be Takenoff Calendar Etc
                            Blank 7 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998
                            Order To Show Cause-hrg On: Feb 24, 1998 At 9:00 Am
                              Blank 6 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998
                              Mailing (ca074) From 02/24/98 X-1 09:00 Am For 02/24/98 X-1 09:00 Am
                                Blank 5 Filed: 1/12/1998, Entered: 1/12/1998
                                Order To Show Cause - Proof Of Service Hearing Set For Feb-24-1998 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 10/29/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997
                                  Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 10/29/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997
                                    Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Apr-03-1998 At 08:45 Am In Dept 212
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 10/29/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997
                                      Summons Issued
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 10/29/1997, Entered: 10/29/1997
                                        Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 7 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?