Costelo, John v. Caltagirone, Maurizio Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 98 158479
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Costelo, John, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buchanan & Field

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Buchanan, Stephen J +1 650 301 9999
v.
No Logo Caltagirone, Maurizio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Caltagirone, Paolo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Defendant
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 13 Filed: 1/20/1999, Entered: 1/20/1999
Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice Each Party To Bear Their Respective Attorneys Fees & Costs
    Blank 12 Filed: 1/4/1999, Entered: 1/4/1999
    Notice Of Arbitraiton Hearing Set For 3/16/99
      Blank 11 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998
      Added To Arbitration Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For May-11-1999 At 02:30 Pm In Dept 212
        Blank 10 Filed: 12/21/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998
        Arbitrator Appointed, Ruane, Martin Thomas (029735), Arb-5 Mailed
          Blank 9 Filed: 11/13/1998, Entered: 11/13/1998
          Status Conference Calendar Of Nov-20-1998, Case Ordered To Arbitration On Jan-04-1999 Pursuant To Ccp 1141.11(d) Notice Sent By Court
            Blank 8 Filed: 10/20/1998, Entered: 10/20/1998
            Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Caltagirone, Maurizio Caltagirone, Paolo
              Blank 7 Filed: 10/16/1998, Entered: 10/16/1998
              Status Conference Statement Filed By Plaintiff Costelo, John
                Blank 6 Filed: 10/13/1998, Entered: 10/13/1998
                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Caltagirone, Maurizio Caltagirone, Paolo
                  Blank 5 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998
                  Proof Of Service Of Summons And Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Costelo, John Served Sep-08-1998, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Caltagirone, Paolo
                    Blank 4 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998
                    Proof Of Service Of Summons And Complaint,etc Filed By Plaintiff Costelo, John Served Sep-08-1998, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Caltagirone, Maurizio
                      Blank 3 Filed: 9/21/1998, Entered: 9/21/1998
                      Proof Of Service Of Summons And Acomplaint Filed By Plaintiff Costelo, John Served Sep-08-1998, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Caltagirone, Maurizio
                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998
                        Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/17/1998, Entered: 7/17/1998
                          Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Costelo, John As To Defendant Caltagirone, Maurizio Caltagirone, Paolo Does 1 To 20 Summons Issued Status Conference Scheduled For Nov-20-1998 Proof Of Service Due On Sep-15-1998 Status Conference Statement Due On Nov-02-1998

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 11 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?