Jackson, Bennie Clarence v. Nelson, Dayna Ann Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 98 162435
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jackson, Bennie Clarence, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael A Goldfeder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Goldfeder, Michael A +1 510 625 9200
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 60, Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Nelson, Claire, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Nelson, Dayna Ann, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo Nelson, Eugene, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
No Logo City and County of San Francisco, Third Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Plaza

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Agnost, Frank Peter +1 415 554 3873
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 1/3/2000, Entered: 1/3/2000
Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice Jury Trial Of Feb-22-2000 Off Calendar, Dismissal Filed
    Blank 24 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999
    Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial Jury Trial Set For Feb-22-2000 At 09:00 Am In Dept 206
      Blank 23 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999
      Notice Of Settlement Filed By Deft
        Blank 22 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999
        Trial De Novo Filed, Sent To Calendaring Section For Notice Of Time And Place Procesing
          Blank 21 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/19/1999
          Request For Trial De Novo Filed After Arbitration Filed By Defendant Nelson, Dayna Ann Nelson, Eugene Nelson, Claire
            Blank 20 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/27/1999
            Arbitrator's Fee Statement Sent To Accounting
              Blank 19 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/27/1999
              Award Filed By Arbitrator, Enter Judgment On Aug-27-1999
                Blank 18 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999
                Added To Arbitration Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Oct-26-1999 At 02:30 Pm In Dept 212
                  Blank 17 Filed: 5/26/1999, Entered: 5/26/1999
                  Arbitrator Appointed, Allen, Caroline G. (157377), Arb-5 Mailed
                    Blank 16 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/13/1999
                    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Plaintiff Jackson, Bennie Clarence
                      Blank 15 Filed: 4/22/1999, Entered: 4/22/1999
                      Osc Calendar Of May-05-1999, Case Ordered To Arbitration On Jun-21-1999 Pursuant To Ccp 1141.11(d) Notice Sent By Court
                        Blank 14 Filed: 4/13/1999, Entered: 4/13/1999
                        Status Conference Statement Filed By Plaintiff Jackson, Bennie Clarence
                          Blank 13 Filed: 4/8/1999, Entered: 4/8/1999
                          Answer To Complaint In Intervention Filed By Defendant Nelson, Dayna Ann Nelson, Eugene Nelson, Claire
                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/29/1999, Entered: 3/29/1999
                            Proof Of Service Of Complaint In Intervention Filed By Third Party City And County Of San Francisco Served Mar-29-1999, Mail On Defendant Nelson, Dayna Ann Nelson, Eugene Nelson, Claire
                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/19/1999, Entered: 3/19/1999
                              Status Conference Calendar Of Mar-26-1999, Order To Show Cause For Failure To Filr Pos Of Complaint In Intervention And Obtain Answer Or Default; Osc To Intervenor's Attorney Frank Agnost Hearing Set For May-05-1999 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 212 Notice Sent By Court
                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/16/1999, Entered: 3/16/1999
                                Proof Of Service By Mail On The Complaint In Intervention Filed By The Third Party City And County Of San Francisco
                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/15/1999, Entered: 3/15/1999
                                  Complaint In Intervention Filed By Third Party City And County Of San Francisco As To Plaintiff Jackson, Bennie Clarence
                                    Blank 8 Filed: 2/26/1999, Entered: 2/26/1999
                                    Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Nelson, Dayna Ann Nelson, Eugene Nelson, Claire
                                      Blank 7 Filed: 2/10/1999, Entered: 2/10/1999
                                      Status Conference Statement Filed By Plaintiff Jackson, Bennie Clarence
                                        Blank 6 Filed: 1/29/1999, Entered: 1/29/1999
                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Nelson, Dayna Ann Nelson, Eugene Nelson, Claire
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999
                                          Proof Of Service Of Summons And Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Jackson, Bennie Clarence Served Dec-28-1998, Personal Service On Defendant Nelson, Claire
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999
                                            Proof Of Service Of Summons & Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Jackson, Bennie Clarence Served Dec-28-1998, Personal Service On Defendant Nelson, Eugene
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/6/1999, Entered: 1/6/1999
                                              Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Jackson, Bennie Clarence Served Dec-29-1998, Personal Service On Defendant Nelson, Dayna Ann
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 11/24/1998
                                                Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 11/24/1998, Entered: 11/24/1998
                                                  Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Jackson, Bennie Clarence As To Defendant Nelson, Dayna Ann Nelson, Eugene Nelson, Claire Does 1 To 60, Inclusive Summons Issued Status Conference Scheduled For Mar-26-1999 Proof Of Service Due On Jan-25-1999 Status Conference Statement Due On Mar-08-1999

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?