Weston Vs Robert Dollar Building Assoc.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 99 301167
Superior Court Judge Ralph J. Flageollet, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Weston, Theodore W Jr, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stelling, Otto C Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stelling, Otto C Jr +1 415 989 5400
v.
No Logo Guardsmark, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Low, Ball & Lynch +1 415 981 6630
No Logo Northwest Asset Management Co, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hirshik, David - Law Offices Of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hirshik, David - Of +1 510 932 0120
No Logo Northwest Asset Management Co.,inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hirshik, David - Law Offices Of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hirshik, David - Of +1 510 932 0120
No Logo Robert Dollar Building Associates Ltd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caven Cleaveland Murray & Payne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caven Cleaveland Murray & Payne +1 707 576 7180
No Logo Guardsmark, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Low, Ball & Lynch +1 415 981 6630
No Logo Northwest Asset Management Co Inc, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Robert Dollar Building Associates Ltd, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Caven Cleaveland Murray & Payne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Caven Cleaveland Murray & Payne +1 707 576 7180
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (7) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 61 Filed: 6/6/2000, Entered: 6/6/2000
Req For Dism, W/ Prej, X-complt Of Northwest Asset Mangmnt Co
    Blank 60 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000
    Req For Dism, W/prej, Entire Action
      Blank 59 Filed: 4/20/2000, Entered: 4/20/2000
      Arbitrator Discharged: Case Settled
        Blank 58 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000
        Notice Of Settlement
          Blank 57 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000
          Order Continuing Arbitration Osc (mailing) From 02/22/00 X-1 03:30 Pm For 04/20/00 X-1 01:30 Pm
            Blank 56 Filed: 2/22/2000, Entered: 2/22/2000
            Arb Osc Hearing Set For Apr-20-2000 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 212
              Blank 55 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999
              > Robert Dollar Building Associates Ltd
                Blank 54 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/17/1999
                Answer Of X-deft Guardsmark Inc To X-complt Of >
                  Blank 53 Filed: 11/16/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999
                  > To Amended X-complt
                    Blank 52 Filed: 11/16/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999
                    Answer Of Northwest Asset Management Co Inc >
                      Blank 51 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999
                      Order To Show Cause Re Arbitration (mailing) From 02/22/00 X-1 03:30 Pm For 02/22/00 X-1 03:30 Pm
                        Blank 50 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999
                        Order To Arbitration, No Disposition
                          Blank 49 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999
                          Mailing: Assignment Of Arbitrator On 11/10/99
                            Blank 48 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999
                            Arbitration Due To End
                              Blank 47 Filed: 11/10/1999, Entered: 11/10/1999
                              Arbitrator Selection Due
                                Blank 46 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999
                                Deft's Ntc Of Mo To Compel Answers, Calendar Motion: Compel Answers, Calendar Motion: Compel Production Of Documents, Calendar Motion: Sanctions Hearing Set For Nov-15-1999 At 10:30 Am In Dept 612
                                  Blank 45 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999
                                  Memo Of P&a In Supp Of Mo To Compel Answers
                                    Blank 44 Filed: 10/29/1999, Entered: 10/29/1999
                                    Declaration Of Patricia Walsh
                                      Blank 43 Filed: 10/27/1999, Entered: 10/27/1999
                                      Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 10/27/99
                                        Blank 42 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999
                                        >dollar Building Assocs Ltd Against Guardsmark Inc Only
                                          Blank 41 Filed: 10/26/1999, Entered: 10/26/1999
                                          Req For Dism, W/o Prej, X-complt Of Robert>
                                            Blank 40 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999
                                            > Associates, Ltd To X-complt
                                              Blank 39 Filed: 10/25/1999, Entered: 10/25/1999
                                              Answer Of X-deft, Robert Dollar Building >
                                                Blank 38 Filed: 10/21/1999, Entered: 10/21/1999
                                                Answer Of Guardsmark Inc To X-complt
                                                  Blank 37 Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: 10/19/1999
                                                  Amendment To Substitute True Name(s) For Fictitious Name(s)(amendment To Cross-complaint)
                                                    Blank 36 Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: 10/19/1999
                                                    $75. Pd By: Robert Dollar Building Assoc. Ltd
                                                      Blank 35 Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: 10/19/1999
                                                      Summons Issued On Amended Cross-complaint
                                                        Blank 34 Filed: 10/19/1999, Entered: 10/19/1999
                                                        Amended X-complt Of Robert Dollar Building Assoc.
                                                          Blank 33 Filed: 9/23/1999, Entered: 9/23/1999
                                                          Amendment To X-complt
                                                            Blank 32 Filed: 9/15/1999, Entered: 9/15/1999
                                                            Mailing: Panel Of Arbitrators On 09/15/99
                                                              Blank 31 Filed: 8/27/1999, Entered: 8/27/1999
                                                              Plan I Arbitration: Deft Demands, Calendar Motion: Arbitration Hearing Hearing Set For Sep-13-1999 At 08:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                Blank 30 Filed: 8/18/1999, Entered: 8/18/1999
                                                                Order To Arbitration (mailing) From 08/27/99 X-1 09:00 Am For 09/13/99 X-1 08:00 Am
                                                                  Blank 29 Filed: 8/2/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999
                                                                  Status And Setting Conference Statement By Robert Dollar Building Associates Ltd
                                                                    Blank 28 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 7/30/1999
                                                                    Status And Setting Conference Statement By Northwest Asset Management Co Inc
                                                                      Blank 27 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 7/29/1999
                                                                      Status And Setting Conference Statement By Deft Guardsmark Inc
                                                                        Blank 26 Filed: 7/28/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999
                                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Pltf
                                                                          Blank 25 Filed: 7/16/1999, Entered: 7/16/1999
                                                                          Status Conference Continued: (ptr1) Hearing Set For Aug-27-1999 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                            Blank 24 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999
                                                                            $75. Pd By: Robert Dollar Building Associates Ltd
                                                                              Blank 23 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999
                                                                              Summons Issued
                                                                                Blank 22 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999
                                                                                Cross-complaint Of Robert Dollar Building Associates Ltd
                                                                                  Blank 21 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999
                                                                                  $193. Pd By: Robert Dollar Building Associates Ltd
                                                                                    Blank 20 Filed: 7/13/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999
                                                                                    Answer Of Robert Dollar Building Associates Ltd To Complt
                                                                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999
                                                                                      Order Continuing Status Conference (mailing) From 07/16/99 X-1 09:00 Am For 08/27/99 X-1 09:00 Am
                                                                                        Blank 18 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999
                                                                                        Summons Issued On X-complt
                                                                                          Blank 17 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999
                                                                                          $75 . Pd By: Northwest Asset Management Co Inc
                                                                                            Blank 16 Filed: 6/21/1999, Entered: 6/21/1999
                                                                                            Cross-complt Of Northwest Asset Management Co Inc
                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 6/18/1999, Entered: 6/18/1999
                                                                                              Status And Setting Conference Statement By Northwest Asset Mgmt Co Inc
                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: 6/17/1999
                                                                                                Status And Setting Conference Statement By Pltf
                                                                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 6/15/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999
                                                                                                  Status And Setting Conference Statement By Deft Guardsmark Inc
                                                                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999
                                                                                                    Proof Of Service
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 6/7/1999, Entered: 6/7/1999
                                                                                                      Declaration Confirming Service
                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/25/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999
                                                                                                        $193. Pd By: Northwest Asset Management Co Inc
                                                                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 5/25/1999, Entered: 5/25/1999
                                                                                                          Answer Of Northwest Asset Management Co Inc To Complt
                                                                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999
                                                                                                            $193. Pd By: Guardsmark Inc
                                                                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/19/1999
                                                                                                              Answer Of Guardsmark Inc
                                                                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 5/11/1999, Entered: 5/11/1999
                                                                                                                Order To Show Cause Re Proof Of Service (mailing) From 06/08/99 X-1 09:00 Am For 06/08/99 X-1 09:00 Am
                                                                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 5/10/1999, Entered: 5/10/1999
                                                                                                                  Order To Show Cause - Proof Of Service Hearing Set For Jun-08-1999 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999
                                                                                                                    Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999
                                                                                                                      Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Jul-16-1999 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999
                                                                                                                        Summons Issued
                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/11/1999, Entered: 2/11/1999
                                                                                                                          Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 25 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?