Valon Vs Huang
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 99 308449
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Valon, Guillermo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by O'brien, Philip (law Offices Of)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'brien, Philip +1 415 865 2099
v.
No Logo Central Sky International Group Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neville, Dave

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dave Neville +1 415 487 2601
No Logo Huang, Linda, Defendant
No Logo Huang, Victor, Defendant
Cause of Action Contract/warranty
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 54 Filed: 12/29/2000, Entered: 12/29/2000
$150 Jury Fee Rfnd Pd To Payer Philip Obrien >>> Ck #1600-01512771 # 08590
    Blank 53 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000
    > Linda And Victor Huang
      Blank 52 Filed: 11/6/2000, Entered: 11/6/2000
      Req For Dism, W/ Prej, Complt Only As To Deft, >
        Blank 51 Filed: 10/24/2000, Entered: 10/24/2000
        Off-calendar-settled (504/ptr1)
          Blank 50 Filed: 10/19/2000, Entered: 10/19/2000
          C/c For Settlement Conference; Case Settles
            Blank 49 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000
            $150 Jury Fee Philip Obrien # 08590
              Blank 48 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000
              Ntc Of Pltfs' Demand For Jury Trial & Ntc Of Deposit Of Jury Fees
                Blank 47 Filed: 10/10/2000, Entered: 10/10/2000
                Notice Of Entry Of Order
                  Blank 46 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000
                  Proceedings Reported By Joe Vickstein
                    Blank 45 Filed: 10/6/2000, Entered: 10/6/2000
                    Mtn For Sj--denied.order Signed In Open Court.(301)
                      Blank 44 Filed: 9/29/2000, Entered: 9/29/2000
                      Deft's Reply To Pltf's Opposition To Mtn For Summary Jdgmnt
                        Blank 43 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000
                        Proceedings Reported By Helen Sorep Matley
                          Blank 42 Filed: 9/26/2000, Entered: 9/26/2000
                          Mo Cal(206): Def Mo To Cont 11/6/00 Trl Date--denied
                            Blank 41 Filed: 9/25/2000, Entered: 9/25/2000
                            Proof Of Service
                              Blank 40 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000
                              Declaration Of Philip O'brien In Opposition To Mtn Of Defts For Summary Judgment
                                Blank 39 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000
                                Request For Judicial Ntc In Support Of Pltfs' Opposition To Mtn Of Defts For Summary Judgment
                                  Blank 38 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000
                                  Declaration Of Christine Ericksen In Opposition To Mtn Of Defts For Summary Judgment
                                    Blank 37 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000
                                    Memo Of Pts & Authrties In Support Of Pltfs' Opposition To Mtn Of Defts For Summary Judgment
                                      Blank 36 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000
                                      Pltfs' Separate Statement Of Facts In Opposition To Mtn Of Defts For Summary Judgment
                                        Blank 35 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000
                                        Declaration Of Philip O'brien In Oppostn To Mtn Of Defts Victor & Linda Huang For Summary Judgment
                                          Blank 34 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000
                                          Declaration Of Guillermo Valon In Support Of Pltfs' Oppostn To Mtn For Summary Judgment
                                            Blank 33 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000
                                            Memo Of P&a In Oppos To Deft's Mtn To Continue Trial Date
                                              Blank 32 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: 9/22/2000
                                              Declaration Of Philip O'brien In Oppos To Mtn For Continuance
                                                Blank 31 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000
                                                Ntc Of Mtn For Continuance Of A Trial, Calendar Motion: Continuance Of Trial Date Hearing Set For Sep-26-2000 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: 9/21/2000
                                                  Declaration Of George A Otstott In Support Of Mtn To Continue Trial
                                                    Blank 29 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000
                                                    Order Shortening Time Re: Motion
                                                      Blank 28 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000
                                                      Defts' Ex Parte Appl For An Ost
                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 9/20/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000
                                                        Motion To Cont Td Of 11/6/00, Calendar Motion: Continuance Of Trial Date, Calendar Motion: Continuance Of Trial Date Hearing Set For Sep-26-2000 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000
                                                          Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Victor & Linda Huangs' Mtn For Summary Judgment
                                                            Blank 25 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000
                                                            $100. Pd By: Victor Huang & Linda Huang
                                                              Blank 24 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000
                                                              Ntc Of Mtn By Defts Victor Huang & Linda Huang For Summary Judgment, Calendar Motion: Compel Answers Hearing Set For Oct-06-2000 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                Blank 23 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000
                                                                Memo Of Pts & Authrties In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment By Victor & Linda Huang
                                                                  Blank 22 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000
                                                                  Declaration Of Valentino Ristevski In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment By Victor & Linda Huang
                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000
                                                                    Declaration Of George A Ostot In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgment By Victor & Linda Huang
                                                                      Blank 20 Filed: 9/8/2000, Entered: 9/8/2000
                                                                      Request For Judicial Ntc In Support Of Victor & Linda Huang's Summary Judgment
                                                                        Blank 19 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000
                                                                        Order Rescheduling Settlement Conference (mailing) From 10/19/00 R504 03:30 Pm For 10/19/00 R504 03:30 Pm
                                                                          Blank 18 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000
                                                                          Settlement Conference Continued, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Oct-19-2000 At 03:30 Pm In Dept 504
                                                                            Blank 17 Filed: 7/12/2000, Entered: 7/12/2000
                                                                            Dropped From S/c Calendar (ptr1),
                                                                              Blank 16 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000
                                                                              Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:
                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 5/12/2000, Entered: 5/12/2000
                                                                                Plan I Trial,pltf Demands
                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/5/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000
                                                                                  Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial (mailing) From 05/12/00 X-1 09:00 Am For 10/19/00 Sc14 08:45 Am
                                                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 5/2/2000, Entered: 5/2/2000
                                                                                    Status And Setting Conference Statement By Defts
                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 4/24/2000, Entered: 4/24/2000
                                                                                      Status And Setting Conference Statement By Central Sky Int'l Gp Inc
                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 4/21/2000, Entered: 4/21/2000
                                                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Pltf
                                                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000
                                                                                          $193. Pd By: Central Sky International Group Inc
                                                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 4/19/2000, Entered: 4/19/2000
                                                                                            Answer Of Central Sky International Group Inc To Complt
                                                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000
                                                                                              Declaration Confirming Service
                                                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 3/8/2000, Entered: 3/8/2000
                                                                                                Return Of Proof Of Service
                                                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000
                                                                                                  $386. Pd By: Victor Huang & Linda Huang
                                                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 2/29/2000, Entered: 2/29/2000
                                                                                                    Answer Of Victor Huang & Linda Huang To Complt
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 4 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/10/1999
                                                                                                      Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/10/1999
                                                                                                        Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For May-12-2000 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/10/1999
                                                                                                          Summons Issued
                                                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 12/10/1999, Entered: 12/10/1999
                                                                                                            Complaint For Breach Of Contract

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?