Lace Vs Grossbard
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 00 316637
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lace, Peter, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Scaparotti, Linda M (law Offices Of-sf)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Linda M +1 415 434 9600
v.
No Logo Bourzat, Francoise, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'leary & Lecky LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'leary & Lecky Llp +1 415 247 7900
No Logo Grossbard, Aharon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'leary & Lecky LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space O'leary & Lecky Llp +1 415 247 7900
Cause of Action Malpractice - Medical/dental
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 24 Filed: 10/15/2001, Entered: 10/15/2001
Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
    Blank 23 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001
    Off Calendar Settled (206/ptr1)
      Blank 22 Filed: 8/15/2001, Entered: 8/15/2001
      Ptr1, Osc 08-15-01 @ 10:00 Am, Off Calendar: Mediated
        Blank 21 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001
        Order To Show Cause Re Mediation (mailing) From 07/18/01 X-1 10:00 Am For 08/15/01 X-1 10:00 Am
          Blank 20 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001
          Order To Show Cause - Mediation Hearing Set For Aug-15-2001 At 10:00 Am In Dept 212
            Blank 19 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001
            Ntc Of Change Of Firm Name & Address, From Phillips Gee & O'leary To Pacific West Law Group, For Defts
              Blank 18 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001
              Order To Show Cause - Mediation Hearing Set For Jul-18-2001 At 10:00 Am In Dept 212
                Blank 17 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001
                Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Hearing Set For Sep-24-2001 At 09:00 Am In Dept 602
                  Blank 16 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001
                  Plan I Trial, Pltf Demands,
                    Blank 15 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001
                    Order To Show Cause Re Mediation (mailing) From 07/18/01 X-1 10:00 Am For 07/18/01 X-1 10:00 Am
                      Blank 14 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001
                      Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial (mailing) From 04/20/01 X-1 09:00 Am For 09/24/01 Scd7 09:00 Am
                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001
                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Pltf(s) Peter Lace
                          Blank 12 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001
                          Status And Setting Conference Statement By Deft(s) Aharon Grossbard And Francoise Bourzat
                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000
                            $200. Pd By: Francoise Bourzat
                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000
                              Answer Of Francoise Bourzat To Complaint
                                Blank 9 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000
                                $200. Pd By: Aharon Grossbard, Ph.d.
                                  Blank 8 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/21/2000
                                  Answer Of Aharon Grossbard, Ph.d. To Complaint
                                    Blank 7 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000
                                    Proof Of Service (summons)
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000
                                      Proof Of Service (summons)
                                        Blank 5 Filed: 11/30/2000, Entered: 11/30/2000
                                        Summons Filed
                                          Blank 4 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000
                                          Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                            Blank 3 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000
                                            Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Apr-20-2001 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                              Blank 2 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000
                                              Summons Issued
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 11/13/2000, Entered: 11/13/2000
                                                Complaint For Professional Negligence

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 2,648 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?