Gardner Vs Asbestos Defendants(bhc)*
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 01 318416
Superior Court Judge Ronald E. Quidachay, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Gardner, Edward, Plaintiff

Represented by Brayton Purcell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brayton Purcell +1 415 898 1555
v.
No Logo A.p. Green Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ACandS, Inc., Defendant

Represented by St Peter Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space St Peter Law Group +1 415 955 0700
Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Spansion Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd Investments, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd (u.s.) Holdings, Inc.

Represented by Walsworth, Franklin & Bevins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walsworth, Franklin & Bevins +1 415 781 7072
No Logo Alexander & Baldwin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alta Building Materials Company, Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Alza Corporation, Defendant

Represented by PREUSS WALKER & SHANAGHER, LLP

No Logo American President Lines, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo American Standard, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Apl Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Armour And Company, Defendant

Represented by Charter Miller Davis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hinrichsen, Jeffrey J.a. +1 916 448 9000
No Logo Asbestos Claims Management Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Asbestos Corporation Limited, Defendant
No Logo Asbestos Defendants (bhc), Defendant
No Logo Astra Flooring Company, Defendant

Represented by Burke, Williams & Sorenson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward R Hugo +1 415 388 9762
No Logo Atlas Turner Inc., Defendant
No Logo B T Mancini Company Inc, Defendant

Represented by PH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Miller, Morton, Caillat & Nevis +1 408 292 1765
No Logo B.t. Mancini Co., Inc., Defendant
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Oneida Ltd.
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Nb Holdings Corp

Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sonja E. Blomquist +1 415 981 6630 +1 415 982 1634 sblomquist@lowball.com
No Logo Bank Of America Nt & Sa, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Corporation (de), Defendant
No Logo Bell Asbestos Mines, Ltd., Defendant
Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University, Defendant
Officially listed as "Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Jr.univ"

Represented by Barg Coffin Lewis & Trapp, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jon G Lycett +1 415 228 5400
No Logo Borden Chemical, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Spurlock Industries Inc
No Logo Borden Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Spurlock Industries Inc

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Duane Morris LLP +1 973 424 2000
No Logo Certain-teed Corporation, Defendant

Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fong, Camille Kamee +1 213 576 8000
Colgate-Palmolive Company Colgate-Palmolive Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Colgate-palmolive Co"

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Congoleum Corporation,, Defendant

Represented by Glaspy & Glaspy, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glaspy & Glaspy +1 925 947 1300
No Logo Consolidated Insulation Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Continental Can Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Continental Can Co., Inc."

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Continental Can Company Usa, Defendant
No Logo Craig Shipbuilding Company, Defendant
No Logo Crown, Cork And Seal Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dana Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-800, Defendant
No Logo Douglas Insulation Co, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dowman Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Familian Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP

No Logo Federated Department Stores, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Fireman's Fund Insurance Company, Defendant

Represented by Carroll, Burdick & McDonough LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Craig Nelson +1 415 617 2400 +1 415 617 2409 evan.nelson@tuckerellis.com
No Logo Flint & Walling Industries, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Bradley, Curley, Asiano, Barrabee, Abel & Kowalski, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Curley Asiano Barrabee & Crawford +1 415 442 4888
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vastera, Inc.

Represented by Filice Brown Eassa & McLeod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Filice Brown Eassa & Mcleod Llp +1 510 444 3131

Represented by Thelen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ostertag, James J +1 415 392 6320
No Logo Fraser Edwards Co, Defendant

Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sonja E. Blomquist +1 415 981 6630 +1 415 982 1634 sblomquist@lowball.com
Garlock, Inc. Garlock, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gatke Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Bennett Samuelsen Reynolds & Allard PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bennett Samuelsen Reynolds & Allard +1 510 444 7688
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Officer/Director, Oec Medical Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Genpact Ltd.
Officer/Director, Gei, Inc.
Officer/Director, Sportstech, Inc.
Officer/Director, Superior Essex Inc.
Officer/Director, Genworth Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Greenwater Holdings Ltd.
Officer/Director, Genicom Corp
Officer/Director, Imatron Inc.
Officer/Director, Paine Webber Group Inc
Officer/Director, Regal Beloit Corp
Officer/Director, Lockheed Martin Corp
Officer/Director, Lunar Corp
Officer/Director, Mecon Inc
Officer/Director, Positron Corp
Officer/Director, GE India Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, Heller Financial, Inc.
Officer/Director, Regency Energy Partners LP
Officer/Director, Regency LP Acquirer, L.P.
Officer/Director, Aircraft Services CORP
Officer/Director, Townsquare Media, LLC
Officer/Director, Antares Capital Corp
Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc. Officer/Director, Ge Capital Us Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bear Newco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gopivotal, Inc.
Officer/Director, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Officer/Director, Greenwich Air Services Inc
Officer/Director, Marquette Electronics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xoom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Paxson Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Plug Power, Inc.
Officer/Director, Harmon Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Thermoview Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Hpsc, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ionics, Inc.
Officer/Director, Idx Systems Corp
Officer/Director, iVillage, Inc.
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Georgia-pacific Corp."
No Logo H.b. Fuller Company, Defendant

Represented by Selman Breitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Selman Breitman Llp +1 310 445 0800
No Logo Hanson Permanente Cement, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

Hewlett-Packard Company Hewlett-Packard Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hewlett Packard Co."
Officer/Director, Navisite, Inc.
Officer/Director, E-cruiter.com Inc.
Officer/Director, Novadigm, Inc.
No Logo Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Defendant

Represented by Vasquez & Estrada

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vasquez & Estrada +1 415 453 0555
No Logo Hopeman Brothers, Defendant
No Logo I. Magnin Inc, Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Irex Corporation, Defendant
No Logo JC Penney Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo J.t. Thorpe & Son Inc, Defendant
No Logo Jc Penny Co Inc, Defendant

Represented by Burke Williams & Sorensen LLP

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Kaiser Aluminum And Chemical Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Thelen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thelen Reid & Priest Llp +1 415 371 1200
No Logo Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo L.h. Burcher Company, Defendant
No Logo Lockheed Shipbuilding Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea Ellen Neuman +1 949 451 3937 +1 949 475 4653 aneuman@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Macarthur Company, Defendant
No Logo Matson Navigation Company, Defendant
No Logo Memorex Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Colombatto, Klimenko & Rosse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colombatto, Klimenko & Rosse +1 415 391 6182

Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oberg, Lisa L +1 415 267 4000
Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Defendant
National Semiconductor (Maine), Inc. National Semiconductor (Maine), Inc., Defendant
No Logo National Steel And Shipbuilding Company (nassco), Defendant

Represented by Brydon Hugo and Parker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Rohan Brydon +1 415 248 0360

Represented by Burke, Williams & Sorenson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward R Hugo +1 415 388 9762
No Logo North American Refractories Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "North American Refractories Co."

Represented by Stevens, Drummond & Gifford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Allan Gifford +1 510 944 5550
No Logo Oakfabco Inc, Defendant

Represented by Filice Brown Eassa & McLeod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Filice Brown Eassa & Mcleod Llp +1 510 444 3131
PG&E Corporation PG&E Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Pacific Gas & Electric Company"
No Logo Parker-hannifin Coropration, Defendant
Officially listed as "Parker-hannifin Corporation"
No Logo Plant Insulation Company, Defendant

Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mcneil, Constance +1 415 362 2580
No Logo Pneumo Abex Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Quigley Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Quintec Industries, Inc. And/or Western Fibrous Glass Products Company (westglas) And/or Western Fiberglas Supply Company, Defendant
No Logo Rapid American Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Rich-tex, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sargent Controls & Aerospace, Defendant

Represented by Cunningham, James P. (601)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cunningham, James P. +1 415 781 7605
No Logo Scott Co Of California, Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Sealand Shipping, Defendant
No Logo Sequoia Ventures Inc, Defendant

Represented by Hassard Bonnington LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Mitchell Hamblett +1 415 288 9800 rmh@hassard.com

Represented by Thelen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thelen Reid & Priest Llp +1 415 371 1200
No Logo Sun Ship, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Syntex (USA), Inc., Defendant

Represented by Gray Cary Ames & Frye (sd - B Street)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gray Cary Ames & Frye +1 619 699 2749
The Dow Chemical Company The Dow Chemical Company, Defendant
No Logo The Flintkote Company, Defendant
No Logo The Oceanic Steamship Company, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Dee Engineering Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Thomas Dee Engineering Company"

Represented by Walsworth, Franklin & Bevins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walsworth, Franklin & Bevins +1 415 781 7072
No Logo Thorpe Insulation Company, Defendant
No Logo Todd Shipyards Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Davidovitz & Yaron

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Dimitri Yaron, Jr. +1 415 658 2929 +1 415 658 2930 gyaron@yaronlaw.com
No Logo Triple A Machine Shop Inc., Defendant
UC Berkeley UC Berkeley, Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation Union Carbide Corporation, Defendant

Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Fong, Camille Kamee +1 213 576 8000
No Logo Isolatek International, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Mineral Products Company"

Represented by Schaffer & Lax

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schaffer & Lax +1 323 934 4300
W. R. Grace & Company W. R. Grace & Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "W.r. Grace & Co.--conn."
No Logo Waldron, Duffy, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Western Asbestos Company, Defendant
No Logo Western Building Material Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Western Building Materials Co, Defendant

Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gordon & Rees Llp +1 415 986 5900
No Logo Western Macarthur Company, Defendant
Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. Advanced Micro Devices, Inc., Cross-Complainant
Officer/Director, Spansion Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd Investments, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amd (u.s.) Holdings, Inc.

Represented by Walsworth, Franklin & Bevins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walsworth, Franklin & Bevins +1 415 781 7072
No Logo Thomas Dee Engineering Company Inc., Cross-Complainant
Officially listed as "Thomas Dee Engineering Co"

Represented by Walsworth, Franklin & Bevins

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Walsworth, Franklin & Bevins +1 415 781 7072
Cause of Action Asbestos
  Entries (329) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (68) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Order
Order Directing Clerk To Enter Dismissals (filed In Case No. Cgc-82-828684) In The Cases Attached In Exhibit A
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Entire Action Of All Partie
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice [see Attached Exhibit A] (transaction Id # 29131944)
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 327 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008 Court Filing
      Removed From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Oct-16-2008 - Off Calendar. Judge: A. James Robertson, Ii; Clerk: Ernalyn Bura; Reporter: Susan Lee Csr# 4280 (d206)
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 326 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: 6/26/2008
        Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Jun-26-2008 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Oct-16-2008 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206.
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 325 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
          Added To Calendar For Asbesto Status And Setting Conference Hearing Set For Jun-26-2008 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 206
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Notice Of Entry Of Order Setting Cases For Special June 26, 2008 Trial
            Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Setting Cases For Special June 26, 2008 Trial Setting Conference (transaction Id # 17766991) Filed By Plaintiff Gardner, Edward
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/16/2007 Defendant Plant Insulation Companys Answer To Plaintiffs Personal Inju
              Answer (transaction Id # 14488680) Filed By Defendant Plant Insulation Company
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 322 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006
                Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Quintec Industries, Inc. And/or Western Fibrous Glass Products Company (westglas) And/or Western Fiberglas Supply Company
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 321 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006
                  Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Sun Ship Inc.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 320 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005
                    Jury Fees Of 150.00 For Transaction W1603924j038 Transferred Into Jplus
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 319 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005
                      Jury Fees Of 150.00 For Transaction W2104510j010 Transferred Into Jplus
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 318 Filed: 12/29/2005, Entered: 12/29/2005
                        Jury Fees Of 150.00 For Transaction W1803924j040 Transferred Into Jplus
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 317 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: 11/1/2005
                          Dismissal With Prejudice
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 316 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant J.c. Penney Company, Inc.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 315 Filed: 7/18/2005, Entered: 7/18/2005 Court Filing
                              Removed From Asbestos Jury Trial Calendar On Jul-18-2005 In Dept. 604 - Matter Has Resolved, Per Counsel For Plaintiffs. Judge: D. Ballati; Clerk: R. Goulding; Reporter: S. Lee, Csr # 4280.
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 314 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/11/2005 Court Filing
                                Asbestos Jury Trial Set For Jul-11-2005 Continued To Jul-18-2005 At 9:00 Am In 604. This Is Trailing The Brayton-thorpe Group, Sub-group 4 (a). The Lead Case Is 310074, Velasco V Thorpe. This Shall Remain The Lead Case For All Remaining Cases In The Brayton-thorpe Group, Until Assignment Of Sub-group 4 (b). See Lead Case For All Minutes And Entries. Judge: D. Ballati; Clerk: R. Goulding; Reporter: S. Lee, Csr # 4280
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 313 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Court Filing
                                  Asbestos Jury Trial Set For Jun-29-2005 Continued To Jul-11-2005 At 9:00 Am In 604 For Voir Dire/jury Selection. The Lead Case Is 310074 Lavern Velasco V Asbestos Defendants (thorpe Insulation). See Lead Case For All Minutes And Entries. Judge: D. Ballati; Clerk: R. Goulding; Reporter: S. Lee, Csr # 4280.
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 312 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Court Filing
                                    Asbestos Jury Trial Set For Jun-28-2005 Continued To Jun-29-2005 At 10:00 Am In 604 For Continued Jury Hardship. The Lead Case Is 310074 Lavern Velasco V Asbestos Defendants (thorpe Insulation). See Lead Case For All Minutes And Entries. Judge: D. Ballati; Clerk: R. Goulding; Reporter: S. Lee, Csr # 4280.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 311 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005
                                      Added To Calendar For Asbestos Jury Trial Hearing Set For Jun-28-2005 At 09:00 Am In Dept 604
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 310 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005
                                        Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Garlock Inc.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 309 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004
                                          Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Douglas Insulation Co, Inc.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 308 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004
                                            Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Pacific Gas & Electric Company
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 307 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004
                                              Removed From Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Jul-12-2004 - Brayton Group 259 - Per Plaintiff Counsel, This Matter Has Resolved. (206)
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 306 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004
                                                Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant General Electric Company
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 305 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 6/30/2004 Court Filing
                                                  Asbestos Settlement Conference Calendar Of Jun-30-2004 Assigned To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos Calendar On Jul-12-2004 At 11:15 Am In Dept. 206 In Brayton Group 258, Lead Case Is #311843, Green Vs. Asbestos Defts, All Settlement Discussions Exhausted, Judge Alvarado, Clerk Greg Chuck, Not Reported (305)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 304 Filed: 6/16/2004, Entered: 6/16/2004 Court Filing
                                                    Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Jun-16-2004 Continued To Jun-30-2004 At 3:00 Pm In 305, Asbestos Sett Conf Held In Brayton Group 258, Lead Case Is #311843 Green V. Asbestos Defts., Cases Did Not Settle, Judge Alvarado, Clerk Greg Chuck, Not Reported (305)
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 303 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                      Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Jun-09-2004 Continued To Jun-16-2004 At 3:00 Pm In 305, Asbestos Sett Conf Held In Brayton Group 258, Lead Case Is #311843, Green Vs. Asbestos Defts, Cases Did Not Settle, Judge Alvarado, Clerk Greg Chuck, Not Reported (305)
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 302 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004
                                                        Hon. Robert Dondero; Clerks: D. Boffi/v. Mu Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce (206) Removed From Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Jun-07-2004 - Asbestos Settlement Conference Set In Dept. 305 For 6/9/04 At 1:30 P.m. Brayton Group 258 Lead Case #311843 Green V. Asb. Defts. Matter To Remain In Dept. 305 Until All Settlement Discussions Have Been Exhaused.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 301 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/7/2004
                                                          Hon. Robert Dondero; Clerks: D. Boffi/v. Mu Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce (206) Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Jun-09-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 305 From The 6/7/04 Trial Calendar. Brayton Group 258 Lead Case #311843 Green V. Asb. Defts. Matter To Remain In Dept. 305 Until All Settlement Discussions Have Been Exhaused.
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 300 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: 5/10/2004
                                                            Jury Fees, Tran # W2104510j010, Tag # 009005, Receipt Number 023724, Deposited By Plaintiff Gardner, Edward
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 299 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: 4/19/2004
                                                              Hon. Robert L. Dondero; Clerks: D.boffi/v.mu; Reporter: Jo Ann Bryce Csr #3321 (206) Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Apr-19-2004 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Jun-07-2004 At 11:15 Am In 206 By The Court.
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Blank 298 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                Judge Robert Dondero, Clerk: Dianne Boffi/vera Mu, Reporter: Joanne Brice. Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Apr-12-2004 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Apr-19-2004 At 11:15 Am In 206. Brayton Group 258-trailing Week Of 4/12/04 Tor Trial Court Assignment-not Reached. Case Is Restored To Calendar On 4/19/04 At 11:15am In Dept. 206 For Assignment.
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Blank 297 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
                                                                  Substitution Of Attorney: Oberg, Lisa L Substituted For Colombatto, Klimenko & Rosse As Attorney For Metalclad Insulation Corporation
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 296 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/5/2004 Court Filing
                                                                    Judge Dondero; Clerks: D/boffi/v. Mu; Reporter: J. Bryce, #3321 (206). (brayton Group 258, No Settlement Conference Scheduled. Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Apr-05-2004 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Apr-12-2004 At 11:15 Am In 206
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 295 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Court Filing
                                                                      Judge Donna Hitchens, Clerk: Dianne Boffi/audrey Huie, Reporter: Patricia Van Steenberge. Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Mar-22-2004 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Apr-05-2004 At 11:15 Am In 206; Settlement Conference (previously Set) On 3/24/04 @ 1:30pm In Dept. 606, Judge Conway.
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Blank 294 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004
                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 293 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Court Filing
                                                                          Judge Donna Hitchens, Clerk: Dianne Boffi, Reporter: Helen Sorep-matley. Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Mar-01-2004 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Mar-22-2004 At 11:15 Am In 206; Settlement Conference Set For 3/3/04 In Dept. 606, Judge Conway, At 1:30pm.
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 292 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
                                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Blank 291 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Court Filing
                                                                              Judge Donna Hitchens, Clerks: Rani Edwards And Dianne Boffi, Reporter: Patricia Van Steenberge. Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Feb-09-2004 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Mar-01-2004 At 11:15 Am In 206; Settlement Conference Set For Feb 18, 2004, At 1:30pm In Dept. 606, Judge Conway.
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Blank 290 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004
                                                                                Opposition Consolidation Of Cases For Trial, Pos Filed By Deft Nassco
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 289 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004
                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Judgment
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Blank 288 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                    Judge Donna Hitchens, Clerk Rani Edwards, Reporter Patty Van Steenberg. Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Jan-26-2004 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Feb-09-2004 At 11:15 Am In 206; Settlement Conference In Dept. 606/judge Conway @ 1:30 Pm
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Blank 287 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: 1/22/2004
                                                                                      Suggestion Of Bankruptcy Filed By Defendant Congoleum Corporation
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Blank 286 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/20/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                        Judge Donna Hitchens, Clerk Rani Edwards, Reporter Patty Van Steenberg. Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Jan-20-2004 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Jan-26-2004 At 11:15 Am In 206
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Blank 285 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004
                                                                                          Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Gatke Corporation
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Blank 284 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                            Judge Donna Hitchens, Clerk Rani Edwards, Reporter Patty Van Steenberg. Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Jan-12-2004 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Jan-20-2004 At 11:15 Am In 206; Settlement Conference January 21, 2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 606/judge Conway
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Blank 283 Filed: 12/26/2003, Entered: 12/26/2003
                                                                                              Dismissal With Prejudice Each Party To Bear Its Own Costs As To Defendant Hopeman Brothers
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Blank 282 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003
                                                                                                Dismissal With Prejudice Each Party To Bear Its Own Costs. As To Defendant J.t. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Blank 281 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003
                                                                                                  Dismissal With Prejudice Each Party To Bear Its Own Costs. As To Defendant Bank Of America, Nt & Sa
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Blank 280 Filed: 12/8/2003, Entered: 12/8/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                    Judge Donna Hitchens, Clerk Rani Edwards, Reporter Patty Van Steenberg. Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Dec-08-2003 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Jan-12-2004 At 11:15 Am In 206
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Blank 279 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003
                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Deft Western Building Material Co.
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Blank 278 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003
                                                                                                        Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Nov-10-2003 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Dec-08-2003 At 11:15 Am In 206
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 277 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003
                                                                                                          Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Triple A Machine Shop Inc.
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Blank 276 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                            Judge Donna Hitchens, Clerk Rani Edwards, Reporter Patty Van Steenberge. Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Nov-03-2003 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Nov-10-2003 At 11:15 Am In 206
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Blank 275 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/3/2003
                                                                                                              Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Brydon, John R
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Blank 274 Filed: 10/30/2003, Entered: 10/30/2003
                                                                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 10/29/2003, Entered: 10/29/2003 Judgment For Defendant
                                                                                                                  The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Gardner, Edward Take Nothing From Defendant Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Jr.univ (defendant To Recover Costs Of Suit) See Scanned Document
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Blank 272 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003
                                                                                                                    Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Oct-20-2003 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Nov-03-2003 At 11:15 Am In 206, Settlement Conference Will Be Held In Dept. 613 For Brayton Group 258.
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Blank 271 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003
                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Costs And Disbursements, Maturity Nov.07,2003 Filed By Defendant Certainteed Corporation Union Carbide Corporation
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Blank 270 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003
                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Sequoia Ventures Inc
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Blank 269 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003
                                                                                                                          Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Sargent Controls & Aerospace
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Blank 268 Filed: 10/20/2003, Entered: 10/20/2003
                                                                                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Consolidated Insulation Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Blank 267 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003
                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Oct-10-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 304
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Blank 266 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003
                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Oct-10-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 304
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Blank 265 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003
                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Oct-10-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 304
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Blank 264 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003
                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Oct-10-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 304
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Blank 263 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003
                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Oct-10-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 304
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Blank 262 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003
                                                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Oct-10-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 304
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                          Blank 261 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003
                                                                                                                                          Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On Oct-10-2003 In Dept. 304, Motion For Summary Judgment By Fraser Edwards Co. Off Calendar. No Appearance.
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Blank 260 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003
                                                                                                                                            Expedited Summary Judgment Motion Of Western Building Materials Is Off Calendar. Not Reported. (dept. 304)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Blank 259 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003
                                                                                                                                              Expedited Summary Judgment Motion Of Sequoia Ventures Inc Is Off Calendar. Not Reported. (dept. 304)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Blank 258 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                Expedited Summary Judgment Motion Of H. B. Fuller Co Is Off Calendar. Not Reported. (dept 304)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 257 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                  Expedited Summary Judgment Motion Of Ford Motor Co Is Off Calendar. Not Reported. (dept. 304)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 256 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                    All Parties Are Present; No Settlement Reached; Maintain Trial Date. Not Reported (dept. 304)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 255 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting The Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University's Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Jr.univ
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 254 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                        4 Motions In Limine Filed By Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 253 Filed: 10/6/2003, Entered: 10/6/2003
                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Complaint As To Deft H.b.fuller Company, Only (with A Mutual Waiver Of Costs)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 252 Filed: 10/3/2003, Entered: 10/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Lockheed Shipbuilding Corporation
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 251 Filed: 9/30/2003, Entered: 9/30/2003
                                                                                                                                                              General Order No.154 Settlement Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 250 Filed: 9/29/2003, Entered: 9/29/2003
                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion 302, Defendant, Standford University's Motion For Summary Judgment, Previously Taken Under Submission On Sept. 11, 2003, Is Granted. Prevailing Party To Serve All Counsel With A Copy Of This Order. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay, Dept. #302
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                  Order Granting Defendant Stanford University's Motion For Summary Judgment.
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 248 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: 9/26/2003
                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Deft Ford Motor Company
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 247 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                      Jury Fees, Tran # W1803924j040, Tag # 006625, Receipt Number 021738, Deposited By Defendant Sequoia Ventures Inc
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 246 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003
                                                                                                                                                                        Jury Fees, Tran # W1603924j038, Tag # 006616, Receipt Number 020938, Deposited By Plaintiff Gardner, Edward
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 245 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003
                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Fraser Edwards Co
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 244 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003
                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Bank Of America's Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar-untimely Noticed (74 Days). No Appearances On This Matter. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Irene Burns, Csr #1815
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 243 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003
                                                                                                                                                                              Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Federated Department Stores, Inc's Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Irene Burns, Csr #1815
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 242 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc's Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Irene Burns, Csr #1815
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 241 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Sep-19-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 240 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Sep-19-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 239 Filed: 9/19/2003, Entered: 9/19/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Sep-19-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 238 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs As To Defendant Federated Department Stores, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 237 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs As To Defendant Hanson Permanente Cement Inc Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 236 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs As To Defendant Scott Co Of California
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 235 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply To Pltf's Objection To Motion For Summary Judgment; Declaration Of Sonja E Blomquist Filed By Defendant Bank Of America N A
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 234 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Sep-11-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 233 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Jr.univ, Motion For Summary Judgment, Submitted On Sep-11-2003 By Ronald E. Quidachay. Appearance For Defendant-moving Party & For Plaintiff-opposing Party. Argued And The Court Took The Matter Under Submission. Parties To Submit Respective Orders. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Beldon Yee, Csr #2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 232 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Scott Co. Of California Motion For Summary Judgment, Set For 09-19-03, Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 231 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Lockheed Shipbuilding Corporation Motion For Summary Judgment, Set For 09-19-03, Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 230 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Familian Corporation Motion For Summary Judgment, Set For 09-19-03, Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 229 Filed: 9/10/2003, Entered: 9/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Astra Flooring Company Motion For Summary Judgment, Set For 09-19-03, Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 228 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion, 302, Defendant J.c. Penny's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Off Calendar Per Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 227 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply Memo. Of P/a In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment;evidentiary Objection To The Declaration Of Charles Ay Filed By Defendant Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Jr.univ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 226 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection To Deft Bank Of America's Untimely Notice Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Gardner, Edward
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 225 Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Complaint As To Defendant Fraser-edwards Co Only, With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 224 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Complaint As To Deft Astra Flooring Company, Only (with A Mutual Waiver Of Costs)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 223 Filed: 8/27/2003, Entered: 8/27/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Deft The Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Juior University's Motion For Summary Judgment; Declaration Of Lisa J. Espada; Declaration Of Charles Ay; Pltf's Response To Deft's Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts; Pltf's Separate Statement Of Disputed Material Facts Filed By Plaintiff Gardner, Edward
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 222 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of The Complaint As To Deft Lockheed Shipbuilding Company Only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 221 Filed: 8/15/2003, Entered: 8/15/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Complaint As To Deft Familian Corporation, Only With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 220 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/13/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Pos Re: Notice Of Intent To Request Expedited Summary Judgment Filed By Defts Attorney (ford Motor Company)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 219 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service (notice Of Intent To Request Expedited Summary Judgment) Filed By Defendant Fraser Edwards Co Hearing Set For Oct-10-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 304
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 218 Filed: 8/12/2003, Entered: 8/12/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Messenger For The Defendant's Motion Of Intent To Request Expedited Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Ford Motor Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 217 Filed: 8/11/2003, Entered: 8/11/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Declaration Filed By Defendant Ford Motor Company Hearing Set For Oct-10-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 304
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 216 Filed: 8/5/2003, Entered: 8/5/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service (expedited) Filed By Defendant Western Building Materials Co Hearing Set For Oct-10-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 304
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 215 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion For Summary Judgment / Ntc Of Intent To Req Expedited Summ Judgmnt; Decl Of Jeffrey A. Hurwitz In Support Filed By Defendant Sequoia Ventures Inc Hearing Set For Oct-10-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 304
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 214 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/1/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Colgate-palmolive Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 213 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/1/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Aug-01-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 212 Filed: 8/1/2003, Entered: 8/1/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Continental Can Co., Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment - Off Calendar, Defendant Dismissed. Hon. Kevin M. Mccarthy. Reporter: Mitch Lyon, Csr #6840
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 211 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Federated Department Stores, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 210 Filed: 7/25/2003, Entered: 7/25/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Colgate-palmolive Co. Motion For Summary Judgment, Set For 08-01-03, Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 209 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: 7/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice -complaint- With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs. As To Defendant Continental Can Company Usa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 208 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: 7/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Substitution Of Attorney: Brydon, John R Substituted For Hugo, Edward R As Attorney For National Steel And Shipbuilding Company (nassco)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 207 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Of Notice Of And Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Scott Co Of California
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 206 Filed: 7/10/2003, Entered: 7/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service For Notice Of Amd Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 205 Filed: 7/7/2003, Entered: 7/7/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Bank Of America N A Hearing Set For Sep-19-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 204 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Scott Co Of California Hearing Set For Sep-19-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 203 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Federated Department Stores, Inc. Hearing Set For Sep-19-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 202 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. Hearing Set For Sep-19-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 201 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First Filing Fee For Deft Filed By Defendant Familian Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 200 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Familian Corporation Hearing Set For Sep-19-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 199 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Lockheed Shipbuilding Corporation Hearing Set For Sep-19-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 198 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Astra Flooring Company Hearing Set For Sep-19-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Declaration Filed By Defendant Jc Penny Co Inc Hearing Set For Sep-16-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer Filed By Defendant Lockheed Shipbuilding Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 195 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Oakfabco Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 194 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Oakfabco Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment, Set For 07-02-03, Is Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 193 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Jr.univ Hearing Set For Sep-11-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 192 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/13/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Georgia-pacific Corp.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 191 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Certainteed Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 190 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service Expedited Filed By Defendant H.b. Fuller Company Hearing Set For Oct-10-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 304
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 189 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Colgate-palmolive's Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Colgate-palmolive Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 188 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: 5/27/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Continental Can Company's Motion For Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Continental Can Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 187 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion For Summary Judgment, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Colgate-palmolive Co Hearing Set For Aug-01-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 186 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Continental Can Co., Inc. Hearing Set For Aug-01-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 185 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Union Carbide Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 184 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Change Of Address As To Fraser-edwards Co., Llc Filed By Attorney Blomquist, Sonja Elizabeth
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 183 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Change Of Address As To Bank Of America, Na Filed By Attorney Blomquist, Sonja Elizabeth
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 182 Filed: 4/17/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Foster Wheeler L.l.c. (survivor To A Merger With Foster Wheeler Corporation) Only. Each Party To Bear Its Own Costs.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 181 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: 4/15/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant American President Lines, Ltd. Apl Ltd.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 180 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Cunningham, James P. (601)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 179 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Oakfabco Inc Hearing Set For Jul-02-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 178 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Mar-21-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 304
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 177 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Mar-21-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 304
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 176 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion In Limine Notice Of And Index To Motions In Limine Filed By Defendant Jc Penny Co Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 175 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion In Limine Notice Of And Index To Motions In Limine Filed By Defendant Federated Department Stores, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 174 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion In Limine Notice Of And Index To Motions In Limine Filed By Defendant Colgate-palmolive Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 173 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion In Limine Notice Of And Index To Motions In Limine Filed By Defendant Continental Can Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 172 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Expedited Summary Judgment Motion Of Union Carbide Is Off Calendar. Not Reported. (dept. 304)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 171 Filed: 3/21/2003, Entered: 3/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Removed From Asbestos Settlement Conference Calendar On Mar-21-2003 In Dept. 304 -all Parties Are Present;no Settlement Reached; Maintain Trial Date. (dept. 304)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 170 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Substitution Of Attorney: Pond, Frank D Substituted For Jackson & Wallace As Attorney For Jc Penny Co Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Certainteed Corporation Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Beldon Yee, Csr #2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 168 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: 2/28/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Feb-28-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 167 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Removed From Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Feb-20-2003. Assigned To Dept. 206 On Oct-20-2003 At 11:15 Am For Trial. Assigned For Mandatory Settlement In Dept. 304 On Oct-10-2003 At 9:30 Am. All Expedited Summary Judgment Motions Will Be Heard At That Time. New Brayton Group 258, Living/asbestosis.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer Filed By Defendant Astra Flooring Company Astra Flooring Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 165 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/7/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection To Commissioner Everett A. Hewlett;objection To Court Commissioner Acting As Judge Pro Tempore At Trial;proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Astra Flooring Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 164 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 163 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: 1/16/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Metalclad Insulation Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 162 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: 1/15/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Declaration Request For Expedited Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Union Carbide Corporation Hearing Set For Mar-21-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 304
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Dec-19-2002 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Feb-20-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Certainteed Corporation Hearing Set For Feb-28-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Hewlett Packard Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Borden Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: 11/26/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Borden Chemical, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 11/18/2002, Entered: 11/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Removed From Asbestos Master Jury Calendar On Apr-01-2003. Assigned To Dept. 206 On Dec-19-2002 At 1:30 Pm For Case Management Conference, Per Stipulation.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 154 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal With Prejudice Complaint. As To Defendant American Standard, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 11/1/2002, Entered: 11/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Substitution Of Attorney: Hamblett, Robert Mitchell Substituted For Thelen Reid & Priest Llp As Attorney For Sequoia Ventures Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 152 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Flint & Walling Industries, Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 151 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant B T Mancini Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 150 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice ,with A Mutual Waiver Of Costs, As To Defendant Flint & Walling Industries, Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 149 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion, 302, Motion For Summary Judgment By Deft B T Mancini, Off Calendar, Deft Dismissed. Reporter: Patricia M. Evezich, Csr #1193
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 9/25/2002, Entered: 9/25/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Sep-25-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 147 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Complaint. As To Defendant B T Mancini Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Matson Navigation Company The Oceanic Steamship Company Alexander & Baldwin Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 9/12/2002, Entered: 9/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Removed From Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Aug-15-2002. Assigned To Dept. 206 On Apr-01-2003 At 11:15 Am For Trial. Assigned For Mandatory Settlement In Dept. 304 On Mar-21-2003 At 9:30 Am. All Expedited Summary Judgment Motions Will Be Heard At That Time. Depo Conclude By 9/30/02-brayton Group 238
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Brooks T Mancini In Support Of Mtn For Summ Judgment Filed By Defendant B T Mancini Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 143 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Katherine S Pak In Support Of Deft's Mtn For Summ Judgment Filed By Defendant B T Mancini Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summ Judgment Filed By Defendant B T Mancini Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summ Judgment Filed By Defendant B T Mancini Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 140 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of Deft's Motion For Summ Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service By Mail On Ntc Of Mtn For Summ Judgment; Request For Judicial Ntc; Memo Of Pts & Auths; Separate Statement; Declarations: Brooks T Mancini & Katherine Pak Filed By Defendant B T Mancini Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 8/28/2002, Entered: 8/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant B T Mancini Company Inc Hearing Set For Sep-25-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Of Remand
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Acknowledgment Receipt Of Certified Copies Of Docket Entries And Certified Copies Of Remand Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Substitution Of Attorney: Ostertag, James J Substituted For Filice Brown Eassa & Mcleod Llp As Attorney For Ford Motor Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 8/2/2002, Entered: 8/2/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal With Prejudice As To The Complaint; Each Party To Bear Its Own Costs As To Defendant Armour And Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Filed By Defendant Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Jr.univ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 6/20/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Jun-20-2002 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Aug-15-2002 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Gardner, Edward Served Jun-14-2002, Mail On Defendant Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Jr.univ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/17/2002, Entered: 6/17/2002 Dismissal With Prejudice Complt As To Deft Alza Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal With Prejudice Complt As To Deft Alza Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant National Semiconductor (maine), Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 305 To Be Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Jr.univ
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 5/15/2002, Entered: 5/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Advanced Micro Devices Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: 4/25/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion, 302, Demurrer Off Calendar Per Moving Party. Reporter: Patricia M. Evezich, Csr #1193
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: 4/24/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Apr-24-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 122 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Quigley Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request For Judicial Notice Filed By Defendant Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: 3/29/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Demurrer, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Fireman's Fund Insurance Company Hearing Set For Apr-24-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: 3/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal With Prejudice Complaint Only As To Deft Syntex (u.s.a.) Inc., Only ---each Party To Bear Its Own Costs.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          1st Appearance Fees Paid Filed By Defendant Armour And Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/6/2002, Entered: 3/6/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer Filed By Defendant Armour And Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 3/5/2002, Entered: 3/5/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Gardner, Edward
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection To Hearing Before A Discovery Commissioner As A Temporary Judge Filed By Defendant Bank Of America N A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/1/2002, Entered: 3/1/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer Filed By Defendant Bank Of America N A
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer Filed By Defendant Alza Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Stipulation Of Hearing By Commissioner Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Filed By Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Feb-21-2002 To Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Jun-20-2002 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 2/20/2002, Entered: 2/20/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer Filed By Defendant Certainteed Corporation Union Carbide Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                1st Appearance Fees Paid Filed By Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer Filed By Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Parker-hannifin Corporation Only. Each Party To Bear Its Own Costs.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued Filed By Plaintiff Gardner, Edward As To Defendant Kaiser Aluminum & Chemical Corporation Sargent Controls & Aerospace Hill Brothers Chemical Company Jc Penny Co Inc Ford Motor Company Gatke Corporation Acands Inc Syntex (u.s.a.) Inc Sequoia Ventures Inc Metalclad Insulation Corporation Congoleum Corporation Alta Building Materials Company Thomas Dee Engineering Company Oakfabco Inc Fraser Edwards Co H.b. Fuller Company Colgate-palmolive Co Scott Co Of California Advanced Micro Devices Inc Hanson Permanente Cement Inc Flint & Walling Industries, Inc National Steel And Shipbuilding Company (nassco) A.p. Green Services, Inc. Atlas Turner, Inc. Asbestos Claims Management Corporation Asbestos Corporation Limited Bechtel Corporation (de) Bell Asbestos Mines Ltd. Certainteed Corporation Dana Corporation Dowman Products, Inc. Familian Corporation The Flintkote Company Garlock Inc. Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. L.h. Burcher Company Macarthur Company Parker-hannifin Corporation Plant Insulation Company Quigley Company, Inc. Quintec Industries, Inc. Rapid-american Corporation Rich-tex, Inc. Thorpe Insulation Company Union Carbide Corporation The Dow Chemical Company W.r. Grace & Co.--conn. Waldron, Duffy, Inc. Western Building Material Corporation Western Macarthur Company Western Asbestos Company Astra Flooring Company Irex Corporation Sealand Shipping Sun Ship Inc. Triple A Machine Shop Inc. Craig Shipbuilding Company Lockheed Shipbuilding Corporation Consolidated Insulation Company, Inc. B.t. Mancini Co., Inc. Armour And Company U.c. Berkeley Hewlett Packard Co. Federated Department Stores, Inc. Memorex Corporation Continental Can Company Usa Borden Chemical, Inc. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Pneumo Abex Corporation Does 1-800
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer Filed By Defendant National Steel And Shipbuilding Company (nassco)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 304 To Be Alza Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 303 To Be Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 302 To Be Bank Of America, Nt & Sa
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 301 To Be Fireman's Fund Insurance Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal With Prejudice Complaint As To Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 96 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Substitution Of Attorney: Blomquist, Sonja Elizabeth Substituted For Gordon & Rees As Attorney For Fraser Edwards Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 95 Filed: 12/20/2001, Entered: 12/20/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Alta Building Materials Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: 12/7/2001 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Filing Notice Of Removal Filed By Deft. Ford Motor Company.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection To Stipulation Of Hrg By Commissioner Filed By Defendant Continental Can Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Demand For Jury Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Continental Can Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer Filed By Defendant Continental Can Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/15/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer Filed By Defendant North American Refractories Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 89 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order On Stip Re Release Of Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 88 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 9/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ntc Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Ntc Of Change Of Address, Gray Cary Ware & Freidenrich Llp,atty For Deft Syntex (usa) Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 86 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        $200. Pd By: National Semiconductor (maine), Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 85 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Of National Semiconductor (maine*, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 84 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Cmplt [ccp Sec 474], National Semiconductor (maine) Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Substitution Of Atty, James P Cunningham, For Deft Sargent Controls & Aerospace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                $200. Pd By: Jc Penny Co Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 81 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer Of Jc Penny Co Inc To Cmplt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection To Stip Of Hrg By Commission Er By Jc Penney Co Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Demand For Trial By Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial Byjc Penney Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Civil Pleadings Statement Of Damages Filed By Edward Gardner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 77 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Req To Enter Default-entered As To: Western Macarthur Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 76 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service Of Summons, Complaint And Statement Of Damages
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 75 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 74 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Change Of Firm Address Bradley, Curley, Asiano & Mccarthy Pc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  $200. Pd By: Scott Co. Of California
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer Of Scott Co. Of California To Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Cross-complaint Of Thomas Dee Engineering Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        $200. Pd By: Thomas Dee Engineering Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Of Thomas Dee Engineering Co To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Deft Scott Co Of California's Demand For Trial By Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 4/27/2001, Entered: 4/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deft Scott Co Of California's Objection To Stip Of Hrg By Commissioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                $200. Pd By: Advanced Micro Devices Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 4/19/2001, Entered: 4/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer Of Advanced Micro Devices Inc To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    $200. Pd By: Western Building Materials Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 4/18/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer Of Western Building Materials Co. To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        $200. Pd By: Flint & Walling Industries Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: 4/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Of Flint & Walling Industries Inc To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 59 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Demand For Trial By Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial Byfederated Department Stores Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection To Stip Of Hrg By Commissioner By Federated Department Stores Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  $200. Pd By: Federated Department Stores Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer Of Federated Department Stores Inc To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      $200. Pd By: Metalclad Insulation Corp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 4/13/2001, Entered: 4/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer Of Metalclad Insulation Corp To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 4/10/2001, Entered: 4/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Association Of Attorney, Berry & Berry, For Deft, Hill Brothers Chemical Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            $200. Pd By:alta Building Materials Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer Of Alta Building Materials Co To Complnt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deft Alta Building Materials Co's Objection To Stipulation Of Hearing By Commissioner
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Deft Alta Building Materials Co's Demand For Trial By Jury & Estimate Of Length Of Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Demand For Trial By Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial Bydeft Colgate-palmolive Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Stipulation Of Hrg By Commissioner By Deft Colgate-palmolive Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        $200. Pd By: Colgate-palmolive Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: 4/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Of Colgate-palmolive Company To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            $200. Pd By: Hanson Permanente Cement Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              > Kaiser Cement Corporation) To Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer Of Hanson Permanente Cement Inc (fka >
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection To Stip Of Hrg By Commissioner By Deft Hanson Permanente Cement Inc (fka Kaiser Cement Corporation)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 4/4/2001, Entered: 4/4/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Demand For Trial By Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial Bydeft Hanson Permanente Cement Inc (fka Kaiser Cement Corp)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      $200 . Pd By: Kaiser Aluminum & Chemical Corp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: 4/2/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer Of Kaiser Aluminum & Chemical Corp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Demand For Trial By Jury & Estimate Of Length Of Trial By Acands Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            $200. Pd By: Acands Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Summary Pleading-answer Of Acands Inc To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                $200. Pd By: Gatke Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: 3/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer Of Gatke Corporation To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    $200. Pd By: Syntex (usa) Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer Of Syntex (usa) Inc To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (e) $200. Pd By: United States Mineral Products Co Filing Id: 144153
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          > Company To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 3/28/2001, Entered: 3/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            (e) Answer Of United States Mineral Products >
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              $200. Pd By: H.b. Fuller Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer Of H.b. Fuller Company To Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  $200. Pd By: Hill Brothers Chemical Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer Of Hill Brothers Chemical Company To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Demand For Jury Trial By Deft H.b. Fuller Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        $200. Pd By: Oakfabco Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 3/26/2001, Entered: 3/26/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Of Oakfabco Inc To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            $200. Pd By: Ford Motor Co
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer Of Ford Motor Co To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                $200. Pd By: Borden Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/21/2001, Entered: 3/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer Of Borden Inc To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    (e) Demand For Jury Trial By Deft, Sargent Controls & Aerospace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      (e) $200. Pd By: Sargent Controls & Aerospace Filing Id: 138043
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 3/20/2001, Entered: 3/20/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        (e) Answer Of Sargent Controls & Aerospace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          $200. Pd By: Fraser Edwards Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: 3/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer Of Fraser Edwards Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              $200. Pd By: Congoleum Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 3/13/2001, Entered: 3/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer Of Congoleum Corporation To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  $200 . Pd By: Sequoia Ventures Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: 3/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer Of Sequoia Ventures Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      $200. Pd By:b. T. Mancini Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 3/6/2001, Entered: 3/6/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer Of B. T. Mancini Co., Inc. To Cmplt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Preliminary Fact Sheet/new Filing/asbestos Litigation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plan Ii Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Feb-21-2002 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 1/29/2001, Entered: 1/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Complaint For Personal Injury Non-vehicle (asbestos)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?