Gary Glasgow Vs Kent Lim
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 01 319854
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Glasgow, Gary, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Appel & Appel (law Offices Of)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Appel & Appel +1 925 938 2000
No Logo Glasgow, Lisa, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Appel & Appel (law Offices Of)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Appel & Appel +1 925 938 2000
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 35, Defendant
No Logo Kent M Lim And Company Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP +1 213 250 1800
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan & Lifter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Jaye Lifter +1 510 763 6510
No Logo Kent M. Lim & Co. Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP +1 213 250 1800

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan & Lifter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill Jaye Lifter +1 510 763 6510
No Logo L.e. Wentz Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Braze +1 415 986 5900
No Logo Ramcon Co Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Braze +1 415 986 5900
No Logo Ward North America,inc. (lien Claimant), Defendant
No Logo Kent M. Lim & Co. Inc, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP +1 213 250 1800
No Logo Ramcon Company Inc, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Supple, John Linck +1 415 278 0500

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Costella & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Costella & Associates +1 925 945 4491
No Logo Ramcon Plumbing Inc, Cross-Defendant
No Logo L E Wentz Co, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James J. Braze +1 415 986 5900
No Logo Ramcon Co Inc, Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Supple, John Linck +1 415 278 0500

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Costella & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Costella & Associates +1 925 945 4491
No Logo Ward North America,inc. (lien Claimant), Intervenor

Represented by Mullen & Filippi, LLP

No Logo Ward North America,inc. (lien Claimant), Other Party

Represented by Mullen & Filippi, LLP

Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (99) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (10) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 99 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005
Master Calendar Motion Calendar - Off Calendar Sweep.
    Blank 98 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/10/2005
    Master Calendar Motion Calendar - Off Calendar Sweep.
      Legal Document 97 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Order Dismissing Case Pursuant To Crc 225
      Case Dismissed By Court At Order To Show Cause Hearing Mar-18-2003 At 10:00am Pursuant To Crc 225. Notice Sent By Court.
        Blank 96 Filed: 3/18/2003, Entered: 3/18/2003
        Mini-minutes For Mar-18-2003 10:00 Am
          Legal Document 95 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Dismissal (crc 225)
          Crc 225 Order To Show Cause Of Feb-04-2003 Continued To Mar-18-2003 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Dismissal With Prejudice - Cross-complaint Filed By L.e. Wentz Company
            Dismissal With Prejudice - Cross-complaint Filed By L.e. Wentz Company On 7-19-01.
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 93 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002
              Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Kent M Lim And Company Inc
                Blank 92 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/4/2002
                Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Kent M Lim And Company Inc Kent M. Lim & Co. Inc
                  Legal Document 91 Filed: 11/19/2002, Entered: 11/19/2002 Dismissal With Prejudice Complaint;
                  Dismissal With Prejudice Complaint.
                    Blank 90 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Court Filing
                    Master Jury Calendar Set For Nov-04-2002 Vacated. Case Settled Out Of Court, No Parties Present, Judge Alvarado, Clerk Greg Chuck, Not Reported (305)
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/29/2002, Entered: 10/29/2002 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc225)Court Filing
                      Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Nov-04-2002 - Case Settled By Plaintiff's Atty Joseph Appel. Assigned To Dept. 212 On Feb-04-2003 At 10:00 Am For Dismissal Per Crc 225. No Parties Present, Judge Alvarado, Clerk Greg Chuck, Not Reported (305)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 88 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002
                        Notice Of Settlement Pursuant To Rule 225 Of The California Rules Of Court.
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Notice Of Continued Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                          Settlement Conference Set For Oct-21-2002 Held, Case Did Not Settle, Continued To Nov-04-2002 At 9:00 Am In 305, Judge Alvarado, Clerk Greg Chuck, Not Reported (305)
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document 86 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Minutes
                            Minutes For Oct-21-2002 9:00 Am
                              Blank 85 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Court Filing
                              Judge Ronald Evans Quidachay, Clerk Nicole Adams, Reporter Beldon Yee. Master Jury Calendar Set For Oct-21-2002 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Nov-04-2002 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 For Settled Protective Date.
                                Legal Document 84 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002 Dismissal With Prejudice Filed By Plaintiff In Intervention
                                Dismissal With Prejudice Filed By Plaintiff In Intervention As To Defendant Ward North America,inc. (lien Claimant)
                                  Blank 83 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002
                                  Proof Of Service By Mail Re Mtn To Stay Trial Date; Ntc Of Mtn To Stay Trial Date; Pts & Auths; Declaration; Proposed Order Filed By Defendant Kent M Lim And Company Inc
                                    Blank 82 Filed: 10/18/2002, Entered: 10/18/2002
                                    Mini-minutes For Oct-18-2002 9:30 Am
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Order
                                      Order Granting Ward North America, Inc. Leave To File Complaint In Intervention
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document 80 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Complaint In Intervention
                                        Complaint In Intervention Filed By Intervenor Ward North America,inc. (lien Claimant) As To Defendant L.e. Wentz Company Kent M Lim And Company Inc Does 1 To 35
                                          Blank 79 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002
                                          Memo Of P&a Of Plaintiffs In Opposition To Motion To Stay Trial Date Filed By Deft Kent M Lim & Company Inc Filed By Plaintiff Glasgow, Gary Glasgow, Lisa
                                            Blank 78 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002
                                            Declaration Of Joseph J Appel In Opposition To Motion To Stay Trial Date Filed By Deft Kent M Lim & Company Inc Filed By Plaintiff Glasgow, Gary Glasgow, Lisa
                                              Blank 77 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002
                                              Ex Parte Application For Order For Leave To File Complaint In Intervention Filed By Intervenor Ward North America,inc. (lien Claimant)
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Order
                                                Order Ost-hearing On Motion To Cont Trial
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 75 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002
                                                  To Stay The Trial Date, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Kent M Lim And Company Inc Hearing Set For Oct-18-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                    Blank 74 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002
                                                    Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time For Motion To Stay Trial Date, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Kent M Lim And Company Inc
                                                      Blank 73 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002
                                                      Amended Proof Of Service Of Request For Dismissal (as To L E Wentz Company) Filed By Defendant Ramcon Co Inc
                                                        Legal Document 72 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: 10/11/2002 Dismissal With Prejudice Filed By Plaintiff.
                                                        Dismissal With Prejudice Filed By Plaintiff As To Defendant L.e. Wentz Company
                                                          Legal Document 71 Filed: 10/7/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Minutes
                                                          Minutes For Oct-02-2002 3:00 Pm
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002 Notice Of Continued Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                            Settlement Conference Set For Oct-02-2002 Continued To Oct-21-2002 At 9:00 Am In 305, All Parties Present, Case Did Not Settle, Judge Alvarado, Clerk Greg Chuck, Not Reported (305)
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 69 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: 9/16/2002
                                                              Off September 11, 2002 Mediation Osc Calendar: Mediated.
                                                                Blank 68 Filed: 9/11/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002
                                                                Mini-minutes For Sep-11-2002 10:00 Am
                                                                  Blank 67 Filed: 9/6/2002, Entered: 9/6/2002
                                                                  Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Braze, James J.
                                                                    Blank 66 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/3/2002
                                                                    Declaration Joseph J. Appel In Response To Osc Re Mediation Filed By Plaintiff Glasgow, Gary Glasgow, Lisa
                                                                      Blank 65 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002
                                                                      Substitution Of Attorney: Lifter, Jill Jaye Substituted For Takahashi, Irene As Attorney For Kent M Lim And Company Inc
                                                                        Blank 64 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002
                                                                        Association Of Attorneys: Takahashi, Irene Added As Attorney For Kent M Lim And Company Inc
                                                                          Blank 63 Filed: 8/5/2002, Entered: 8/5/2002
                                                                          Notice Of Change Of Firm Name Filed By Deft's Attorney.
                                                                            Legal Document 62 Filed: 6/25/2002, Entered: 6/25/2002 Order To Show Cause - Mediation (b)
                                                                            Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Jun-26-2002 Continued To Sep-11-2002 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                              Blank 61 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/19/2002
                                                                              Response To Order To Show Cause Re: Mediation Filed By Plaintiff Glasgow, Gary Glasgow, Lisa
                                                                                Blank 60 Filed: 6/18/2002, Entered: 6/18/2002
                                                                                Response To Osc Re:mediation Filed By Defendant Kent M Lim And Company Inc
                                                                                  Legal Document 59 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Order To Show Cause - Mediation (b)
                                                                                  Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Feb-27-2002 Continued To Jun-26-2002 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002
                                                                                    Response To Osc Re: Mediation Filed By Plaintiff Glasgow, Gary Glasgow, Lisa
                                                                                      Blank 57 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: 2/15/2002
                                                                                      Response To Osc Re: Mediation, Filed By Defendant Kent M. Lim & Company, Inc.
                                                                                        Legal Document 56 Filed: 2/14/2002, Entered: 2/14/2002 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                        Settlement Conference Set For Oct-02-2002 At 3:00 Pm In Dept. 305
                                                                                          Blank 55 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002
                                                                                          Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial Filed By Plaintiffs
                                                                                            Blank 54 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                            Judge Ronald Evans Quidachay, Clerk Nicole Olcomendy, Reporter Sonia Wong. Status Conference Held, Case Is Set For Trial.
                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 2/11/2002, Entered: 2/11/2002
                                                                                              Added To Calendar For Jury Trial Settled Protective Date Jury Trial Set For Oct-21-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                Blank 52 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002
                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice As To Defendant Ramcon Co Inc
                                                                                                  Blank 51 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002
                                                                                                  Substitution Of Attorney: Braze, James J. Substituted For Guichard Tarkoff & Portello A.p.c. As Attorney For L.e. Wentz Company
                                                                                                    Blank 50 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                    Notice Of Intent To Appear By Telephone
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 49 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                      Judge John E. Munter, Clerk Nicole Olcomendy, Reporter Judith Ossa. Status Conference Of Jan-28-2002 Continued To Feb-11-2002 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206.
                                                                                                        Blank 48 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002
                                                                                                        Notice Or Order Vacating Trial Date Settlement Conference Date And Setting Status Conference
                                                                                                          Legal Document 47 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002 Order To Show Cause - Mediation (b)
                                                                                                          Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Jan-09-2002 Continued To Feb-27-2002 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                            Blank 46 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002
                                                                                                            Response To Osc Re: Mediation Filed By Defendant Kent M Lim And Company Inc
                                                                                                              Blank 45 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: 12/19/2001
                                                                                                              Notice Of Status Conference Filed By Plaintiff Glasgow, Gary Glasgow, Lisa
                                                                                                                Blank 44 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001
                                                                                                                Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Feb-01-2002 - Set For Jan-28-02 Status Conference.
                                                                                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001
                                                                                                                  Master Calendar Jury, Feb-19-2002 Off Calendar, Reset For Jan-28-2002 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 For Status Conference.
                                                                                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: 12/18/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Judge Ronald Evans Quidachay, Clerk Nicole Olcomendy, Reporter Sonia Wong. Master Calendar Motion Calendar On Dec-18-2001 In Dept. 206, Motion To Continue Jury Trial &/or Settlement Conf. Granted, Pending Written Order. Trial Date Is Off Calendar, Set For Jan-28-2002 For Status Conference Only.
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: 12/6/2001 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                      Statement Of Non-opposition To Cross-deft. Ramcon Company, Inc.'s Motion To Continue Trial Date Filed By Plaintiff Glasgow, Gary Glasgow, Lisa
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 40 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 Unknown document
                                                                                                                        Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Nov-14-2001 Continued To Jan-09-2002 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001
                                                                                                                          Added To Calendar For Order To Show Cause Re: Mediation Hearing Set For Nov-14-2001 At 10:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 38 Filed: 11/29/2001, Entered: 11/29/2001 Notice
                                                                                                                            Notice Of Order Granting Application For 90 Day Stay Filed By Detfs
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 37 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 Generic Civil Filing (with Fee)
                                                                                                                              Application For Lien And Request For Notice Filed By Other Ward North America,inc. (lien Claimant)
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 36 Filed: 11/20/2001, Entered: 11/20/2001 Motion To Continue Jury Trial &/or Settlement Conf.
                                                                                                                                Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Cross Defendant Ramcon Company Inc Hearing Set For Dec-18-2001 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                  Stipulation And Order To Stay The Action 90 Days Filed By Defendant Kent M Lim And Company Inc As To Plaintiff Glasgow, Gary Glasgow, Lisa
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service On Substitution Of Attorney Filed By Cross Defendant Ramcon Company Inc
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Ex Parte Application for Order
                                                                                                                                      Ex Parte Application For Order Staying Action 90 Days Or In The Alternative For Order Shortening Time On Hearing Of Mtn Staying The Action 90 Days, Declaration Filed By Defendant Kent M Lim And Company Inc
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/7/2001, Entered: 11/7/2001 Declaration
                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Thomas J. Tarkoff Filed By Defendant L.e. Wentz Company Kent M Lim And Company Inc
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: 11/5/2001 Declaration
                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Joseph J. Appel In Response To Osc Re: Mediation Filed By Plaintiff Glasgow, Gary Glasgow, Lisa
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                            Blank 30 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001
                                                                                                                                            Substitution Of Attorney: Supple, John Linck Substituted For Joseph Costella & Associates As Attorney For Ramcon Co Inc Ramcon Company Inc
                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                                                                                              Association Of Attys, Lafollette Johnson Dehaas Fester Silverberg & Ames, Atty For Ramcon Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                $150 Jury Fee Pd By Appel # 12371
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  Objection To Judge Pro Tem By Deft Kent M Lim & Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 8/29/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    X-deft's Objection To Assignment To Judge Pro Tempore (ramcon Company Inc)
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                      $200. Pd By: Ramcon Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                        Cross-complaint Of Ramcon Plumbing Inc Incorrectly Sued As Ramcom Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 8/27/2001, Entered: 8/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                          Answer Of Ramcon Company Inc To Unverified X-cmplt
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                            Order To Show Cause - Mediation Hearing Set For Nov-14-2001 At 10:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                              Plan I Trial, Settlement Conference:, Calendar Motion: Settlement Conference Settlement Conference Set For Feb-01-2002 At 11:00 Am In Dept 613
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: 8/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                                Plan I Trial, Pltf Demands,, Calendar Motion: Jury Trial Jury Trial Set For Feb-19-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/20/2001
                                                                                                                                                                  Ntc Of Trial Date & Settlement Conference Date
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                    Answer Of Kent M Lim & Co Inc To X-cmplt
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 17 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001
                                                                                                                                                                      Order To Show Cause Re Mediation (mailing) From 08/24/01 X-1 09:00 Am For 11/14/01 X-1 10:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 16 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: 8/14/2001
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial (mailing) From 08/24/01 X-1 09:00 Am For 02/01/02 R613 11:00 Am
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                          Return Or Original Summons On Cross-complt - With Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 7/23/2001, Entered: 7/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                            Status And Setting Conference Statement By Deft, L.e. Wentz Co
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                              Summons Issued On X-complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                Cross-complaint Of L E Wentz Co
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: 7/11/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                  Status And Setting Conference Statement By Pltfs, Gary & Lisa Glasgow
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                    $200. Pd By: L.e. Wentz Co
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer Of L.e. Wentz Co To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                        $200. Pd By: Kent M Lim & Company Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/29/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Of Kent M Lim & Company Inc To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 6 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Filed W/proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: 5/3/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Confirming Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Aug-24-2001 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 2 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/23/2001, Entered: 3/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?