Anthony Hampton Vs Guardsmark Inc
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 01 321672
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Hampton, Anthony, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dacey & Sitkin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dacey & Sitkin +1 415 781 1444
v.
No Logo Guardsmark, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Munger, Tolles & Olson +1 415 512 4000
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (50) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 50 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004
Satisfaction Of Judgment, Fully Satisfied, (creditor Anthony Hampton, On Behalf Of Himself And All Other Members Of The Settlement Class Acknowledges Full Satisfaction Of The Judgment As To Guardsmark, Llc, As Successor In Interest To Deft Guardsmark, Inc.) Filed By Plaintiff Hampton, Anthony As To Defendant Guardsmark Inc
    Blank 49 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003
    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Pltf's Motion For Award Of Fees And Costs Filed By Plaintiff Hampton, Anthony
      Blank 48 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003
      Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Anthony Hampton Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees And Costs. Appearance For Plaintiff-miving Party. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling - Grant Pursuant To Notice Of Non-opposition. Order Signed In Open Court. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Beldon Yee, Csr #2647
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Order
        Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion For Award Of Fees And Costs
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 46 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003
          Mini-minutes For Jun-09-2003 9:30 Am
            Blank 45 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003
            Notice Of Non-opposition To Pltf's Motion For Award Of Atty Fees & Costs; Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Guardsmark Inc
              Blank 44 Filed: 5/19/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003
              Motion Notice Of Motion For Award Of Attorneys Fees And Costs, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Hampton, Anthony Hearing Set For Jun-09-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
                Case Management Conference Of Apr-25-2003 Is Off Calendar. Judgment Filed. Notice Sent By Court.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 42 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003
                  Notice Pf Entry Of Judgment And Order Approving Settlement Filed By Deft.
                    Blank 41 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003
                    Law And Motion 302, Defendant Guardsmark Inc. Joint Motion For Final Approval Of Settlement & Entry Of Judgment. Appearance For Defendant-moving Party & For Plaintiff-opposing Party. No Argument. The Court Granted The Motion. Order Signed In Open Court. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Beldon Yee, Csr #2647
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Text Judgment
                      The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: See Scanned "judgment" (at Length For Details)
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003 Order
                        Order Determining Good Faith And Granting Final Approval Of Settlement
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 38 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 3/28/2003
                          Mini-minutes For Mar-28-2003 9:30 Am
                            Blank 37 Filed: 2/21/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003
                            Joint Motion For Final Approval Of Settlement & Entry Of Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Guardsmark Inc Hearing Set For Mar-28-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                              Blank 36 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002
                              Added To Calendar For Joint Motion For Final Approval Of Settlement Hearing Set For Mar-28-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Order
                                Order Granting Preliminary Approval For The Settlement And Setting A Settlement Hearing (no Sase Provided; No Copies Provided)
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 34 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002
                                  Law And Motion 302, Defendant Guardsmark Inc.'s For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement, Class Notice, And Settlement Hearing Date. No Appearance, Tentative Ruling Adopted - Grant, Joint Motion, No Opposition. (ajr) Reporter: Patricia M. Evezich, Csr #1193 (302)
                                    Blank 33 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002
                                    Mini-minutes For Sep-05-2002 9:30 Am
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                      Case Management Conference Of Sep-06-2002 Continued To Apr-25-2003 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 31 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: 8/8/2002
                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Hampton, Anthony Also Filed By Defendant Guardsmark Inc
                                          Blank 30 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002
                                          Proof Of Service By Mail Filed By Defendant Guardsmark Inc
                                            Blank 29 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002
                                            Fee Pd: For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement, Class Notice, And Settlement Hearing Date; Declarations Of Malcolm A Heinicke; Declaration Of John J Dacey, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Guardsmark Inc Hearing Set For Sep-05-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                              Blank 28 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002
                                              Stipulation Re: Settlement Of Class Action Filed By Hampton, Anthony Guardsmark Inc
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/6/2002, Entered: 5/6/2002 Order Setting Status Conference From Order To Show Cause (b)
                                                Status Conference Set For Sep-06-2002 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. The May-13-2002 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: 4/17/2002
                                                  Joint Response Of All Parties Re Order To Show Cause; Supporting Declaration Of John J. Dacey Re Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Hampton, Anthony
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/18/2002, Entered: 3/18/2002 Order to Show Cause
                                                    Order To Show Cause Set For May-13-2002 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File A Status Conference Statement 20 Court Days Prior To The Status Conference. The Mar-29-2002 Status Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002 Case Ordered Off Calendar
                                                      Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Feb-27-2002 Is Off Calendar: Mediated. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 1/24/2002, Entered: 1/24/2002
                                                        Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Dacey & Sitkin
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: 1/14/2002 Order Continuing Status Conference
                                                          Status Conference Of Jan-25-2002 Continued To Mar-29-2002 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002 Order To Show Cause - Mediation (b)
                                                            Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Jan-09-2002 Continued To Feb-27-2002 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 20 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002
                                                              Proof Of Service Of Joint Report On Case Status Filed By Defendant Guardsmark Inc Served Jan-03-2002, Mail On Plaintiff Hampton, Anthony
                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 1/3/2002, Entered: 1/3/2002
                                                                Joint Report On Case Status
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 Unknown document
                                                                  Removed From Master Jury Calendar On Apr-22-2002. Assigned To Pretrial Dept. 212 On Jan-25-2002 At 9:00 Am For Status Conference.
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001
                                                                    Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Apr-02-2002 - Per Court Order.
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                      Joint Objection To Trial Date Filed By Defendant Guardsmark Inc
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/6/2001, Entered: 11/6/2001 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                        Proof Of Service By Mail Of Joint Objection To Trial Date Filed By Defendant Guardsmark Inc
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Unknown document
                                                                          Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Apr-02-2002 At 3:30 Pm In Department 606. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Apr-22-2002 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Status Conference On Oct-26-2001 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001 Unknown document
                                                                            Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Set For Jan-09-2002 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                              Proof Of Service
                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                                Status And Setting Conference Statement By Deft, Guardsmark Inc
                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: 8/3/2001
                                                                                  Declaration Confirming Service
                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001
                                                                                    Order Re: Complex Case Designation-denied
                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: 7/30/2001
                                                                                      Proof Of Service
                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: 7/16/2001
                                                                                        Answer Of Guardsmark Inc To Complt
                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 6/25/2001
                                                                                          $200. Pd By: Guardsmark Inc
                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 6/25/2001
                                                                                            Stipulation To Extend Time To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To The Cmplt
                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001
                                                                                              Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001
                                                                                                Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Oct-26-2001 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001
                                                                                                  Summons Issued
                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 5/25/2001
                                                                                                    Complaint For Violation Of Calif Labor Code

                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 26 times.

                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                       
                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                      Need Password Help?