Kathleen Evans Vs Textron Lycoming
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 01 321848
Superior Court Judge A James Robertson Ii, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Evans, Kathleen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. Brandi +1 415 989 1800 +1 415 989 1801 tjb@brandilaw.com
No Logo Hobbs, William C, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. Brandi +1 415 989 1800 +1 415 989 1801 tjb@brandilaw.com
No Logo Dukes, Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidovitz & Bennett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Davidovitz & Bennett Llp +1 415 956 4800
v.
No Logo Adf Airways, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Phillips

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Windust, Paul W +1 925 296 2607
No Logo Aquila Airways Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fleming & Phillips

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Windust, Paul W +1 925 296 2607
No Logo Boca Airport Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan & Fong

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy John Ryan +1 916 924 1912 +1 916 923 3872 tryan@ryanfong.com
No Logo Boca Aviation Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ryan & Fong

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy John Ryan +1 916 924 1912 +1 916 923 3872 tryan@ryanfong.com
No Logo Cj Aviation Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hansen,boyd,culhane & Watson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hansen,boyd,culhane & Watson +1 916 444 2550
No Logo Dukes, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidovitz & Bennett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Davidovitz & Bennett Llp +1 415 956 4800
No Logo Gold Star Aviation Inc, Defendant
No Logo Main Air, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reid Axelrod

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reid, Axelrod, Ruane & Mccormack +1 415 451 3300
No Logo Precision Air Inc, Defendant
No Logo Precision Airmotive Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Perkins Coie, LLP +1 206 583 8888
No Logo Precision Armotive Corp/bendix, Defendant
No Logo Textron Lycoming, Defendant
No Logo Textron Lycoming Inc, Defendant

Represented by Reily & Jeffery

Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (353) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (31) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 353 Filed: 8/9/2011, Entered: 8/9/2011
Jury Fees Of 150.00 For Transaction B8206203j002 Transferred Into Jplus
    Blank 352 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011
    Jury Fees Of 150.00 For Transaction W1905b03j013 Transferred Into Jplus
      Blank 351 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006
      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
        Blank 350 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: 7/21/2006
        Dismissal With Prejudice (entire Action)
          Blank 349 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006
          Per Diem Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
            Blank 348 Filed: 5/26/2006, Entered: 5/26/2006
            Subsequent Jury Fee Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C Fee Deposited By The Brandi Law Firm For Jury Fee For May-15-2006 Through May-19-2006 For Trial In Dept 602
              Blank 347 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006
              Subsequent Jury Fee Filed By Plaintiff Hobbs, William C Fee Deposited By The Brandi Law Firm For Jury Fee For Mar-14-2006 Through May-12-2006 For Trial In Dept 602
                Blank 346 Filed: 5/24/2006, Entered: 5/24/2006
                Per Diem Fees Deposited By Plaintiff Hobbs, William C
                  Blank 345 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006
                  Per Diem Fees Deposited By Defendant Boca Aviation Inc Boca Airport Inc
                    Blank 344 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006
                    Subsequent Jury Fee Filed By Defendant Boca Aviation Inc Boca Airport Inc Fee Deposited By Ryan & Fong For Jury Fee For Mar-14-2006 Through May-12-2006 For Trial In Dept 602
                      Blank 343 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006
                      Trial Concluded. In 21 Days
                        Legal Document 342 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Exhibit
                        Exhibit List For Defendants Filed
                          Legal Document 341 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Exhibit
                          Exhibit List For Plaintiff Filed
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 5/22/2006, Entered: 5/22/2006 Witness List
                            Witness List Filed
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 339 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Court Filing
                              Removed From Jury Trial Calendar On May-19-2006 In Dept. 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporters R. Fung (am) And R. Balian (pm), Clerk I. Hammer, Bailiff A. Trevino, Attys., Parties And Jurors Present. Closing Argument, Jury Instr., Jury Delib. Jury Verdict For Defendant, Verdict And Jury Instr. Filed, Jury Thanked And Discharged. Jury Fees $87.50 Per Side And Per Diems $140 Per Side For This Date.
                                Blank 338 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                                Jury Instructions
                                  Blank 337 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006
                                  Jury Notes
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Order
                                    Order Returning Exhibits - See Scanned Document
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: 5/19/2006 Jury Verdict
                                      Jury Verdict - See Scanned Document
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 334 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006 Court Filing
                                        Jury Trial Set For May-18-2006 Continued To May-19-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attorneys, Parties & Jurors Present. Witness Exam, Doc Evid Intro, Closing Arguments Made. Per Diems Are $280 Per Side & Jury Fees Are $87.50 Per Side For This Date.
                                          Blank 333 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                          Motion In Limine Plaintiffs' Motion For A Directed Verdict Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                            Blank 332 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: 5/18/2006
                                            Removed From Jury Trial Calendar Set For Apr-26-2006 - Duplicate Entry
                                              Blank 331 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Court Filing
                                              Jury Trial Set For May-17-2006 Continued To May-18-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attys., Parties And Jurors Present. Witness S/e, Doc Evid Intro. Per Diems Are $140 Per Side And Jury Fees Are $87.50 Per Side For This Date.
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/17/2006 Minutes
                                                Minutes For May-17-2006 10:00 Am For Dept 602
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Blank 329 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Court Filing
                                                  Jury Trial Set For May-16-2006 Continued To May-17-2006 At 10:00 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attorneys, Parties And Jurors Present. Witnesses S/e, Doc. Evid Intro. Per Diems Are $280 Per Side And Jury Fees Are $87.50 For This Date.
                                                    Blank 328 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006
                                                    Opposition To Motion In Limine - Defendant Boca Airport, Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine #15 To Exclude Gerald Polson
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006 Minutes
                                                      Minutes For May-16-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 326 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                        Jury Trial Set For May-15-2006 Continued To May-16-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attys., Parties And Jury Present. Witnesses S/e, Doc Evid Intro. Per Diems Are $280 Per Side And Jury Fees Are $87.50 Per Side For This Date.
                                                          Blank 325 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006
                                                          Response - Plaintiffs' Reply To Boca's Opposition To Motion In Limine #12 To Exclude Testimony Of Defendant's Undisclosed Expert Dr. Root Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                            Legal Document 324 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: 5/15/2006 Minutes
                                                            Minutes For May-15-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                              Blank 323 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                              Jury Trial Set For May-12-2006 Continued To May-15-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter Yvonne Lee, Clerk I. Hammer, Attys., Parties & Jurors Present. Witnesses S/e, Doc Evid Intro. Per Diems Are $280 Per Side And Jury Fees Are $87.50 Per Side For This Date.
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: 5/12/2006 Minutes
                                                                Minutes For May-12-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Blank 321 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Court Filing
                                                                  Jury Trial Set For May-11-2006 Continued To May-12-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reorter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attys., Parties & Jury Present. Witness S/e, Doc Evid Intro. Per Diems Are $280 Per Side And Jury Fees Are $87.50 Per Side. For This Date.
                                                                    Blank 320 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006
                                                                    Declaration Timothy J. Ryan In Support Of Boca Airpoit, Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude Testimony Of David Root, M.d. Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                      Blank 319 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006
                                                                      Opposition To Motion In Limine Defendant Boca Airport, Inc.'s Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude Testimony Of David Root, M.d.
                                                                        Blank 318 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006
                                                                        Motion In Limine #14 To Exclude Evidence Of Plaintiffs'purchase Of The Piper Tomahawk Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Minutes
                                                                          Minutes For May-11-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 316 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Court Filing
                                                                            Jury Trial Set For May-10-2006 Continued To May-11-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attys., Parties And Jurors Present. Witnesses S/e, Doc Evid Intro. Per Diems Are $280 Per Side And Jury Fees Are $87.50 Per Side For This Date.
                                                                              Legal Document 315 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: 5/10/2006 Minutes
                                                                              Minutes For May-10-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                Blank 314 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006
                                                                                Motion In Limine Defendant Boca Airport, Inc.'s Motion Regarding Ntsb/faa Investigators' Statements Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                  Blank 313 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006
                                                                                  Trial Brief - Plaintiffs' Trial Brief Re Admissibility Of Testimony Regarding What The Faa Told William Hobbs Following This Accident Pursuant To Evidence Code Sec. 356
                                                                                    Blank 312 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                    Jury Trial Set For May-09-2006 Continued To May-10-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attys., Parties And Jurors Present. Witnesses S/e, Doc. Evid Intro. Per Diems Are $280 Per Side And Jury Fees Are $87.50 Per Side For This Date.
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006 Minutes
                                                                                      Minutes For May-09-2006 10:00 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Blank 310 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: 5/9/2006
                                                                                        Proof Of Personal Service Of Motion Regarding Expert Testimony Of Douglas E. Stimpson Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                          Blank 309 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                          Jury Trial Set For May-08-2006 Continued To May-09-2006 At 10:00 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mmitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attys., Parties & Jury Present. Witnesses S/e, Doc. Evid Intro. Each Side Owes $280 Per Diems And $87.50 Jury Fees For This Date.
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Minutes
                                                                                            Minutes For May-08-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Blank 307 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                              Jury Trial Day 11/jury Day 4 Held May-05-2006. Witnesses Sworn And Examined. Documentary Evidence Identified And Admitted. Continued To May-08-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602. Judge Donald Mitchell; Clerk Marilyn Flores; Court Reporter Rhonda Fung
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/5/2006, Entered: 5/5/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                Minutes For May-05-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Unknown documentCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Jury Trial Set For May-04-2006 Continued To May-05-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attys. Parties And Jurors Present. Witnesses S/e, Doc Evid Intro. Per Diems Are $280 Per Side And Jury Fees Are $175 Total Or &87.50 Per Side.
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Blank 304 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006
                                                                                                    Motion In Limine Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                      Blank 303 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006
                                                                                                      Motion In Limine Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                        Blank 302 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006
                                                                                                        Trial Brief Re Inapplicability Of Doctrine Of "last Clear Chance" (plaintiffs')
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: 5/4/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                          Minutes For May-04-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Blank 300 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                            Jury Trial Set For May-03-2006 Continued To May-04-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attorneys, Parties And Jury Present. Opening Statements Made. Each Side Owes $140 Per Diems And $96.25 Jury Fees For This Date.
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: 5/3/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                              Minutes For May-03-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                                Minutes For May-02-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Blank 297 Filed: 5/2/2006, Entered: 5/2/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Jury Trial Set For May-02-2006 Continued To May-03-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attorneys, Parties & Prospective Jurors Present. Voir Dire Resumed, Jury And Alts. Sworn, Court Pre Instructed Jury. Per Diems Are $280 Per Side And Jury Fees For This Date Are $302.25 Per Side For This Date.
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                                    Minutes For May-01-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Blank 295 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Jury Trial Set For May-01-2006 Continued To May-02-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attorneys, Plaintiff And Prospective Jurors Present. Jury Voir Dire Commenced. Parties Each Owe $280 Per Diems And Each Also Owe $391.75 For Jury Fees.
                                                                                                                        Blank 294 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Jury Trial Set For Apr-28-2006 Continued To May-01-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer And Attorneys Present. Motions In Limine Heard. Granted In Part/denied In Part. Per Diem Fees Are $280 Per Side For This Date.
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                                          Minutes For Apr-28-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                                            Minutes For Apr-27-2006 10:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Blank 291 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: 4/27/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Jury Trial Set For Apr-27-2006 Continued To Apr-28-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter Mitch Lyon, Clerk I. Hammer, Attys. & Panel 3 Of Prospective Jurors Present. Hardshipping Done, Jurors To Return 5/1/06, Matter Cont. To 4/28/06 At 9:30 For Mil. No Per Diems Or Jury Fees For This Date (4/28/06)
                                                                                                                                Blank 290 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006
                                                                                                                                Added To Calendar For Jury Trial Jury Trial Set For Apr-26-2006 At 09:00 Am In Dept 602
                                                                                                                                  Blank 289 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Jury Trial Set For Apr-26-2006 Continued To Apr-27-2006 At 10:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attys. & Prospective Jurors From Panels 1 & 2 Present. Hardshipping Done. Jurors To Return 9:30 Am On 5/1/06. Panels 3 & 4 To Be Hardshipped 4/27/06. No Per Diems Or Jury Fees Due For This Date.
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                                                    Minutes For Apr-26-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Blank 287 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Jury Trial Set For Apr-17-2006 Continued By The Court To Apr-26-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 For Jury Selection - Judge D. Mitchell, Clerk I. Hammer, Dept. 602
                                                                                                                                        Blank 286 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Jury Trial Set For Mar-20-2006 Continued To Apr-17-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attys. & Prospective Jurors Present. Jurors Thanked And Excused. No Per Diems Due. Jury Fees: Plaintiffs: $203.75 And Defendants: $203.75 For This Date. (jury Fees For This Date Were $707.50 Total Minus $300 Total Jury Fee Deposits By The Parties For A Total Of $407.50 Or $203.75 For Each Side.)
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                                                          Minutes For Mar-20-2006 10:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Blank 284 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Jury Trial Set For Mar-15-2006 Continued To Mar-20-2006 At 10:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attorneys And Panel 2 Of Prospective Jurors Present. Hardshipping & Questionnaires Done. No Per Diems Or Jury Fees Owed For This Date.
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 3/15/2006, Entered: 3/15/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                                                              Minutes For Mar-15-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Blank 282 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                Jury Trial Set For Mar-14-2006 Continued To Mar-15-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Clerk, I. Hammer And Six Prospective Jurors Present. Pursuant To Instructions (by Phone) From The Court, Jurors Were Told To Report To Dept. 602 On March 20, 2006 At 10:30 Am. Jury Fees For This Date Are $105.00. No Per Diems Due. Not Reported
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                  Minutes For Mar-14-2006 10:00 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 280 Filed: 3/14/2006, Entered: 3/14/2006
                                                                                                                                                    Jury Trial, Advanced From Mar-15-2006 To Jury Trial At Mar-14-2006 10:00 Am In Dept. 602. Clerk I. Hammer
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 279 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006
                                                                                                                                                      Jury Trial Set For Mar-13-2006 Continued To Mar-15-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Court Not In Session Today. Jury Hardshipping Will Resume 3/15/06 At 9:30 Am. Clerk, I. Hammer
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 278 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Trial Brief Re The Admissibility Of The Opinions Of Defense Expert Douglas Stimpson Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 277 Filed: 3/10/2006, Entered: 3/10/2006
                                                                                                                                                          Motion In Limine # 12 To Exclude Testimony Of Defendant's Undisclosed Expert Dr. Root Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 276 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            Jury Trial Set For Mar-07-2006 Continued To Mar-13-2006 At 9:30 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Reporter R. Fung, Clerk I. Hammer, Attorneys & Panel 1 Of Prospective Jurors. Hardshipping Done And Jury Questionnaires Completed. No Jury Fees Or Per Diems Due For This Date.
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 275 Filed: 3/7/2006, Entered: 3/7/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                              Minutes For Mar-07-2006 10:00 Am For Dept 602
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 274 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Jury Trial Set For Mar-06-2006 Continued To Mar-07-2006 At 10:00 Am In 602 - Judge D. Mitchell, Clerk I. Hammer And Attorneys Present In Court. Court And Counsel Discussed Preliminary Issues (not Reported) No Per Diems Due For This Date.
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 273 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant Boca Airpoit, Inc.'s Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 272 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiffs' Statement Of Case And Witness List
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 271 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                      Plaintiffs' Designation Of Raymond Bysiewicz Testimony
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 270 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Designation Of John Clegg Testimony
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 269 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff William Hobbs' Designation Of Dr. Kai Jaki Testimony
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 268 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Designation Of Peter Nielson Testimony
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 267 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                              Plaintiffs' Designatino Of Mark Platt Testimony
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 266 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                Plaintiff Kathleen Evans' Designation Of Dr. Thomas Voegeli Testimony
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006 Minutes
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minutes For Mar-06-2006 1:30 Pm For Dept 602
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 264 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition To Motion In Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 263 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                      Master Jury Calendar Of Mar-06-2006 Assigned To Jury Trial Calendar On Mar-06-2006 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 602, Donald S. Mitchell. (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 262 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                        Trial Brief (defendant Boca Airport, Inc.)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 261 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: 3/6/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                          Trial Brief (plaintiffs Kathleen Evans' And William Hobbs')
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 260 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                            11 Motions In Limine Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 259 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: 3/1/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Feb-28-2006 8:30 Am For Dept 220
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 258 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                8 Motions In Limine Declarations Of Timothy J. Ryan In Support Of Motions Three And Seven Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 257 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: 2/28/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Settlement Conference Held, Case Not Settled
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 256 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: 2/2/2006
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Jury Fees, Tran # B8206203j002, Tag # 014479, Receipt Number 028200, Deposited By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Boca Airport, Inc.'s Motion To Continue Trial Date (no Sase; Copy In Dept 206 Out Box)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: 11/22/2005 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Settlement Conference Set For Feb-28-2006 Continued To Feb-28-2006 At 3:30 Pm In 220
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 253 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: 11/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Trial Continuance Fee Paid By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Settlement Conference Set For Nov-17-2005 Continued To Feb-28-2006 At 8:30 Am In 220
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 251 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Master Jury Calendar Set For Dec-05-2005 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Mar-06-2006 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 - Continue Fees Are Due
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 250 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Master Motion Calendar On Nov-16-2005 In 206, Defendant Boca Airport Inc.'s Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Is Granted. The Trial Date Of 12/05/05 Is Continued To 03/06/06 In Dept. 206 At 9:30 Am. The Current Settlement Conference Will Be Vacated And A New Settlement Conference Will Be Set And Mailed By The Court. Discovery Closed. Written Order Pending. Judge: David L. Ballati; Clerk: Dlok/dokazaki; Reporter: Susan Lee, Csr #4280
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 249 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Timothy J. Ryan In Supp Of Mtn To Cont Trial Date Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 248 Filed: 11/14/2005, Entered: 11/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply To Opposition To Mtn To Cont Trial Date Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 247 Filed: 11/10/2005, Entered: 11/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition To Deft Boca Motion To Continue Trial Date Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Shortening Time Re: Motion To Continue Trial Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 245 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference With Proof Of Service; Memo Of P&a Filed In Support; Declaration Of Timothy J. Ryan Filed In Support Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc Hearing Set For Nov-16-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 244 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte Application For Order To Hear Motion To Continue Trial Date On Shortened Time Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 243 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Jury Fees, Tran # W1905b03j013, Tag # 013644, Receipt Number 016394, Deposited By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: 7/29/2005 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 241 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Dec-05-2005 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Nov-17-2005 At 3:30 Pm In Department 220. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 238 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Removed From Settlement Conference Calendar Set For Oct-05-2005 - By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 237 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: 3/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Objection To Trial Date Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Oct-05-2005 At 1:30 Pm In Department 504. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Oct-24-2005 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Order To Show Cause On Mar-07-2005 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 235 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Adf Airways, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 234 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Casey A. Kaufman In Response To Order To Show Cause For Failure To Obtain Answer Or Enter Default Of Defts Adf Airways, Inc. And Gold Star Aviation, Inc. Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order To Show Cause Set For Dec-27-2004 Continued To Mar-07-2005 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Dec-27-2004 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004 Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Each Party To Bear Their Own Costs. As To Defendant Gold Star Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 231 Filed: 12/23/2004, Entered: 12/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Casey A. Kaufman In Response To Order To Show Cause For Failure To Obtain Answer Or Enter Default Of Defts Adf Airways & Gold Star Aviation Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/26/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-25-2004 Continued To Dec-27-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 229 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Oct-25-2004 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order To Show Cause Set For Jul-26-2004 Continued To Oct-25-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Jul-26-2004 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 227 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Pos By Mail Of Notice Of Entry Of Order Re: Defts Motion To Quash Complaint For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 226 Filed: 7/23/2004, Entered: 7/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of John F. Vannucci In Response To Osc For Failure To Obtain Answer Or Enter Default Of Defts Adf Airways,inc. And Gold Star Aviation,inc.; Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 225 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Order Re: Deft's Motion To Quash Complaint Filed By Pltfs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/26/2004, Entered: 4/26/2004 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Apr-26-2004 Continued To Jul-26-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Apr-26-2004 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 223 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Responsive Declaration To Order To Show Cause For Failure To Obtain Answer Or Enter Default Of Defts Adf Airways Inc & Goldstar Aviaton Inc Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 222 Filed: 2/23/2004, Entered: 2/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Change Of Address And Firm Name Filed By Attorney Ryan Timothy J
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: 1/27/2004 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-26-2004 Continued To Apr-26-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 220 Filed: 1/26/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Jan-26-2004 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order To Show Cause Set For Nov-24-2003 Continued To Jan-26-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: 11/25/2003 Sanction Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sanctions Ordered In The Amount Of $350.00 Against Thomas J. Brandi, Esq., For Failure To Appear At The Order To Show Cause Hearing On: Nov-24-2003, Payable On Or Before Dec-09-2003. Proceedings Reported By: Valerie Papale. (212) Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 217 Filed: 11/24/2003, Entered: 11/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Nov-24-2003 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-22-2003 Continued To Nov-24-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Sep-22-2003 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request For Default Rejected, Notice Mailed, As To Defendant Gold Star Aviation Inc Adf Airways, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Dismissal With Prejudice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Dukes Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 213 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of John F. Vannucci In Response To Order To Show Cause For Failure To Obtain Answer Or Enter Default Of Defts Adr Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation, Inc. Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 212 Filed: 9/9/2003, Entered: 9/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice As To Defendant Precision Armotive Corp/bendix Precision Airmotive Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/24/2003, Entered: 6/24/2003 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order To Show Cause Set For Jun-23-2003 Continued To Sep-22-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 210 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Jun-23-2003 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/16/2003 Judgment For Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  The Court Ordered The Following Judgment Entered: It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C Take Nothing From Defendant Main Air See Scanned Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 3/25/2003, Entered: 3/25/2003 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-24-2003 Continued To Jun-23-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 207 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Mar-24-2003 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 206 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/22/2003 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order To Show Cause Set For Jan-21-2003 Continued To Mar-24-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 205 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Jan-21-2003 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 204 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Granting Summary Judgment As To Defendant Main Air (no Sase - 302 Outbox)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 203 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/5/2002 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order To Show Cause Set For Dec-16-2002 Continued To Jan-21-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Dec-16-2002 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 202 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion 302, Amended Motion For Summary Judgment, Duplicate, Error.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 201 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion 302,boca Airport,inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Defendant Boca Airport, Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication: Argued And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling (motion For Summary Judgment Denied. Motion For Summary Adjudication As To Punitive Damages Granted Otherwise Motion For Summary Adjudication Denied Ccp 437c(h)) With The Exception That The Motion For Summary Adjudication As To Punitive Damages Is Denied. Pltf To Prepare Order. (302/ajr/pb) Court Reporter Patricia M. Evezich, Csr #1193
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 200 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion 302, Defendant Main Air's Motion For Summary Judgment: No Appearance On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling (grant Pursuant To Statement Of Non-opposition). (302/ajr/ju) Court Reporter Patricia M. Evezich, Csr #1193
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 199 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Nov-20-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 198 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Nov-20-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 197 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Alan M. Steinberg In Support Of Deft. Boca Airport, Inc.'s Reply To Plntf.'s Opposition Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 196 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply In Support Of Deft. Boca Airport's Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 195 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection To Plntf's Opposition To Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 194 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Brief In Support Of Deft. Boca Airport, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative, Summary Adjudication
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 193 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amended Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc Hearing Set For Nov-20-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 192 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statement Of Non-opposition To Deft Main Air's Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 191 Filed: 11/6/2002, Entered: 11/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Opposition To Boca's Motion For Summary Judgment And Summary Adjudication Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 190 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: 10/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc Hearing Set For Nov-20-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 189 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: 10/17/2002 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-15-2002 Continued To Dec-16-2002 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 188 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Oct-15-2002 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 187 Filed: 10/2/2002, Entered: 10/2/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Law And Motion 302, Motion For Summary Judgment Continued From Oct-02-2002 To Law And Motion At Nov-20-2002, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302, No Appearance On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling (continued To 11-20-02 Per All Parties) [deft Main Air's Motion For Summary Judgment]. (302/ajr/ju) Court Reporter Patricia M. Evezich, Csr #1193
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Defendant Textron Lycoming, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 185 Filed: 8/27/2002, Entered: 8/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Separate Statement (2)declarations, Request For Judicial Notice Filed By Defendant Main Air Hearing Set For Oct-02-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 184 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-12-2002 Continued To Oct-15-2002 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 183 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: 8/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Aug-12-2002 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 182 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/11/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Order Quashing Service Of Summons On Deft On The Grounds Of Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 181 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: 7/10/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Change Of Zip Code
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: 6/26/2002 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-12-2002 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Adf Airways, Inc., And Gold Star Aviation Inc. The Jun-28-2002 Status Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 179 Filed: 6/11/2002, Entered: 6/11/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference Statement Jury Requested By Dukes, Inc Filed By Defendant Dukes Inc Jury Demanded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 178 Filed: 6/4/2002, Entered: 6/4/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Non-opposition To Deft Dukes Inc's Mtn To Compel Further Responses And Plaintiffs Opposition To Request For Sanctions Filed By Plaintiff Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 177 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference Statement Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 176 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: 6/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference Statement Jury Requested By The Plaintiff Filed By Defendant Main Air Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Weeks
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 175 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Precision Armotive Corp/bendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 174 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Re Status Conference Statement, Filed By Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 173 Filed: 5/31/2002, Entered: 5/31/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference Statement Jury Requested By Boca Airport Inc Filed By Defendant Boca Aviation Inc Boca Airport Inc Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Weeks
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 172 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion 302, Motion For Summary Judgement,    
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 171 Filed: 5/16/2002, Entered: 5/16/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For May-16-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 170 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Mail On Mtn To Compel; Memo Of Pts & Au; Separate Statement Of Facts; Decl Of Sean M Gaffney Filed By Petitioner Dukes Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 169 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Sean M Gaffney In Supp Of Deft Dukes Inc's Mtn To Compel Filed By Defendant Dukes Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 168 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Separate Statement Of Facts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 167 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Supp Of Deft Duke Inc's Mtn To Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 166 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: 5/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Ntc To Mtn & Mtn To Compel Further Responses To Special Interrogatories & For Sanctions Filed By Defendant Dukes Inc Hearing Set For Jun-13-2002 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: 5/3/2002 Order Continuing Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference Of May-17-2002 Continued To Jun-28-2002 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 164 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: 5/2/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statement Of Non-opposition To Defendant Textron Lycoming, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 163 Filed: 4/26/2002, Entered: 4/26/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Dukes Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 162 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: 4/23/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference Statement Jury Requested By The Plaintiffs Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 161 Filed: 4/22/2002, Entered: 4/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference Statement Jury Requested By The Plaintiff Filed By Defendant Main Air Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Weeks
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 160 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference Statement Jury Requested By Boca Filed By Defendant Boca Aviation Inc Boca Airport Inc Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Weeks
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 159 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service Re: Status And Setting Conference Statement Filed By Deft's Attorney.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 158 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: 4/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Precision Airmotive Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 4/16/2002, Entered: 4/16/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Defendant Aquila Airways Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 4/15/2002, Entered: 4/15/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Quashing Service Of Summons On Deft Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 155 Filed: 4/8/2002, Entered: 4/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Re: Order Quashing Service Of Summons Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: 4/5/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order On Deft Boca Airport, Inc's Mot To Quash Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 153 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion 302, 04-mar-02, Deft Adf Airways, Inc.'s Motion To Quash Denied (see Order Signed 04/03/02).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order On Defendant Adf Airways, Inc.'s Motion To Quash Complaint For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Re: Specially Appearing Deft Aquila Airways, Inc.'s Motion To Quash Service Of Summons On The Ground Of Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/3/2002, Entered: 4/3/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer Filed By Defendant Boca Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Order Continuing Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference Of Apr-05-2002 Continued To May-17-2002 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order Quashing Service Of Summons On Deft C J Aviation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: 3/27/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order Order Re Deft Precision Air, Inc's Mtn To Quash Service Of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 146 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: 3/20/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Or Alternatively, Motionf Or Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Textron Lycoming Hearing Set For May-16-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 145 Filed: 3/14/2002, Entered: 3/14/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Main Air Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 144 Filed: 3/12/2002, Entered: 3/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order --per Comm. Hewlett--on Stipulated Protective Order And Order Thereon -modified-, Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 142 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Status And Setting Conference Statement By Mail Filed By Defendant Precision Airmotive Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 141 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Precision Airmotive Corporation Jury Demanded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: 3/8/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order --per Comm. Hewlett--granting A Stipulated Protective Order, Filed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 139 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Law And Motion 302, Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Or Stay Or Dismiss: Motion Re: Deft Aquila Airways - Ct Adopted Tentative: Motion Granted. Deft To Submit Proposed Order. Motion Re: Deft Adf Airways - Argued & Matter Submitted On Mar-04-02 By Judge A. James Robertson. Proposed Orders To Be Submitted This Afternoon. Reporter: Patricia M. Evezich, Csr #1193
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 138 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: 3/4/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Mar-04-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 137 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ameded Proof Of Service Re: Supplemental Reply To Motion To Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Filed By Defendant Adf Airways, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 136 Filed: 2/28/2002, Entered: 2/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended P.o.s Re: Supplemtal Appearing To Opposotion To Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Filed By Defendant Aquila Airways Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 135 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Reply Of Specially Appearing Deft Adf Airways Inc To Opposition To Mtn To Quash Service Of Summons Filed By Defendant Adf Airways, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 134 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: 2/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Supplemental Reply Of Specially Appearing Deft Aquila Airways Inc To Opposition To Mtn To Quash Service Of Summons Filed By Defendant Aquila Airways Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 133 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: 2/25/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Serivce By Mail (memo In Further Support Of Motion To Quash)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 132 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of William Hobbs In Support Of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition To Deft. Adf Airways, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 131 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Opposition To Deft. Adf Airways, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 130 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: 2/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of John F. Vannucci In Support Of Plaintiffs' Supplemental Opposition To Deft. Adf Airways, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Complaint For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 129 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion 302, Added To Calendar For Mtn To Quash By Defts Precision Air And Cj Aviation Granted, Insufficient Contact. Reporter: Patricia M. Evezich, Csr #1193
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 128 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion 302, Added To Calendar For Motion To Quash By Deft Boca Airport, Argued, Motion To Quash Denied, Sufficient Contacts With California. Reporter: Patricia M. Evezich, Csr #1193
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 127 Filed: 2/21/2002, Entered: 2/21/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Feb-21-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 126 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (supplemental) In Supp Of Precision Air's Mtn To Quash Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 125 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection To Pltf's Opposoiton To Motion To Quash Service Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 124 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: 2/19/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Second Supplemental Reply In Support Of Deft's Motion To Quash Service & Dismiss Ofr Lack Of Personal Jurisdicton Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 123 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Opposition To Deft Boca Airport Inc Mtn To Dismiss Complaint For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002 Order Continuing Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference Of Feb-22-2002 Continued To Apr-05-2002 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 121 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: 2/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Opposition To Deft Precision Air Inc's Mtn To Dismiss Complaint For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 120 Filed: 2/1/2002, Entered: 2/1/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference Statement Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 119 Filed: 1/30/2002, Entered: 1/30/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statement Of Deft Cj Aviation Inc Re Status Conference Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 118 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: 1/28/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Dukes Inc Estimated Time For Trial: 4.0 Weeks
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Precision Airmotive Corporation Jury Demanded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 116 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Commission To Issue Out-of-state Deposition Subpoena To The Custodian Of Records For Washoe Medical Center,inc. Filed By Defendant Precision Airmotive Corporation As To Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 115 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Commission To Issue Out-of-state Deposition Subpoena Custodian Of Records For Washoe Medical Center,inc. Filed By Defendant Precision Airmotive Corporation As To Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 114 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Weeks
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 113 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: 1/23/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Main Air Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 112 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion 302, Added To Calendar For Mtn To Quash, Duplicate, Error.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 111 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion 302, Added To Calendar For Mtn To Quash Continued From Jan-17-2002 To Law And Motion At Feb-21-2002, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 , Opp Due 2-13, Reply Due 2-19. Reporter: Patricia Evezich
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Charles Duffie (supplemental) In Supp Of Cj Aviation's Supplemental Reply Brief Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 109 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Jan-17-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 108 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Jan-17-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 107 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Law And Motion 302, Added To Calendar For Motion To Quash Continued From Jan-16-2002 To Law And Motion At Feb-21-2002, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Opp Due2-13; Reply Due 2-19. Reporter: Patricia Evezich
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 106 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: 1/16/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Jan-16-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 105 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of John J Rueda In Support Of C J Aviations Mtn To Quash Service Of Summons On The Grounds Of Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 104 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Reply Brief In Support Of Its Mtn To Quash Service Of Summons On The Grounds Of Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 103 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service By Mail Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 102 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Supplemental Of Charles Duffie In Support Of C J Aviation Supplemental Reply Brief In Support Of Its Mtn To Quash Service Of Summons On The Ground Of Lack Of Personal Jurisdictions Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 101 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Supplemental Memo In Supp Of Precision Air's Mtn To Quash Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 100 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: 1/8/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Perkins Coie Llp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 99 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Opposition To Deft Cj Aviation Inc Mtn To Dismiss Complaint For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 98 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/4/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Opposition To Deft Boca Airport Inc Mtn To Dismiss Complaint For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 97 Filed: 12/27/2001, Entered: 12/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Supplemental Opposition To Deft. Precision Air, Inc.'s Motion Dismiss Complaint; Decl. Of John F. Vannucci In Support Of Pltf.'s Supplemental Opposition Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/14/2001, Entered: 12/14/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Order Re: Specially Appearing Defendant Precision Air, Inc.'s Motion To Quash Service Of Summons On The Ground Of Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/5/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Status Conference Of Dec-14-2001 Continued To Feb-22-2002 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 94 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion 302, Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Or Stay Or Dismiss, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration (continued From Nov-09-2001) Continued From Dec-03-2001 To Law And Motion At Mar-04-2002, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Granted Cont To Do Jurisdictional Discovery. Cont To 3-4-02. Reporter: Joe Vickstein
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 93 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request For Judicial Ntc In Support Of Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Memo Of P&a Declaration Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 92 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Dec-03-2001 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 91 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Law And Motion 302, Added To Calendar For Motion To Quash Fr 9-27, Mp-deft Precision Air, Inc. Continued From Nov-27-2001 To Law And Motion At Jan-16-2002, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Suppl Opp Due 12-28, Reply Due 1-9. Counsel To Prep Order. Reporter: Patricia M. Evezich, Csr 1193
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 90 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Nov-27-2001 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/21/2001 Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Boca Airport Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/19/2001, Entered: 11/19/2001 Status Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Main Air Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 87 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Added To Calendar For Motion To Quash Fr 9-27, Mp-deft Precision Air, Inc. Hearing Set For Nov-27-2001 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/16/2001, Entered: 11/16/2001 Memorandum Of Points And Authorities;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities Declaration Of Ashley E Dempsey Filed By Deft Precision Air Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/14/2001 Generic Civil Filing (no Fee)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statement Of Deft Cj Aviation,inc., Regarding Status Conference Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001 Status Conference Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Status Conference Statement And Proof Of Service By Mail Filed By Defendant Textron Lycoming Precision Armotive Corp/bendix
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 83 Filed: 11/13/2001, Entered: 11/13/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference Statement And Of Proof Of Service By Mail Filed By Defendant Textron Lycoming Precision Armotive Corp/bendix Jury Demanded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 82 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion 302, Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Or Stay Or Dismiss, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Continued From Nov-09-2001 To Law And Motion At Dec-03-2001, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302. Reptr: Diana Chan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Continuing Hearing On Deft Boca Airport Mtn To Qsh Svc Of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 80 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: 11/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Nov-09-2001 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply Of Specially Appearing Defendant Adf Airways'inc. To Opposition To Motion To Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Of Specially Appearing Defendant Aquila Airways, Inc. To Opposition To Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition Defendant Aquila Airways Inc.s Motion To Dismiss Complaint For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition To Defendant Adf Airways, Inc.'s Motion To Dismiss Complaint For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 75 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/30/2001 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of John F. Vannucci In Support Of Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant Motion To Dismiss Complaint For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiciton Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/26/2001, Entered: 10/26/2001 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference Of Nov-02-2001 Continued To Dec-14-2001 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 73 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Oct-23-2001 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 10/24/2001, Entered: 10/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Oct-23-2001 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Added To Calendar For Mtn To Quash Mp-deft Cj Aviation Inc. (fr. 10-4) Hearing Set For Oct-23-2001 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Added To Calendar For Mtn To Quash Mp-deft Boca Airport (fr. 10-3) Hearing Set For Oct-23-2001 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 69 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion 302, Added To Calendar For Mtn To Quash Mp-deft Cj Aviation Inc. (fr. 10-4) Continued From Oct-23-2001 To Law And Motion At Jan-17-2002, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Mtn To Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 10/23/2001, Entered: 10/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion 302, Added To Calendar For Mtn To Quash Mp-deft Boca Airport (fr. 10-3) Continued From Oct-23-2001 To Law And Motion At Jan-17-2002, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 For Mtn To Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Status Conference Statement Filed By Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Status Conference Statement Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Cj Aviation Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 65 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Dukes Inc Jury Demanded
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001 Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Or Stay Or Dismiss, Proof Of
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Or Stay Or Dismiss, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Adf Airways, Inc. Hearing Set For Nov-09-2001 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Alex Farkas In Support Of Mo To Quash Service Of Summons Filed By Defendant Adf Airways, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Mo To Quash Service Of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Susan Escobio In Support Of Mo To Quash Service Of Summons Filed By Defendant Aquila Airways Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Mo To Quash Service Of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001 Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Or Stay Or Dismiss, Proof Of
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion To Quash Service Of Summons Or Stay Or Dismiss, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Aquila Airways Inc Hearing Set For Nov-09-2001 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 10/11/2001, Entered: 10/11/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Textron Lycoming Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 10/9/2001, Entered: 10/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Main Air Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 15.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 56 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proceedings Reported By Patricia M Evezich, Csr #1193 (302)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mtn To Quash Cont To 10-23 On Court's Motion. (d302)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 10/4/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Status And Setting Conference Statement By Deft Precision Airmotive Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proceedings Reported By Patricia M Evezich, Csr #1193 (302)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: 10/3/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mtn To Quash & Dismiss Cont To 10-23-01 By Court Per Local Rule 8.5. (d302)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 51 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statement Of Clarification In Support Of Defendant Boca Airport, Inc's Motion To Quash Service & Dismiss For Lack..
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: 9/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply Brief In Supp Of Deft Cj Aviation's Mtn To Quash Service Of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of John F Vannucci In Supp Of Pltfs' Opposition To Deft Precision Air Inc's Mtn To Quash Complt For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction Filed By Plaintiff Evans, Kathleen Hobbs, William C
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion To Quash Aruged, Cont To 11-27-01. Reporter: Patricia M. Evezich
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Further Decl Of Mark Wantshouse To The Reply In Supp Of Mtn To Quash Service & Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdictn
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 46 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply In Supp Of Deft Boca Airport Inc's Mtn To Quash Service & Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          $200. Pd By: Precision Airmotive Corp
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer Of Precision Airmotive Corp To Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 43 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion To Quash Cont To 9-27-01 On Court's Own Motion. Reporter: Patricia Evezich
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 42 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Pltf's Oppos To Deft Cj Aviation Inc's Mtn To Dismiss Cmplt For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: 9/24/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Decl Of John F Vannucci In Supp Of Pltfs' Oppos To Deft Boca Airport Inc's Mtn To Dismiss Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Confirming Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 39 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: 9/21/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Pltfs' Opposition To Deft Boca Airport Inc's Mtn To Dismisscomplt For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proceedings Reported By Patricia M Evezich, Csr #1193 (302)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 37 Filed: 9/17/2001, Entered: 9/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mtn To Quash Svc Cont To 9-24 Per Moving Party. (d302)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 9/14/2001, Entered: 9/14/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply Of Deft Precision Air, Inc. In Further Support Of Itsmotion To Quash Service Of Summons & Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              $200. Pd By: Dukes Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: 9/10/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer Of Dukes Inc To Unverified Complt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Pltfs' Opposition To Deft Precision Air, Inc's Mo To Dismiss Complt For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: 9/7/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request For Judicial Ntc In Support Of Ntc Of Mo & Mo Of Cjaviation, Inc. To Quash Service Of Summons On Grounds Of...
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Charles Duffie In Support Of Motion Of Cj Aviation, Inc. To Quash Service Of Summons
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memo Of P&a In Support Of Mo Of Cj Aviation, Inc. To Quash Service Of Summons On The Grounds Of Lack Of Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            $200. Pd By: Cj Aviation, Inc. (1st Appearance/quash)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Ntc Of Mo & Mo Of Cj Aviation, Inc. To Quash Service Of Summons On The Grounds Of Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction, Calendar Motion: Quash Service Of Summons Hearing Set For Oct-04-2001 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: 9/5/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 25 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Original Signature Page Of Declaration Of Gary Fitzgerald In Support Precision Air, Inc's Mo To Quash Service Of.....
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 24 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: 8/30/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ntc Of Errata Re: Mo Of Deft Precision Air, Inc. To Quash Service Of Summons & Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of John Clegg In Support Of Motion To Quash Service And Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Juridiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 22 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Mark Wantshouse In Support Of Motion To Quash Service And Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memo Of P&a In Support Of Mo To Quash Service And Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            $200. Pd By: Boca Airport, Inc. (mo To Quash)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 8/28/2001, Entered: 8/28/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Deft Boca Airport, Inc's Ntc Of Mo & Mo To Quash Service And Dismiss For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction, Calendar Motion: Quash Service Of Summons, Calendar Motion: To Dismiss Hearing Set For Oct-03-2001 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                $200. Pd By: Textron Lycoming Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer Of Textron Lycoming Inc To Cmplt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 8/23/2001, Entered: 8/23/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ntc Of Mo & Mo Of Deft Precision Air, Inc. To Quash Serviceof Summons On The Ground Of Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction, Calendar Motion: Quash Service Of Summons Hearing Set For Sep-17-2001 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: 8/22/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amendment To Complt [ccp Section 474]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 14 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        $200. Pd By: Main Air (sued Herein As Main Air Inc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 8/17/2001, Entered: 8/17/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          General Denial Of Main Air To Cmplt
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service On Deft Adf Airways Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service On Deft Precision Air Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 10 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service On Deft Goldstar Aviation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service On Deft Cj Aviation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: 8/9/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service On Deft Aquila Airways Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 7/27/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proof Of Service On Deft Main Air, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/25/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Service On Deft Textron Lycoming
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Nov-02-2001 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Complaint For Personal Injury (non-vehicle)

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 154 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?