Zabek Vs Paredes
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 01 324454
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Zabek, Gregory, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Schuman, Allan M. (& Associates)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Schuman, Allan M. +1 415 563 2111
v.
No Logo Paredes, Fernando, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Prestholt & Siepmann

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Siepmann, Willi H +1 702 240 3289
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (7) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 55 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
Removed From Master Jury Calendar Set For Apr-05-2004 - Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed.
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Notice Of Non-payment Of Jury Fees
    Notice Of Non-payment Of Jury Fees
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004 Dismissal Of Entire Action With Prejudice
      Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 52 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004
        Notice Of Case Settlement
          Blank 51 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003
          Trial Continuance Fee Paid By Plaintiff Zabek, Gregory
            Blank 50 Filed: 10/10/2003, Entered: 10/10/2003
            Master Jury Calendar Set For Nov-10-2003 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Apr-05-2004 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 Per Ex Part Application. - Continue Fees Are Due
              Blank 49 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003
              Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time Or Request To Continue Trial Filed By Plaintiff Zabek, Gregory
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/9/2003, Entered: 10/9/2003 Order
                Order For Continuance Of Trial Date
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 47 Filed: 5/20/2003, Entered: 5/20/2003
                  Notice Of Unvailability
                    Blank 46 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
                    Per Moving Party
                      Blank 45 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003
                      Per Moving Party
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/25/2003, Entered: 4/25/2003 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial
                        Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Nov-10-2003 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Notice Sent By Court.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 43 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003
                          Ntc Of Mtn & Mtn To Compel Answers To Deft's Supplemental Interrogatory & Request For Sanctions, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Paredes, Fernando Hearing Set For May-08-2003 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                            Blank 42 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003
                            Ntc Of Mtn & Mtn To Compel Answers To Deft's First Demand For Inspection Of Documents & Request For Sanctions, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Paredes, Fernando Hearing Set For May-08-2003 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                              Blank 41 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003
                              Notice Of Plntf's Objection To Trial Setting
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/27/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial After Trial De Novo Request
                                Case Removed From Pending Trial De Novo Calendar - Set For Trial If Objection: Hearing Set For Apr-18-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 212 Jury Trial Set For Jun-30-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 39 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003
                                  Trial De Novo Filed By Defendant Paredes, Fernando
                                    Blank 38 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003
                                    Arbitrator's Fee Statement, Sent To Accounting For - Richard C. Wootton
                                      Blank 37 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003
                                      Award Filed By Arbitrator
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration
                                        Arbitration Order To Show Cause Of Feb-06-2003 Continued To Mar-20-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212. Jurisdiction Of The Arbitrator Is Extended Through Feb-28-2003. Arbitration Order To Show Cause On Feb-06-2003 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 35 Filed: 1/21/2003, Entered: 1/21/2003
                                          Letter, Defendant's Attorney, Willi H. Siepmann To Arbitration Dept.; In Re: Case Arbitrated On January 17, 2003 Before Richard Wootton
                                            Blank 34 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: 12/24/2002
                                            Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Siepmann, Willi H
                                              Blank 33 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002
                                              Correspondence, Arbitrator, Richard C. Wootton To Counsels; Arbitration Hearing Date: Rescheduled To January 17, 2003 @ 2:00 Pm
                                                Blank 32 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: 10/15/2002
                                                Correspondence, Richard C. Wooton To Counsels; Arbitration Hearing Date: December 13, 2002 @ 2:00 Pm
                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002
                                                  After Hearing, Order To Show Cause Is Ordered Off Calendar. (212) See Previous Entry.
                                                    Blank 30 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002
                                                    Order To Show Cause To Willi H. Siepmann, Esq., For Failure Of Adjuster To Appear At The July 29, 2002 Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference. Failure To Comply With Local Rule 4.1 N (1) And 4.1 N (5) Is Ordered Scheduled This Day. There Being Good Cause In Response To The Osc Court Ordered Osc Off Calendar And Dissolved. Order To Show Cause To Allan M. Schuman, Esq., For Faioure To Appear At The Pre-arbitration Settlemnent Conference On 7/29/2002 Is Also Ordered Off Calendar And Dissolved. Proceedings Reported By: Leticia Perez. (212)
                                                      Blank 29 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002
                                                      Mini-minutes For Sep-26-2002 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration
                                                        Arbitration Order To Show Cause Of Sep-30-2002 Continued To Feb-06-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212. Jurisdiction Of The Arbitrator Is Extended Through Jan-03-2003. Arbitration Order To Show Cause On Sep-30-2002 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Order
                                                          Order And Stipulation To Extend Arbitrator's Jurisdiction To 1-3-03.
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 26 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002
                                                            Declaration Of Allan M. Schuman In Support Of Stipulation To Arbitration Jurisdiction. Filed By Plaintiff Zabek, Gregory
                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 9/19/2002, Entered: 9/19/2002
                                                              Stipulation And Order To Extend Arbitration Jurisdiction; Declaration Of Allan M. Schuman In Support Of Stipulation To Extend Arbitration Jurisdiction Filed By Plaintiff Zabek, Gregory
                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: 8/26/2002
                                                                Declaration Of Willi H. Siepmann Re Osc Re Sanctions Filed By Defendant Paredes, Fernando
                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 8/23/2002, Entered: 8/23/2002
                                                                  Declaration Of Allan M. Schman Re: Osc Re: Sanctions Filed By Plaintiff Zabek, Gregory
                                                                    Blank 22 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/19/2002
                                                                    Correspondence, Arbitrator, Richard C. Wootton To Counsels: Rescheduled Arbitration Hearing Date: Sep-13-02 At 3:30 Pm.
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 Order To Show Cause \- Miscellaneous
                                                                      Order To Show Cause To Willi H. Siepmann, Esq., Set For Sep-26-2002 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure Of Adjuster To Appear At The July 29, 2002 Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference. Failure To Comply With Local Rule 4.1 N (1) And 4.1 N (5). Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: 8/14/2002 Order To Show Cause \- Miscellaneous
                                                                        Order To Show Cause To Allan M. Schuman,esq., Set For Sep-26-2002 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure Of Plaintiff To Appear At The July 29, 2002 Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference. Failure To Comply With Local Rule 4.1 N (1). Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: 7/8/2002
                                                                          Correspondence, Arbitrator, Richard C. Wootton To Counsels: Arbitration Hearing Date: Aug-14-02 At 3:30 Pm.
                                                                            Blank 18 Filed: 6/14/2002, Entered: 6/14/2002
                                                                            Correspondence, Arbitrator, Richard C. Wootton To Counsels; Arbitration Hearing Date: (tba) Available Dates???
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration (c)
                                                                              Arbitration Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-30-2002 At 3:30 Pm In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: 6/5/2002 Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (crc 1605)
                                                                                Arbitrator Richard Craig Wootton Appointed. Arbitrator's Jurisdiction Jun-05-2002 Through Sep-03-2002.
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002
                                                                                  Declaration Of Willi H Siepmann In Supp Of Stip To Continue Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference Filed By Defendant Paredes, Fernando
                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002
                                                                                    Fee Pd: Stip & Order Filed By Defendant Paredes, Fernando
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: 5/23/2002 Order
                                                                                      Order & Stip To Continue Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: 5/21/2002 Notice Of Random Selection From Panel Of Arbitrators
                                                                                        Panel Of Arbitrators Assigned. Rejection Date May-31-2002.
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 Order To Arbitration And Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference (b)
                                                                                          Ordered Into Arbitration On Apr-15-2002 Pursuant To Ccp 1141.11(a). Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference Set For May-20-2002 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Feb-15-2002 Status Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 1/17/2002, Entered: 1/17/2002
                                                                                            Status Conference Statement Filed By Plaintiff Zabek, Gregory Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                                              Blank 9 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/9/2002
                                                                                              Status Conference Statement Filed By Defendant Paredes, Fernando Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                                                Blank 8 Filed: 10/12/2001, Entered: 10/12/2001
                                                                                                Answer To Complt, 1st Appearance Fee Pd #412351 Filed By Defendant Paredes, Fernando
                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                                                  Summons Filed (no Proof Of Service Attached)
                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                                                    Declaration Confirming Service
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001
                                                                                                      Proof Of Service (summons)
                                                                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001
                                                                                                        Civil Cover Sheet Received
                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001
                                                                                                          Plan I Status Conference Date: Hearing Set For Feb-15-2002 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001
                                                                                                            Summons Issued
                                                                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 9/12/2001, Entered: 9/12/2001
                                                                                                              Complaint For Personal Injury (vehicle Related)

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?