Eric Beardon v. Citigroup, Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 02 408316
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Beardon, Eric, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Hopkins, Maximilian J B +1 415 479 9200
v.
Citibank FSB Citibank FSB, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Court Square Capital Ltd.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Officer/Director, Citibank, NA
Officer/Director, Keane, Inc.
Officer/Director, Macdermid Inc.
Officer/Director, Travelers Insurance Co
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Imc Mortgage Co
Officer/Director, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Officer/Director, Pfs Services Inc
Officer/Director, Citicorp Banking Corp
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co
Officer/Director, Cvc Partners LLC
Officer/Director, Ness Technologies Inc
Officer/Director, Primerica, Inc.
Officer/Director, Student Loan Corp
Officer/Director, Mfs Municipal Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Pimco Corporate Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Pennsylvania Fund
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Gabelli Equity Trust Inc
Officer/Director, Nuveen Senior Income Fund
Officer/Director, Muniyield Insured Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Salomon Inc
Officer/Director, Jones Energy, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cryomedical Sciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, S Y Bancorp Inc
Officer/Director, Scholastic Corp
Officer/Director, Corvel Corp
Officer/Director, Buckle, Inc.,
Officer/Director, Avid Technology, Inc.
Officer/Director, O'reilly Automotive, Inc.
Officer/Director, Healthrite, Inc.
Officer/Director, Smith Midland Corp
Officer/Director, Mitcham Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Tc Group L.l.c.
Darden Restaurants, Inc. Officer/Director, Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Officer/Director, American Tire Corp
Officer/Director, Synalloy Corp
No Logo Does 1 To 25, Inclusive, Defendant
Cause of Action Civil Rights
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (8) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 38 Filed: 6/2/2006, Entered: 6/2/2006
Jury Fees Of 150.00 For Transaction W2303407j001 Transferred Into Jplus
    Blank 37 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003
    Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b.
      Blank 36 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003
      Master Jury Calendar Set For Sep-22-2003 Vacated, Dismissal Filed.
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/15/2003, Entered: 9/15/2003 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Amended Complaint
        Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/26/2003, Entered: 8/26/2003 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Amended Complaint
          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 33 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003
            Mini-minutes For Aug-04-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 302
              Blank 32 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003
              Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Citibank, F.s.b.'s Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party. Hon. Kevin M. Mccarthy. Reporter: Mitch Lyon, Csr #6840
                Blank 31 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003
                Proof Of Personal Service Notice Of Motion & Motion Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b.
                  Blank 30 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003
                  Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement , Compendium Of Non-california Authorities Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b. Hearing Set For Aug-04-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003 Notice
                    Notice Of Rescheduled Early Settlement Conference
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Order
                      Order Continuing Trial Date
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 27 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003
                        Master Jury Calendar Set For Apr-21-2003 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Sep-22-2003 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 (trial Date Continued Per Exparte Order)
                          Blank 26 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003
                          Notice Of Entry Of Order Continuing Trial Date Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b.
                            Blank 25 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003
                            Proof Of Service By Mail Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b.
                              Blank 24 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003
                              Declaration Of Jody Willson In Support Of Ex Parte Appl. For An Order Whortening Time For Motion To Continue Trial, Or, In The Alternative, For An Order Continuing Trial Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b.
                                Blank 23 Filed: 4/8/2003, Entered: 4/8/2003
                                Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time For Motion To Continue Trial, Points And Authorities Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b.
                                  Blank 22 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003
                                  Jury Fees, Tran # W2303407j001, Tag # 004787, Receipt Number 018498, Deposited By Plaintiff Beardon, Eric
                                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Court Filing
                                    Settlement Conference Held - Case Did Not Settle ( 502 Judge C. Mitchell; Clerk: Linda Espy; Not Reported)
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/2/2003, Entered: 4/2/2003 Minutes
                                      Minutes For Apr-02-2003 3:30 Pm For Dept 502
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Notice Of Non-payment Of Jury Fees
                                        Notice Of Non-payment Of Jury Fees
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/17/2003, Entered: 3/17/2003 Order
                                          Order Granting Deft's Motion For Order Compellijng The Attendance Of Pltf. For Deposition And Awarding Monetary Sanctions
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 17 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003
                                            Proof Of Service Of Notice Of Motion And Motion For Order Compelling The Attendance Of Plntf. Eric Beardon For Deposition And For Monetary Sanctions Against Plntf.; Memo Of P & A; Declaration Of Jody Willson In Support T Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b. Served Mar-10-2003, Mail On Plaintiff Beardon, Eric
                                              Blank 16 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003
                                              Request For Continuance; Declaration Of Eric Bearden Filed By Plaintiff Beardon, Eric
                                                Blank 15 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003
                                                For Order Compelling The Attendance Of Pltf For Deposition And For Monetary Sanctions Against Pltf, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b. Hearing Set For Mar-17-2003 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Order
                                                  Order Shortening Notice (for Service Of Ntc Of Motion And Motion To Order Compelling Pltf's Appearance)
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003
                                                    Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time, Declaration Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b.
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/14/2003, Entered: 2/14/2003 Notice
                                                      Notice Of Rescheduled Early Settlement Conference
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003
                                                        Substitution Of Attorney: Pro Per Substituted For Hopkins Maximilian J As Attorney For Beardon, Eric
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                          Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/16/2002, Entered: 10/16/2002 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                            Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Apr-02-2003 At 3:30 Pm In Department 502. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Apr-21-2003 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Case Management Conference On Oct-25-2002 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/3/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002
                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Beardon, Eric Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/26/2002, Entered: 9/26/2002
                                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b. Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002
                                                                  Before Hearing, Order To Show Cause Is Ordered Off Calendar By Court. (212)
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: 9/5/2002 Answer
                                                                    Answer To 1st Amended Complaint Filed By Defendant Citibank, F.s.b.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/16/2002, Entered: 8/16/2002 Order To Show Cause - Proof Of Service
                                                                      Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Sep-17-2002 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Blank 3 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002
                                                                        Summons Issued To Plaintiff Beardon, Eric
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Complaint
                                                                          1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Beardon, Eric As To Defendant Citigroup, Inc. Does 1 To 25, Inclusive
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/24/2002, Entered: 5/24/2002 Complaint
                                                                            Civil Rights, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Beardon, Eric As To Defendant Citigroup, Inc. Does 1 To 25, Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Status Conference Scheduled For Oct-25-2002 Proof Of Service Due On Jul-23-2002 Status Conference Statement Due On Sep-26-2002
                                                                              Request RequestSpace

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 42 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?