Albert Boro v. Mark Massara Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 02 409750
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Boro, Albert, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bianco, Windle & Bianco

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bianco, Gregory O +1 415 362 3344
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 20, Defendant
No Logo Massara, Mark, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irene Takahashi +1 415 438 6605
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/2/2004, Entered: 3/2/2004 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Crc 225 Order To Show Cause Of Mar-09-2004 Is Off Calendar Dismissal Filed. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 21 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004
    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Massara, Mark
      Blank 20 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003
      Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: 12/12/2003 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc225)
        Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal Pursuant To Crc 225 Set For Mar-09-2004 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Settled Per Notice Of Settlement Dated 12-10-03. Dec-18-2003 Arbitration Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 18 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003
          Notice Notice Of Settlement.
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: 9/22/2003 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration
            Arbitration Order To Show Cause Of Sep-18-2003 Continued To Dec-18-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212. Jurisdiction Of The Arbitrator Is Extended Through Nov-21-2003. Arbitration Order To Show Cause On Sep-18-2003 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 16 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003
              Mini-minutes For Sep-18-2003 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/10/2003, Entered: 6/10/2003 Continued Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration
                Arbitration Order To Show Cause Of Jun-23-2003 Continued To Sep-18-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212. Jurisdiction Of The Arbitrator Is Extended Through Aug-19-2003. Arbitration Order To Show Cause On Jun-23-2003 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/22/2003, Entered: 5/22/2003
                  Response To Osc Re: Arbitration Filed By Plaintiff Boro, Albert
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Order
                    Order Extending Arbitrator's Jurisdiction To 8-19-03
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 12 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003
                      Declaration Of Gregoray O. Bianco In Support Of Stipulation To Extend Arbitrator's Jurisdiction; Filed By Plaintiff Boro, Albert
                        Blank 11 Filed: 4/7/2003, Entered: 4/7/2003
                        Paid Fee For The Stipulation To Extend Arbitrator's Jurisdiction And Order Thereof; Filed By Plaintiff Boro, Albert
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Order To Show Cause Re: Arbitration (c)
                          Arbitration Order To Show Cause Set For Jun-23-2003 At 3:30 Pm In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Notice Of Appointment Of Arbitrator (crc 1605)
                            Arbitrator Robert Stephen Wood Appointed. Arbitrator's Jurisdiction Feb-20-2003 Through May-21-2003.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 8 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                              Plaintiff(s) Rejected Proposed Arbitrator Ralph Rhoades.
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/3/2003, Entered: 2/3/2003 Notice Of Random Selection From Panel Of Arbitrators
                                Panel Of Arbitrators Assigned. Rejection Date Feb-13-2003.
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Order To Arbitration And Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference
                                  Assigned To Arbitration For Feb-03-2003. Pre-arbitration Settlement Conference Set For Mar-10-2003 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Dec-06-2002 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002
                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Massara, Mark Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 4.0 Days
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002
                                      Case Management Statement Jury Requested By The Pltf Filed By Plaintiff Boro, Albert Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 4.0 Days
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/23/2002, Entered: 9/23/2002 Answer
                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Massara, Mark
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 8/29/2002, Entered: 8/29/2002
                                          Proof Of Service Of Summons And Complaint, Not To Pltff,sf Adr Procedures, Stip. To Adr, Case Management Ststement Filed By Plaintiff Boro, Albert Served Aug-24-2002, Personal Service On Defendant Massara, Mark
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/2/2002, Entered: 7/2/2002 Complaint
                                            Personal Injury/property Damage - Vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Boro, Albert As To Defendant Massara, Mark Does 1 To 20 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Dec-06-2002 Proof Of Service Due On Sep-03-2002 Case Management Statement Due On Nov-21-2002
                                              Request RequestSpace

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?