Catherine Jensen Thornton v. Raymond James & Associates, Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 02 409834
Superior Court Judge A James Robertson Ii, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Leet, W. Carlos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leet, W. Carlos +1 408 739 7391

Toggle Switch Represented by Olimpia, Whelan, Lively & Ryan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Filon Ryan +1 650 691 1430 +1 650 968 2685 jr@ryansteiner.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 100 Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Raffa, George An Individual, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keesal, Young & Logan, APC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
Cause of Action Civil Rights
  Entries (82) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (7) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 82 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006
Order To Show Cause To All Counsel And Parties In Propria Persona For Failure To Complete Arbitration Is Ordered Off Calendar/dismissal On File. Proceedings Not Reported. (212)
    Blank 81 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: 8/10/2006
    Mini-minutes For Aug-10-2006 10:30 Am For Dept 212
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: 7/28/2006 Dismissal Of Entire Action
      Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 79 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006
        Dismissal With Prejudice Of 1st Amended Complaint As To Defendant Raffa, George An Individual
          Blank 78 Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: 3/13/2006
          Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual
            Blank 77 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006
            Law And Motion, 302,plaintiff Catherine Thornton, Motion To Disqualify Defense Counsel. Off Calendar Per Moving Party. (302/req/ju)beldon Yee #2647
              Blank 76 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: 2/23/2006
              Mini-minutes For Feb-23-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/10/2006, Entered: 2/10/2006 Order To Show Cause \- Miscellaneous
                Order To Show Cause To All Counsel And Parties In Propria Persona Set For Feb-09-2006 Continued To Aug-10-2006 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Feb-09-2006 Miscellaneous Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 74 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
                  Declaration Of Christopher A. Stecher In Supp Of Deft's Opposition To Pltf's Mtn To Disqualify Defense Counsel; Pos Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                    Blank 73 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
                    Opposition To Pltf's Mtn To Disqualify Defense Counsel Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                      Blank 72 Filed: 2/8/2006, Entered: 2/8/2006
                      Declaration Of Julie L. Taylor In Supp Of Deft's Opposition To Pltf's Mtn To Disqualify Defense Counsel Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                        Blank 71 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006
                        Substitution Of Attorney: Leet, W. Carlos Substituted For Ryan, Jeffrey Filon As Attorney For Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual
                          Blank 70 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: 1/31/2006
                          Proof Of Personal Service Of Motion To Disqualify Defense Counsel, Declarations & Memo Of P&a In Support Thereof Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual
                            Blank 69 Filed: 1/30/2006, Entered: 1/30/2006
                            Ntc Of Mtn And Mtn To Disqualify Defense Counsel, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual Hearing Set For Feb-23-2006 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                              Blank 68 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006
                              Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                Blank 67 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: 1/20/2006
                                Response To Osc Re: Miscellaneous Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/15/2005, Entered: 8/15/2005 Order To Show Cause \- Miscellaneous
                                  Order To Show Cause To All Counsel And Parties In Propria Persona Set For Aug-11-2005 Continued To Feb-09-2006 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Aug-11-2005 Miscellaneous Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 65 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                    Mini-minutes For Aug-11-2005 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                      Blank 64 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: 7/21/2005
                                      Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                        Blank 63 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005
                                        Response To Order To Show Cause (supplemental) Re: Miscellaneous Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005 Order To Show Cause \- Miscellaneous
                                          Order To Show Cause To All Counsel And Parties In Propria Persona Set For Apr-21-2005 Continued To Aug-11-2005 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Apr-21-2005 Miscellaneous Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 61 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005
                                            Mini-minutes For Apr-21-2005 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                              Blank 60 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
                                              Response To Order To Show Cause Re Misc. Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual
                                                Blank 59 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
                                                Response Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Order To Show Cause \- Miscellaneous
                                                  Order To Show Cause To All Counsel And Parties In Propria Persona Set For Apr-21-2005 In Department 212 At 10:30 Am For Failure To Complete Arbitration. The Mar-11-2005 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 57 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005
                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation
                                                      Blank 56 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005
                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 14.0 Days
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Order
                                                        Order Denying Petition For Writ Of Mandate And/or Prohibition A108314
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: 11/22/2004 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                          Case Management Conference Of Dec-03-2004 Continued To Mar-11-2005 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 53 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004
                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                                              Blank 52 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004
                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 14.0 Days
                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 9/29/2004
                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Denying Pltf's Mo To Lift Stay & Revive Proceedings Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Order
                                                                  Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion To Lift Stay And Revive Proceedings
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                    Case Management Conference Of Oct-01-2004 Continued To Dec-03-2004 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 48 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004
                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                                                        Blank 47 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004
                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 14.0 Days
                                                                          Blank 46 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004
                                                                          Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Catherine Thornton Notice Of Motion To Lift Stay And Revive Proceedings Where Selected Arbiter Has Refused To Arbitrate Claims. Appearances: Plaintiff & Defendant. Argued And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling-deny. Prevailing Party To Prepare Order. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Beldon Yee, Csr #2647
                                                                            Blank 45 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004
                                                                            Mini-minutes For Aug-26-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                              Case Management Conference Of Aug-27-2004 Continued To Oct-01-2004 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Blank 43 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004
                                                                                Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Catherine Thornton Motion To Lift Stay And Revive Proceedings Where Selected Arbiter Has Refused To Arbitrate Claims Continued From Aug-12-2004 To Law And Motion At Aug-26-2004, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302, To Be Heard By The Honorable Ronald Evans Quidachay. Hon. Paul H. Alvarado. Reporter: Robert Balian, Csr #5220
                                                                                  Blank 42 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004
                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Aug-12-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                    Blank 41 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004
                                                                                    Reply To Opposition To Lift Stay & Revive Proceedings Where Selected Arbiter Has Refused To Arbitrate Claims Filed By Pltf
                                                                                      Blank 40 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004
                                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 14.0 Days
                                                                                        Blank 39 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004
                                                                                        Opposition Pltf's Motion To Lift Stay And Revive Proceedings Filed By Defts Raymond James & Associates, Inc. And George Raffa's
                                                                                          Blank 38 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004
                                                                                          Declaration Of Christopher A. Stecher In Support Of Defts' Opposition To Pltf's Motion To Lift Stay And Revive Proceedings Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                                                                            Blank 37 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004
                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                                                                              Blank 36 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004
                                                                                              Notice Of Motion To Lift Stay; Motion To Lift Stay And Revive Proceedings Where Selected Arbiter Has Refused To Arbitratwe Claims, Proof Of Service, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual Hearing Set For Aug-12-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/3/2004, Entered: 2/3/2004 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                Case Management Conference Of Feb-13-2004 Continued To Aug-27-2004 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004
                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                                                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 1/16/2004, Entered: 1/16/2004
                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 14.0 Days
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 9/12/2003, Entered: 9/12/2003
                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Clarification Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/8/2003, Entered: 9/8/2003 Order
                                                                                                        Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion For Clarification
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                          Law And Motion 503, Re-ntc Of Mo For Clarification Of The Court's Order Of November 21,2002 And For Further Instructions; Plaintiff's Motion Heard Friday, 22aug2003, D-503; W. Carlos Leet, Esq. Appears For Plaintiff; Christopher A. Stecher, Esq. Appears For Defendant; The Court Entertains Argument On The Motion By Both Sides And Thereupon Denies Plaintiff's Motion For Clarification Of Order And Further Instructions After Matter Is Submitted; Defense Counsel Stecher Is Ordered By The Court To Prepare And Submit The Order For Signature. Judge: Hon. A. James Robertson Ii; Reporter: Patricia M. Evezich, Csr #1193; Clerk: Marjorie Manzella (d-503, Fri., 22aug2003).
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/22/2003, Entered: 8/22/2003 Minutes
                                                                                                            Minutes For Aug-22-2003 11:00 Am For Dept 503
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003
                                                                                                              Re-ntc Of Mo For Clarification Of The Court's Order Of November 21,2002 And For Further Instructions Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual Hearing Set For Aug-22-2003 At 11:00 Am In Dept 503
                                                                                                                Blank 27 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003
                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Jun-30-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                  Blank 26 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003
                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Jun-30-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Law And Motion, 302, Plaintiff Catherine Thornton Motion Amended Notice For Clarification Of The Court's Order And For Further Instruction - Off Calendar, November 21 Order Signed By Judge Robertson. Moving Party To Recalendar In Dept. 503. Hon. David A. Garcia. Reporter: Joseph Vickstein, Csr #4780
                                                                                                                      Blank 24 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Law And Motion, 302, Plaintiff Catherine Thornton For Clarification Of The Court's Order Of November 21, 2002 And For Further Instructions - Off Calendar, November 21 Order Signed By Judge Robertson. Moving Party To Recalendar In Dept. 503. Hon. David A. Garcia. Reporter: Joseph Vickstein, Csr #4780
                                                                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 6/25/2003, Entered: 6/25/2003
                                                                                                                        Reply Brief In Support Of Motion For Clarification Of The Court's Order Of November 21, 2002, And For Further Instructions Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual
                                                                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 6/20/2003, Entered: 6/20/2003
                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Christopher A. Stecher In Support Of Defendant's Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Clarification And Further Instructions Regarding Order Compelling Arbitration;opposition To Motion Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation
                                                                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 6/11/2003, Entered: 6/11/2003
                                                                                                                            Motion Amended; Notice For Clarification Of The Court's Order And For Further Instruction, Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual Hearing Set For Jun-30-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                              Case Management Conference Of Jun-20-2003 Continued To Feb-13-2004 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Blank 19 Filed: 6/9/2003, Entered: 6/9/2003
                                                                                                                                For Clarification Of The Court's Order Of November 21,2002 And For Further Instructions, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual Hearing Set For Jun-30-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 6/5/2003, Entered: 6/5/2003
                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 14.0 Days
                                                                                                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003
                                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation
                                                                                                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003
                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Order Granting Petitioners And Defendants Raymond James & Associates, Inc. And George Raffa's Petition To Compel Arbitration And Motion To Stay Proceedings
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                        Case Management Conference Of Dec-06-2002 Continued To Jun-20-2003 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Petitioners And Defendants Raymond James & Associates, Inc. And George Raffa's Petition To Compel Arbitration And Motion To Stay Proceedings (no Sase - 302 Outbox)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 11/14/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002
                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual
                                                                                                                                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002
                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement Estimated Trial Time N/a Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                                                                                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002
                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion 302, Defendants Raymond James & Associates, Inc. And George Raffa' S Petition To Compel Arbitration And Notice Of Motion To Stay Proceedings: No Appearance On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling (granted). (302/jjm/ks(ex)) Court Reporter Eric L. Throne, Csr #7855
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002
                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Oct-10-2002 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002
                                                                                                                                                    Reply Brief In Support Of Their Petition To Compel Arbitration And Motion To Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/4/2002
                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Julie L Taylor In Support Of Defts Reply Brief In Support Of Their Petition To Compel Arbitration And Motion To Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 9/30/2002, Entered: 9/30/2002
                                                                                                                                                        Opposition To Defendant's Petition To Compel Arbitration And Motion To Stay Proceedings;declaration Of Catherine Thorton In Support;declaration Of Carlos Leet; Appendix Of Federal Cases Cited Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 9/13/2002, Entered: 9/13/2002
                                                                                                                                                          Petition To Compel Arbitration And Notice Of Motion To Stay Proceedings, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual Hearing Set For Oct-10-2002 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                            Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 8/22/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002
                                                                                                                                                              Notice And Acknowledgment Of Receipt Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: 8/7/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual As To Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual Does 1 To 100 Inclusive
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/3/2002, Entered: 7/3/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                    Civil Rights, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Thornton, Catherine Jensen An Individual As To Defendant Raymond James & Associates, Inc. A Florida Corporation Raffa, George An Individual Does 1 To 100 Inclusive Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Dec-06-2002 Proof Of Service Due On Sep-03-2002 Case Management Statement Due On Nov-21-2002

                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?