James Carlson v. Asbestos Defendants (bhc) Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 02 412166
Superior Court Judge Donna J. Hitchens, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carlson, James, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Ezrin, Joshua C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DAVID R. DONADIO +1 415 898 1555 +1 415 898 1247 ddonadio@braytonlaw.com
v.
ABB Inc. ABB Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Abb Inc. Formerly Known As Elsag Bailey, Inc."
No Logo Abb Inc. Which Will Do Business In Ca. As Abb De Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Albay Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Alexander & Baldwin, Defendant
No Logo Allis-chalmers, Defendant
No Logo Allis-chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust A Corporation, Erroneously Sued Herein As Allis-chalmers, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sekelick, Peter W.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth J. McCarthy +1 510 285 2500 kjm@knoxricksen.com
American Honda Motor Company, Inc. American Honda Motor Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "American Honda Motor Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph Wells Robinson +1 415 433 0990 +1 415 434 1370 Ralph.Robinson@wilsonelser.com
No Logo American President Lines, Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Apl Ltd., Defendant
No Logo Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Poole & Shaffery LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John H Shaffery +1 213 439 5390 +1 213 439 0183 jshaffery@pooleshaffery.com
No Logo Asbestos Corporation Limited, Defendant
No Logo Asbestos Defendants (bhc), Defendant
No Logo Baldor Electric Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skinner, Jeffrey Albert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mckeown, Francis Mcclintock +1 415 391 4200
Cargill, Inc. Cargill, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Demand Tec Inc.
Unknown Role, Robcor Properties Inc
Unknown Role, Gns I (us) Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene C Blackard, Jr. +1 925 930 6600 +1 925 930 6620 eblackard@archernorris.com
Caterpillar, Inc. Caterpillar, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Asv Inc /mn/

Toggle Switch Represented by Marchant, John Bertrand

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES T. SHELDON +1 415 781 7900 +1 415 781 2635 charles.sheldon@sedgwicklaw.com
No Logo Certain-teed Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oberg, Lisa L +1 415 267 4000
No Logo Chevron Products Company, Defendant
No Logo Chevron Shipping Company, Defendant
No Logo Csk Auto, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Glaspy & Glaspy, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Glaspy, David Michael
No Logo CUTLER-HAMMER Inc., Defendant

Represented by Howard Rome Martin & Ridley, LLP

No Logo DaimlerChrysler Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Thelen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kuenster, Jennifer A.
No Logo Dana Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brydon Hugo and Parker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward R Hugo +1 415 388 9762

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oberg, Lisa L +1 415 267 4000
No Logo Dayton Electric Manufacturing Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Dayton Electric Manufacturing Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Logan, Peter Burton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Burton Logan ,. +1 415 391 7111 +1 415 391 8766 PLogan@WrightRobinson.com
No Logo Does 1 To 800, Defendant
Eaton Corporation Eaton Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Howard Rome Martin & Ridley, LLP

No Logo Electrical Insulation Suppliers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Emerson Electric Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GARY D. SHARP +1 248 721 4200 +MDL TER MINATED gsharp@foleymansfield.com
No Logo Flowserve Us Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Fmc Corporation-turbo Pump Operation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McNamara Dodge Ney Beatty Slattery Pfalzer Borges & Brothers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas E Pfalzer +1 415 939 5330
Ford Motor Company Ford Motor Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, Vastera, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Thelen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen A Henry +1 415 371 1200
No Logo Foster Wheeler Llc (survivor To A Merger With Foster Wheeler Corporation) Only., Defendant
No Logo Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Gatke Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bennett Samuelsen Reynolds & Allard PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reynolds, Richard Leroy +1 510 444 7688 +1 510 444 5849
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Grace Genson Cosgrove & Schirm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip R Cosgrove +1 213 533 5400 +1 213 533 5444 pcosgrove@ggcs.net
Georgia-Pacific Corporation Georgia-Pacific Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Granger Supply Company Inc., Defendant
No Logo GRAYBAR ELECTRIC COMPANY, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Archer Norris, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene C Blackard, Jr. +1 925 930 6600 +1 925 930 6620 eblackard@archernorris.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Berry & Berry

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Vacchina, Leonardo J +1 510 250 0200
Honeywell International, Inc. Honeywell International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Biderman, David T

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David T Biderman +1 213 824 9981

Toggle Switch Represented by Hassard Bonnington LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Mitchell Hamblett +1 415 288 9800 rmh@hassard.com
No Logo Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Ingersoll-Rand Company Ingersoll-Rand Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gordon & Rees LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Pietrykowski +1 415 986 5900 +1 415 986 8054 mpietrykowski@gordonrees.com
No Logo Itt Industries, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Jacuzzi Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Burnham Brown

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rohit A. Sabnis +1 510 444 6800 rsabnis@burnhambrown.com
Kellogg North America Company Kellogg North America Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kellogg Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Filice Brown Eassa & McLeod LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eugene Brown +1 510 444 3131
No Logo Leeson Electric Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Jackson and Wallace

No Logo Limitorque Corporation,, Defendant
No Logo Matson Navigation Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Colombatto, Klimenko & Rosse

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colombatto, Paul Richard +1 415 391 6182

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oberg, Lisa L +1 415 267 4000
No Logo Milligan-spika Company, Defendant
No Logo Mitsubishi Fuso Truck Of America,inc., Defendant
No Logo Mitsubishi Motor Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Mitsubishi Motor Manufacturing Of America,inc., Defendant
No Logo Mitsubishi Motor R&d Of America,inc., Defendant
No Logo Mitsubishi Motor Sales Of America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mitsubishi Motors America,inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becherer Kannett & Schweitzer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheila D Kelley +1 510 658 3600
No Logo Mitsubishi Motors Austrialia,inc., Defendant
No Logo Mitsubishi Motors North America, Defendant
No Logo Morton International, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Autoliv Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Nicora & Minor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy James Minor +1 831 622 2000

Toggle Switch Represented by Lombardo & Gilles, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A Gobell +1 831 754 2444
No Logo Morton Salt Company, Defendant
Nissan North America, Inc. Nissan North America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Becherer Kannett & Schweitzer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheila D Kelley +1 510 658 3600
Occidental Chemical Corporation Occidental Chemical Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barg Coffin Lewis & Trapp, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen Crawford Lewis +1 415 228 5400 +1 415 228 5450 scl@bcltlaw.com
No Logo Oceanic Steamship Company, The, Defendant
No Logo Osram Sylvania, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hassard Bonnington LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Mitchell Hamblett +1 415 288 9800 rmh@hassard.com
No Logo Owens-illinois Glass Company, Defendant
No Logo Parker Hannifin Corporation As Product Successors To Eis Brake Parts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Towle, Denison, Smith & Tavera LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edmund J Towle, III +1 310 446 5445 +1 310 446 5447 etowle@tdsmlaw.com
No Logo Pcc Flow Technologies, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Joseph Powers +1 415 397 1795
No Logo Pes Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pneumo Abex Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens, Drummond & Gifford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Allan Gifford +1 510 944 5550
No Logo Pneumo Abex Corporation, Successor In Interest To Abex Corporation Only., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stevens, Drummond & Gifford

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kapp, Lysle J +1 925 944 5550
No Logo Potter Electric,inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Adams, Barbara Rose

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Adams, Barbara Rose +1 415 982 8955
No Logo Quintec Industries, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Walsworth Franklin Bevins & McCall

No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Booth Beers +1 202 346 4000 +1 202 346 4444 dbeers@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keele, Christopher A. +1 415 617 8900
No Logo Reliance Electric Industrial Company, Defendant
No Logo REXAM BEVERAGE CAN COMPANY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sheppard Mullin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mcdaniel, Marietta Elizabeth +1 415 434 9100

Toggle Switch Represented by Trock, Alan L

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alan Lawrence Trock +1 661 253 0075 alantrock@mindspring.com
No Logo Rockwell Automation Inc. Served As Bradley Company, Defendant
No Logo Rockwell Automation, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Booth Beers +1 202 346 4000 +1 202 346 4444 dbeers@goodwinprocter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stoel Rives, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keele, Christopher A. +1 415 617 8900
No Logo Seariver Maritime, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Armstrong & Associates, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William H. Armstrong +1 510 433 1830 +1 510 433 1836 bill.armstrong@armstrongetal.com
No Logo Sew Eurodrive, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP

No Logo Square D Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bassi Martini Edlin & Blum, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert J Ryan +1 415 362 5116
No Logo Standard Motor Products As Product Successors To Eis Brake Parts, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Towle, Denison, Smith & Tavera LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edmund J Towle, III +1 310 446 5445 +1 310 446 5447 etowle@tdsmlaw.com
No Logo Standard Motor Products, Inc And Parker-hannifin Corporation, As Successor To Eis Brake Parts Only., Defendant
The Dow Chemical Company The Dow Chemical Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mcleod, Bruce Edwin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mcleod, Bruce Edwin +1 510 444 3131
No Logo The Lincoln Electric Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crosby, Heafey, Roach & May, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Norris, Albert B +1 213 457 8000
No Logo Thomas Dee Engineering Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Thomas Dee Engineering Company"

Represented by Walsworth Franklin Bevins & McCall

No Logo Todd Shipyards Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Yaron & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Dimitri Yaron, Jr. +1 415 658 2929 +1 415 658 2930 gyaron@yaronlaw.com
No Logo Toshiba International Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ralph Wells Robinson +1 415 433 0990 +1 415 434 1370 Ralph.Robinson@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Triple A Machine Shop, Inc., Defendant
Union Carbide Corporation Union Carbide Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Oberg, Lisa L +1 415 267 4000
No Logo Unocal Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Viacom Inc., Successor By Merger To Cbs Corp. , F/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pond North LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pond, Frank D +1 213 617 6170
No Logo Vic Hubbard Speed And Marine Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Western Fiberglas Supply Company, Defendant
No Logo Western Fibrous Glass Products Company (westglas), Defendant
No Logo Anchor Packing Company,, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Anchor Packing Company, The"
No Logo Thomas Dee Engineering Company Inc., Cross-Complainant
Officially listed as "Thomas Dee Engineering Company"

Represented by Walsworth Franklin Bevins & McCall

Cause of Action Asbestos
  Entries (360) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (94) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 360 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: 1/27/2010 Order
Order Directing Clerk To Enter Dismissals (filed In Case No. Cgc-82-828684) In The Cases Attached In Exhibit A
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 1/21/2010, Entered: 1/21/2010 Request For Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Entire Action Of All Partie
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice [see Attached Exhibit A] (transaction Id # 29131944)
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 358 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006
      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Limitorque Corporation
        Blank 357 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: 5/16/2006
        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Flowserve Us Inc.
          Blank 356 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Court Filing
          Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On May-06-2005 In Dept. 608, General Motors Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Off Calendar No Appearances, Calendar Sweep. Judge Tomar Mason, Clerk Melinka Jones, Not Reported. (608)
            Blank 355 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: 4/26/2006 Court Filing
            Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On May-06-2005 In Dept. 608, Ford Motor Company's Motion For Summary Judgment Is Off Calendar. No Appearances, Calendar Sweep. Judge Tomar Mason, Clerk Melinka Jones, Not Reported. (608)
              Blank 354 Filed: 4/14/2006, Entered: 4/14/2006
              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint (each Party To Bear Its Own Costs) As To Defendant Quintec Industries, Inc. Western Fibrous Glass Products Company (westglas) Western Fiberglas Supply Company
                Blank 353 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: 4/6/2006
                Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Rockwell Automation Inc. Served As Bradley Company
                  Blank 352 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006
                  Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Allis-chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust A Corporation, Erroneously Sued Herein As Allis-chalmers
                    Blank 351 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: 3/20/2006
                    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Itt Industries,inc.
                      Blank 350 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: 2/17/2006
                      Refund/reimbursement Of $150.00 For Transaction B8805413j003 (jury Fees), Payable To Brayton Purcell, Tag 26711, Prsp06500363, Warrant #03102000, Dated Feb-17-2006
                        Blank 349 Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: 2/15/2006
                        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Emerson Electric Company, Inc.
                          Blank 348 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: 2/3/2006
                          Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Potter Electric,inc.
                            Blank 347 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: 1/23/2006
                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Emerson Electric Company, Inc.
                              Blank 346 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006
                              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Reliance Electric Company
                                Blank 345 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: 1/18/2006
                                Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.
                                  Blank 344 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: 1/13/2006
                                  Removed From Asbestos Jury Trial Calendar Set For Jan-13-2006. Settled Per Dave Donadio, Counsel For Plaintiff. (505)
                                    Blank 343 Filed: 1/11/2006, Entered: 1/11/2006 Court Filing
                                    Asbestos Jury Trial Held Jan-11-2006. Continued To Jan-13-2006 At 1:30 Pm In 505. Judge John E. Munter;clerk T.maruyama (505)
                                      Blank 342 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006 Court Filing
                                      Asbestos Jury Trial Assigned Jan-10-2006. Defendants Made No Appearance. Continued To Jan-11-2006 At 9:30 Am In 505. Judge John E. Munter;clerk T.maruyama (505)
                                        Blank 341 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: 1/10/2006
                                        Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Of Jan-09-2006 Assigned To Asbestos Jury Trial Calendar On Jan-10-2006 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 505, John E. Munter After Being Put On Telephone Standby. Brayton Group 313 Liv/asb. (17 Cases). Lead Case #400079 Boyum V. Asbestos Defts. (206)
                                          Blank 340 Filed: 12/1/2005, Entered: 12/1/2005
                                          Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Pcc Flow Technologies L.p.
                                            Blank 339 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 Court Filing
                                            Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Nov-28-2005 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Jan-09-2006 At 11:15 Am In 206 On The Court's Own Motion. Brayton Group 313 Liv/asb Lead Case 400079 Boyum V. Asbestos Defendants. Judge Robert L. Dondero; Clerk: Vmu/dlok/dokazaki; Reporter: Joann Bryce, Csr #3321 (206)
                                              Blank 338 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Court Filing
                                              Settlement Conference Held (minutes In Lead Case 400079 Boyum) On Nov-16-2005 In 502 And Settlement Negotiations Have Failed. Matter Assigned To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos Calendar On Nov-28-2005 At 11:15 Am In Dept. 206. (502 Judge C. Mitchell; Clerk: Linda Espy/nancy Regas; Not Reported)
                                                Blank 337 Filed: 10/31/2005, Entered: 10/31/2005
                                                Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc.
                                                  Blank 336 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005
                                                  Refund/reimbursement Of $150.00 For Transaction B5105421j003 (jury Fees), Payable To Logan Law Group, Tag 15802, Otsp06000455, Warrant #30302225, Dated Oct-28-2005
                                                    Blank 335 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: 10/26/2005 Court Filing
                                                    Asbestos Settlement Conference Held On Oct-26-2005 For Brayton 313 (lead Case400079 Boyum) & Continued To Nov-16-2005 At 1:30 Pm In 502 (502 Judge C. Mitchell; Clerk: Linda Espy; Not Reported)
                                                      Blank 334 Filed: 10/25/2005, Entered: 10/25/2005
                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Dayton Electric Manufacturing Co.
                                                        Blank 333 Filed: 10/17/2005, Entered: 10/17/2005
                                                        Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Dayton Electric Manufacturing Co.
                                                          Blank 332 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005
                                                          Asbestos Settlement Conference Set For Oct-12-2005 Continued To Oct-26-2005 At 1:30 Pm In 502
                                                            Blank 331 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005
                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Garlock Sealing Technologies, Llc
                                                              Blank 330 Filed: 9/21/2005, Entered: 9/21/2005
                                                              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Csk Auto,inc.
                                                                Blank 329 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/9/2005
                                                                Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Gatke Corporation
                                                                  Legal Document 328 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Answer
                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Quintec Industries, Inc.
                                                                    Blank 327 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005
                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                      Blank 326 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005
                                                                      Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                        Blank 325 Filed: 8/19/2005, Entered: 8/19/2005
                                                                        Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On May-06-2005 In Dept. 608, Motion For Summary Judgment Off Calendar Per Written Request Of Moving Party, Daimlerchrysler Corp.; Dept. 304, Clerk-beth Wilber
                                                                          Blank 324 Filed: 8/17/2005, Entered: 8/17/2005 Court Filing
                                                                          Asbestos Settlement Conference Held On Aug-17-2005 Continued To Oct-12-2005 At 1:30 Pm In 502(502 Judge C. Mitchell; Clerk: Linda Espy; Not Reported)
                                                                            Blank 323 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005
                                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Foster Wheeler Llc (survivor To A Merger With Foster Wheeler Corporation) Only.
                                                                              Blank 322 Filed: 8/12/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005
                                                                              Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On May-06-2005 In Dept. 608, Motion For Summary Judgment Off Calendar Per Plaintiff's Written Request, Pneumo Abex Dismissed; Dept. 304, Clerk-beth Wilber
                                                                                Blank 321 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
                                                                                  Blank 320 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Toshiba International Corporation
                                                                                    Blank 319 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005
                                                                                    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Abb Inc. Formerly Known As Elsag Bailey, Inc.
                                                                                      Blank 318 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005
                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Baldor Electric Company
                                                                                        Blank 317 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005
                                                                                        Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered, Declaration Of Non-military Status As To Defendant Pes Enterprises, Inc.
                                                                                          Blank 316 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005
                                                                                          Proof Of Service Of Statement Of Damages Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James Served Jun-10-2005, Personal Service On Defendant Pes Enterprises, Inc.
                                                                                            Blank 315 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005
                                                                                            Statement Of Damages Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James As To Defendant Pes Enterprises, Inc.
                                                                                              Blank 314 Filed: 8/4/2005, Entered: 8/4/2005
                                                                                              Summons On Complaint Amendment To Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James Served Aug-12-2004, Personal Service On Defendant Pes Enterprises, Inc.
                                                                                                Blank 313 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                Asbestos Settlement Conference (brayton 313) Held Onaug-03-2005 Continued To Aug-17-2005 At 1:30 Pm In 502 (502 Judge C. Mitchell; Clerk: Linda Espy; Not Reported)
                                                                                                  Blank 312 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005
                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Triple A Machine Shop, Inc.
                                                                                                    Blank 311 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005
                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Kellogg Company
                                                                                                      Blank 310 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                      Asbestos Settlement Conference Held On Jul-13-2005 And Continued To Aug-03-2005 At 1:30 Pm In 502 (502 Judge C. Mitchell; Clerk: Linda Espy; Not Reported)
                                                                                                        Blank 309 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                        Asbestos Settlement Conference Was Held On Jun-29-2005 And Continued To Jul-13-2005 At 1:30 Pm In 502 (502 Judge C. Mitchell; Clerk: Linda Espy; Not Reported)
                                                                                                          Blank 308 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005
                                                                                                          Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Viacom Inc., Successor By Merger To Cbs Corp. , F/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
                                                                                                            Blank 307 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005
                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Leeson Electric Corporation
                                                                                                              Blank 306 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                              Removed From Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For Jun-20-2005 - Matter Set For Asbestos Settlement Conference In Dept. 502 On 6/29/05 At 1:30 P.m. Brayton Group 313 Liv/asb. Lead Case #400079 Boyum V. Asb. Defts. All Parties Ordered To Appear With Representative With Authority To Settle. Plaintiff(s) To Make Demand To Each Defendant By 4:00 P.m. On 6/23/05. Defendant(s) To Make Counter Demand To Plaintiff By Noon On 6/27/05. Matter To Remain In Dept. 502 Until All Settlement Discussions Have Been Exhausted. Judge Robert L. Dondero; Clerks: V. Mu/d. Okazaki; Reporter: Joann Bryce, Csr #3221 (206)
                                                                                                                Blank 305 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Set For Jun-29-2005 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 502 From The 6/20/05 Trial Calendar. Brayton Group 313 Liv/asb. Lead Case #400079 Boyum V. Asb. Defts. All Parties Ordered To Appear With Representative With Authority To Settle. Plaintiff(s) To Make Demand To Each Defendant By 4:00 P.m. On 6/23/05. Defendant(s) To Make Counter Demand To Plaintiff By Noon On 6/27/05. Matter To Remain In Dept. 502 Until All Settlement Discussions Have Been Exhausted. Judge Robert L. Dondero; Clerks: V. Mu/d. Okazaki; Reporter: Joann Bryce, Csr #3221 (206)
                                                                                                                  Blank 304 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005
                                                                                                                  Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Vic Hubbard Speed And Marine Corporation
                                                                                                                    Blank 303 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005
                                                                                                                    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Rexam Beverage Can Company
                                                                                                                      Blank 302 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                        Blank 301 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005
                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Asbestos Corporation Limited
                                                                                                                          Blank 300 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005
                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Honeywell International Inc
                                                                                                                            Blank 299 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005
                                                                                                                            Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On May-06-2005 In Dept. 608, Motion For Summary Judgment By Caterpillar Inc. Off Calendar. No Appearance.
                                                                                                                              Blank 298 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005
                                                                                                                              Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On May-06-2005 In Dept. 608, Motion For Summary Judgment By Fmc Corp. - Turbo Pump Operation Off Calendar. No Appearance.
                                                                                                                                Blank 297 Filed: 5/17/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005
                                                                                                                                Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On May-06-2005 In Dept. 608, Motion For Summary Judgment By Leeson Electric Off Calendar By The Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                  Blank 296 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005
                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On May-06-2005 In Dept. 608, Motion For Summary Judgment By Occidental Chemical Corp. Off Calendar By The Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                    Blank 295 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005
                                                                                                                                    Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On May-06-2005 In Dept. 608, Motion For Summary Judgment By Ingersoll Rand Co. Off Calendar By The Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                      Blank 294 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005
                                                                                                                                      Asbestos Expedited Summary Judgment Calendar On May-06-2005 In Dept. 608, Motion For Summary Judgment By Certainteed Corp. Off Calendar By The Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                        Blank 293 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/16/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        Master Jury Asbestos Calendar Set For May-16-2005 Continued To Master Calendar Jury Asbestos On Jun-20-2005 At 11:15 Am In 206. Brayton Group 313 Liv/asb. Lead Case #400079 Boyum V. Asbestos Defts. Continued On The Court's Own Motion. Judge Robert L. Dondero; Clerks: V. Mu/d. Lok; Reporter: Joann Bryce, Csr #3321 (206)
                                                                                                                                          Blank 292 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005
                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Keith E. Patterson In Support Of Deft Todd Shipyards Corp.'s Motion In Limine To Exclude Witnesses Not Identified During Discovery Filed By Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                                                                                            Blank 291 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005
                                                                                                                                            Declaration Of Keith E. Patterson In Support Of Deft's Motion In Limine To Exclude Documents Expected To Be Offered At Trial And P/a In Support Filed By Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 290 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                              Request For Default Rejected, Notice Mailed, As To Defendant Milligan-spika Company
                                                                                                                                                Blank 289 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                Summons Returned Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 288 Filed: 5/9/2005, Entered: 5/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                  Designation Of Motions In Limine Filed By Defendant Pcc Flow Technologies L.p.
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 287 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: 5/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Asbestos Mandatory Settlement Conference Held For The Cases In Brayton Group 313 On May-06-2005 In Dept. 304 - These Cases Did Not Settle. Judge Richard Kramer, Clerk Andrea Carney, Not Reported
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 286 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                      Summons Returned Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 285 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Caterpillar Inc.
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 284 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 Unknown document
                                                                                                                                                          Request For Default Rejected, Notice Mailed, As To Defendant Granger Supply Company Inc.
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 283 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 282 Filed: 5/3/2005, Entered: 5/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Fmc Corporation-turbo Pump Operation
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 281 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Ingersoll-rand Company
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 280 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant General Motors Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 279 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: 4/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Ford Motor Company
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 278 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: 4/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant American President Lines, Ltd. Apl Ltd. Matson Navigation Company, Inc. Oceanic Steamship Company, The Alexander & Baldwin
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 277 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 276 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 275 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 274 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: 4/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Certainteed Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 273 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc.'s, Motion For Summaru Judgment. Off Calendar Per Moving Party.(302/req)beldon Yee #2647
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 272 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Apr-22-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 271 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion 302, Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment -- Continued To April 22, 2004 Per Request Of Moving Party. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Beldon Yee, Csr #2647
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 270 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Apr-21-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 269 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                        Association Of Attorneys: Keele, Christopher A. Added As Attorney For Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 268 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                          Added To Calendar For Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Hearing Set For Apr-22-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 267 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                            Jury Fees, Tran # B5105421j003, Tag # 011999, Receipt Number 015802, Deposited By Defendant Dayton Electric Manufacturing Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 266 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                              Jury Fees, Tran # W2205419j018, Tag # 011986, Receipt Number 026767, Deposited By Defendant Honeywell International Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 265 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: 4/19/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Mail On Substitution Of Atty Filed By Defendant Rexam Beverage Can Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 264 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 263 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply To Plntfs' Opposition To Its Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 262 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service By Mail Of Opposition To Deft Cutler-hammer's Summary Judgment Motion, Marie Appel Declaration And Filings In Support Thereof Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 261 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Apr-15-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 260 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mini-minutes For Apr-15-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 259 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Apr-15-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 258 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Dana Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 257 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion 301, Defendant Union Carbide Corp.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Transferred From Dept. 302, Per Challenge) Granted; No Opposition Filed. Judge: Kevin Mccarthy, Reporter: Mitch Lyon, Csr #6840
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 256 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion, 301, Defendant Dana Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment Transferred From Dept.302, Per Challenge) Is Off Calendar Per Moving Party. Judge: Kevin Mccarthy, Reporter: Mitch Lyon, Csr #6840
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 255 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion 301, Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Transferred From Dept. 302, Per Challenge) Is Granted. Judge: Kevin Mccarthy, Reporter: Mitch Lyon, Csr #6840
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 254 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion 302, Defendant Union Carbide Corp., Motion For Summary Judgment. Transferred To Dept. 301.(302/req)beldon Yee # 2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 253 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion 302, Defendant Dana Corp., Motion For Summary Judgment. Transferred To Dept. 301.(302/req)beldon Yee # 2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 252 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion 302, Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.; Motion For Summary Judgment. Transferred To Dept. 301.(302/req)beldon Yee # 2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 251 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Union Carbide Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 250 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Apr-15-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 249 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Apr-15-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 248 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: 4/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Apr-15-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 247 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Eaton Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 246 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion 302, Defendant Toshiba International Corp., Motion For Summary Judgment. No Argument And The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling -- Grant-no Opposition Filed. Prevailing Party To Prepare Order. (302/req)beldon Yee #2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 245 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion 302, Defendant Toshiba International Corp., Motion For Summary Judgment. Duplicate Entry.(302/req)beldon Yee #2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 244 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion 302, Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.; Motion For Summary Judgment. No Appearances On This Matter. The Court Adopted Its Tentative Ruling - Grant-no Opposition Filed. Prevailing Party To Prepare Order.(302/req)beldon Yee # 2647
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 243 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Apr-14-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 242 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Apr-14-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 241 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Roger Genereux In Supp Of Deft Applied Industrial's Mtn For Summ Judgmnt Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 240 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Jury Fees, Tran # B8805413j003, Tag # 011916, Receipt Number 026711, Deposited By Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 239 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Apr-13-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 238 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Added To Calendar For Defendant Union Carbide Corporation Motion For Summary Judgment (transferred From Dept. 302, Per Challenge) Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 237 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Added To Calendar For Defendant Dana Corporation Motion For Summary Judgment (transferred From Dept. 302, Per Challenge) Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 236 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Added To Calendar For Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment (transferred From Dept. 302, Per Challenge) Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 235 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Personal Service (courier Delivery) Of Union Carbide Corp's Reply To Pltf's Failure To Oppose Expedited Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Certainteed Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 234 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Toshiba International Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 233 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: 4/12/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 232 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Personal Service Objection To Decl Of Ay; Reply To Opposition For Mtn For Summ Judgmnt; Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 231 Filed: 4/11/2005, Entered: 4/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Jacuzzi, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 230 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration Of Charles W Jenkins In Supp Of Deft's Reply To Pltf's Oppos To Mtn For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 229 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply To Pltf's Oppos To Mtn For Summary Judgment & Memo Of Pts Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 228 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection To The Declaration Of Charles Ay Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 PlaintiffsÂ’memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Defen
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Oppos To Deft's Mtn For Summary Judgment ** E-filed, Fid# 5582511 ** Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 226 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply To Pltfs' Failure To Oppose Expedited Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Union Carbide Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 225 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Law And Motion 302, Defendant Baldor Electric Co., Motion For Summary Judgment. Off Calendar Per Dismissal Without Prejudice 3/16/05.(302/req)gena Eales Csr #9176
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 224 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Apr-08-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 223 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Seariver Maritime's Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 222 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Jacuzzi, Inc's Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 221 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 220 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion, 302, Eaton Corporation's Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 219 Filed: 4/7/2005, Entered: 4/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion, 302, Defendant Greybar Electric Co.'s Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 218 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Stip & Order Continuing Deft Cutler-hammer's Mtn/sum/judgt Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 217 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos Motion For Expedited Summary Judgment By Caterpillar, Inc. Set For May-06-2005 Continued To May-06-2005 At 9:30 Am In 608 By The Court. (not Reported)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 216 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Asbestos Motion For Expedited Summary Judgment By General Motors Corp. Set For May-06-2005 Continued To May-06-2005 At 9:30 Am In 608 By The Court. (not Reported)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 215 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Asbestos Motion For Expedited Summary Judgment By Ford Motor Co. Set For May-06-2005 Continued To May-06-2005 At 9:30 Am In 608 By The Court. (not Reported)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 214 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Law And Motion, 302, Motion For Summary Judgment, Off Calendar Per Moving Party.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 213 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion 302, Motion For Summary Judgment Continued From Apr-15-2005 To Law And Motion At Apr-21-2005, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Per Ex Parte Order Of 4/05/05.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005 Stip And Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation And Order Continuing Hearing Date On Defendant Cutler-hammer, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 211 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation, Successor In Interest To Abex Corporation Only.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 210 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: 4/5/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Filing Fee Paid For Stipulation And [proposed] Order Continuing Hearing Date On Deft Cutler-hammer, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 209 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant The Lincoln Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 208 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Graybar Electric Company,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 207 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Jacuzzi, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 206 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Eaton Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 205 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of P&a In Opposition To Deft Applied Industrial Technologies, 's Motion For Summary Judgment; Declaration Of Emily M. Richdale Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 204 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Sew-eurodrive, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 203 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: 3/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal Without Prejudice Complaint. As To Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation, Successor In Interest To Abex Corporation Only.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 202 Filed: 3/25/2005, Entered: 3/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant General Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 201 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: 3/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Complaint. As To Defendant Daimlerchrysler Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 200 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Substitution Of Attorney: Trock, Alan L. Substituted For Mcdaniel Marietta E As Attorney For Rexam Beverage Can Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 199 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Seariver Maritime, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 198 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: 3/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion For Summary Judgment ; Memo Of P&a Filed In Support; Separate Statement Of Undisputed Material Facts Filed In Support; Declaration Of Randall K. Bernard Filed In Support; Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Toshiba International Corporation Hearing Set For Apr-14-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 197 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Baldor Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 196 Filed: 3/14/2005, Entered: 3/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Substitution Of Attorney: Choe, Jiyon Substituted For Jackson, Gabriel Anne As Attorney For Abb Inc. Which Will Do Business In Ca. As Abb De Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 195 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: 3/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Albay Construction Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 194 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Discovery 610, Defendant's Motion To Deem Request For Admission And Request For Monetary Sanctions: Off Calendar Per Request Of The Moving Party. Commissioner: Bruce E. Chan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 193 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Discovery 610, Defendant's Motion To Compel Responses To Request, Demand Inspection, Production Of Documents: Off Calendar Per Request Of The Moving Party. Commissioner: Bruce E. Chan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 192 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery 610, Defendant's Amended Motion To Compel Responses To Admission/interrogatories: Off Calendar Per Request Of The Moving Party. Commissioner: Bruce E. Chan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 191 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Discovery 610, Defendant's Amended Motion To Compel Responses To Admission/interrogatories: Off Calendar Per Request Of The Moving Party. Commissioner: Bruce E. Chan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 190 Filed: 3/9/2005, Entered: 3/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Association Of Attorneys: Vacchina, Leonardo J Added As Attorney For Graybar Electric Company,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 189 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Caterpillar Inc. Hearing Set For May-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 304
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 188 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proof Of Personal Service Of Notice Of Intent To Request Expedited Summ. Judgmt.; Thacker Declaration Filed By Defendant Leeson Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 187 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion For Summary Judgment (notice Of Intent To Request Expedited Summary Judgment); Declaration; Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Ingersoll-rand Company Hearing Set For May-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 608
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 186 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion For Summary Judgment (expedited), Proof Of Service, Declaration Filed By Defendant Certainteed Corporation Hearing Set For May-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 608
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 185 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 184 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion For Summary Judgment (notice Of Intent To Request Expedited Summary Judgment); Proof Of Service; Declaration Of Sergio Borgiotti Filed In Support Filed By Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation Hearing Set For May-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 608
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 183 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Proof Of Service Via Messenger Service Of Deft Seariver Maritime, Inc.'s Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment; Memo Of Pya; Separate Statemnt Of Undisputed Facts; Declaration Of Wn, , Armstrong; Declaration Of Stuart Mcrbbiie; Appendix Of Federal Authorites In Support Thereof Filed By Defendant Seariver Maritime, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 182 Filed: 2/25/2005, Entered: 2/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Declaration Notice Of Intent To Request Expedited Summary Judgment Pursuant To General Order 157 Filed By Defendant Leeson Electric Corporation Hearing Set For May-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 608
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 181 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint Each Party To Bear Its Own Costs As To Defendant Sew-eurodrive, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 180 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order Regarding Defendant Toshiba International Corporation's Motion To Vacate Or Sever Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 179 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: 2/23/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Asbestos Motion Calendar On Feb-23-2005 In Dept. 206, Motion To Vacate And/or Sever The Trial Date Off Calendar - Parties Agreed To Shortened Time (25 Days) To Notice Summary Judgment Motion. Order Signed. Trial Date Of 5/16/05 Remains. Hon. Robert Dondero; Clerks: V. Mu/d. Okazaki Reporter: Joann Bryce, #3321 (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 178 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply In Support Of Mtn To Vacate And/or Sever The Trial Date Filed By Defendant Toshiba International Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 177 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Personal Service Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Dana Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 176 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Personal Service Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Dana Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 175 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation Hearing Set For May-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 608
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 174 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Personal Service On Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 173 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: 2/9/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proofs Of Service Of Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendant Toshiba International Corporation's Motion To Vacate Or Sever Trial Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: 2/8/2005 Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendant Toshiba International Corporations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition To Deft Toshiba International Corporations Mtn To Vacate Or Sever Trial **e-filed, Fid #5106016** Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 171 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Discovery 610, Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. 4 Discovery Motions Have Been Continued To Mar-09-05 Per Renotice Filed Feb-01-05.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 170 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Discovery 610, Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. 4 Discovery Motions Have Been Continued To Mar-09-05 Per Renotice Filed Feb-01-05.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 169 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Discovery 610, Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. 4 Discovery Motions Have Been Continued To Mar-09-05 Per Renotice Filed Feb-01-05.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 168 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Discovery 610, Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. 4 Discovery Motions Have Been Continued To Mar-09-05 Per Renotice Filed Feb-01-05.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 167 Filed: 2/3/2005, Entered: 2/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc. Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 166 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Balance Of Fee Paid For Transaction B5105118m019 By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 165 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mtn To Deem Req For Admission By Deft, Applied Industrial; & Req For Monetary Sanctions (amended), Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Mar-09-2005 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 164 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion To Compel Responses To Request, Demand Inspection, Production Of Documents, Proof Of Service & Req For Sanctions (amended) Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Mar-09-2005 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 163 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended Motion To Compel Responses To Admission/interrogatories, Proof Of Service (special Interoggs) Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Mar-09-2005 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 162 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Motion To Compel Responses To Admission/interrogatories, Proof Of Service (form Interoggs) Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Mar-09-2005 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 161 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Personal Service Of Mtn For Summ Judgmnt; Supporting Docs Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 160 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion To Vacate And/or Sever The Trial Date, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Toshiba International Corporation Hearing Set For Feb-23-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 159 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Toshiba International Corporation Hearing Set For Apr-14-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 158 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Hearing Set For Apr-13-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 157 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant The Lincoln Electric Company Hearing Set For Apr-13-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 156 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service Notice Of Motion And Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Seariver Maritime, Inc. Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 155 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Peretory Challenge Of Judge - Honorable Ronald E. Quidachay Filed By Defendant Dana Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 154 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement (or In The Alt, For Summ. Adj. Of Issues); Filed With Volumes I And Ii Of Declaration Filed By Defendant Union Carbide Corporation Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 153 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Dana Corporation Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 152 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 151 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Metalclad Insulation Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 150 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Appendix Of Federal Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Seariver Maritime, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 149 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Stuart Mcrobbie In Support Of Defendant Seariver Maritime Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Seariver Maritime, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 148 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Declaration In Support Of Defendnat Seariver Maritime Inc.s Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Seariver Maritime, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 147 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Separate Statement Of Facts In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Seariver Maritime, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 146 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Seariver Maritime, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 145 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Mail Via Overnight Delivery On Ntc Of Mtn For Summary Judgm; Memo Of P & A; Decl; Index Of Documentary Evidence; [proposed] Order Filed By Defendant Jacuzzi, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 144 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Index Of Documentary Evidence In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgm Filed By Defendant Jacuzzi, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 143 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Declaration Of Rohit A. Sabnis In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgm Filed By Defendant Jacuzzi, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 142 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Separate Statement Of Facts / Separate Stmnt Of Undisputed Material Facts In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgm Filed By Defendant Jacuzzi, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 141 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Mtn For Summary Judgm Filed By Defendant Jacuzzi, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 140 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment / Ntc Of Mtn & Mtn For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Jacuzzi, Inc. Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 139 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc. Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 138 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service By Mail On Ntc Of Mo & Mo For Sum Judgt Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 137 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Index Of Exhibits In Suppt Of Mo For Sum Judgt Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 136 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Cesar A. Alvarado In Suppt Of Mo For Sum Judgt Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 135 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Separate Statement Of Facts In Suppt Of Mo For Sum Judgt Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 134 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Suppt Of Mo For Sum Judgt Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 133 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company,inc. Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 132 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: 1/25/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Eaton Corporation Hearing Set For Apr-15-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 131 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: 1/19/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion For Summary Judgment Or Summary Adjudication, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant Baldor Electric Company Hearing Set For Apr-08-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Partial Payment Of Filing Fees (receipt Tag #21973); Clerk's Certificate Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 129 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: 1/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Of James Mccormick, In Support Of Baldor Electric Company's Motion For Summary Judgment Or, In The Alternative Summary Adjudication Filed By Defendant Baldor Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 128 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Not Of Mot & Mot To Deem Requests For Admission Admitted By Deft; Req For Monetary Sanctions;, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Feb-08-2005 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 127 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion To Compel Responses To Admission/interrogatories, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration / Not Of Mot & Mot To Compel Responses To Special Interrogatories; Req For Sanctions; Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Feb-08-2005 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 126 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion To Compel Responses To Admission/interrogatories, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration / Not Of Mot & Mot To Compel Responses To Form Interrogatories; Req For Sanctions; Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Feb-08-2005 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 125 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion To Compel Responses To Request, Demand Inspection, Production Of Documents, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration / Not Of Mot & Mot To Compel Responses To Req For Prod Of Documents; Req For Sanctions; Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Hearing Set For Feb-08-2005 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 124 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Fmc Corporation-turbo Pump Operation Hearing Set For May-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 608
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 123 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Declaration Request Expedited Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Daimlerchrysler Corporation Hearing Set For May-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 608
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 122 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Declaration Filed By Defendant General Motors Corporation Hearing Set For May-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 304
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 121 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Declaration Filed By Defendant Ford Motor Company Hearing Set For May-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 304
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Kellogg Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 119 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Toshiba International Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 118 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal With Prejudice Complaint. As To Defendant Standard Motor Products, Inc And Parker-hannifin Corporation, As Successor To Eis Brake Parts Only.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 117 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 116 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Morton Salt Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 115 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Change Of Address And Telephone Number Filed By Attorney Beers, David Booth
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 114 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 19 To Be Milligan-spika Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 113 Filed: 11/2/2004, Entered: 11/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Association Of Attorneys: Hamblett, Robert Mitchell Added As Attorney For Honeywell International Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 112 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Law And Motion, 302, Motion For Summary Judgment, Defendant Cargill, Inc. Motion For Summary Judgment. Off Calendar Per Moving Party. Judge Ronald Quidachay; Reporter Kathy Kollehner #4102
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 111 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Oct-29-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 110 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Stip Of Hearing By Commissioner Filed By Defendant Leeson Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 109 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Demand For Trial By Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial Filed By Defendant Leeson Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 108 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Leeson Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 107 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Removed From Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Oct-21-2004. Assigned To Dept. 206 On May-16-2005 At 11:15 Am For Trial. Assigned For Mandatory Settlement In Dept. 304 On May-06-2005 At 9:30 Am. All Expedited Summary Judgment Motions Will Be Heard At That Time. Brayton Group 313 Liv/asb
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 106 Filed: 10/21/2004, Entered: 10/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Cargill, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 105 Filed: 10/1/2004, Entered: 10/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Pond, Frank D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 104 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Flowserve Us Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 103 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Flowserve Us Inc. As To Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: 9/24/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer Filed By Defendant Flowserve Us Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 101 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 100 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Substitution Of Attorney: Hugo, Edward R Substituted For Oberg, Lisa L As Attorney For Dana Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 99 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/17/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Sew-eurodrive, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 98 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: 9/16/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Seariver Maritime, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: 9/13/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant American Honda Motor Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/9/2004, Entered: 9/9/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Dayton Electric Manufacturing Co.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 95 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: 9/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Georgia-pacific Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 94 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Abb Inc. Which Will Do Business In Ca. As Abb De Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 93 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Pcc Flow Technologies L.p.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 91 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Reliance Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 90 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Demand For Trial By Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial Filed By Defendant Abb Inc. Which Will Do Business In Ca. As Abb De Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 89 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Objection To Stip Of Hearing By Commissioner Filed By Defendant Abb Inc. Which Will Do Business In Ca. As Abb De Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 88 Filed: 8/27/2004, Entered: 8/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint Each Party To Bear Its Own Costs As To Defendant Square D Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 87 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Ingersoll-rand Company As To Plaintiff Carlson, James
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Ingersoll-rand Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 85 Filed: 8/24/2004, Entered: 8/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Discovery, 610, Defendant Todd Shipyards' Motion To Compel Plaintiff's Responses To Todd Shipyards Corporation's Form Interrogatories (set 3), Special Interrogatories (set 3),and Requests For Production - Off Calendar Per Moving Party.(610/bchan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 84 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Jacuzzi, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: 8/23/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Jacuzzi, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 82 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Cargill, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 81 Filed: 8/4/2004, Entered: 8/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Index Of Exhibits Filed By Defendant Cargill, Inc. Hearing Set For Oct-29-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 80 Filed: 7/29/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 4 To Be Abb Inc. Which Will Do Business In Ca. As Abb De Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 5 To Be American Honda Motor Co., Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 6 To Be Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 7 To Be Dayton Electric Manufacturing Co. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 8 To Be Electrical Insulation Suppliers Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 9 To Be Flowserve Us Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 10 To Be Granger Supply Company Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 11 To Be Ingersoll-rand Company Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 12 To Be Jacuzzi, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 13 To Be Leeson Electric Corporation Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 14 To Be Pcc Flow Technologies L.p. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 15 To Be Pes Enterprises, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 16 To Be Reliance Electric Industrial Company Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 17 To Be Sew-eurodrive, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 18 To Be Toshiba International Corporation Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 551 To Be Seariver Maritime, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Yaron George D
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 78 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Plaintiff's Responses To Todd Shipyards Corporation's Form Interrogatories (set 3) ,special Interrogatories (set 3),and Requests For Production, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation Hearing Set For Aug-24-2004 At 09:00 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 77 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Association Of Attorneys: Keele, Christopher A. Added As Attorney For Rockwell Automation, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 6/10/2004, Entered: 6/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint Each Party To Bear Its Own Cost. As To Defendant Chevron Shipping Company Chevron Products Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 75 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: 5/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Allis-chalmers Corporation Product Liability Trust A Corporation, Erroneously Sued Herein As Allis-chalmers
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 74 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: 5/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Jun-17-2004 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Oct-21-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206 Pursuant To "big Move List"
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: 4/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Mail Filed By Defendant Rexam Beverage Can Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 72 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Owens-illinois Glass Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 4/15/2004, Entered: 4/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Substitution Of Attorney: Mcdaniel Marietta E Substituted For Trock, Alan L. As Attorney For Rexam Beverage Can Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 70 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Substitution Of Attorney: Oberg, Lisa L Substituted For Colombatto, Paul Richard As Attorney For Metalclad Insulation Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 69 Filed: 3/18/2004, Entered: 3/18/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Unocal Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 68 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/3/2004 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 3 To Be Allis-chalmers
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 67 Filed: 2/19/2004, Entered: 2/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Judge Donna Hitchens, Clerk Rani Edwards, Reporter Ronald Sinclair. Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Feb-19-2004 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Jun-17-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 66 Filed: 2/17/2004, Entered: 2/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 65 Filed: 12/18/2003, Entered: 12/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Dec-18-2003 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Feb-19-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206. If Deposition Is Concluded At The Time Of Status Conference, Matter To Be Added To Brayton Group 283 Living/asbestosis.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 64 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Oct-30-2003 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Dec-18-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 206, Pursuant To Order Filed In 828684.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 63 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/13/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 62 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Discovery, 610, Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Pltf's Responses To Todd Shipyards Corporation's Form Interrogatories (set One), Special Interrogatories (set One), And Requests For Production (set One); Order T Off Calendar
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 61 Filed: 10/16/2003, Entered: 10/16/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Continued From Asbestos Status Conference Calendar On Oct-16-2003 To Asbestos Case Management Conference Calendar On Oct-30-2003 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 206 For Special Setting.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 60 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Baldor Electric Company Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 14.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 59 Filed: 9/24/2003, Entered: 9/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice Complaint. As To Defendant Chevron Shipping Company Chevron Products Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 58 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Motion And Motion To Compel Pltf's Responses To Todd Shipyards Corporation's Form Interrogatories (set One), Special Interrogatories (set One), And Requests For Production (set One); Order T, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation Hearing Set For Oct-24-2003 At 10:30 Am In Dept 610
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 57 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Substitution Of Attorney: Minor Timothy J Substituted For Gobell Jeffrey A As Attorney For Morton International, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 56 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 2 To Be Owens-illinois Glass Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 55 Filed: 6/23/2003, Entered: 6/23/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Pneumo Abex Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Chevron Shipping Company Chevron Products Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 53 Filed: 5/15/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation As Product Successors To Eis Brake Parts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/22/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint With A Mutual Waiver Of Costs As To Defendant The Dow Chemical Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 51 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 50 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/24/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order & Stipulation Re: Release Of Records
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/7/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Deft Nissan North America Inc, Nissan Motor Co Ltd, & All Nissan Dealerships Only
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/27/2003, Entered: 2/27/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Standard Motor Products As Product Successors To Eis Brake Parts Parker Hannifin Corporation As Product Successors To Eis Brake Parts
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Objection To Stipulation Of Hearing By Commissioner Filed By Defendant Fmc Corporation-turbo Pump Operation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 46 Filed: 2/6/2003, Entered: 2/6/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer Filed By Defendant Fmc Corporation-turbo Pump Operation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 45 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Mitsubishi Motors America,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 44 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Filed By Defendant Certainteed Corporation Dana Corporation Union Carbide Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 43 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Mitsubishi Motor Sales Of America,in.c Mitsubishi Motor Corporation Mitsubishi Motor Manufacturing Of America,inc. Mitsubishi Motor R&d Of America,inc. Mitsubishi Fuso Truck Of America,inc. Mitsubishi Motors America,inc. Mitsubishi Motors Austrialia,inc. Mitsubishi Motors North America
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Thomas Dee Engineering Company As To Cross Defendant Anchor Packing Company, The
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/13/2003, Entered: 1/13/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Thomas Dee Engineering Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 40 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Norris, Albert B
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/10/2003, Entered: 1/10/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Gatke Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Judge Pro Tem And/or Commissioner Assignment Filed By Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 37 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Cutler-hammer Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Objection To Judge Pro Tem And/or Commissioner Assignment Filed By Defendant Eaton Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 35 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Eaton Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection To Hearing By Commissioner/pro Tem Acting As Judge Filed By Defendant Morton International, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 33 Filed: 1/3/2003, Entered: 1/3/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Morton International, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 32 Filed: 12/24/2002, Entered: 12/24/2002 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1 To Be Fmc Corporation-turbo Pump Operation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 31 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Potter Electric,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 30 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Graybar Electric Company,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 29 Filed: 12/19/2002, Entered: 12/19/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Csk Auto,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 28 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Metalclad Insulation Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer Filed By Defendant Daimlerchrysler Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/13/2002, Entered: 12/13/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 25 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Itt Industries,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 24 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer Filed By Defendant Todd Shipyards Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 23 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Baldor Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Cargill, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection To Stipulation Of Hearing By Commissioner Filed By Defendant Itt Industries,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Rexam Beverage Can Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Demand For Trial By Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial Filed By Defendant Itt Industries,inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Caterpillar Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant The Lincoln Electric Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/12/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Emerson Electric Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint To Complaint Filed By Defendant Occidental Chemical Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer Filed By Defendant Honeywell International Inc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint --electronically Filed Fid# 1107522-- Filed By Defendant General Motors Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 12/9/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Demand For Trial By Jury And Estimate Of Length Of Trial Filed By Defendant Viacom Inc., Successor By Merger To Cbs Corp. , F/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Objection To Assignment To Commissioner For Trial Filed By Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Objection To Hearing By Commissioner Best Filed By Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Deft's Demand For Jury Filed By Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Osram Sylvania Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Viacom Inc., Successor By Merger To Cbs Corp. , F/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Objection To Stipulation Of Hearing By Commissioner Hewlett Filed By Defendant Viacom Inc., Successor By Merger To Cbs Corp. , F/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Objection To Court Commissioner Acting As Judge Pro Tempore At Trial Filed By Defendant Viacom Inc., Successor By Merger To Cbs Corp. , F/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 11/27/2002, Entered: 11/27/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Ford Motor Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/25/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant The Dow Chemical Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/4/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Asbestos, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Carlson, James As To Defendant Asbestos Defendants (bhc) Does 1 To 800 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Oct-16-2003

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?