Najam Najmi Et Al v. Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 02 412877
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Najmi, Leyla, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinton & Alfert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Wayne Alfert +1 510 932 6006

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells, Call, Clark, Bennett & Clawson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Dayton Call +1 707 426 5300
No Logo Najmi, Najam, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Hinton & Alfert

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Wayne Alfert +1 510 932 6006

Toggle Switch Represented by Wells, Call, Clark, Bennett & Clawson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Dayton Call +1 707 426 5300
v.
No Logo Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shawn Adrian Toliver +1 415 362 2580 +1 415 434 0882 toliver@lbbslaw.com
No Logo Burr Computer Environments, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown, Robert Joseph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Joseph Brown +1 415 836 2626 +1 415 836 3104 bob.brown@aig.com
No Logo Cambay Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Forge & Coe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Ann Bower +1 415 543 3434
Space Mell, Thomas Henry +1 415 541 3723

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis Harrison Castoria +1 415 433 0990 +1 415 434 1370 louis.castoria@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Carter Burgess, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Carter & Burgess, Inc."

Represented by McCurdy and Fuller LLP

No Logo Data Processing Air Corporation Dba Dp Air, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mahon, James Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mahon, James Francis +1 415 349 3555
No Logo Does 1 To 40 Inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Gensler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Long & Levit LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Anne Becker +1 415 397 2222 +1 415 397 6392 jabecker@longlevit.com
No Logo Guardsmark, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dean Michael Robinson +1 415 981 6630
No Logo Hansen Company, The, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andersen & Shinnick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Marsh Andersen +1 510 587 1999

Toggle Switch Represented by Guichard, Teng & Portello, A.P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew P. Guichard +1 916 934 9690
No Logo M. Arthur Gensler Jr. & Associates, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Long & Levit LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Anne Becker +1 415 397 2222 +1 415 397 6392 jabecker@longlevit.com
No Logo Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andersen & Shinnick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Marsh Andersen +1 510 587 1999

Toggle Switch Represented by Guichard, Teng & Portello, A.P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew P. Guichard +1 916 934 9690
No Logo San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Forge & Coe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Ann Bower +1 415 543 3434
Space Mell, Thomas Henry +1 415 541 3723

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Louis Harrison Castoria +1 415 433 0990 +1 415 434 1370 louis.castoria@wilsonelser.com
No Logo The Hansen Co., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Guichard, Teng & Portello, A.P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew P. Guichard +1 916 934 9690
No Logo Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ericksen, Arbuthnot, Kilduff, Day & Linstrom, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Stephen Painter +1 916 483 5181 +1 916 483 7558 cpainter@ericksenarbuthnot.com
No Logo Williams Communications, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ericksen, Arbuthnot, Kilduff, Day & Linstrom, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Stephen Painter +1 916 483 5181 +1 916 483 7558 cpainter@ericksenarbuthnot.com
No Logo Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc., Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shawn Adrian Toliver +1 415 362 2580 +1 415 434 0882 toliver@lbbslaw.com
No Logo Hansen Company, The, Cross-Complainant
No Logo Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc., Cross-Complainant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andersen & Shinnick

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip Marsh Andersen +1 510 587 1999
No Logo Burr Computer Environments, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown, Robert Joseph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Joseph Brown +1 415 836 2626 +1 415 836 3104 bob.brown@aig.com
No Logo Cambay Group, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Forge & Coe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Ann Bower +1 415 543 3434

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglass, Michael C +1 510 286 0206
No Logo Cambay Group, S.f. Wave Exchange, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Carter Burgess, Inc., Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "Carter & Burgess,inc."

Represented by McCurdy and Fuller LLP

No Logo Censler Architect & Design, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Data Processing Air Corporation, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Mahon, James Francis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mahon, James Francis +1 415 349 3555
No Logo Data Processing Air Corporation, Dba Dpair, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Does 1 To 100, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Dp Air, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Gensler, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Long & Levit LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Anne Becker +1 415 397 2222 +1 415 397 6392 jabecker@longlevit.com
No Logo Guardsmark, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Low Ball & Lynch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dean Michael Robinson +1 415 981 6630
No Logo M. Arthur Gensler Jr. & Associates, Inc., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Long & Levit LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Anne Becker +1 415 397 2222 +1 415 397 6392 jabecker@longlevit.com
No Logo Roes 1 To 10, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Roes 1-25, Cross-Defendant
No Logo Roes 25-50, Cross-Defendant
No Logo San Francisco Wave Exchange Llc, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Forge & Coe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Pamela Ann Bower +1 415 543 3434

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglass, Michael C +1 510 286 0206
No Logo The Hansen Company, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Guichard, Teng & Portello, A.P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew P. Guichard +1 916 934 9690
No Logo Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ericksen, Arbuthnot, Kilduff, Day & Linstrom, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Stephen Painter +1 916 483 5181 +1 916 483 7558 cpainter@ericksenarbuthnot.com
No Logo Williams Communications, LLC, Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ericksen, Arbuthnot, Kilduff, Day & Linstrom, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Charles Stephen Painter +1 916 483 5181 +1 916 483 7558 cpainter@ericksenarbuthnot.com
No Logo Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Louie Almeida & Stettler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen K. Nakata +1 818 461 9559
Cause of Action Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related
  Entries (311) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (40) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 311 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007
Single Assignment Terminated Dismissals Filed.
    Blank 310 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: 1/5/2006
    Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
      Blank 309 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: 12/30/2005
      Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Cross Complainant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
        Blank 308 Filed: 12/21/2005, Entered: 12/21/2005
        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service
          Blank 307 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005
          Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Pos Filed By Defts
            Legal Document 306 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005 Dismissal
            Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Wil Tel Communications, Llc
              Blank 305 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: 12/20/2005
              Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Of Cross Complaint Filed By Defendant Data Processing Air Corporation Dba Dp Air
                Blank 304 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005
                Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                  Blank 303 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005
                  Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. The Hansen Co., Inc.
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005 Dismissal
                    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Data Processing Air Corporation Filed By Data Processing Air Corporation On 5/19/05
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 301 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                      Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hansen Company, The Filed By Hansen Company,inc. On Jan.10,2005 And X-complaint Filed By Marelich Mechanical Co.,inc. On Mar.12,2003
                        Blank 300 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                        Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Carter & Burgess, Inc. Filed By Carter & Burgess, Inc. On Dec.9,2004
                          Blank 299 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                          Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc. Filed By Anderson, Rowe & Buckley,inc. On June 6,2003
                            Blank 298 Filed: 12/2/2005, Entered: 12/2/2005
                            Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Dismissal
                              Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc, Cambay Group, Inc. Filed By San Francisco Wave Exchange & Cambay Group, Inc. On Apr. 9, 2003
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Legal Document 296 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: 11/21/2005 Dismissal
                                Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Guardsmark, Inc. Filed By Guardsmark, Inc. On June 4, 2003
                                  Blank 295 Filed: 11/17/2005, Entered: 11/17/2005
                                  Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/16/2005 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross-complaint
                                    Dismissal With Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hansen Company, The
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 293 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005
                                      Copying Fees Paid By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                        Blank 292 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: 10/3/2005
                                        Commission To Take The Deposition Of Person Most Knowledgeable Of Qwest Communications Issued To Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005 Order
                                          Order That Commission Issue For Taking Deposition Of Person Most Knowledgeable Of Qwest Communications
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 290 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: 9/30/2005
                                            Ex Parte Application For Order For Issuance Of Commission To Take Deposition Of Person Most Knowledgeable Of Qwest Communications, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                              Blank 289 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: 9/29/2005
                                              Notice Of Change Of Address (corrected) Filed By Attorney Guichard, Matthew P.
                                                Blank 288 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005
                                                Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Guichard, Matthew P.
                                                  Blank 287 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/22/2005
                                                  Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed On The Mtn For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement Filed By Defendant M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc.
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005 Order
                                                    Order That Commission Issue For Taking Deposition Of (1)charles Whitman (2) Custodian Of Record Of Carter Burgess (3) Ken Noack (4) Mark Courville
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 285 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: 9/19/2005
                                                      Trial Motion Calendar On Sep-19-2005 In Dept. 613, Nct Of And Mo For Relief From Waiver Pur To Ccp Section 2033.280 Is Off Calendar Per Moving Party.
                                                        Blank 284 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005
                                                        Commission To Take The Deposition Of 1-charles Whitman; 2- Custodian Of Records Of Carter & Burgess; 3- Ken Noack; 4- Mark Courville Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                          Blank 283 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: 9/16/2005
                                                          Ex Parte Application For Order For Issuance Of Commission(s) To Take Depositions Of 1-charles Whitman; 2- Custodian Of Records Of Carter & Burgess; 3-ken Noack; 4- Mark Courville Outside California, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005 Order
                                                            Order Re: Motion Of Gensler And Carter & Burgess For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 281 Filed: 9/12/2005, Entered: 9/12/2005
                                                              Reply To Opposition From Relief From Waiver, Ccp.2033.280; Points & Auths In Support Thereof Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                Blank 280 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: 9/7/2005
                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                  Blank 279 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005
                                                                  Opposition To Wil Tel Communication's Mtn For Relief From Waiver Filed By Cross Defendant The Hansen Company
                                                                    Blank 278 Filed: 9/6/2005, Entered: 9/6/2005
                                                                    Opposition /joinder In Deft Hansen's Opposition To Deft Wil Tel Communication's Mtn For Relief From Waiver Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                      Blank 277 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005
                                                                      Nct Of And Mo For Relief From Waiver Pur To Ccp Section 2033.280, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc Hearing Set For Sep-19-2005 At 01:30 Pm In Dept 613
                                                                        Blank 276 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005
                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 8/25/2005, Entered: 8/25/2005 Dismissal
                                                                          Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 8/23/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
                                                                            Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Blank 273 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Court Filing
                                                                              Trial Motion For Good Faith Settlement Heard Aug-18-2005 In Dept. 613. Good Faith Settlement Motion As To Defendants M. Arthur Gensler And Carter & Burgess, Inc. Was Argued, Submitted And Granted. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith, Reporter: Melanie Gheno Csr 7489, Clerk: David Swanson, Dept. 613
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Minutes
                                                                                Minutes For Aug-18-2005 10:00 Am For Dept 613
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 271 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                                  Reply Brief In Supp Of Deft's Reply To Wil Tel's Opposition To The Mtn For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement Pursuant To Ccp 877.6(a)(2); Pos Filed By Cross Defendant M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc.
                                                                                    Blank 270 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                                    Declaration Of Greg Lacour In Supp Of Deft's Reply To Wil Tel's Opposition To The Mtn For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement Pursuant To Ccp 877.6(a)(2) Filed By Cross Defendant M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc.
                                                                                      Blank 269 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                                      Declaration Of Of Gina M. Guiley In Supp Of Deft's Reply; Pos Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                        Blank 268 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: 8/11/2005
                                                                                        Reply In Supp Of Mtn For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                          Blank 267 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005
                                                                                          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Opposition To Motion For Good Faith Settlement Filed On Behalf Of M. Arthur Genslar And Carter & Burgess, Inc. Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                            Blank 266 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005
                                                                                            Joinder In Co-defendant Wiltel Communications'opposition To Motion For Good Faith Settlement Determination Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                              Blank 265 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: 7/27/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                              Status Conference Held; All Counsel To Notify Court By Letter After Depositions Are Taken In September 2005 And October 2005; An Additional Status Conference Date To Be Determined By The Court. Judge: Hon. E. Goldsmith; Reporter: Melanie D. Gheno, Csr #7489; Clerk: M.manzella (d613).
                                                                                                Legal Document 264 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005 Unknown document
                                                                                                Mtn For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc. Hearing Set For Aug-18-2005 At 10:00 Am In Dept 613
                                                                                                  Blank 263 Filed: 7/22/2005, Entered: 7/22/2005
                                                                                                  Response To Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Filed By Defendant Gensler
                                                                                                    Blank 262 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                    Trial Motion Calendar On Jul-20-2005 In Dept. 613. Motion For Good Faith Settlement(per Judge) Granted Pursuant To Written Order. Judge: Ernest H. Goldsmith, Reporter: Melanie Gheno Csr 7489, Clerk: Kay Peek, Dept. 613
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Order
                                                                                                      Order Finding Good Faith Settlement
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: 7/20/2005 Minutes
                                                                                                        Minutes For Jul-20-2005 10:00 Am For Dept 613
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 259 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/15/2005
                                                                                                          Second Amended Notice Of Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement Filed By Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                            Blank 258 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                            Added To Calendar For Motion For Good Faith Settlement(per Judge) Hearing Set For Jul-20-2005 At 10:00 Am In Dept 613
                                                                                                              Blank 257 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005
                                                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Data Processing Air Corporation Dba Dp Air Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 12.0 Days
                                                                                                                Blank 256 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005
                                                                                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 20.0 Days
                                                                                                                  Blank 255 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005
                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                                                    Blank 254 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005
                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 12.0 Days
                                                                                                                      Blank 253 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005
                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For Jul-12-2005 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                        Blank 252 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005
                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Guardsmark, Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                                                          Blank 251 Filed: 7/12/2005, Entered: 7/12/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Law And Motion, 301, Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc., Hansen Company's, The Notice Of Motion And Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement - Off Calendar. Case Singly Assigned To Judge Goldsmith. Judge James L. Warren, Reporter Christina Paxton Csr #1558
                                                                                                                            Blank 250 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005
                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Cross Complainant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. Hansen Company, The Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 12.0 Days
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Order
                                                                                                                              Order Granting Good Faith Settlement Re: Anderson, Rowe & Buckley
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Blank 248 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005
                                                                                                                                Declaration Of William L. Portello In Supp Of Reply To Opposition Re Mtn For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement Filed By Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. Hansen Company, The
                                                                                                                                  Blank 247 Filed: 7/5/2005, Entered: 7/5/2005
                                                                                                                                  Reply To Opposition To Mtn For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement Filed By Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. Hansen Company, The
                                                                                                                                    Blank 246 Filed: 7/1/2005, Entered: 7/1/2005
                                                                                                                                    Trial Continuance Fee Paid By Defendant Data Processing Air Corporation Dba Dp Air
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005 Order For Single AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Single Assignment To Judge Ernest H. Goldsmith For All Purposes. Case Management Conference Set For Jul-27-2005 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 613. Dec-12-2005 Master Calendar Jury Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Blank 244 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 6/30/2005
                                                                                                                                        Defendant Witel Communication's Joinder In Cambay Group, Inc. And San Frrancisco Wave Exchange's Opposition To Marelich Mechanical Co.'s Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Defendant Dta Processing Air Corp.'s Motion To Continue Trial
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Blank 242 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005
                                                                                                                                            Invalid/returned Check Redeemed For Transaction W1805602f021 For Civil First Paper Answer/response/pleading
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Invalid Check Notice
                                                                                                                                              Invalid/returned Check For Transaction W1805602f021 For Civil First Paper Answer/response/pleading
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Blank 240 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                Settlement Conference Set For Jul-13-2005 Vacated. Case Singly Assigned. (206)
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 239 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005
                                                                                                                                                  Master Jury Calendar Set For Aug-01-2005 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Dec-12-2005 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 - Continue Fees Are Due
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 238 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: 6/29/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Master Motion Calendar On Jun-29-2005 In 206, Defendant Data Processing Air Corporation's Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Was Granted. The Trial Date Of 8/1/05 Is Continued To 12/12/05 In Dept. 206 At 9:30 Am. The Current Settlement Conference Will Be Vacated. The Court Indicated That This Matter Will Be Singly Assigned. Order Signed. Judge Robert L. Dondero, Clerks: V.mu/d. Lok, Reporter: Joann Bryce, #3321 (206)
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 237 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                      Opposition To Motion For Good Faith Settlement Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 6/23/2005, Entered: 6/23/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 235 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                          Declaration Of Dr. Bruce T. Adornato In Supp Of Deft Wil Tel Non-opposition To Mtn To Cont Trial Date & Req To Vacate Mandatory Settlement Conference Date Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 234 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                            Commission Issued To The State Of Utah For The Out-of-state Deposition Of James Mcclellan Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 233 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                              Commission Issued To The State Of Utah For The Out-of-state Deposition Michael Van Hook Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                Order For Issuance Of Commission For Out-of-state Depositions
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 231 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                  Non-opposition To Deft Data Processing Air Corp's Motion To Continue Trial Date Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 230 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Application For Order For Issuance Of Commission For Out Of State Deposition, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 228 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed To Name & Designate Deft Gensler Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 227 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
                                                                                                                                                                          Answer Filed By Cross Defendant Gensler
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 226 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005
                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Change Of Firm Name Filed By Attorney Mccurdy, Mary Plungy
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/15/2005 Case Ordered Off Calendar
                                                                                                                                                                              Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Jun-22-2005 Is Off Calendar Mediated. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 224 Filed: 6/14/2005, Entered: 6/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Motion And Motion For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. Hansen Company, The Hearing Set For Jul-12-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Complaint - Stipulation And Order To Name And Designate A Defendant Defendant Sued Incorrectly As Gensler To Be M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 222 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                    Non-opposition To Motion To Continue Trial Date; Request To Vacate Mandatory Settlement Conference Date; Declaration Of Dr. Adornato In Support Thereof Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 221 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: 6/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                      Application For Determination Of Good Faith Settlement Filed By Defendant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 6/9/2005, Entered: 6/9/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 219 Filed: 6/8/2005, Entered: 6/8/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                          Response To Order To Show Cause Regarding Mediation; Declaration Of Sasha M. Cummings In Support Thereof Filed By Defendant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 218 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Data Processing Air Corporation Dba Dp Air Hearing Set For Jun-29-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 217 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: 6/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                              Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time For Notice And Hearing Motion To Continue Trial Date, With Declaration Filed By Defendant Data Processing Air Corporation Dba Dp Air
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 216 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/3/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                Response To Order To Show Cause Regarding Mediation; And Declaration Of Norma A Morales In Support Thereof Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/2/2005, Entered: 6/2/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Cambay Group, Inc. San Francisco Wave Exchange Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Data Processing Air Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Data Processing Air Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Cross Complaint (to Data Processing Air Corporation's Unverified X-complaint) Filed By Cross Defendant Guardsmark, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Amendment To Cross Complaint Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 4 To Be Data Processing Air Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Answer To Cross-complaint Filed By Cross Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 208 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: 5/20/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Fee For Stip & Order (re Name Of Deft Gensler) Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Answer To Cross-complaint Filed By Cross Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Data Processing Air Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 206 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Data Processing Air Corporation Dba Dp Air
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Data Processing Air Corporation Dba Dp Air As To Cross Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Guardsmark, Inc. Cambay Group, Inc. Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc. Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc. Carter & Burgess, Inc. Does 1 To 100
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Data Processing Air Corporation Dba Dp Air
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 203 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation To Continue Trial Date Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 202 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: 5/19/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Ex Parte Application For Order To Continue Trial Date, Declaration Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 201 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: 5/12/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: 4/27/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Cross Complaint (amendment To X-complaint Of Anderson Rowe & Buckley) Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 6 To Be Dp Air
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: 4/26/2005 Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Complaint --the Causes Of Action For Product Liability, And Premise Liability As To Do Defendant, Carter & Burgess, Inc. As To Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 198 Filed: 4/22/2005, Entered: 4/22/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Response To Osc Re Mediation On Behalf Of Anderson Rowe & Buckley Filed By Defendant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 197 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response To Order To Show Cause Re Mediation;declaration Of Jordan Rojas Filed By Defendant M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 196 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Elise R Sanguinettin In Response To Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 195 Filed: 4/21/2005, Entered: 4/21/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response To Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Cross Complaint Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 1 To Be Data Processing Air Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/20/2005, Entered: 4/20/2005 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Mediation Order To Show Cause Of Apr-27-2005 Continued To Jun-22-2005 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 192 Filed: 4/18/2005, Entered: 4/18/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Response To Order To Show Cause Regarding Mediation; And Declaration Of Norma A. Morales In Support Thereof Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 191 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Response To Order To Show Cause - Mediation Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: 4/14/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amendment To Cross Complaint Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 25 To Be Data Processing Air Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 189 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Proof Of Service By Mail Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 188 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Gina M Guiley In Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 187 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: 4/13/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response To Order To Show Cause -mediation Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 186 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/4/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Change Of Firm Name Filed By Attorney Guichard, Matthew P.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 185 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 184 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: 4/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 183 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: 3/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons On Complaint Adr Package; Substitution Of Atty; Ntc To Plntf; Order Allowing Amendment To Complaint; Etc, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Served Feb-21-2005, Personal Service On Defendant Data Processing Air Corporation Dba Dp Air
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Dismissal With Prejudice Cause Of Action For Premises Liability As To Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant The Hansen Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 180 Filed: 3/1/2005, Entered: 3/1/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Substitution Of Attorney: Castoria Louis H Substituted For Mell, Thomas Henry As Attorney For Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 178 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Association Of Attorneys: Castoria Louis H Added As Attorney For San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 177 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Hansen Company, The
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 176 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 2/28/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Entry Of Dismissal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: 2/22/2005 Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Carter & Burgess, Inc. As To Cross Defendant Burr Computer Environments, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant The Hansen Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Hansen Company, The As To Cross Defendant Burr Computer Environments, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Cross Complaint Filed By Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. As To Cross Defendant Burr Computer Environments, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: 2/15/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Cross Complaint Of Wiltel Communications, Llc Filed By Cross Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 170 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proof Of Service By Mail On Request For Dismissal Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 169 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proof Of Service By Mail On Request For Dismissal Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Cross Complaint Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 1 To Be Carter & Burgess, Inc. Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 2 To Be M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc. Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 3 To Be The Hansen Company Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 4 To Be Data Processing Air Corporation, Dba Dpair
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: 2/10/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Burr Computer Environments, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Burr Computer Environments, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/7/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: 2/2/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant The Hansen Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 158 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: 2/1/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Guardsmark, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Dismissal With Prejudice Cause Of Action For Premises Liability As To Anderson Rowe & Buckely
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: 1/28/2005 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Burr Computer Environments, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/27/2005, Entered: 1/27/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amendment To Cross Complaint Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 1 To Be Cambay Group, S.f. Wave Exchange Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 2 To Be Guardsmark,inc. Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 3 To Be Censler Architect & Design Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 4 To Be Carter & Burgess,inc. Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 5 To Be The Hansen Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005 Order To Show Cause - Mediation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order To Show Cause Re Mediation Set For Apr-27-2005 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 4 To Be Data Processing Air Corporation Dba Dp Air
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 151 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: 1/14/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Trial Continuance Fee Paid By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 1/13/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Guardsmark, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Cross Complaint (to The X-complaint Of The Hansen Company) Filed By Cross Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: 1/12/2005 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Cross Complaint (to X-complaint Of Carter & Burgess, Inc.) Filed By Cross Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 147 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: 1/11/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Hansen Company, The As To Cross Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Guardsmark, Inc. Cambay Group, Inc. Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc. Roes 1-25 Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc. Carter & Burgess, Inc. Burr Computer Environments, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Cross Complaint Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 1 To Be Burr Computer Environments, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 144 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Cross Complaint Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 2 To Be Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 143 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: 1/10/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Amendment To Cross Complaint Cross Defendant Sued Herein As Roe 3 To Be Gensler
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 142 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Master Jury Calendar Set For Mar-07-2005 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Aug-01-2005 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 - Continue Fees Are Due
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Settlement Conference Set For Feb-16-2005 Continued To Jul-13-2005 At 1:30 Pm In 604
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Order Vacating And Continuing Trial Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 139 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Master Calendar Motion Calendar On Jan-06-2005 In Dept. 206, Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.'s Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Is Granted. See Disposition Of Motion To Continue Same Day. Judge Robert Dondero; Clerks: V. Mu/d. Hakewill; Reporter: Joann Bryce, (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 138 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Master Calendar Motion Calendar On Jan-06-2005 In Dept. 206, Defendant Gensler's Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference Is Granted. The Trial Date Is Continued From 3/7/05 To 8/1/05 @ 9:30am In Dept. 206. The Current Mandatory Settlement Conference Will Be Vacated. A New Settlement Conference Will Be Set And Mailed By The Court. Discovery Consistent With The New Trial Date. Order Signed. Judge Robert Dondero; Clerks: V. Mu/d. Hakewill; Reporter: Joann Bryce, (206)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 137 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Stipulation To Participate In Private Mediation In Lieu Of Early Settlement Program (also By Defendants) Filed By Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 136 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First Filing Fee Paid For Claimant (advanced By Pltf) Filed By Claimant Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 135 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 134 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc's Non-opposition To Motion To Continue Trial Date; Request To Vacte Early Settlement Conference Date And Mandatory Settlement Conference Date; Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 133 Filed: 12/27/2004, Entered: 12/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Non-opposition To Motion To Continue Trial Date Filed By Defendant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 132 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Declaration Of Gina M. Guiley In Support Of Mot To Continue Trial Date Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 131 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Mot To Continue Trial Date Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 130 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference, Proof Of Service / Notice Of Hrng On Mot To Continue Trial Date Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc. Hearing Set For Jan-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 129 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Motion To Continue Jury Trial And/or Settlement Conference, Proof Of Service, Declaration Joinder In Defendant Carter & Burgess Inc's Motion Filed By Defendant M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc. Hearing Set For Jan-06-2005 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 128 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Hansen Company, The
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: 12/17/2004 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 125 Filed: 12/16/2004, Entered: 12/16/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Non-opposition To Motion To Continue Trial Date Filed By Defendant Guardsmark, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Burr Computer Environments, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: 12/15/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Guardsmark, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 121 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Carter & Burgess, Inc. As To Cross Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Guardsmark, Inc. Cambay Group, Inc. Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc. Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc Burr Computer Environments, Inc. Hansen Company, The Roes 25-50
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 120 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 119 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Dec-06-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 118 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: 12/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion 301, Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.'s Demurrer To Plaintiff's Complaint: Off Calendar Per Moving Party. (301/jlw/) Reporter: Christina T. Paxton, Csr #1558
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 117 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: 12/2/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Hansen Company, The
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 116 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Dec-01-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 115 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion 301, Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc And Cambay Group, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment: Denied. Prevailing Party Shall Submit A Proposed Form Of Order Pursuant To Ccp 437c(g). Judge: James L. Warren Reporter: Christina Paxton, Csr #1558
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Gensler
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 113 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amended Certificate Of Merit Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 112 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Certificate Of Merit Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 111 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Declaration Of Elise R. Sanguinetti In Support Of Pltfs' Opposition To Deft Carter & Burgess,inc.'s Demurrer To Pltf's Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 110 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: 11/24/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition To Deft Carter & Burgess,inc.'s Demurrer To Pltf's Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 109 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: 11/23/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Certificate Of Merit Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 108 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Nov-19-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 107 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: 11/19/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion 301, Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc And Cambay Group, Inc.'s Motion For Summary Judgment Continued From Nov-19-2004 To Law And Motion At Dec-01-2004, 9:30 Am In Dept. 301 On The Court's Own Motion. Judge: James L. Warren Reporter: Christina Paxton, Csr #1558
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 106 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Hearing On Carter & Burgess, Inc.'s Demurrer To Pltf's Complaint, Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc. Hearing Set For Dec-06-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 105 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of Janet Jolley Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 104 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Declaration Of Thomas H. Mell Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 103 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply To Wil Tel Communications,inc.'s Opposition To Deft's Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 102 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney Certification Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/10/2004, Entered: 11/10/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Burr Computer Environments, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 100 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Evidentiary Objections To The Declaration Of Thomas H. Mell In Support Of Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 99 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Separate Statement Of Facts Disputed Facts In Opposition To Camby Group,inc. And San Francisco Wave Exchange,llc's Motion For Summary Judgment Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 98 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: 11/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition To Cambay Group,inc And San Francisco Wave Exchange,llc's Motion For Summary Judgment;memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Thereof;declaration Of Charles S. Painter Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 97 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: 11/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Non-oppos To Defts Cambay Group/san Francisco Wave Exchange Mo For Summary Judgment - Filed By Pltfs, Najam Najmi And Leyla Najmi
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 10/29/2004 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Rescheduled Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 95 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order To Show Cause To Peter W. Albert, Esq., For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No. 4. (administrative Fee) Is Ordered Off Calendar/fee Paid. Proceedings Reported By: Lois Jones. (212)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 94 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mini-minutes For Oct-07-2004 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 93 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons On Complaint (and Substitution Of Attorney, Amendment To Complaint, Etc.), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Served Sep-23-2004, Personal Service On Defendant Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 92 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons On Complaint (and Substitution Of Attorney, Amendment To Complaint, Etc.), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Served Sep-24-2004, Personal Service On Defendant Burr Computer Environments, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 91 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons On Complaint (and Substitution Of Attorney, Amendment To Complaint, Etc.), Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Served Sep-24-2004, Personal Service On Defendant The Hansen Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 90 Filed: 9/27/2004, Entered: 9/27/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Served Sep-23-2004, Personal Service On Defendant M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 89 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Amendment To Complaint Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 2 To Be M. Arthur Gensler, Jr. & Associates, Inc. Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 3 To Be Carter & Burgess, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004 Amendment to Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amendment To Complaint Per Order Defendant Sued Herein As Doe 1 To Be The Hansen Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Order Allowing Amendment To Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 86 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: 9/22/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Ex Parte Application For Order Allowing Amendment To Complaint; Request For Order Allowing Amendment To Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 85 Filed: 9/10/2004, Entered: 9/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Substitution Of Attorney: Alfert Peter W Substituted For Call Richard D As Attorney For Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 84 Filed: 8/26/2004, Entered: 8/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion For Summary Judgment, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration, Separate Statement Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc. Hearing Set For Nov-19-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 83 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Response To Order To Show Cause / Response To Miscellaneous Order To Show Cause (1) And Declaration Of R. Dayton Call Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 82 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Change Of Defts', Cambay Group Inc & Sf Wave Exchange Llc, Handling Atty Thomas H. Mell
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 81 Filed: 7/26/2004, Entered: 7/26/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Change Of Firm Name Filed By Attorney Mell, Thomas Henry
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: 7/16/2004 Miscellaneous Order To Show Cause (1)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order To Show Cause To Richard D. Call Set For Oct-07-2004 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Comply With San Francisco Superior Court Early Settlement Program Policies And Procedures No 4. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 79 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Of Change Of Handling Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice - Amended Notice Of Rescheduled Early Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 77 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/2/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Trial Continuance Fee Paid By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Settlement Conference Set For Jul-28-2004 Continued To Feb-16-2005 At 1:30 Pm In 604
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 75 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Master Jury Calendar Set For Aug-23-2004 Continued To Master Calendar Jury On Mar-07-2005 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206 - Continue Fees Are Due
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004 Stip And Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Stipulation And Order For Continuance Of Trial Date
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 73 Filed: 6/28/2004, Entered: 6/28/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration Of R. Dayton Call
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/11/2004, Entered: 6/11/2004 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Settlement Conference, Advanced From Jul-28-2004 At 3:30 Pm In 514 To Settlement Conference At Jul-28-2004 1:30 Pm In Dept. 604.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 71 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time For Service Of Notice Of Motion And Motion To Continue Settlement Conference And Trial Dates To Reset Discovery Cut Off Date And To Assign Case To Different Case, Points And Authorities, Declaration Managment Plan Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice - Amended Notice Of Rescheduled Early Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 69 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mini-minutes For May-21-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 68 Filed: 5/21/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Law And Motion, 301, Plaintiff Najam Najmi, Leyla Najmi Motion's Motion To Continue Settlement Conference And Trial Dates, To Reset Discovery Cut Off Dates And To Assign Case To A Different Case Management Plan -- O F F C A L E N D A R. Counsel To File Motion In The Appropriate Departments. Judge: James L. Warren Reporter: Christina Paxton, Csr #1558
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Notice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Rescheduled Early Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: 5/13/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Non-opposition To Notice Of Motion And Motion To Continue Settlement Conference, Trial Dates Reset Discovery Cutoff Dates And Assign Case To Different Case Management Plan
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 65 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Notice Of Non-opposition To Notice Of Motion And Motion To Continue Settlement Conference, Trial Dates, Reset Discovery Cutoff Dates And Assign Case To Different Case Management Plan, Set For May 21, 2004 At 9:30 A.m. Dept. 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: 5/7/2004 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 63 Filed: 4/29/2004, Entered: 4/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion (notice) Of Motion To Continue Settlement Conference And Trial Dates, To Reset Discovery Cut Off Dates And To Assign Case To A Different Case Management Plan, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Hearing Set For May-21-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/27/2004, Entered: 4/27/2004 Notice Of Early Settlement Conference--early Settlement Prgm
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Early Settlement Conference - Early Settlement Program
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/18/2004, Entered: 2/18/2004 Notice Of Rescheduled Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Settlement Conference, Advanced From Aug-02-2004 At 4:15 Pm In Dept. 514 To Settlement Conference At Jul-28-2004 2:30 Pm In Dept. 514.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: 12/30/2003 See Also Substitution Filed Dec-03-2003 Filed By Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        See Also Substitution Filed Dec-03-2003 Filed By Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 59 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 12/17/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Nakata, Stephen K.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 58 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Filing And Application For Lien Claim Pursuant To Labor Code Sections 3852 And 3856 Filed By Claimant Lumbermens Mutual Casualty Company
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Substitution of Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Substitution Of Attorney: Guichard, Matthew P. Substituted For Andersen, Philip Marsh As Attorney For Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 56 Filed: 11/21/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice Of Change Of Address Notice Of Change Of Firm Name. Filed By Attorney Bower, Pamela Ann
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/6/2003, Entered: 8/6/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Cross Complaint Of Anderson, Rowe & Buckley Filed By Cross Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: 8/4/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 53 Filed: 7/3/2003, Entered: 7/3/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/2/2003, Entered: 7/2/2003 Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial And Mandatory Settlement Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Mandatory Settlement Conference On Aug-02-2004 At 4:15 Pm In Department 210. Notice Of Time And Place Of Trial, Jury Trial Set For Aug-23-2004 At 9:30 Am In Dept. 206. Order To Show Cause On Jul-14-2003 Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/26/2003, Entered: 6/26/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc. As To Cross Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. Roes 1-25 Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/6/2003, Entered: 6/6/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Guardsmark, Inc. As To Cross Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Williams Communications Llc Cambay Group, Inc. Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc. Roes 1-25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/4/2003, Entered: 6/4/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Guardsmark, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request For Reassignment Of Cae To A Plan 3 Case Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Order For Reassignment Of Case To A Plan 3 Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 42 Filed: 6/2/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fee Of $25.30 For Request For Reassignment Of Case To A Plan 3 Case Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/28/2003 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order To Show Cause Set For Jun-09-2003 Continued To Jul-14-2003 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s) Guardsmark, Inc.. Jun-09-2003 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/16/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Cross Complaint Of Wil Tel Communications, Llc Filed By Cross Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Guardsmark, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 38 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/12/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proof Of Service By Mail Xd Filed By Cross Complainant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/8/2003, Entered: 5/8/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Williams Communications Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/6/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice Of Change Of Address Filed By Attorney Robinson, Dean Michael
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/5/2003, Entered: 5/5/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Guardsmark, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 5/1/2003, Entered: 5/1/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued To Cross Complainant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 33 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Declaration In Response To Osc Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/28/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer To Cross Complaint Of San Francisco Wave Echange, Llc And Cambay Group, Inc. Filed By Cross Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 31 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proof Of Service Of Cross-complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. Served Apr-17-2003, Mail On Cross Defendant Guardsmark, Inc. Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/18/2003, Entered: 4/18/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc As To Cross Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Guardsmark, Inc. Cambay Group, Inc. Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc. Roes 1 To 10
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/14/2003, Entered: 4/14/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 26 Filed: 4/11/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order To Show Cause Set For Jun-09-2003 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s). The Apr-25-2003 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 25 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 24 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 7.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 23 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Wil Tel Communications, Llc Fka, Williams Communications, Llc Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 12.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc. As To Cross Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. Williams Communications Llc Roes 1-25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/9/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer To Cross Complaint Of Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. Filed By Cross Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 19 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Issued For The Cross-complaint;
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Cross Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Cross Complaint Filed By Cross Complainant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. As To Cross Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Williams Communications Llc Guardsmark, Inc. Cambay Group, Inc. Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc. Roes 1-25
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 16 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proof Of Service By Mail Summons And Complaint, Notice To Pltfs Cases Of Unlimited Jurisdiction, Alternative Dispute Resolution (adr) Info Package, (2) Statement Of Damages. Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Summons On Complaint Summmons And Complaint, Notice To Pltfs Cases Of Unlimited Jurisdiction, Alternative Dispute Resolution (adr) Info Package, (2) Statement Of Damages Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Served Jan-22-2003, Personal Service On Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Summons On Complaint Summons And Complaint, Notice To Pltfs Cases Of Unlimited Jurisdiction, Alternative Dispute Resolution (adr) Info Package, (2) Statement Of Damages Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Served Jan-22-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Williams Communications Llc
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Summons On Complaint Summons And Complaint, Notice To Pltfs Cases Of Unlimited Jurisdiction, Alternative Dispute Resolution (adr) Info Opackage, (2) Statement Of Damages Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Served Jan-22-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Guardsmark, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Summons On Complaint Summons And Complaint Notice To Plaintiffs Cases Of Unlimited Jurisdiction, Alternative Dispute Resolution (adr) Info Package, (2) Statement Of Damages Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Served Jan-28-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons Returned Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla On Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Williams Communications Llc Guardsmark, Inc. Cambay Group, Inc. Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc. Does 1 To 40 Inclusive
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Answer To Complaint Filed By Defendant San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Cambay Group, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/13/2003 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Of Feb-21-2003 Continued To Apr-25-2003 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement A Nonjury Trial Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla Estimated Time For Trial: 10.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 1/7/2003, Entered: 1/7/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Before Hearing, Order To Show Cause Is Ordered Off Calendar By Court. (212)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/23/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Order Extending Deadline For Service To 2-28-03; Request For Extension
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Jan-07-2003 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Filing Fee For Extension And Order Extending Deadline For Service Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/24/2002, Entered: 9/24/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Personal Injury/property Damage - Non-vehicle Related, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Najmi, Najam Najmi, Leyla As To Defendant Marelich Mechanical Co., Inc. San Francisco Wave Exchange, Llc Williams Communications Llc Guardsmark, Inc. Cambay Group, Inc. Anderson, Rowe & Buckley, Inc. Does 1 To 40 Inclusive Burr Computer Environments, Inc. Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Feb-21-2003 Proof Of Service Due On Nov-25-2002 Case Management Statement Due On Feb-06-2003
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 114 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?