California Public Employees Retirement System v. Banc Of America Securities Llc Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 02 414500
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo California Public Employees Retirement System, Plaintiff
Unknown Role, ZALE CORP
Unknown Role, Cbre Holding Inc
Unknown Role, RLJ Lodging Trust

Toggle Switch Represented by Cotchett Pitre & McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Winters Cotchett +1 650 697 6000 +1 650 697 0577 jcotchett@cpmlegal.com
v.
No Logo Andersen Co, Defendant
No Logo Andersen Llp, Defendant
No Logo Andersen Worldwide, S.c., Defendant
No Logo Arthur Andersen, Defendant
Arthur Andersen LLP Arthur Andersen LLP, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Andersen-brazil, Defendant
No Logo Banc Of America Securities LLC, Defendant
Barclays Capital Inc. Barclays Capital Inc., Defendant
No Logo Belfer, Robert A., Defendant
No Logo Blake Jr., Norman P., Defendant
No Logo Causey, Richard A., Defendant
No Logo Chan, Ronnie C., Defendant
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chippac, Inc.
Unknown Role, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Unknown Role, Citibank, NA
Unknown Role, Keane, Inc.
Unknown Role, Macdermid Inc.
Unknown Role, CITICORP
Unknown Role, Imc Mortgage Co
Unknown Role, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Unknown Role, Pfs Services Inc
Unknown Role, Citicorp Banking Corp
Unknown Role, Intersil Holding Co
Unknown Role, Citigroup Holdings Co
Unknown Role, Cvc Partners LLC
Unknown Role, Ness Technologies Inc
Unknown Role, Primerica, Inc.
Unknown Role, Student Loan Corp
Unknown Role, Pacholder Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Salomon Inc
Unknown Role, Jones Energy, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul S Chan +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 pchan@birdmarella.com
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse First Boston"

Toggle Switch Represented by Heller Ehrman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jerry L Marks +1 213 689 0200
No Logo Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryan Alexander Merryman +1 213 620 7700 +1 213 687 0758 bmerryman@whitecase.com
No Logo Duncan, John H., Defendant
No Logo Fastow, Andrew S., Defendant
No Logo Ferraz Pereira, Paulo V., Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs And Company"

Toggle Switch Represented by Steefel Levitt & Weiss

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael J. Lawson +1 415 788 0900
No Logo Gramm, Wendy L., Defendant
No Logo Jaekicke, Robert K., Defendant
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Unknown Role, Peloton Resources Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chet Alan Kronenberg +1 818 755 7009 +1 818 755 7009 ckronenberg@stblaw.com
No Logo Laimastrie, Charles, Defendant
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
No Logo Mendohlsohn, John, Defendant
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co.,inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan C. Dickey +1 415 424 0160
No Logo Salomon Smith Barney, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bird, Marella, Boxer, Wolpert, Nessim, Drooks & Lincenberg

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul S Chan +1 310 201 2100 +1 310 201 2110 pchan@birdmarella.com
No Logo Savage, Frank, Defendant
Unknown Role, Qualcomm Inc/de
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
No Logo Skilling, Jeffrey K., Defendant
Wachovia Corporation Wachovia Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Wachovia Corporation Fka First Union Corporation Fka Forum Capital Markets, Llc"
No Logo Wakeham, John, Defendant
No Logo Winokur Jr., Herbert S., Defendant
Cause of Action Securities/investment
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (3) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: 5/5/2005
Suggestion Of Bankruptcy
    Blank 30 Filed: 3/1/2004, Entered: 3/1/2004
    Proof Of Service By Mail Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System
      Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/1/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
      Case Management Conference Of Apr-11-2003 Is Off Calendar. Notice Of Removal Filed. Notice Sent By Court.
        Blank 28 Filed: 3/12/2003, Entered: 3/12/2003
        Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Mar-06-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Belfer, Robert A.
          Blank 27 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: 3/6/2003
          Notice Of Filing Defts' Notice Of Removal And Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Banc Of America Securities Llc Salomon Smith Barney, Inc Goldman Sachs And Company Jp Morgan Securities, Inc. Citigroup,inc Merrill Lynch & Co.,inc. Credit Suisse First Boston Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc Barclay's Capital Inc.
            Blank 26 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003
            Hearing. Order To Show Cause Re Proof Of Service On Mar-04-2003 Is Off Calendar.
              Blank 25 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/25/2003
              Response To The Osc; Ex Parte Request For Extension Of Time In Which To File Proof Of Service; Declaration Of Steven N. Williams Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System
                Blank 24 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-11-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Arthur Andersen
                  Blank 23 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                  Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-11-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Arthur Andersen
                    Blank 22 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                    Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-11-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Andersen Co
                      Blank 21 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                      Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-11-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Andersen Llp
                        Blank 20 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                        Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-11-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Arthur Andersen-brazil
                          Blank 19 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                          Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-11-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Andersen Worldwide S C
                            Blank 18 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                            Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-11-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Arthur Andersen Llp;
                              Blank 17 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/24/2003
                              Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-13-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Wachovia Corporation Fka First Union Corporation Fka Forum Capital Markets, Llc
                                Blank 16 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                                Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-18-2003, Mail On Defendant Goldman Sachs And Company
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                                  Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-18-2003, Mail On Defendant Merrill Lynch & Co.,inc.
                                    Blank 14 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                                    Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-18-2003, Mail On Defendant Citigroup,inc
                                      Blank 13 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                                      Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-18-2003, Mail On Defendant Barclay's Capital Inc.
                                        Blank 12 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                                        Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-18-2003, Mail On Defendant Banc Of America Securities Llc
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                                          Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-07-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Banc Of America Securities Llc
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                                            Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-18-2003, Mail On Defendant Credit Suisse First Boston
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                                              Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-10-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Salomon Smith Barney, Inc
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                                                Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-10-2003, Mail On Defendant Jp Morgan Securities, Inc.
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                                                  Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System Served Feb-07-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 2/18/2003, Entered: 2/18/2003
                                                    Proof Of Service For The Amended Complaint; Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003
                                                      Summons Issued To Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Complaint
                                                        1st Amended Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System As To Defendant Banc Of America Securities Llc Wachovia Corporation Fka First Union Corporation Fka Forum Capital Markets, Llc Salomon Smith Barney, Inc Goldman Sachs And Company Arthur Andersen Llp; Jp Morgan Securities, Inc. Citigroup,inc Merrill Lynch & Co.,inc. Causey, Richard A. Skilling, Jeffrey K. Fastow, Andrew S. Belfer, Robert A. Blake Jr., Norman P. Chan, Ronnie C. Duncan, John H. Gramm, Wendy L. Jaekicke, Robert K. Lay, Kenneth L. Laimastrie, Charles Mendohlsohn, John Ferraz Pereira, Paulo V. Savage, Frank Wakeham, John Winokur Jr., Herbert S. Credit Suisse First Boston Deutsche Bank Alex Brown, Inc Barclay's Capital Inc.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                                          Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Mar-04-2003 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                            Notice To Plaintiff
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/7/2002 Complaint
                                                              Securities/investment, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff California Public Employees Retirement System As To Defendant Banc Of America Securities Llc Wachovia Corporation Fka First Union Corporation Fka Forum Capital Markets, Llc Salomon Smith Barney, Inc Goldman Sachs And Company Arthur Andersen Llp; Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Apr-11-2003 Proof Of Service Due On Jan-06-2003 Case Management Statement Due On Mar-27-2003
                                                                Request RequestSpace

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 100 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?