Jason Zvanut v. Morgan Stanley Witter Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 03 420686
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Zvanut, Jason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown & Mcdevitt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William George McDevitt +1 415 898 1555 +1 415 898 1247 kcorreia@braytonlaw.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 50, Defendant
No Logo Gilman, Wendy, Defendant
No Logo Jaber, John, Defendant
No Logo Witter, Morgan Stanley Dean, Defendant
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/15/2003, Entered: 10/15/2003 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Oct-24-2003 Is Off Calendar. Dismissal Filed. Notice Sent By Court.
    Blank 5 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action With Prejudice
      Blank 4 Filed: 6/27/2003, Entered: 6/27/2003
      Summons On Complaint Declaration Of Diligence And Proof Of Service By Mail Attached Filed By Plaintiff Zvanut, Jason Served Jun-05-2003, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Jaber, John
        Blank 3 Filed: 6/17/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003
        Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Zvanut, Jason Served May-30-2003, Personal Service On Defendant Witter, Morgan Stanley Dean
          Legal Document 2 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Notice To Plaintiff
          Notice To Plaintiff
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 5/21/2003, Entered: 5/21/2003 Complaint
            Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Zvanut, Jason As To Defendant Witter, Morgan Stanley Dean Jaber, John Gilman, Wendy Does 1 To 50 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Oct-24-2003 Proof Of Service Due On Jul-21-2003 Case Management Statement Due On Oct-09-2003

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 597 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?