Lawrence Marcus v. Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 03 421042
Superior Court Judge Ronald E. Quidachay, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Marcus, Lawrence, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cliff Michael Palefsky +1 415 421 9292 +1 415 403 0202 cp@mhpsf.com
v.
No Logo Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (16) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: 2/5/2007 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Case Management Conference Of Feb-16-2007 Is Off Calendar, Judgment. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Arbitration Judgment
    Pursuant To Crc 1615 (c), The Award Of The Arbitrator Is Hereby Entered As Judgment. It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Recover From Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. See Scanned Document
      Request RequestSpace
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/29/2006, Entered: 11/29/2006 Order
      Order Confirming Arbitration Award
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 77 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006
        Mini-minutes For Nov-14-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 302
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 76 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: 11/14/2006 Court Filing
          Law And Motion 302, Plaintiff Lawrence Marcus' Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award Was Granted. There Was No Opposition Filed. Prevailing Party To Prepare Order. Judge: Ronald E. Quidachay, Reporter: Sherry Sawyer, Csr #5976
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 75 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
            Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel: Pro Per Substituted For Taylor, Julie L As Attorney For Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 74 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
              Law And Motion, 302, (second Amended) Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arb Award, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party, Plaintiff Lawrence Marcus.
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 73 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: 11/13/2006
                Law And Motion, 302, (amended) Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arb Award, Off Calendar Per Request Of Moving Party, Plaintiff Lawrence Marcus.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Legal Document 72 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Order
                  Order Granting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel-civil
                    Blank 71 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006 Court Filing
                    Law And Motion 302, Defendant's Counsel John Cox's Motion For Withdrawal Of Attorney Of Record Was Granted Order Was Signed In Open Court. Judge: Ronald E. Quidachay, Reporter: Beldon Yee, Csr #2647
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Blank 70 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: 11/9/2006
                      Mini-minutes For Nov-09-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 69 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006
                        Motion For Withdrawal Of Attorney Of Record, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration (re-notice) Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. Hearing Set For Nov-09-2006 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: 11/1/2006 Order
                          Order Shortening Time To Hear Motion For Withdrawal Of Defendant's Counsel Of Record
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 67 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: 10/31/2006
                            Law And Motion 302, Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award; Petition Continued From Nov-09-2006 To Law And Motion At Nov-14-2006, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 At The Request Of The Moving Party.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 66 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
                              Master Calendar Motion Calendar On Nov-09-2006 In Dept. 206, Notice Of Motion And Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel Is Off Calendar. Matter Calendared In The Wrong Department. (206)
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 65 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
                                Amended Petition To Confirm Contractual Arbitration Award Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 64 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
                                  Law And Motion 302, (amended) Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arb Award Continued From Nov-14-2006 To Law And Motion At Nov-20-2006, 9:30 Am In Dept. 302 Per Request Of Moving Party, Plaintiff Lawrence Marcus.
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 63 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006
                                    (second Amended) Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arb Award, Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Hearing Set For Nov-20-2006 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 62 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006
                                      Notice Of Motion And Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel -civil, Proof Of Service, Declaration Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. Hearing Set For Nov-09-2006 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Order
                                        Order Shortening Time Re: Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel.
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 60 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006
                                          Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time To Hear Motion For Withdrawal Of Deft's Counsel Of Record, Declaration Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 59 Filed: 10/23/2006, Entered: 10/23/2006
                                            (amended) Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arb Award, Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Hearing Set For Nov-14-2006 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 58 Filed: 10/18/2006, Entered: 10/18/2006
                                              Notice Of Hearing On Petition To Confirm Arbitration Award; Petition, Proof Of Service Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Hearing Set For Nov-09-2006 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 57 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: 10/4/2006
                                                Plaintiff's Proof Of Service Of Order Continuing Case Management Conference Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/2/2006, Entered: 10/2/2006 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                  Case Management Conference Of Oct-13-2006 Continued To Feb-16-2007 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 55 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: 9/28/2006
                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 54 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: 9/19/2006
                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: 6/19/2006 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                        Case Management Conference Of Jun-30-2006 Continued To Oct-13-2006 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Blank 52 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: 6/5/2006
                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/17/2006, Entered: 1/17/2006 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                            Case Management Conference Of Jan-27-2006 Continued To Jun-30-2006 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: 1/12/2006
                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Blank 49 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: 1/9/2006
                                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/20/2005, Entered: 9/20/2005 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                  Case Management Conference Of Sep-30-2005 Continued To Jan-27-2006 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 47 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005
                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Remittitur
                                                                      Remittitur Reversed
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: 1/26/2005 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                        Case Management Conference Of Feb-04-2005 Continued To Sep-30-2005 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 44 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: 1/20/2005
                                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. Also Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/16/2004, Entered: 8/16/2004 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                            Case Management Conference Of Aug-27-2004 Continued To Feb-04-2005 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212, Re: Status Of Appeal. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 8/12/2004, Entered: 8/12/2004
                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 8/11/2004, Entered: 8/11/2004
                                                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Legal Document 40 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Order
                                                                                  Order Denying Respondent's Mtn To Dismiss Appeal Filed 1/13/04, Etal (a104817 #1)
                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004
                                                                                    Refund/reimbursement Of $287.00 For Transaction W2803b18a056 (reporters Costs Deposited), Payable To Keesal, Young, Tag 22141, Prsp04001205-04, Warrant #02583084, Dated Feb-02-2004
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004
                                                                                      Refund/reimbursement Of $38.00 For Transaction W2803b18a056 (reporters Costs Deposited), Payable To Csr Vikstein, Tag 22141, Prsp04001205-03, Warrant #02583025, Dated Feb-02-2004
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Blank 37 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/15/2004
                                                                                        Record Certified To The Court Of Appeal, A104817 #11, 5.1, Rt-2 Vols (appeal Filed 11/18/03)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Blank 36 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004
                                                                                          Refund/reimbursement Of $325.00 For Transaction W2803b18a056 (reporters Costs Deposited), Payable To Keesal, Young, Tag 22141, Prsp04001092-05, Warrant #02566771, Dated Jan-13-2004
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: 1/12/2004 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                            Case Management Conference Of Jan-23-2004 Continued To Aug-27-2004 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Blank 34 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004
                                                                                              Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 1/8/2004, Entered: 1/8/2004
                                                                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: 12/3/2003 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                  Case Management Conference Of Dec-12-2003 Continued To Jan-23-2004 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Blank 31 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003
                                                                                                    Directory Ntc To Reporter To Prepare Transcript - Deposit (b. Yee, J. Vickstein)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 30 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003
                                                                                                      Clerk's Ntc Of Filing Of Ntc Of Appeal
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Blank 29 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: 11/26/2003
                                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 28 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003
                                                                                                          Reporters Costs Deposited By Appellant, Tran # W2803b18a056, Tag # 007235 (tag #22141)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Request For Clerks/reporter Transcript
                                                                                                            Request For Clerk's/reporter's Transcript (rule 5.1)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript
                                                                                                              Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript, Tran # W2803b18a055, Tag # 007234 (ntc Of Appeal Only, Tag #22141) Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 11/17/2003, Entered: 11/17/2003
                                                                                                                Case Management Statement Jury Requested Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/4/2003
                                                                                                                  Plaintiff's Order Re Motion To Determine Proper Venue.
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/4/2003, Entered: 11/4/2003 Order
                                                                                                                    Order Re; Plaintiff's Motion To Determine Venue
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003
                                                                                                                      Law And Motion, 302, Plaintiff Lawrence Marcus Motion To Determine Proper Venue, Submitted On Oct-28-2003 By Ronald E. Quidachay. Appearance For Plaintiff-moving Party & For Defendant-opposing Party. Argued And The Court Took The Matter Under Submission. Parties To Submit Respective Orders. Hon. Ronald E. Quidachay. Reporter: Joe Vickstein, Csr #4780
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 10/28/2003, Entered: 10/28/2003
                                                                                                                        Mini-minutes For Oct-28-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003
                                                                                                                          Reply Brief In Support Of Motion To Determine Proper Venue, Filed By Pltf Lawrence Marcus
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/23/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                            Case Management Conference Of Oct-31-2003 Continued To Dec-12-2003 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: 10/17/2003
                                                                                                                              Opposition To Pltf's Motion To Determine Proper Venue; Declaration Of Julie Taylor; Pos Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003
                                                                                                                                Case Management Statement Jury Requested Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: 10/7/2003
                                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 3.0 Days
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 10/1/2003, Entered: 10/1/2003
                                                                                                                                    Motion To Determine Proper Venue, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Hearing Set For Oct-28-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Blank 14 Filed: 9/16/2003, Entered: 9/16/2003
                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Petitioner And Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company Inc.s: (1) Petition To Compel Arbitration; And (2) Motion To Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Blank 13 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003
                                                                                                                                        Petition To Compel Arbitration And Motion To Stay Proceedings-granted.
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/11/2003, Entered: 9/11/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                          Order Granting Petitioner And Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Co.inc.
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Blank 11 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            Law And Motion, 302, Petition To Compel Arbitration, Submitted On Sep-05-2003 By Ronald E. Quidachay. The Court Took Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company's, A Corp. Petition Under Submission. Parties To Submit Proposed Orders. Judge: Ronald E. Quidachay Reporter: Beldon Yee, Csr# 2647.
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Blank 10 Filed: 9/5/2003, Entered: 9/5/2003
                                                                                                                                              Mini-minutes For Sep-05-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 9/2/2003, Entered: 9/2/2003
                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Compendium Of Non-california Cases Cited In Support Of Its Petition To Compel Arbitration And Motion To Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003
                                                                                                                                                  Pos Of Reply And Supplemental Declaration Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003
                                                                                                                                                    Supplemental Declaration Of Julie Taylor In Support Of Deft's Petition To Compel Arbitration And To Stay Of Proceedings Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 8/29/2003
                                                                                                                                                      Reply Brief In Support Of Deft's Peition To Compel Arbitration And Motion To Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/25/2003, Entered: 8/25/2003
                                                                                                                                                        Opposition Defendant's Petition To Compel Arbitration
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/14/2003, Entered: 7/14/2003
                                                                                                                                                          Petition To Compel Arbitration; Notice;supplemental Compendium, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. Hearing Set For Sep-05-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 302
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 6/19/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003
                                                                                                                                                            Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence Served Jun-04-2003, Mail On Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp.
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                              Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/3/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Marcus, Lawrence As To Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, A Corp. Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Oct-31-2003 Proof Of Service Due On Aug-04-2003 Case Management Statement Due On Oct-16-2003
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 51 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?