Anderson v. McGraw Hill Cos Inc

Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:00-cv-00486-WDM-CBS
District Judge Walker D. Miller, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Walker D. Miller
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Rebecca Anderson, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of Howard B. Cohen, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nora Virginia Kelly +1 303 866 9868 +1 303 866 0855 nvkesq@qwestoffice.net
v.
The McGraw-Hill Companies The McGraw-Hill Companies, Defendant
Officially listed as "McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc."

Represented by Law Offices of Jason Allen Kramer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Allen Kramer +1 720 913 3100 +1 720 913 3120 dlefiling.litigation@denvergov.org

Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henry D. Lederman +1 925 932 2468 +1 925 946 9809 hlederman@littler.com
Attributes
Office Denver
Filed 3/6/2000
Jury Demand Both
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Denver
Terminated 10/21/2002
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 02-1514[], {}
Def Custody Status
Flags SuppressAnsRpt, TERMED
Timeline
  Entries (112) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 104 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 USCA Mandate
MANDATE from the Court of Appeals; CA # 02-1514; Dt issued 12/6/02; ORDER dated 12/6/02 dismissing the appeal [99-1] (msn)
LREF
Blank 103 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/9/2002 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller granting motion to withdraw motion for review of Bill of Costs [100-1] [102-1], withdrawing motion for review of Bill of Costs [100-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/9/02 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 102 Filed: 12/5/2002, Entered: 12/6/2002 Motion to Withdraw Document
MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to withdraw motion for review of Bill of Costs [100-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 101 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/25/2002 USCA Case Number
NOTIFICATION by Circuit Court of assignment of Case No. [99-1] 02-1514 (msn)
LREF
Blank 100 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002, Terminated: 12/6/2002 Motion for Review
MOTION by defendant for review of Bill of Costs (document actually entitiled Defendants Appeal From Bill of Costs) (msn)
LREF
Blank 99 Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff re: judgment dated 10/21/02 [96-1] ; Notice of transcript order form due 12/2/02 ; Notice mailed to all counsel on 11/21/02 (msn)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 11/20/2002, Entered: 11/21/2002 USCA Appeal Fees
$100.00 fee and $5.00 fee paid. Receipt No 239435. re: appeal [99-1] (msn)
LREF
Blank 98 Filed: 11/13/2002, Entered: 11/14/2002 Costs Taxed
Bill of COSTS taxed judgment [96-1] for defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc in the amount of $ 3,671.10 against plaintiff Rebecca Anderson (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
LREF
Blank 97 Filed: 11/12/2002, Entered: 11/13/2002 Certificate of Compliance
Certificate of Compliance by defendant re: consultation with opposing counsel regarding Bill of Costs (pap)
LREF
Blank 96 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 Judgment*
JUDGMENT: by Clerk James R. Manspeaker regarding [95-1] Scheduling order dismissing case w/prej, regarding [95-2] order; Jgm is entered in favor of dft and against pla, the complaint and cause of action are dismissed w/prej; the dft may have its costs upon filing of bill of costs within 10 days from entry of jgm (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/21/02 (dlb) Modified on 11/21/2002
LREF
Blank 95 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: 10/21/2002 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Judge Walker D. Miller granting dft's motion for summary judgment on all claims [62-1] dismissing case w/prej (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/21/02 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 94 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: 10/10/2002, Terminated: 10/21/2002 Motion in Limine
MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc in limine to exclude certain categories of evidence (dlb)
LREF
Blank 93 Filed: 10/4/2002, Entered: 10/7/2002 Notice of Entry of Appearance
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc by Henry David Lederman (dlb)
LREF
Blank 92 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: 9/4/2002 Supplement/Amendment
Citation of Additional Authority in Support (SUPPLEMENT) by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to dft's motion for summary judgment on all claims [62-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 91 Filed: 7/17/2002, Entered: 7/18/2002 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller granting motion for leave to resp to dft's citation of add'l authority [88-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/18/02 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 90 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 Response
RESPONSE by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson to dft's citation of add'l authority [87-1], in support of its motion for summary judgment on all claims [62-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 89 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: 7/15/2002 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller granting motion for leave to resp to dft's citation of add'l authority [88-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/15/02 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 88 Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002, Terminated: 7/12/2002 Motion for Leave
MOTION by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson for leave to resp to dft's citation of add'l authority (dlb)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 7/11/2002, Entered: 7/12/2002 Miscellaneous Document
Tendered Response submitted by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson re: motion for leave to resp to dft's citation of add'l authority [88-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 87 Filed: 6/19/2002, Entered: 6/20/2002 Supplement/Amendment
Citation of Additional Authority in Support (SUPPLEMENT) by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to dft's motion for summary judgment on all claims [62-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 86 Filed: 6/7/2002, Entered: 6/10/2002 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller ; Trial prep conference set for 8:30 10/22/02 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/10/02 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 85 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: 4/12/2002, Terminated: 6/5/2002 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Notice (MOTION) by counsel defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to withdraw attorney Sven C. Collins and Franklin A. Nachman will remain (dlb)
LREF
Blank 84 Filed: 2/5/2002, Entered: 2/6/2002 Trial Exhibit
Notice of Filing of Original EXHIBITS by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to motion for summary judgment on all claims [62-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 83 Filed: 1/31/2002, Entered: 1/31/2002 Reply to Response to Motion
REPLY by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to pla's response to dft's motion for summary judgment on all claims [62-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 82 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller granting motion to exceed page limitation and ext time to file reply br to 1/31/02 [81-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/22/02 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 81 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: 1/22/2002, Terminated: 1/22/2002 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to exceed page limitation and ext time to file reply br to 1/31/02 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 80 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 Affidavit
Amended AFFIDAVIT of Rebecca Anderson re: pla's motion response [77-1], dft's re: motion for summary judgment on all claims [62-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 79 Filed: 1/10/2002, Entered: 1/11/2002 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller granting motion for leave to substitute an amended exh B to pla's resp to dft's mtn for sum jgm [78-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/11/02 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 78 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002, Terminated: 1/10/2002 Motion for Leave
MOTION by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson for leave to substitute an amended exh B to pla's resp to dft's mtn for sum jgm (dlb)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: 1/10/2002 Miscellaneous Document
Tendered Amended Affidavit of Rebecca Anderson submitted by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson re: motion for leave to substitute an amended exh B to pla's resp to dft's mtn for sum jgm [78-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 77 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson to dft's motion for summary judgment on all claims [62-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 76 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller granting motion to exceed page limitation re: resp to mtn for sum jgm [75-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/7/02 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 75 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002, Terminated: 1/7/2002 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Unopposed MOTION by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson to exceed page limitation re: resp to mtn for sum jgm (dlb)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: 1/7/2002 Miscellaneous Document
Tendered Pla's Response to Mtn for Sum Jgm submitted by plaintiff re: motion to exceed page limitation re: resp to mtn for sum jgm [75-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 74 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 Objections
OBJECTIONS by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson to dft's exhibits listed in pre-trial order [68-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 73 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller granting pla's uncontested motion for leave to file objections to exhibits out of time [71-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/5/01 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 72 Filed: 12/4/2001, Entered: 12/5/2001 Supplement/Amendment
SUPPLEMENT by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to dft's motion for summary judgment on all claims [62-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 71 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001, Terminated: 12/4/2001 Motion for Leave
Uncontested MOTION by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson for leave to file objections to exhibits out of time (dlb)
LREF
Blank 70 Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller ; jury trial set for 8:30 11/4/02; parties to contact court one month prior to set trial prep conf (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/3/01 (dlb)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2001, Entered: 12/4/2001 Miscellaneous Document
Tendered Pla's Obj to Dft's Exhibits submitted by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson re: motion for leave to file objections to exhibits out of time [71-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 69 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 12/3/2001 Objections
OBJECTIONS by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to Pla's Exhibits in final pre-trial order order [68-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 68 Filed: 11/30/2001, Entered: 11/30/2001 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
Final PRE-TRIAL ORDER; Discovery complete; Pending mtns: dft's mtn for sum jgm, pla may file a mtn to compel by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
LREF
Blank 67 Filed: 11/27/2001, Entered: 11/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller granting pla's motion to extend time to 1/4/02 to resp to dft's mtn for sum jgm [66-1]; dft has until 1/24/02 to reply (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/28/01 (pap)
LREF
Blank 66 Filed: 11/21/2001, Entered: 11/23/2001, Terminated: 11/27/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson to extend time to 1/4/02 to resp to dft's mtn for sum jgm (dlb)
LREF
Blank 65 Filed: 11/14/2001, Entered: 11/15/2001 Pretrial Conference - FinalCourt Filing
COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer , ; pretrial conf held 11/14/01 ; pto ddl set for 11/20/01 ; entry date : 11/15/01 Court Reporter: CBS C.V. 2001-169 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 64 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller regarding [62-1] dft's motion for summary judgment on all claims, pla shall respond by 11/23/01 and dft shall reply by 12/10/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/2/01 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 63 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001 Trial Exhibit
EXHIBITS by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to dft's motion for summary judgment on all claims [62-1] *large top bound document (dlb)
LREF
Blank 62 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/2/2001, Terminated: 10/21/2002 Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc for summary judgment on all claims (dlb)
LREF
Blank 61 Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: 11/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Judge Walker D. Miller granting unopposed motion to exceed page limitation re: sum jgm brief [60-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/1/01 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 60 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: 10/31/2001, Terminated: 11/1/2001 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Unopposed MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to exceed page limitation re: sum jgm brief (dlb)
LREF
Blank 59 Filed: 10/2/2001, Entered: 10/4/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to extend dispo ddl [57-1] ; disp mtn ddl reset 11/1/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 10/4/01 (pap)
LREF
Blank 58 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: 10/2/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend dispo ddl [57-1] (pap)
LREF
Blank 57 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: 9/27/2001, Terminated: 10/2/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
Unopposed MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to extend dispo ddl (dlb)
LREF
Blank 56 Filed: 8/20/2001, Entered: 8/29/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting in part and denying in part Pla's motion to compel discovery from Dft [46-1] ; discovery ddl set 9/28/01 ; entry date : 8/29/01 Court Reporter: Tape #CBS C.V. 01-126 & 127 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 55 Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: 8/13/2001 Response to Motion
RESPONSE by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to Pla's motion to compel discovery from Dft [46-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 54 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: 8/8/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting dft's motion to extend time to 8/10/01 to resp to Pla's Mtn to Comp [51-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/8/01 (pap)
LREF
Blank 53 Filed: 8/1/2001, Entered: 8/2/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to 8/10/01 to resp to Pla's Mtn to Comp [51-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 52 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001 Report
Notice of Filing of Export REPORT by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc (dlb)
LREF
Blank 51 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: 8/1/2001, Terminated: 8/7/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to extend time to 8/10/01 to resp to Pla's Mtn to Comp (dlb)
LREF
Blank 50 Filed: 7/26/2001, Entered: 7/27/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer regarding Pla's [46-1] motion to compel discovery from Dft. Dft has to 7/31/01 to respond. A hearing on Dft's motion to compel discovery from Dft [46-1] will be held at the Settle Conf set for 3:30 8/20/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/27/01 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 49 Filed: 7/25/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; settlement conf set for 3:30 8/20/01 ; pto ddl set for 11/7/01 ; pretrial conf set for 10:00 11/14/01. Dft's oral mtn to ext report ddl is denied. Dft shall produce w/in 10 days (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/26/01 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 47 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to compel discovery from Dft [46-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 46 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: 7/20/2001 Motion to Compel
MOTION by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson to compel discovery from Dft (dlb)
LREF
Blank 48 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/26/2001 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
COURTROOM MINUTES by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer ; discovery ddl set 8/31/01 ; disp mtn ddl set 10/1/01 ; settlement conf set for 3:30 8/20/01 ; pretrial conf set for 10:00 11/14/01 ; entry date : 7/26/01 Court Reporter: CBS C.V. 2001-112 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 45 Filed: 7/3/2001, Entered: 7/5/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting Pla's motion to reschedule (reset) Final Pre-Trial Conf [39-1] and Dft's motion to extend ddl for filing disp mtns [43-1] ; disp mtn ddl set 8/31/01 ; pretrial conf reset for 3:30 8/20/01 ; pto ddl set for 8/13/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 7/5/01 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 44 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: 6/29/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend ddl for filing disp mtns [43-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 43 Filed: 6/28/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001, Terminated: 7/3/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to extend ddl for filing disp mtns (dlb)
LREF
Blank 42 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001 Protective OrderCourt Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer : regarding [41-1] order and [0-0] proposed protective order (document tendered) (cc: all counsel) (dlb)
LREF
Blank 41 Filed: 6/27/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting Protective Order (tendered doc) [0-0] in connection with this action ONLY (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/28/01 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 40 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: 6/22/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to reschedule (reset) Final Pre-Trial Conf [39-1] (gms)
LREF
Blank 39 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/21/2001, Terminated: 7/3/2001 Motion to Reset
Uncontested MOTION by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson to reschedule (reset) Final Pre-Trial Conf (dlb)
LREF
Blank 38 Filed: 6/1/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting motion to extend time to submit medical expert reports to 7/23/01 [34-1] and motion to extend Discovery Cutoff Date to 7/31/01 [36-1] ; discovery ddl set 7/31/01, Defendant shall serve its expert reports on or before 7/31/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/1/01 (dlb)
LREF
Blank 37 Filed: 5/30/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend Discovery Cutoff Date to 7/31/01 [36-1] (dlb)
LREF
Blank 36 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson to extend Discovery Cutoff Date to 7/31/01 (dlb)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 6/28/2001 Miscellaneous Document
Tendered Protective order submitted by plaintiff, defendant (dlb)
LREF
Blank 35 Filed: 5/22/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to submit medical expert reports to 7/23/01 [34-1] (lam)
LREF
Blank 34 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: 5/23/2001, Terminated: 6/1/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
Unopposed MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to extend time to submit medical expert reports to 7/23/01 (lam)
LREF
Blank 33 Filed: 2/7/2001, Entered: 2/12/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer granting pla's motion to stay proceedings in this case for a short period of time, due to illness [28-1] ; discovery ddl reset 6/1/01 ; dsm papers ddl reset for 6/15/01 ; disp mtn ddl reset 7/2/01 ; pretrial conf reset for 9:30 7/6/01 ; pto ddl reset for 7/1/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 2/12/01 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 32 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: 1/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer finding the motion to extend time to respond to discovery pursuant to LR 7.1B for 3 days [26-1] moot, granting motion to extend time to respond and/or object to pla's first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents [25-1] until 2/1/01, granting motion to extend time to file certain expert reports [24-1] Dft has until 5/21/01 to submit its medical expert reports (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/31/01 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 31 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/23/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to stay proceedings in this case for a short period of time, due to illness [28-1] (former empl)
LREF
Blank 30 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to respond and/or object to pla's first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents [25-1] (former empl)
LREF
Blank 29 Filed: 1/22/2001, Entered: 1/22/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to respond to discovery pursuant to LR 7.1B for 3 days [26-1] (former empl)
LREF
Blank 28 Filed: 1/19/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001, Terminated: 2/7/2001 Motion to Stay
MOTION by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson to stay proceedings in this case for a short period of time, due to illness (former empl)
LREF
Blank 27 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer the motion to extend time to file certain expert reports [24-1] (former empl)
LREF
Blank 26 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001, Terminated: 1/30/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
Ex Parte MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to extend time to respond to discovery pursuant to LR 7.1B for 3 days (former empl)
LREF
Blank 25 Filed: 1/18/2001, Entered: 1/19/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
Unopposed MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to extend time to respond and/or object to pla's first set of interrogatories and requests for production of documents (former empl)
LREF
Blank 24 Filed: 1/16/2001, Entered: 1/17/2001 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc to extend time to file certain expert reports (former empl)
LREF
Blank 23 Filed: 1/10/2001, Entered: 1/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle Case referred to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 1/11/01 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 22 Filed: 12/21/2000, Entered: 12/26/2000 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle granting motion to extend time to file rebuttal expert reports until 1/15/01 [20-1], no further extensions will be granted (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 12/26/00 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 21 Filed: 12/14/2000, Entered: 12/15/2000 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle the motion to extend time to file rebuttal expert reports until 1/15/01 [20-1] (gms)
LREF
Blank 20 Filed: 12/13/2000, Entered: 12/14/2000, Terminated: 12/21/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by defendant to extend time to file rebuttal expert reports until 1/15/01 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 19 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: 11/9/2000 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle granting pla's motion to extend date for designating expert witnesses [16-1], ddl for designating initial experts is 11/13/00, ddl for designating rebuttal experts is 12/13/00 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/9/00 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 18 Filed: 11/2/2000, Entered: 11/3/2000 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle, each party to submit a further supplemental confidential settlement statement by 2/15/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 11/3/00 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 17 Filed: 11/1/2000, Entered: 11/1/2000 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle the motion to extend date for designating expert witnesses [16-1] (former empl)
LREF
Blank 16 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: 10/31/2000, Terminated: 11/8/2000 Motion for Extension of Time
MOTION by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson to extend date for designating expert witnesses (former empl)
LREF
Blank 15 Filed: 10/4/2000, Entered: 10/5/2000 Answer
ANSWER by defendant to 2nd amended complaint [14-1] (former empl)
LREF
Blank 14 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 Amended Complaint
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson; jury demand (originally tendered on 9/15/00, accepted by order of 9/27/00) (former empl) Modified on 09/28/2000
LREF
Blank 13 Filed: 9/27/2000, Entered: 9/28/2000 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER : by Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle granting pla's motion to amend complaint, 2nd amd comp is accepted for filing [2-1] [11-1] (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 9/28/00 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 12 Filed: 9/18/2000, Entered: 9/20/2000 MemorandumCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM by Judge Walker D. Miller referring to Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle the motion to amend complaint [2-1] [11-1] (former empl)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
MOTION by plaintiff to amend complaint [2-1] (former empl)
LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2000, Entered: 9/18/2000 Miscellaneous Document
Tendered Second Amended Complaint submitted by plaintiff re: motion to amend complaint [2-1] [11-1] (former empl)
LREF
Blank 10 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle stlmt / status conf 9:00 11/2/00; pretrial conf 9:00 5/4/01 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 8/2/00 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle discovery cutoff 2/1/01; dispositive motions due 3/1/01; status / settlement conference 9:00 11/2/00; pretrial conference set 9:00 5/4/01 (cc: all counsel) (former empl)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 8/1/2000, Entered: 8/2/2000 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
COURTROOM MINUTES OF SCHED CONF by Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle: sched order approved; rule 16 conf held on 8/1/00; status / settlement conf set for 9:00 11/2/00; pretrial conf set for 9:00 5/4/01 ; entry date : 8/2/00 Court Reporter: Tape 00-66 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 6/1/2000, Entered: 6/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle ; rule 16 conference set for 8:30 8/1/00 (cc: all counsel) ; entry date : 6/2/00 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 5/25/2000, Entered: 5/30/2000 Order Referring Case to Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
ORDER R16,stat,stlmt,pt,pto Case referred to Magistrate Judge Bruce D. Pringle by Judge Walker D. Miller (cc: to counsel) (gms)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 5/22/2000, Entered: 5/22/2000 Answer
ANSWER by defendant to amd complaint [2-1] (gms)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 5/11/2000, Entered: 5/16/2000 Notice of Change of Address
NOTICE of Change of Address of Nora Kelly by plaintiff (former empl)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: 5/5/2000 Summons Returned Executed
RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint upon defendant McGraw Hill Cos Inc on 5/1/00 (former empl)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 4/26/2000, Entered: 4/27/2000, Terminated: 9/27/2000 Amended Complaint
AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Rebecca Anderson; jury demand (former empl)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Complaint
COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued); jury demand (former empl)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: 3/6/2000 Filing Fee Received
FILING FEE PAID: on 3/6/00 in the amount of $ 150, receipt # 214173. (former empl)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 68 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?