Richard Goldstein v. Trautman Wasserman & Company,a Corporation
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 03 424541
Superior Court Judge James L. Warren, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Goldstein Richard, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cliff Michael Palefsky +1 415 421 9292 +1 415 403 0202 cp@mhpsf.com
v.
No Logo Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie L. Taylor +1 415 398 6000 julie.taylor@kyl.com
No Logo Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.*, Defendant
No Logo Trautman Wasserman & Company,a Corporation, Defendant
Cause of Action Other Non Exempt Complaints
  Entries (97) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (13) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Crc 3.1385 Order To Show Cause Of Jun-09-2009 Is Off Calendar, Dismissal On File. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document 96 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal (crc 3.1385)
    Order To Show Cause Re Dismissal Pursuant To Crc 3.1385 Set For Jun-09-2009 At 10:00 Am In Dept. 212. Notice Sent By Court
      Blank 95 Filed: 2/5/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009
      Mini-minutes For Feb-05-2009 10:30 Am For Dept 212
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: 2/2/2009 Dismissal
        Dismissal With Prejudice Of Complaint
          Request RequestSpace
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/5/2008 Order to Show Cause
          Order To Show Cause To All Counsel Set For Dec-04-2008 Continued To Feb-05-2009 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 92 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: 12/4/2008
            Mini-minutes For Dec-04-2008 10:30 Am For Dept 212
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 91 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: 11/26/2008
              Declaration Of Pltf's Counsel, Carolyn Leary, In Response To Osc For Failure To Complete Arbitration Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: 10/23/2008 Order to Show Cause
                Order To Show Cause To All Counsel Set For Oct-23-2008 Continued To Dec-04-2008 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 89 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: 10/23/2008
                  Mini-minutes For Oct-23-2008 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 88 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: 10/16/2008
                    Declaration Of Pltf's Counsel, Cliff Palefsky, In Response To Osc For Failure To Complete Arb Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Order to Show Cause
                      Order To Show Cause To All Counsel Set For Aug-21-2008 Continued To Oct-23-2008 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 86 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
                        Mini-minutes For Aug-21-2008 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 85 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008
                          Declaration Of Pltf's Counsel, Cliff Palefsky, In Response To Order To Show Cause-miscellaneous Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008 Order to Show Cause
                            Order To Show Cause To All Counsel Set For Jun-19-2008 Continued To Aug-21-2008 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
                              Request RequestSpace
                              Blank 83 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008
                              Mini-minutes For Jun-19-2008 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 82 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008
                                Declaration Of Pl's Counsel In Response To Osc - Miscellaneous Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Order to Show Cause
                                  Order To Show Cause To All Counsel Set For Apr-17-2008 Continued To Jun-19-2008 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Blank 80 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008
                                    Mini-minutes For Apr-17-2008 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Blank 79 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                                      Declaration Of Pltf's Counsel In Response To Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 78 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008
                                        Pos; Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Order to Show Cause
                                          Order To Show Cause To All Counsel Set For Jan-17-2008 Continued To Apr-17-2008 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
                                            Request RequestSpace
                                            Blank 76 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008
                                            Mini-minutes For Jan-17-2008 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                              Request RequestSpace
                                              Blank 75 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008
                                              Declaration Of Plaintiff's Counsel, Cliff Palefsky, In Response To Osc - Miscellaneous Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 74 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007
                                                Pos Of Osc-mecellaneous Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Order To Show Cause \- Miscellaneous
                                                  Order To Show Cause To All Counsel Set For Oct-25-2007 Continued To Jan-17-2008 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Blank 72 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007
                                                    Mini-minutes For Oct-25-2007 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 71 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007
                                                      Declaration Of Plaintiff's Counsel, Cliff Palefsky, In Response To Order To Show Cause - Miscellaneous Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                        Blank 70 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
                                                        Proof Of Service Of Order To Show Cause - Miscellaneous Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard Served Aug-27-2007, Mail On Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company,a Corporation Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Order To Show Cause \- Miscellaneous
                                                          Order To Show Cause To All Counsel Set For Aug-23-2007 Continued To Oct-25-2007 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Blank 68 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007
                                                            Mini-minutes For Aug-23-2007 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Blank 67 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007
                                                              Declaration Of Cliff Palefsky In Response To Osc Miscellaneous Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007
                                                                Proof Of Service Of Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard Served May-30-2007, Mail On Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company,a Corporation Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Order To Show Cause \- Miscellaneous
                                                                  Order To Show Cause To All Counsel Set For May-24-2007 Continued To Aug-23-2007 At 10:30 Am In Dept. 212 For Failure To Complete Arbitration. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                    Blank 64 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007
                                                                    Mini-minutes For May-24-2007 10:30 Am For Dept 212
                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                      Blank 63 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007
                                                                      Declaration Of Plaintiff's Counsel, Cliff Palefsky, In Response To Osc-miscellaneous Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                        Blank 62 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: 3/26/2007
                                                                        Proof Of Service Of Order Granting Attorney's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel: Pro Per Substituted For Taylor, Julie L As Attorney For Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                          Blank 61 Filed: 3/16/2007, Entered: 3/16/2007
                                                                          Pos Of Osc Filed By Pltf
                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007
                                                                            Proof Of Service Of (amended Proof Of Service) Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard Served Mar-12-2007, Mail On Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company,a Corporation Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/13/2007 Order To Show Cause \- Miscellaneous
                                                                              Order To Show Cause Set For May-24-2007 In Department 212 At 10:30 Am For Failure To Complete Arbitration. The Mar-23-2007 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007
                                                                                Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                  Blank 57 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006
                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Dec-12-2006 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Order
                                                                                    Order Granting Attorney Julie L. Taylor Of Keesal, Young & Logan's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel For Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                      Blank 55 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: 12/12/2006 Court Filing
                                                                                      Law And Motion 301, Keesal Young & Logan's Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel For Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc. Was Granted. Order Signed In Open Court. Judge: Peter J. Busch, Reporter: Carol Karen, Csr #8189
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                        Blank 54 Filed: 11/15/2006, Entered: 11/15/2006
                                                                                        Motion For Withdrawal Of Attorney Of Record, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc. Hearing Set For Dec-12-2006 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                          Blank 53 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006
                                                                                          Master Calendar Motion Calendar On Nov-09-2006 In Dept. 206, Notice Of Motion And Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel Is Off Calendar. Matter Calendared In The Wrong Department. (206)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                            Blank 52 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006
                                                                                            Notice Of Motion And Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel -civil, Proof Of Service, Declaration Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc. Hearing Set For Nov-09-2006 At 09:30 Am In Dept 206
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: 10/25/2006 Order
                                                                                              Order Shortening Time Re: Motion To Be Relieved As Counsel.
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: 10/24/2006
                                                                                                Ex Parte Application For Order Shortening Time To Hear Motion For Withdrawal Of Deft's Counsel Of Record; Pos In Support Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006
                                                                                                  Case Management Statement A Nonjury Trial Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc. Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                    Legal Document 48 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: 5/11/2006 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                    Case Management Conference Of May-26-2006 Continued To Mar-23-2007 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: 5/1/2006
                                                                                                      Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 4.0 Days
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: 11/4/2005 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                        Case Management Conference Of Nov-18-2005 Continued To May-26-2006 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                          Blank 45 Filed: 11/3/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005
                                                                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 4.0 Days
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                            Blank 44 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: 10/28/2005
                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc. Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/19/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Remittitur
                                                                                                              Remittitur Reversed
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                Legal Document 42 Filed: 6/22/2005, Entered: 6/22/2005 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                Case Management Conference Of Jul-01-2005 Continued To Nov-18-2005 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
                                                                                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: 6/17/2005
                                                                                                                    Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 4.0 Days
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: 3/2/2005 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                      Case Management Conference Of Mar-11-2005 Continued To Jul-01-2005 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                        Blank 38 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: 2/24/2005
                                                                                                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard Also Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc. Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                          Case Management Conference Of Oct-22-2004 Continued To Mar-11-2005 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                            Blank 36 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: 10/7/2004
                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement And Deft. Trautman Wasserman & Company Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 5.0 Days
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                              Blank 35 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004
                                                                                                                              Certification Notice Mailed, A106306 #1
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                Blank 34 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 6/29/2004
                                                                                                                                Record Certified To The Court Of Appeal, A106306 #1, 5.1, Rt-2 Vols (appeal Filed 4/12/04)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                  Blank 33 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                                                                                                                                  Refund/reimbursement Of $290.00 Re 24116 For Transaction W2804412a005 (reporters Costs Deposited), Payable To Keesal Young, Warrant #02699530, Dated Jun-24-2004
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                    Blank 32 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004
                                                                                                                                    Refund/reimbursement Of $35.00 Re 24116 For Transaction W2804412a005 (reporters Costs Deposited), Payable To Patty Lee Hubble, Warrant #00269858, Dated Jun-22-2004
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                      Blank 31 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004
                                                                                                                                      Refund/reimbursement Of $313.00 Re 24116 For Transaction W2804412a005 (reporters Costs Deposited), Payable To Keesal, Young & Logan, Otsp04001044, Warrant #02687989, Dated Jun-09-2004
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                        Blank 30 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: 6/9/2004
                                                                                                                                        Refund/reimbursement Of $12.00 Re 24116 For Transaction W2804412a005 (reporters Costs Deposited), Payable To Christina Paxton, Prsp04002005-01, Warrant #02687836, Dated Jun-09-2004
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                          Blank 29 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004
                                                                                                                                          Directory Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript - Hubble
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                            Blank 28 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                            Directory Notice To Reporter To Prepare Transcript - Paxton
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                              Blank 27 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: 4/16/2004
                                                                                                                                              Clerk's Notice Of Filing Of Notice Of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                Blank 26 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004
                                                                                                                                                Reporters Costs Deposited By Appellant, Tran # W2804412a005, Tag # 008726 Receipt No. 24116
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Request For Clerks/reporter Transcript
                                                                                                                                                  Request For Clerk's/reporter's Transcript (5.1)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript
                                                                                                                                                    Notice Of Appeal/request For Transcript, Tran # W2804412a004, Tag # 008725 Tag #24116 Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                      Blank 23 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: 3/30/2004
                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                        Order Re: Relief From Stay
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                          Blank 21 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Law And Motion 301, Plaintiff Richard Goldstein's Motion For Relief From Stay: Granted. Order Signed. Judge: James L. Warren Reporter: Christina Paxton, Csr #1558
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                            Blank 20 Filed: 3/29/2004, Entered: 3/29/2004
                                                                                                                                                            Mini-minutes For Mar-29-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                              Blank 19 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Law And Motion 301, Notice Of Motion For Relief From Stay, And Motion For Relief From Stay Continued From Mar-15-2004 To Law And Motion At Mar-29-2004, 9:30 Am In Dept. 301. Plaintiff Richard Goldstein's Motion: Continued On The Court's Own Motion To Be Heard By The Honorable James L. Warren. Judge: A. James Robertson, Ii Reporter: Joyce Long, Csr #8620
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 18 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004
                                                                                                                                                                Mini-minutes For Mar-15-2004 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 17 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004
                                                                                                                                                                  Reply Brief Of Pltf In Support Of Pltf's Motion For Relief From Stay Filed
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 16 Filed: 3/5/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition To Pltf's Motion For Relief From Stay Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 2/20/2004, Entered: 2/20/2004
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice Of Motion For Relief From Stay, And Motion For Relief From Stay, Proof Of Service, Points And Authorities, Declaration Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard Hearing Set For Mar-15-2004 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/9/2004 Order Continuing Case Management Conference
                                                                                                                                                                        Case Management Conference Of Feb-20-2004 Continued To Oct-22-2004 At 9:00 Am In Dept. 212,. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: 2/6/2004
                                                                                                                                                                          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard Jury Demanded, Estimated Time For Trial: 4.0 Days
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/5/2004, Entered: 2/5/2004
                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Statement Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 12/16/2003, Entered: 12/16/2003
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Of Entry Of Order/notice Of Ruling Filed Granting Petitioner And Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company Inc.'s: 1) Petition To Compel Arbitration; And 2) Motion To Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                Order Granting Petitioner And Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.'s Petition To Compel Arbitration And Motion To Stay Proceedings
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                  Mini-minutes For Dec-11-2003 9:30 Am For Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: 12/11/2003 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Law And Motion 301, Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.'s Petition To Compel Arbitration And Motion To Stay: Granted. Order Signed. Judge: James L. Warren Reporter: Patty Lee Hubble, Csr #3058
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                      Supplemental Compendum Of Non California Cases In Support Of Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.'s Petition To Compel Arbitration; And Motion To Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 12/5/2003, Entered: 12/5/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum Of Points And Authorities In Support Of Petition To Compel Arbitration; And Motion To Stay Proceedings Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: 12/1/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition Deft's Petition To Compel Arbitration, Filed By Pltf
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: 11/5/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Of Petition And Petition To Compel Arbitration And Motion To Stay; Memo Of P&a; Declaration Of Julie Taylor; Declaration Of Forde Prigot; Compendium Of Non-california Authorities, Proof Of Service Filed By Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company, Inc. Hearing Set For Dec-11-2003 At 09:30 Am In Dept 301
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 10/14/2003, Entered: 10/14/2003
                                                                                                                                                                                              Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard Served Sep-19-2003, Mail And Acknowledgement, Acknowledgment Date Oct-06-2003 On Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company,a Corporation
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice To Plaintiff
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Other Non Exempt Complaints, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Goldstein, Richard As To Defendant Trautman Wasserman & Company,a Corporation Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Feb-20-2004 Proof Of Service Due On Nov-17-2003 Case Management Statement Due On Feb-05-2004

                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 85 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?