Pioneer Financial, Llc v. Chanel Smith Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 04 427960
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Kennard , +1 916 920 2295 +1 916 920 0682 rskennard@nelson-kennard.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Smith, Chanel, Defendant
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: 10/31/2012 Execution For Money/possession/sale Return
Return Of Execution For Money Issued To Alameda County, Returned And Filed, Unsatisfied As To Defendant Smith, Chanel
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 12 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: 4/24/2012
    Execution For Money Issued To Alameda County As To Defendant Smith, Chanel
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: 4/24/2012 Cost Bill
      Cost Bill After Judgment, $618.30 Credit Acknowledged, $905.20 Interest, $.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
        Request RequestSpace
        Blank 10 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: 5/28/2004
        Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
          Pre-trial Calendar Sweep, Case Management Conference Calendar Of May-14-2004, Off Calendar, Dismissal Or Judgment On File As To All Defendants
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Clerks Judgment - General
            Under Application To The Clerk For Judgment Under Sec 585(1) C.c.p., It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Recover From Defendant Smith, Chanel $1,094.91 Principal, $325.00 Attorney Fees, $239.83 Interest, $118.30 Costs, Total Judgment $1,778.04, See Scanned Document
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004 Dismissal
              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Does 1-10
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 6 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004
                Declaration Robert Scott Kennard Filed Re: Unavailability Of Original Instrument, Computation Of Interest, Notice Pursuant To Ccp 1033 (b) (2) And Attorney's Fees Pursuant To Cc 1717 Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                  Blank 5 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004
                  Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered, Declaration Of Non-military Status, Cost Bill $198.30 Filed, Credit Acknowledged $.00 As To Defendant Smith, Chanel
                    Blank 4 Filed: 4/7/2004, Entered: 4/7/2004
                    Original Summons Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Smith, Chanel
                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004
                      Proof Of Service Of Summons & Complaint; Notice To Pltf; Alternative Dispute Resolution; Case Management Statement; Stipulation For Alternative Dispute Resolution Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Served Jan-23-2004, Personal Service On Defendant Smith, Chanel
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Notice To Plaintiff
                        Notice To Plaintiff
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Complaint
                          Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Smith, Chanel Does 1-10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For May-14-2004 Proof Of Service Due On Mar-15-2004 Case Management Statement Due On Apr-29-2004
                            Request RequestSpace

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 10 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?