Pioneer Financial, Llc v. Verner Martin Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 04 427971
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Kennard , +1 916 920 2295 +1 916 920 0682 rskennard@nelson-kennard.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Martin, Verner, Defendant
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (5) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: 3/21/2013 Satisfaction of Judgment
Satisfaction Of Judgment, Fully Satisfied, Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Martin, Verner
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Execution For Money/possession/sale Return
    Return Of Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County, Returned And Filed, Fully Satisfied As To Defendant Martin, Verner
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 15 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011
      Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County As To Defendant Martin, Verner
        Blank 14 Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: 8/8/2011
        Cost Bill After Judgment, $.00 Credit Acknowledged, $1,005.10 Interest, $.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
          Blank 13 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: 4/6/2009
          Return Of Execution For Money Issued To Sacramento County, Returned And Filed, Unsatisfied As To Defendant Martin, Verner
            Blank 12 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: 9/23/2004
            Execution For Money Issued To Sacramento County As To Defendant Martin, Verner
              Blank 11 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 9/20/2004
              Cost Bill After Judgment, $.00 Credit Acknowledged, $62.23 Interest, $26.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                Blank 10 Filed: 4/23/2004, Entered: 4/23/2004
                Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/12/2004 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
                  Pre-trial Calendar Sweep, Case Management Conference Calendar Of May-14-2004, Off Calendar, Dismissal Or Judgment On File As To All Defendants
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Clerks Judgment - General
                    Under Application To The Clerk For Judgment Under Sec 585(1) C.c.p., It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Recover From Defendant Martin, Verner $800.64 Principal, $240.00 Attorney Fees, $156.66 Interest, $198.30 Costs, Total Judgment $1,395.60, See Scanned Document
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Dismissal
                      Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Does 1-10
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 6 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
                        Declaration Robert Scott Kennard Filed Re: Unavailability Of Original Instrument, Computation Of Interest, Notice Pursuant To Ccp 1033 (b)(2) And Attorney's Fees Pursuant To Cc 1717 Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                          Blank 5 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
                          Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered, Declaration Of Non-military Status, Cost Bill $198.30 Filed, Credit Acknowledged $.00 As To Defendant Martin, Verner
                            Blank 4 Filed: 4/8/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004
                            Original Summons Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Martin, Verner
                              Blank 3 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004
                              Proof Of Service Of Summons & Complaint; Notice Of Court Mediation Program; Alternative Dispute Resolution Information Package; Stipulation For Alternative Dispute Resolution; Case Management Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Served Jan-24-2004, Personal Service On Defendant Martin, Verner
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Notice To Plaintiff
                                Notice To Plaintiff
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: 1/13/2004 Complaint
                                  Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Martin, Verner Does 1-10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For May-14-2004 Proof Of Service Due On Mar-15-2004 Case Management Statement Due On Apr-29-2004
                                    Request RequestSpace

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?