Pioneer Financial,llc v. Jackie Kaufman Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 04 428469
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Kennard , +1 916 920 2295 +1 916 920 0682 rskennard@nelson-kennard.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Kaufman, Jackie, Defendant
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (4) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 9/13/2005, Entered: 9/13/2005
Return Of Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County, Returned And Filed, Unsatisfied As To Defendant Kaufman, Jackie
    Blank 13 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: 10/22/2004
    Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County As To Defendant Kaufman, Jackie
      Blank 12 Filed: 10/14/2004, Entered: 10/14/2004
      Cost Bill After Judgment, $.00 Credit Acknowledged, $355.33 Interest, $26.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc
        Blank 11 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: 7/14/2004
        Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: 7/2/2004 Case Ordered Off Calendar
          Order To Show Cause Of Jul-14-2004 Is Off Calendar Judgment. Notice Sent By Court.
            Request RequestSpace
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Clerks Judgment - General
            Under Application To The Clerk For Judgment Under Sec 585(1) C.c.p., It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc Recover From Defendant Kaufman, Jackie $8,428.57 Principal, $1,175.00 Attorney Fees, $2,647.30 Interest, $198.30 Costs, Total Judgment $12,449.17, See Scanned Document
              Request RequestSpace
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint
              Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Does 1 To 10
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 7 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                Declaration Of Robert Scott Kennard Re: Unavailability Of Orig. Instrument; Computation Of Interest; Ccp 1033(b)(2); & Cc 1717 Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc
                  Blank 6 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                  Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered, Declaration Of Non-military Status, Cost Bill $198.30 Filed, Credit Acknowledged $.00 As To Defendant Kaufman, Jackie
                    Blank 5 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004
                    Summons Returned Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc On Defendant Kaufman, Jackie
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/14/2004 Order to Show Cause
                      Order To Show Cause Set For Jul-14-2004 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To Obtain An Answer(s) From, Or Enter Default(s) Against, Defendant(s). The Jun-04-2004 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 3 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004
                        Summons On Complaint, Proof Of Service Only, Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc Served Feb-27-2004, Substitute Service On Natural Person On Defendant Kaufman, Jackie
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Notice To Plaintiff
                          Notice To Plaintiff
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/2/2004, Entered: 2/2/2004 Complaint
                            Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc As To Defendant Kaufman, Jackie Does 1 To 10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jun-04-2004 Proof Of Service Due On Apr-02-2004 Case Management Statement Due On May-20-2004
                              Request RequestSpace

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 14 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?