Pioneer Financial,llc v. Yung-lin Chou Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 04 429432
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Kennard , +1 916 920 2295 +1 916 920 0682 rskennard@nelson-kennard.com
v.
No Logo Chou, Yung-lin, Defendant
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/10/2004, Entered: 8/10/2004 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Order To Show Cause Of Aug-25-2004 Is Off Calendar Dismissal Filed. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/2/2004, Entered: 8/2/2004 Dismissal Of Entire Action
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice
      Request RequestSpace
      Blank 9 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004
      Non Service/return Of Summons & Complt Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc As To Defendant Chou, Yung-lin
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/24/2004, Entered: 6/24/2004 Order to Show Cause
        Order To Show Cause Set For Aug-25-2004 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Jul-09-2004 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 7 Filed: 6/21/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004
          Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Hours
            Blank 6 Filed: 6/8/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004
            Appearance For Plaintiff. After Hearing, Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Is Ordered Off Calendar. Proceedings Reported By: Vicki Gross (212)
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/18/2004 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
              Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Jun-08-2004 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 4 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004
                Not Founde Or Non-service Return Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc
                  Blank 3 Filed: 4/2/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004
                  Not Found Or Non Service Return Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Notice To Plaintiff
                    Notice To Plaintiff
                      Request RequestSpace
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Complaint
                      Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial,llc As To Defendant Chou, Yung-lin Does 1 To 10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-09-2004 Proof Of Service Due On May-07-2004 Case Management Statement Due On Jun-24-2004
                        Request RequestSpace

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 3 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?