Pioneer Financial, Llc v. Yuri Castro Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 04 429787
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Kennard , +1 916 920 2295 +1 916 920 0682 rskennard@nelson-kennard.com
v.
No Logo Castro, Yuri, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-10, Defendant
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/7/2005, Entered: 1/7/2005 Case Ordered Off Calendar
Order To Show Cause Of Jan-12-2005 Is Off Calendar. Dismissal Filed. Notice Sent By Court.
    Request RequestSpace
    Blank 17 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: 1/6/2005
    Declaration Of Gloria Zarco In Opposition To Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: 1/3/2005 Dismissal Of Entire Action
      Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice
        Request RequestSpace
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: 11/18/2004 Continued Order To Show Cause
        Order To Show Cause Set For Dec-01-2004 Continued To Jan-12-2005 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Dec-01-2004 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
          Request RequestSpace
          Blank 14 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: 11/3/2004
          Non Service/return Summons And Complainton Deft Yuri Castro Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
            Blank 13 Filed: 10/12/2004, Entered: 10/12/2004
            Non Service Of Summons & Complt Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/6/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 Continued Order To Show Cause
              Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-20-2004 Continued To Dec-01-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Oct-20-2004 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                Request RequestSpace
                Blank 11 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 9/30/2004
                Not Found Re Summons & Complt Filed By Pltf
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Continued Order To Show Cause
                  Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-01-2004 Continued To Oct-20-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Sep-01-2004 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                    Request RequestSpace
                    Blank 9 Filed: 7/30/2004, Entered: 7/30/2004
                    Non Service/return Summons And Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                      Blank 8 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
                      Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Hours
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Order to Show Cause
                        Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-01-2004 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Jul-23-2004 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                          Request RequestSpace
                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004
                          After Hearing, Order To Show Cause Is Ordered Off Calendar. Proceedings Reported By : Vicki Gross. # 5525 (212)
                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004
                            Mini-minutes For Jun-22-2004 9:00 Am For Dept 212
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                              Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Jun-22-2004 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                Request RequestSpace
                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004
                                Not Found Or Non Service Return; Attempted To Serve The Following Summons & Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Notice To Plaintiff
                                  Notice To Plaintiff
                                    Request RequestSpace
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Complaint
                                    Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Castro, Yuri Does 1-10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-23-2004 Proof Of Service Due On May-21-2004 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-08-2004
                                      Request RequestSpace

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?