Pioneer Financial, Llc v. Yevgeniy A. Khata Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 04 429792
Superior Court Judge Arlene T. Borick, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Kennard , +1 916 920 2295 +1 916 920 0682 rskennard@nelson-kennard.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 To 10, Defendant
No Logo Khata, Yevgeniy A., Defendant
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Order That Hearing Is Off Calendar
Pre-trial Calendar Sweep, Order To Show Cause Calendar Of Jan-11-2006, Off Calendar, Dismissal Of Entire Action Filed (sweep)
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/12/2005, Entered: 10/12/2005 Dismissal Of Entire Action Without Prejudice.
    Dismissal Of Entire Action Of All Parties And All Causes Of Action Without Prejudice
      Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: 10/6/2005 Continued Order To Show Cause
      Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-12-2005 Continued To Jan-11-2006 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Oct-12-2005 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
        Blank 23 Filed: 10/5/2005, Entered: 10/5/2005
        Declaration In Opposition To Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
          Blank 22 Filed: 7/14/2005, Entered: 7/14/2005
          Declaration Of Non Service/return (of Summons And Complaint) Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Continued Order To Show Cause
            Order To Show Cause Set For Jul-13-2005 Continued To Oct-12-2005 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Jul-13-2005 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
              Request RequestSpace
              Blank 20 Filed: 7/6/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005
              Declaration In Opposition To Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: 4/8/2005 Continued Order To Show Cause
                Order To Show Cause Set For Apr-13-2005 Continued To Jul-13-2005 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Apr-13-2005 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 18 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: 3/16/2005
                  Non Service Of Summons & Complt Filed By Pltf
                    Blank 17 Filed: 2/18/2005, Entered: 2/18/2005
                    Declaration In Opposition To Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/17/2005, Entered: 2/17/2005 Continued Order To Show Cause
                      Order To Show Cause Set For Mar-02-2005 Continued To Apr-13-2005 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Mar-02-2005 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                        Request RequestSpace
                        Blank 15 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/5/2005
                        Declaration Of Non Service/return (summons & Complaint) Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004 Continued Order To Show Cause
                          Order To Show Cause Set For Dec-01-2004 Continued To Mar-02-2005 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Notice Sent By Court.
                            Request RequestSpace
                            Blank 13 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: 12/1/2004
                            Mini-minutes For Dec-01-2004 1:30 Pm For Dept 212
                              Blank 12 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: 11/29/2004
                              Declaration In Opposition To Order To Show Cause Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: 10/5/2004 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                Order To Show Cause Set For Oct-20-2004 Continued To Dec-01-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Oct-20-2004 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                  Request RequestSpace
                                  Blank 10 Filed: 8/25/2004, Entered: 8/25/2004
                                  Non Service/return Summons & Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Continued Order To Show Cause
                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-01-2004 Continued To Oct-20-2004 At 1:30 Pm In Dept. 212 For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). Sep-01-2004 Order To Show Cause Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Order to Show Cause
                                      Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-01-2004 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Jul-23-2004 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Blank 7 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: 7/6/2004
                                        Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Hours
                                          Blank 6 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004
                                          After Hearing, Order To Show Cause Is Ordered Off Calendar. Proceedings Reported By : Vicki Gross. # 5525 (212)
                                            Blank 5 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004
                                            Mini-minutes For Jun-22-2004 9:00 Am For Dept 212
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                              Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Jun-22-2004 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                Request RequestSpace
                                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/20/2004
                                                Nont Found Or Non-service Return Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                  Notice To Plaintiff
                                                    Request RequestSpace
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: 3/22/2004 Complaint
                                                    Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Khata, Yevgeniy A. Does 1 To 10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-23-2004 Proof Of Service Due On May-21-2004 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-08-2004

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 83 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?