Pioneer Financial, Llc v. Saundra E. Young Et Al
State Civil Lawsuit Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, Case No. CGC 04 429875
Superior Court Judge Sue M. Kaplan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pioneer Financial LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson & Kennard

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Scott Kennard , +1 916 920 2295 +1 916 920 0682 rskennard@nelson-kennard.com
v.
No Logo Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead, Defendant
Cause of Action Common Counts/open Book Account/collections
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (6) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: 6/19/2013 Satisfaction of Judgment
Satisfaction Of Judgment, Fully Satisfied, Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
    Request RequestSpace
    Legal Document 30 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 Execution For Money/possession/sale Return
    Return Of Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County, Returned And Filed, Fully Satisfied In The Sum Of $1,175.13 As To Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
      Blank 29 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012
      Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County As To Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
        Blank 28 Filed: 11/7/2012, Entered: 11/7/2012
        Cost Bill After Judgment, $593.41 Credit Acknowledged, $199.41 Interest, $125.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: 9/5/2012 Execution For Money/possession/sale Return
          Return Of Execution For Money Issued To Alameda County, Returned Unserved As To Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
            Request RequestSpace
            Blank 26 Filed: 5/1/2012, Entered: 5/1/2012
            Execution For Money Issued To Alameda County As To Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: 2/23/2012 Cost Bill
              Cost Bill After Judgment, $1,400.00 Credit Acknowledged, $144.66 Interest, $100.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                Request RequestSpace
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: 9/23/2011 Cost Bill
                Cost Bill After Judgment, $1,400.00 Credit Acknowledged, $913.40 Interest, $100.00 Costs, Md=9-6-11 Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                  Request RequestSpace
                  Blank 23 Filed: 8/25/2011, Entered: 8/25/2011
                  Cost Bill After Judgment, $593.41 Credit Acknowledged, $82.59 Interest, $100.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                    Blank 22 Filed: 6/8/2011, Entered: 6/8/2011
                    Return Of Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County, Returned And Filed, Unsatisfied As To Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
                      Blank 21 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: 2/3/2011
                      Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County As To Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
                        Blank 20 Filed: 11/9/2010, Entered: 11/9/2010
                        Cost Bill After Judgment, $593.41 Credit Acknowledged, $24.81 Interest, $75.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                          Blank 19 Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: 1/26/2010
                          Return Of Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County, Returned And Filed, Unsatisfied As To Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
                            Blank 18 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: 6/26/2009
                            Execution For Money Issued To San Francisco County As To Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
                              Blank 17 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: 6/16/2009
                              Cost Bill After Judgment, $.00 Credit Acknowledged, $654.16 Interest, $.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                                Blank 16 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: 5/22/2009
                                Cost Bill, $.00 Credit Acknowledged, $641.95 Interest, $.00 Costs Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                                  Blank 15 Filed: 8/30/2004, Entered: 8/30/2004
                                  Abstract Of Judgment Issued To Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/19/2004, Entered: 8/19/2004 Case Ordered Off Calendar
                                    Order To Show Cause Of Sep-01-2004 Is Off Calendar Judgment. Notice Sent By Court.
                                      Request RequestSpace
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Clerks Judgment - General
                                      Under Application To The Clerk For Judgment Under Sec 585(1) C.c.p., It Is Adjudged That Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Recover From Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead $740.49 Principal, $240.00 Attorney Fees, $184.80 Interest, $198.30 Costs, Total Judgment $1,363.59, See Scanned Document
                                        Request RequestSpace
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004 Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint
                                        Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Complaint As To Defendant Does 1-10
                                          Request RequestSpace
                                          Blank 11 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004
                                          Declaration Of Robert Scott Kennard Re: Unavailability Of Orig. Instrument; Interest Computation; Ccp 1033(b)(2); & Cc1717. Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc
                                            Blank 10 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004
                                            Request To Enter Default Filed/default Entered, Declaration Of Non-military Status, Cost Bill $198.30 Filed, Credit Acknowledged $.00 As To Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
                                              Blank 9 Filed: 8/6/2004, Entered: 8/6/2004
                                              Summons Returned Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc On Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
                                                Blank 8 Filed: 7/15/2004, Entered: 7/15/2004
                                                Summons On Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Served Jun-22-2004, Personal Service On Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead
                                                  Blank 7 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004
                                                  Case Management Statement Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc Estimated Time For Trial: 2.0 Hours
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/8/2004, Entered: 7/8/2004 Order to Show Cause
                                                    Order To Show Cause Set For Sep-01-2004 In Department 212 At 1:30 Pm For Failure To File Proof Of Service On Defendant(s) And Obtain Answer(s), Or Enter Default(s). The Jul-23-2004 Case Management Conference Is Off Calendar. Notice Sent By Court.
                                                      Request RequestSpace
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004
                                                      After Hearing, Order To Show Cause Is Ordered Off Calendar. Proceedings Reported By : Vicki Gross. # 5525 (212)
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 6/22/2004, Entered: 6/22/2004
                                                        Mini-minutes For Jun-22-2004 9:00 Am For Dept 212
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/1/2004, Entered: 6/1/2004 Order To Show Cause Re: Proof Of Service
                                                          Added To Proof Of Service Order To Show Cause Calendar Hearing Set For Jun-22-2004 At 09:00 Am In Dept 212
                                                            Request RequestSpace
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Notice To Plaintiff
                                                            Notice To Plaintiff
                                                              Request RequestSpace
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/24/2004, Entered: 3/24/2004 Complaint
                                                              Common Counts/open Book Account/collections, Complaint Filed By Plaintiff Pioneer Financial, Llc As To Defendant Young, Saundra E. Aka Saundra E. Armstead Does 1-10 Summons Issued, Judicial Council Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed Case Management Conference Scheduled For Jul-23-2004 Proof Of Service Due On May-24-2004 Case Management Statement Due On Jul-08-2004
                                                                Request RequestSpace

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?